EP2871975 - GELLED FOOD CONCENTRATE COMPRISING PECTIN GEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.02.2017 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For:AL
AT
BE
BG
CH
CZ
DE
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GR
HR
HU
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
MK
NL
NO
PL
PT
RO
RS
SE
SI
SK
SM
TR
Unilever N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | For:CY
GB
IE
MT
Unilever PLC Unilever House 100 Victoria Embankment London, Greater London EC4Y 0DY / GB | [2015/40] |
Former [2015/39] | For all designated states Unilever N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | ||
For:CY
GB
IE
MT
Unilever PLC Unilever House 100 Victoria Embankment London, Greater London EC4Y 0DY / GB | |||
Former [2015/21] | For all designated states Unilever N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | ||
For all designated states Unilever PLC A Company Registered In England And Wales Under Company No. 41424 Of Unilever House 100 Victoria Embankment London, Greater London EC4Y 0DY / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
POPP, Alois, Konrad Unilever R&D Vlaardingen B.V. Olivier van Noortlaan 120 NL-3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL | 02 /
SILVA PAES, Sabrina Unilever R&D Vlaardingen B.V. Olivier van Noortlaan 120 NL-3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL | 03 /
VREEKER, Robert Unilever R&D Vlaardingen B.V. Olivier van Noortlaan 120 NL-3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL | [2015/21] | Representative(s) | Tjon, Hon Kong Guno Unilever Patent Group Bronland 14 6708 WH Wageningen / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2015/21] | Tjon, Hon Kong Guno Unilever N.V. Unilever Patent Group Olivier van Noortlaan 120 3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL | Application number, filing date | 13731772.3 | 26.06.2013 | [2016/14] | WO2013EP63357 | Priority number, date | EP20120176416 | 13.07.2012 Original published format: EP 12176416 | [2015/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014009155 | Date: | 16.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2871975 | Date: | 20.05.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.01.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2871975 | Date: | 06.04.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.01.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A23L29/231, A23L29/256, A23L29/269, A23L19/00, A23L27/60, A23L23/00, A23L23/10 | [2016/10] | CPC: |
A23L23/10 (EP,CN);
A23L19/00 (EP,CN);
A23L23/00 (EP,CN);
A23L27/60 (EP,CN);
A23L29/231 (EP,CN);
A23L29/256 (EP,CN);
| C-Set: |
A23V2002/00, A23V2250/5026, A23V2250/50362, A23V2250/5054, A23V2250/50724 (CN,EP)
|
Former IPC [2015/21] | A23L1/0524, A23L1/0532, A23L1/054, A23L1/212, A23L1/24, A23L1/39, A23L1/40 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/21] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GELFÖRMIGES NAHRUNGSMITTELKONZENTRAT ENTHALTEND EIN PEKTINGEL | [2015/34] | English: | GELLED FOOD CONCENTRATE COMPRISING PECTIN GEL | [2015/21] | French: | CONCENTRÉ ALIMENTAIRE GÉLIFIÉ CONTENANT UN GEL DE LA PECTINE | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/21] | GELFÖRMIGES NAHRUNGSMITTELKONZENTRAT MIT PEKTINGEL | ||
Former [2015/21] | CONCENTRÉ D'ALIMENT GÉLIFIÉ COMPRENANT UN GEL DE PECTINE | Entry into regional phase | 01.12.2014 | National basic fee paid | 01.12.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.12.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.12.2014 | Examination requested [2015/21] | 05.08.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.09.2015 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 04.11.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.01.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 15.01.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.01.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.08.2015 | Opposition(s) | 10.01.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.06.2013 | AL | 06.04.2016 | AT | 06.04.2016 | BE | 06.04.2016 | BG | 06.04.2016 | CY | 06.04.2016 | CZ | 06.04.2016 | DK | 06.04.2016 | EE | 06.04.2016 | ES | 06.04.2016 | FI | 06.04.2016 | HR | 06.04.2016 | LT | 06.04.2016 | LV | 06.04.2016 | MC | 06.04.2016 | MK | 06.04.2016 | NL | 06.04.2016 | PL | 06.04.2016 | RO | 06.04.2016 | RS | 06.04.2016 | SE | 06.04.2016 | SI | 06.04.2016 | SK | 06.04.2016 | SM | 06.04.2016 | IE | 26.06.2016 | LU | 26.06.2016 | CH | 30.06.2016 | LI | 30.06.2016 | MT | 30.06.2016 | NO | 06.07.2016 | GR | 07.07.2016 | IS | 06.08.2016 | PT | 08.08.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/38] | HU | 26.06.2013 | |
AT | 06.04.2016 | ||
BE | 06.04.2016 | ||
BG | 06.04.2016 | ||
CY | 06.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2016 | ||
DK | 06.04.2016 | ||
EE | 06.04.2016 | ||
ES | 06.04.2016 | ||
FI | 06.04.2016 | ||
HR | 06.04.2016 | ||
LT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LV | 06.04.2016 | ||
MC | 06.04.2016 | ||
MK | 06.04.2016 | ||
NL | 06.04.2016 | ||
PL | 06.04.2016 | ||
RO | 06.04.2016 | ||
RS | 06.04.2016 | ||
SE | 06.04.2016 | ||
SI | 06.04.2016 | ||
SK | 06.04.2016 | ||
SM | 06.04.2016 | ||
IE | 26.06.2016 | ||
LU | 26.06.2016 | ||
CH | 30.06.2016 | ||
LI | 30.06.2016 | ||
MT | 30.06.2016 | ||
NO | 06.07.2016 | ||
GR | 07.07.2016 | ||
IS | 06.08.2016 | ||
PT | 08.08.2016 | ||
Former [2018/32] | HU | 26.06.2013 | |
AT | 06.04.2016 | ||
BE | 06.04.2016 | ||
CY | 06.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2016 | ||
DK | 06.04.2016 | ||
EE | 06.04.2016 | ||
ES | 06.04.2016 | ||
FI | 06.04.2016 | ||
HR | 06.04.2016 | ||
LT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LV | 06.04.2016 | ||
MC | 06.04.2016 | ||
MK | 06.04.2016 | ||
NL | 06.04.2016 | ||
PL | 06.04.2016 | ||
RO | 06.04.2016 | ||
RS | 06.04.2016 | ||
SE | 06.04.2016 | ||
SI | 06.04.2016 | ||
SK | 06.04.2016 | ||
SM | 06.04.2016 | ||
IE | 26.06.2016 | ||
LU | 26.06.2016 | ||
CH | 30.06.2016 | ||
LI | 30.06.2016 | ||
MT | 30.06.2016 | ||
NO | 06.07.2016 | ||
GR | 07.07.2016 | ||
IS | 06.08.2016 | ||
PT | 08.08.2016 | ||
Former [2018/30] | HU | 26.06.2013 | |
AT | 06.04.2016 | ||
BE | 06.04.2016 | ||
CY | 06.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2016 | ||
DK | 06.04.2016 | ||
EE | 06.04.2016 | ||
ES | 06.04.2016 | ||
FI | 06.04.2016 | ||
HR | 06.04.2016 | ||
LT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LV | 06.04.2016 | ||
MC | 06.04.2016 | ||
MK | 06.04.2016 | ||
NL | 06.04.2016 | ||
PL | 06.04.2016 | ||
RO | 06.04.2016 | ||
RS | 06.04.2016 | ||
SE | 06.04.2016 | ||
SI | 06.04.2016 | ||
SK | 06.04.2016 | ||
SM | 06.04.2016 | ||
IE | 26.06.2016 | ||
LU | 26.06.2016 | ||
CH | 30.06.2016 | ||
LI | 30.06.2016 | ||
NO | 06.07.2016 | ||
GR | 07.07.2016 | ||
IS | 06.08.2016 | ||
PT | 08.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/25] | AT | 06.04.2016 | |
BE | 06.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2016 | ||
DK | 06.04.2016 | ||
EE | 06.04.2016 | ||
ES | 06.04.2016 | ||
FI | 06.04.2016 | ||
HR | 06.04.2016 | ||
LT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LV | 06.04.2016 | ||
MC | 06.04.2016 | ||
NL | 06.04.2016 | ||
PL | 06.04.2016 | ||
RO | 06.04.2016 | ||
RS | 06.04.2016 | ||
SE | 06.04.2016 | ||
SI | 06.04.2016 | ||
SK | 06.04.2016 | ||
SM | 06.04.2016 | ||
IE | 26.06.2016 | ||
CH | 30.06.2016 | ||
LI | 30.06.2016 | ||
NO | 06.07.2016 | ||
GR | 07.07.2016 | ||
IS | 06.08.2016 | ||
PT | 08.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 06.04.2016 | |
BE | 06.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2016 | ||
DK | 06.04.2016 | ||
EE | 06.04.2016 | ||
ES | 06.04.2016 | ||
FI | 06.04.2016 | ||
HR | 06.04.2016 | ||
LT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LV | 06.04.2016 | ||
MC | 06.04.2016 | ||
NL | 06.04.2016 | ||
PL | 06.04.2016 | ||
RO | 06.04.2016 | ||
RS | 06.04.2016 | ||
SE | 06.04.2016 | ||
SK | 06.04.2016 | ||
SM | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.07.2016 | ||
GR | 07.07.2016 | ||
IS | 06.08.2016 | ||
PT | 08.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | AT | 06.04.2016 | |
BE | 06.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2016 | ||
DK | 06.04.2016 | ||
EE | 06.04.2016 | ||
ES | 06.04.2016 | ||
FI | 06.04.2016 | ||
HR | 06.04.2016 | ||
LT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LV | 06.04.2016 | ||
MC | 06.04.2016 | ||
NL | 06.04.2016 | ||
PL | 06.04.2016 | ||
RO | 06.04.2016 | ||
RS | 06.04.2016 | ||
SE | 06.04.2016 | ||
SK | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.07.2016 | ||
GR | 07.07.2016 | ||
IS | 06.08.2016 | ||
PT | 08.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | AT | 06.04.2016 | |
BE | 06.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2016 | ||
DK | 06.04.2016 | ||
EE | 06.04.2016 | ||
ES | 06.04.2016 | ||
FI | 06.04.2016 | ||
HR | 06.04.2016 | ||
LT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LV | 06.04.2016 | ||
MC | 06.04.2016 | ||
NL | 06.04.2016 | ||
PL | 06.04.2016 | ||
RO | 06.04.2016 | ||
RS | 06.04.2016 | ||
SE | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.07.2016 | ||
GR | 07.07.2016 | ||
IS | 06.08.2016 | ||
PT | 08.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 06.04.2016 | |
BE | 06.04.2016 | ||
DK | 06.04.2016 | ||
ES | 06.04.2016 | ||
FI | 06.04.2016 | ||
HR | 06.04.2016 | ||
LT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LV | 06.04.2016 | ||
MC | 06.04.2016 | ||
NL | 06.04.2016 | ||
PL | 06.04.2016 | ||
RS | 06.04.2016 | ||
SE | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.07.2016 | ||
GR | 07.07.2016 | ||
IS | 06.08.2016 | ||
PT | 08.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 06.04.2016 | |
BE | 06.04.2016 | ||
ES | 06.04.2016 | ||
FI | 06.04.2016 | ||
HR | 06.04.2016 | ||
LT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LV | 06.04.2016 | ||
NL | 06.04.2016 | ||
PL | 06.04.2016 | ||
RS | 06.04.2016 | ||
SE | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.07.2016 | ||
GR | 07.07.2016 | ||
IS | 06.08.2016 | ||
PT | 08.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/52] | AT | 06.04.2016 | |
ES | 06.04.2016 | ||
FI | 06.04.2016 | ||
HR | 06.04.2016 | ||
LT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LV | 06.04.2016 | ||
NL | 06.04.2016 | ||
PL | 06.04.2016 | ||
RS | 06.04.2016 | ||
SE | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.07.2016 | ||
GR | 07.07.2016 | ||
IS | 06.08.2016 | ||
PT | 08.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | AT | 06.04.2016 | |
ES | 06.04.2016 | ||
FI | 06.04.2016 | ||
HR | 06.04.2016 | ||
LT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LV | 06.04.2016 | ||
NL | 06.04.2016 | ||
PL | 06.04.2016 | ||
RS | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.07.2016 | ||
GR | 07.07.2016 | ||
IS | 06.08.2016 | ||
PT | 08.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 06.04.2016 | |
ES | 06.04.2016 | ||
FI | 06.04.2016 | ||
HR | 06.04.2016 | ||
LT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LV | 06.04.2016 | ||
NL | 06.04.2016 | ||
PL | 06.04.2016 | ||
RS | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.07.2016 | ||
IS | 06.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | FI | 06.04.2016 | |
LT | 06.04.2016 | ||
NL | 06.04.2016 | ||
PL | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.07.2016 | ||
IS | 06.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/48] | LT | 06.04.2016 | |
NL | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.07.2016 | ||
IS | 06.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | LT | 06.04.2016 | |
NL | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/44] | NL | 06.04.2016 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO0008952 (DANISCO [DK], et al) [A] 1-15 * page 2, line 7 - page 13, line 23; example 6; claims 1-10 *; | [A]WO0205658 (GEN MILLS INC [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * page 5, line 28 - page 15, line 31 * * page 24, line 5 - page 34, line 22 * * example 1; claims 1-74 *; | [A]JP2004129596 (SANEI GEN FFI INC) [A] 1-15 * abstract *; | [A]EP2005838 (UNILEVER NV [NL], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0012] - [0038]; examples 1a-1f; claims 1-13 *; | [AD]EP2468110 (NESTEC SA [CH]) [AD] 1-15 * paragraphs [0009] - [0045]; examples 4,5; claims 1-17 *; | [XP]WO2012097918 (UNILEVER NV [NL], et al) [XP] 1-15 * page 3, line 4 - page 14, line 7 * * page 16, line 29 - page 26, line 5; examples 1-10; claims 1-15 *; | [A] - SANG-HO YOO ET AL, "Monovalent Salt-Induced Gelation of Enzymatically Deesterified Pectin", JOURNAL OF AGRICULTURAL AND FOOD CHEMISTRY, (20031201), vol. 51, no. 25, doi:10.1021/jf030152o, ISSN 0021-8561, pages 7410 - 7417, XP055038900 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jf030152o | [A] - LOOTENS D ET AL, "Influence of pH, Ca concentration, temperature and amidation on the gelation of low methoxyl pectin", FOOD HYDROCOLLOIDS, ELSEVIER BV, NL, vol. 17, no. 3, doi:10.1016/S0268-005X(02)00056-5, ISSN 0268-005X, (20030101), pages 237 - 244, (20030313), XP002562210 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0268-005X(02)00056-5 | by applicant | WO2004049822 | WO2007113111 | EP2468110 | - VAN VLIET, "Rheological properties of filled gels. Influence of filler matrix interaction", COLLOID POLYM SCI, (1988), vol. 266, pages 518 - 524 | - ENGLYST; CUMMINGS, ANALYST, (1984), vol. 109, no. 7, pages 937 - 942 | - FILISETTI-COZZI; CARPITA, ANALYTICAL BIOCHEMISTRY, (1991), vol. 197, pages 157 - 162 | - WALTER ET AL., JOURNAL OF FOOD SCIENCE, (1983), vol. 48, pages 1006 - 10070 | - HOU ET AL., BOTANICAL BULLETIN OF ACADEMIA SINCIA, (1999), vol. 40, pages 115 - 119 | - LEVIGNE S. ET AL., FOOD HYDROCOLLOIDS, (2002), vol. 16, pages 547 - 550 | - ROSENBOHM ET AL., CARBOHYDRATE RESEARCH, (2003), vol. 338, pages 637 - 649 | - WILLIAMS ET AL., JOURNAL OF AGRICULTURAL FOOD AND CHEMISTRY, (2003), vol. 51, pages 1777 - 1781 | - STROM ET AL., CARBOHYDRATE POLYMERS, (20050620), vol. 60, no. 4, pages 467 - 473 |