EP2864830 - MICROSCOPE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.04.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.06.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Leica Microsystems CMS GmbH CPTD Ernst-Leitz-Strasse 17-37 35578 Wetzlar / DE | [2015/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SIECKMANN, Frank Frankenstrasse 11 75031 Eppingen / DE | 02 /
HUBER, Stefan Torweg 26 69250 Schönau / DE | [2015/41] |
Former [2015/37] | 01 /
SIECKMANN, Frank Hörsterholz 11 75031 Eppingen / DE | ||
02 /
HUBER, Stefan Torweg 26 69250 Schönau / DE | |||
Former [2015/18] | 01 /
SIECKMANN, Frank Hörsterholz 1d 44879 Bochum / DE | ||
02 /
HUBER, Stefan Torweg 26 69250 Schönau / DE | Representative(s) | Hoffmann, Jürgen ARROBA GbR Bahnhofstraße 2 65307 Bad Schwalbach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/18] | Bradl, Joachim Leica Microsystems GmbH Corporate Patents + Trademarks Department Ernst-Leitz-Strasse 17-37 35578 Wetzlar / DE | Application number, filing date | 13732430.7 | 20.06.2013 | WO2013EP62925 | Priority number, date | DE201210105484 | 22.06.2012 Original published format: DE102012105484 | [2015/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013190058 | Date: | 27.12.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2864830 | Date: | 29.04.2015 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.12.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.12.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G02B21/00 | [2015/18] | CPC: |
G02B21/00 (EP,US);
G02B21/008 (US);
G02B21/002 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/18] | Title | German: | MIKROSKOP | [2015/18] | English: | MICROSCOPE | [2015/18] | French: | MICROSCOPE | [2015/18] | Entry into regional phase | 22.01.2015 | National basic fee paid | 22.01.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.01.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.01.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.01.2015 | Examination requested [2015/18] | 03.07.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.01.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.11.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.03.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.10.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.04.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.01.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/21] | 23.01.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2024/21] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.07.2019 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2015 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   11.08.2015 | 30.06.2023 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [AD]DE10237470 (LEICA MICROSYSTEMS [DE]) [AD] 1-11* figure 1 *; | [XI]WO2007022961 (OLYMPUS SOFT IMAGING SOLUTIONS [DE], et al) [X] 1-3,8,9 * page 3, line 26 - page 4, line 8 * [I] 4-7,10,11; | [A]US2009168160 (GUINEY PATRICK [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * figures 6,7 * |