EP2861324 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR CONCENTRATING GAS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.10.2020 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.11.2020 [2020/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Invacare Corporation One Invacare Way Elyria, OH 44035-4190 / US | [2016/29] |
Former [2015/17] | For all designated states INVACARE CORPORATION One Invacare Way Elyria, OH 44036 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHELNUTT, Samuel, J. 34747 Deer Run Drive North Ridgeville, OH 44039 / US | 02 /
DANIELS, William, J. 180 Brixton Way Wadsworth, OH 44281 / US | [2015/17] | Representative(s) | Ganguillet, Cyril, et al ABREMA SA Avenue du Théâtre 16 1005 Lausanne / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2015/17] | Ganguillet, Cyril, et al ABREMA Agence Brevets & Marques Ganguillet Avenue du Théâtre 16 P.O. Box 5027 1002 Lausanne / CH | Application number, filing date | 13732338.2 | 17.06.2013 | WO2013US46086 | Priority number, date | US201261661260P | 18.06.2012 Original published format: US 201261661260 P | US201313790312 | 08.03.2013 Original published format: US201313790312 | [2015/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2013192074 | Date: | 27.12.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/52] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2861324 | Date: | 22.04.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.12.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.02.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/04, F04B19/00, F04B43/04 | [2015/17] | CPC: |
F04B43/046 (EP,US);
B01D53/0407 (EP,US);
B01D53/0446 (EP,US);
B01D53/047 (US);
B01D53/0476 (EP,US);
F04B19/006 (EP,US);
F04B45/043 (EP,US);
F04B45/047 (EP,US);
B01D2253/108 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/17] | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUM KONZENTRIEREN VON GAS | [2015/17] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR CONCENTRATING GAS | [2015/17] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE CONCENTRATION DE GAZ | [2015/17] | Entry into regional phase | 06.01.2015 | National basic fee paid | 06.01.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.01.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.01.2015 | Examination requested [2015/17] | 06.08.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.10.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.06.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/45] | 25.06.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/45] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.10.2019 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2003180164 (BUNNER BERNARD [US], et al) [X] 1-3,17 * paragraph [0064]; figures 1-3 *; | [X]US6106245 (CABUZ CLEOPATRA [US]) [X] 1-3,17 * column 7, line 1 - line 36; figures 1,3,6 *; | [X]US2003231967 (NAJAFI KHALIL [US], et al) [X] 1-3,17 * paragraphs [0004] , [0074] , [0080]; figures 6,9a *; | [X]US2003215342 (HIGASHINO KUSUNOKI [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,17 * paragraphs [0003] , [0113] , [0138] , [0169]; figures 5a-5b,16 *; | [XI]US2006174872 (JAGGER THEODORE W [US], et al) [X] 4-9,11-13,15,18-20 * paragraph [0052]; figures 2,5,6,10 * [I] 10,14,16; | [A]US6517610 (DE LA HOUSSAYE PAUL R [US]) [A] 4 * column 1 * | by applicant | US4449990 | US5906672 | US5917135 | US5988165 | US7294170 | US7455717 | US7722700 | US7875105 | US8062003 | US8070853 | US20080106861 |