EP2846981 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING A COMPOSITE PRESSURE CONTAINER, AND CONTAINER SO PRODUCED [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2015/12] | COMPOSITE PRESSURE CONTAINER AND METHOD FOR PRODUCTION THEREOF | ||
[2017/26] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.03.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.06.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.03.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.05.2018 [2018/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hexagon Raufoss AS Enggata 40 2831 Raufoss / NO | [2015/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SANDVOLD, Pål Roanbakken 5 N-2849 Kapp / NO | 02 /
HAMNVIK, Per, Vidar Torgeir Forseths vei 3 N-2821 Gjøvik / NO | [2015/12] | Representative(s) | Onsagers AS P.O. Box 1813 Vika 0123 Oslo / NO | [2015/12] | Application number, filing date | 13732622.9 | 07.05.2013 | WO2013IB53645 | Priority number, date | NO20120000542 | 10.05.2012 Original published format: NO 20120542 | [2015/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013168080 | Date: | 14.11.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2846981 | Date: | 18.03.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.11.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.11.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B29C53/58, B29C53/60, B29C53/82, B29C53/84, B29C70/68, F17C1/06, F17C1/16, B29C70/32, B29C70/08, // B29L31/00 | [2017/26] | CPC: |
B29C70/086 (EP);
B29C70/32 (EP);
F17C1/06 (EP);
B29C53/602 (EP);
B29K2995/0089 (EP);
B29L2031/7156 (EP);
F17C2201/0109 (EP);
F17C2201/035 (EP);
F17C2203/0604 (EP);
F17C2203/0607 (EP);
F17C2203/0621 (EP);
F17C2203/0663 (EP);
F17C2203/067 (EP);
F17C2209/2154 (EP);
F17C2209/227 (EP);
F17C2209/234 (EP);
F17C2221/033 (EP);
F17C2221/035 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2015/12] | B29C53/58, B29C53/60, B29C53/82, B29C53/84, B29C70/68, F17C1/06, F17C1/16 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/12] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES DRUCKBEHÄLTERS AUS VERBUNDWERKSTOFF, UND EIN DANACH HERGESTELLTER BEHÄLTER | [2017/26] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING A COMPOSITE PRESSURE CONTAINER, AND CONTAINER SO PRODUCED | [2017/26] | French: | PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION D'UNE CUVE DE PRESSION COMPOSITE, ET CUVE AINSI PRODUITE | [2017/26] |
Former [2015/12] | VERBUNDDRUCKBEHÄLTER UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON | ||
Former [2015/12] | COMPOSITE PRESSURE CONTAINER AND METHOD FOR PRODUCTION THEREOF | ||
Former [2015/12] | CUVE DE PRESSION COMPOSITE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION | Entry into regional phase | 14.11.2014 | National basic fee paid | 14.11.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.11.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.11.2014 | Examination requested [2015/12] | 19.06.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.01.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.05.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.09.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.12.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.06.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.11.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/18] | 13.12.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2018/18] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.01.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2017 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [AD]WO2011152733 (RAGASCO AS [NO], et al) [AD] 1-12 * abstract *; | [A]WO9834063 (RAUFOSS COMPOSITES AS [NO], et al) [A] 1-12 * abstract *; | [A]EP1744093 (AYGAZ ANONIM SIRKETI [TR]) [A] 1-12 * abstract *; | [A]US2005269338 (OLIVEIRA TIAGO [PT], et al) [A] 1-12 * abstract *; | [A]US4783232 (CARBONE PAT J [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * abstract *; | [A]US2004163755 (LEBRETON EDWARD T [US]) [A] 1-12 * abstract *; | [A]WO2004035297 (EHA SPEZIALMASCHB GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1-12 * abstract *; | [A]DE60017256T (HEMBERT CLAUDE LEON [FR]) [A] 1-12 * paragraphs [0001] - [0005] - [0012] - [0014] - [0019] , [0027] - [0031] * * figures 1-4 * | by applicant | EP0810081 | WO2011152733 |