EP2874988 - PROCESS FOR PREPARING DIACID COMPOUNDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.08.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.08.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.09.2018 [2018/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rhodia Operations 25 Rue de Clichy 75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2016/12] | For all designated states Rhodia Operations 25 rue de Clichy 75009 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2015/22] | For all designated states RHODIA OPERATIONS 40 rue de la Haie-Coq 93306 Aubervilliers / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JACQUOT, Roland 15 rue des Pinsons 69340 Francheville / FR | 02 /
RHERS, Bouchra 24 Rue Frédéric Mistral 69003 Lyon / FR | [2015/22] | Representative(s) | Banfi, Gaia, et al Solvay S.A. Italia Viale Lombardia, 20 20021 Bollate (MI) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2015/22] | Chatelan, Florence Anne, et al Rhodia Opérations Direction de la Propriété Industrielle 85 avenue des Frères Perret 69192 Saint-Fons / FR | Application number, filing date | 13731775.6 | 26.06.2013 | WO2013EP63363 | Priority number, date | FR20120056996 | 19.07.2012 Original published format: FR 1256996 | [2015/22] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014012754 | Date: | 23.01.2014 | Language: | FR | [2014/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2874988 | Date: | 27.05.2015 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.01.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.01.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C07C51/00, C07C55/10, C07C55/12, C07C55/02 | [2015/22] | CPC: |
C07C51/00 (EP,CN,US);
C07C51/087 (KR);
C07C51/42 (US);
C07C51/44 (KR,US);
C07C55/10 (KR);
C07C55/12 (KR)
| C-Set: |
C07C51/00, C07C55/02 (US,CN,EP);
C07C51/00, C07C55/10 (CN,EP,US);
C07C51/00, C07C55/12 (US,CN,EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/22] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON DISÄUREVERBINDUNGEN | [2015/22] | English: | PROCESS FOR PREPARING DIACID COMPOUNDS | [2015/22] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION DE COMPOSÉS DIACIDES | [2015/22] | Entry into regional phase | 18.12.2014 | National basic fee paid | 18.12.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.12.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.12.2014 | Examination requested [2015/22] | 05.08.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.11.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.03.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/37] | 23.04.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/37] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.11.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2018 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US3931243 (PAUSTIAN JOHN E ET AL) [A] 1-15 * abstract * | [XI] - Jerry March, Advanced Organic Chemistry, New York, John Wiley & Sons, (19850101), pages 338 - 339, ISBN 0-471-88841-9, XP002694107 [X] 1 * page 339, lines 5-7 * [I] 2-15 | Examination | US4128574 | by applicant | - JERRY MARCH, Advanced Organic Chemistry, JOHN WILEY AND SONS, (1985), page 227 |