EP2883190 - TEXTURE FEATURES FOR BIOMETRIC AUTHENTICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.07.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.08.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.06.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Jumio Corporation 100 Mathilda Place, Suite 100 Sunnyvale, CA 94086 / US | [2023/44] |
Former [2023/36] | For all designated states Jumio Corporation 395 Page Mill Road, Suite 150 Palo Alto, CA 94306 / US | ||
Former [2015/25] | For all designated states Eyeverify LLC 1913 W. 45th Ave. Kansas City, KS 66103 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DERAKHSHANI, Reza 5444 Cedar Street Roeland Park, Kansas 66205 / US | 02 /
GOTTEMUKKULA, Vikas 5410 Harrison Street Kansas City, Missouri 64110 / US | 03 /
HUGHLETT, Casey 24003 W. 86th Terrace Lenexa, Kansas 66227 / US | [2015/25] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [2015/25] | Application number, filing date | 13732665.8 | 28.05.2013 | [2023/36] | WO2013US42889 | Priority number, date | US201213572188 | 10.08.2012 Original published format: US201213572188 | [2015/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014025445 | Date: | 13.02.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2883190 | Date: | 17.06.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.02.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2883190 | Date: | 06.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.02.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G06V40/18 | [2022/26] | CPC: |
G06V40/193 (EP,CN,US);
G06V10/20 (KR);
G06F18/22 (US);
G06T7/0014 (US);
G06V10/40 (KR);
G06V40/18 (US);
G06V40/14 (EP,CN,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2015/25] | G06K9/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/25] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TEXTURFUNKTIONEN FÜR BIOMETRISCHE AUTHENTIFIZIERUNG | [2015/25] | English: | TEXTURE FEATURES FOR BIOMETRIC AUTHENTICATION | [2015/25] | French: | CARACTÉRISTIQUES DE TEXTURE POUR UNE AUTHENTIFICATION BIOMÉTRIQUE | [2015/25] | Entry into regional phase | 26.02.2015 | National basic fee paid | 26.02.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.02.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.02.2015 | Examination requested [2015/25] | 06.10.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.09.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.07.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.12.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.06.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.10.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 13.10.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 13.10.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.03.2018 | Opposition(s) | 07.06.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 30.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2018 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   27.06.2018 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 06.09.2023 | CZ | 06.09.2023 | DK | 06.09.2023 | EE | 06.09.2023 | FI | 06.09.2023 | HR | 06.09.2023 | IT | 06.09.2023 | LT | 06.09.2023 | LV | 06.09.2023 | NL | 06.09.2023 | PL | 06.09.2023 | RO | 06.09.2023 | RS | 06.09.2023 | SE | 06.09.2023 | SI | 06.09.2023 | SK | 06.09.2023 | SM | 06.09.2023 | NO | 06.12.2023 | GR | 07.12.2023 | IS | 06.01.2024 | PT | 08.01.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/33] | AT | 06.09.2023 | |
CZ | 06.09.2023 | ||
DK | 06.09.2023 | ||
EE | 06.09.2023 | ||
FI | 06.09.2023 | ||
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
IT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
NL | 06.09.2023 | ||
PL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RO | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
SK | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
PT | 08.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 06.09.2023 | |
CZ | 06.09.2023 | ||
EE | 06.09.2023 | ||
FI | 06.09.2023 | ||
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
IT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
NL | 06.09.2023 | ||
PL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RO | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
SK | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
PT | 08.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | AT | 06.09.2023 | |
CZ | 06.09.2023 | ||
EE | 06.09.2023 | ||
FI | 06.09.2023 | ||
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
NL | 06.09.2023 | ||
PL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RO | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
SK | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
PT | 08.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 06.09.2023 | |
CZ | 06.09.2023 | ||
EE | 06.09.2023 | ||
FI | 06.09.2023 | ||
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
NL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RO | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
SK | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
PT | 08.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | FI | 06.09.2023 | |
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
NL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/14] | FI | 06.09.2023 | |
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
NL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | FI | 06.09.2023 | |
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | FI | 06.09.2023 | |
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 06.09.2023 | |
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2006119425 (UNIV WEST VIRGINIA [US], et al) [A] 1-30* the whole document *; | [XY]WO2010129074 (UNIV INDIANA RES & TECH CORP [US], et al) [X] 1,4,7,10,14,17,20,24,27 * abstract * * paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0035] * * paragraph [0048] * [Y] 2,12,22; | [X] - ZHI ZHOU ET AL, "A New Human Identification Method: Sclera Recognition", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON SYSTEMS, MAN, AND CYBERNETICS - PART A: SYSTEMS AND HUMANS, (20120501), vol. 42, no. 3, doi:10.1109/TSMCA.2011.2170416, ISSN 1083-4427, pages 571 - 583, XP055082577 [X] 1,4,7,11,14,17,21,24,27 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TSMCA.2011.2170416 | [Y] - SRIRAM PAVAN TANKASALA ET AL, "Biometric recognition of conjunctival vasculature using GLCM features", IMAGE INFORMATION PROCESSING (ICIIP), 2011 INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, (20111103), doi:10.1109/ICIIP.2011.6108974, ISBN 978-1-61284-859-4, pages 1 - 6, XP032078347 [Y] 2,12,22 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICIIP.2011.6108974 |