EP2867602 - FLAT TUBE AND HEAT EXCHANGER HAVING A FLAT TUBE OF SAID TYPE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.09.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.10.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.10.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.09.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL, IS | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MAHLE Behr GmbH & Co. KG Mauserstrasse 3 70469 Stuttgart / DE | [2015/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KÄSTLE, Christoph Lehnerweg 8 89077 Ulm / DE | 02 /
MARX, Steffen Neufeldstraße 7 B 81243 München / DE | [2017/46] |
Former [2015/19] | 01 /
KÄSTLE, Christoph Bebelstr. 29 70193 Stuttgart / DE | ||
02 /
MARX, Steffen Neufeldstraße 7 B 81243 München / DE | Representative(s) | Grauel, Andreas Grauel IP Patentanwaltskanzlei Wartbergstrasse 14 70191 Stuttgart / DE | [2017/46] |
Former [2015/19] | Grauel, Andreas Grauel IP Patentanwaltskanzlei Presselstrasse 10 70191 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 13732913.2 | 28.06.2013 | [2017/46] | WO2013EP63618 | Priority number, date | DE201210211350 | 29.06.2012 Original published format: DE102012211350 | [2015/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014001498 | Date: | 03.01.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2867602 | Date: | 06.05.2015 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.01.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2867602 | Date: | 15.11.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.01.2014 | Classification | IPC: | F28D1/03, F28F3/02 | [2015/19] | CPC: |
F28D1/0391 (EP,KR,US);
F28F1/42 (KR);
F28F1/12 (US);
F28F3/025 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/19] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FLACHROHR UND WÄRMEÜBERTRAGER MIT EINEM SOLCHEN FLACHROHR | [2015/19] | English: | FLAT TUBE AND HEAT EXCHANGER HAVING A FLAT TUBE OF SAID TYPE | [2015/19] | French: | TUBE PLAT ET ÉCHANGEUR DE CHALEUR ÉQUIPÉ D'UN TEL TUBE PLAT | [2015/19] | Entry into regional phase | 29.01.2015 | National basic fee paid | 29.01.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.01.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.01.2015 | Examination requested [2015/19] | 13.08.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.03.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.09.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.05.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.09.2017 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 05.09.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 05.09.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.10.2017 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 11.10.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.03.2016 | Opposition(s) | 17.08.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.06.2013 | AL | 15.11.2017 | CY | 15.11.2017 | CZ | 15.11.2017 | DK | 15.11.2017 | EE | 15.11.2017 | ES | 15.11.2017 | FI | 15.11.2017 | HR | 15.11.2017 | IT | 15.11.2017 | LT | 15.11.2017 | LV | 15.11.2017 | MC | 15.11.2017 | MK | 15.11.2017 | MT | 15.11.2017 | NL | 15.11.2017 | PL | 15.11.2017 | PT | 15.11.2017 | RO | 15.11.2017 | RS | 15.11.2017 | SE | 15.11.2017 | SI | 15.11.2017 | SK | 15.11.2017 | SM | 15.11.2017 | TR | 15.11.2017 | BG | 15.02.2018 | NO | 15.02.2018 | GR | 16.02.2018 | IS | 15.03.2018 | AT | 28.06.2018 | GB | 28.06.2018 | IE | 28.06.2018 | LU | 28.06.2018 | BE | 30.06.2018 | CH | 30.06.2018 | LI | 30.06.2018 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 28.06.2013 | |
CY | 15.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 15.11.2017 | ||
DK | 15.11.2017 | ||
EE | 15.11.2017 | ||
ES | 15.11.2017 | ||
FI | 15.11.2017 | ||
HR | 15.11.2017 | ||
IT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LV | 15.11.2017 | ||
MC | 15.11.2017 | ||
MK | 15.11.2017 | ||
MT | 15.11.2017 | ||
NL | 15.11.2017 | ||
PL | 15.11.2017 | ||
PT | 15.11.2017 | ||
RO | 15.11.2017 | ||
RS | 15.11.2017 | ||
SE | 15.11.2017 | ||
SI | 15.11.2017 | ||
SK | 15.11.2017 | ||
SM | 15.11.2017 | ||
TR | 15.11.2017 | ||
BG | 15.02.2018 | ||
NO | 15.02.2018 | ||
GR | 16.02.2018 | ||
AT | 28.06.2018 | ||
GB | 28.06.2018 | ||
IE | 28.06.2018 | ||
LU | 28.06.2018 | ||
BE | 30.06.2018 | ||
CH | 30.06.2018 | ||
LI | 30.06.2018 | ||
Former [2020/30] | HU | 28.06.2013 | |
CY | 15.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 15.11.2017 | ||
DK | 15.11.2017 | ||
EE | 15.11.2017 | ||
ES | 15.11.2017 | ||
FI | 15.11.2017 | ||
HR | 15.11.2017 | ||
IT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LV | 15.11.2017 | ||
MC | 15.11.2017 | ||
MT | 15.11.2017 | ||
NL | 15.11.2017 | ||
PL | 15.11.2017 | ||
PT | 15.11.2017 | ||
RO | 15.11.2017 | ||
RS | 15.11.2017 | ||
SE | 15.11.2017 | ||
SI | 15.11.2017 | ||
SK | 15.11.2017 | ||
SM | 15.11.2017 | ||
TR | 15.11.2017 | ||
BG | 15.02.2018 | ||
NO | 15.02.2018 | ||
GR | 16.02.2018 | ||
AT | 28.06.2018 | ||
GB | 28.06.2018 | ||
IE | 28.06.2018 | ||
LU | 28.06.2018 | ||
BE | 30.06.2018 | ||
CH | 30.06.2018 | ||
LI | 30.06.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | CY | 15.11.2017 | |
CZ | 15.11.2017 | ||
DK | 15.11.2017 | ||
EE | 15.11.2017 | ||
ES | 15.11.2017 | ||
FI | 15.11.2017 | ||
HR | 15.11.2017 | ||
IT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LV | 15.11.2017 | ||
MC | 15.11.2017 | ||
MT | 15.11.2017 | ||
NL | 15.11.2017 | ||
PL | 15.11.2017 | ||
PT | 15.11.2017 | ||
RO | 15.11.2017 | ||
RS | 15.11.2017 | ||
SE | 15.11.2017 | ||
SI | 15.11.2017 | ||
SK | 15.11.2017 | ||
SM | 15.11.2017 | ||
TR | 15.11.2017 | ||
BG | 15.02.2018 | ||
NO | 15.02.2018 | ||
GR | 16.02.2018 | ||
AT | 28.06.2018 | ||
GB | 28.06.2018 | ||
IE | 28.06.2018 | ||
LU | 28.06.2018 | ||
BE | 30.06.2018 | ||
CH | 30.06.2018 | ||
LI | 30.06.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | CY | 15.11.2017 | |
CZ | 15.11.2017 | ||
DK | 15.11.2017 | ||
EE | 15.11.2017 | ||
ES | 15.11.2017 | ||
FI | 15.11.2017 | ||
HR | 15.11.2017 | ||
IT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LV | 15.11.2017 | ||
MC | 15.11.2017 | ||
MT | 15.11.2017 | ||
NL | 15.11.2017 | ||
PL | 15.11.2017 | ||
RO | 15.11.2017 | ||
RS | 15.11.2017 | ||
SE | 15.11.2017 | ||
SI | 15.11.2017 | ||
SK | 15.11.2017 | ||
SM | 15.11.2017 | ||
TR | 15.11.2017 | ||
BG | 15.02.2018 | ||
NO | 15.02.2018 | ||
GR | 16.02.2018 | ||
AT | 28.06.2018 | ||
GB | 28.06.2018 | ||
IE | 28.06.2018 | ||
LU | 28.06.2018 | ||
BE | 30.06.2018 | ||
CH | 30.06.2018 | ||
LI | 30.06.2018 | ||
Former [2020/03] | CY | 15.11.2017 | |
CZ | 15.11.2017 | ||
DK | 15.11.2017 | ||
EE | 15.11.2017 | ||
ES | 15.11.2017 | ||
FI | 15.11.2017 | ||
HR | 15.11.2017 | ||
IT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LV | 15.11.2017 | ||
MC | 15.11.2017 | ||
MT | 15.11.2017 | ||
NL | 15.11.2017 | ||
PL | 15.11.2017 | ||
RO | 15.11.2017 | ||
RS | 15.11.2017 | ||
SE | 15.11.2017 | ||
SI | 15.11.2017 | ||
SK | 15.11.2017 | ||
SM | 15.11.2017 | ||
BG | 15.02.2018 | ||
NO | 15.02.2018 | ||
GR | 16.02.2018 | ||
AT | 28.06.2018 | ||
GB | 28.06.2018 | ||
IE | 28.06.2018 | ||
LU | 28.06.2018 | ||
BE | 30.06.2018 | ||
CH | 30.06.2018 | ||
LI | 30.06.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | CY | 15.11.2017 | |
CZ | 15.11.2017 | ||
DK | 15.11.2017 | ||
EE | 15.11.2017 | ||
ES | 15.11.2017 | ||
FI | 15.11.2017 | ||
HR | 15.11.2017 | ||
IT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LV | 15.11.2017 | ||
MC | 15.11.2017 | ||
MT | 15.11.2017 | ||
NL | 15.11.2017 | ||
PL | 15.11.2017 | ||
RO | 15.11.2017 | ||
RS | 15.11.2017 | ||
SE | 15.11.2017 | ||
SI | 15.11.2017 | ||
SK | 15.11.2017 | ||
SM | 15.11.2017 | ||
BG | 15.02.2018 | ||
NO | 15.02.2018 | ||
GR | 16.02.2018 | ||
GB | 28.06.2018 | ||
IE | 28.06.2018 | ||
LU | 28.06.2018 | ||
BE | 30.06.2018 | ||
CH | 30.06.2018 | ||
LI | 30.06.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | CY | 15.11.2017 | |
CZ | 15.11.2017 | ||
DK | 15.11.2017 | ||
EE | 15.11.2017 | ||
ES | 15.11.2017 | ||
FI | 15.11.2017 | ||
HR | 15.11.2017 | ||
IT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LV | 15.11.2017 | ||
MC | 15.11.2017 | ||
MT | 15.11.2017 | ||
NL | 15.11.2017 | ||
PL | 15.11.2017 | ||
RO | 15.11.2017 | ||
RS | 15.11.2017 | ||
SE | 15.11.2017 | ||
SI | 15.11.2017 | ||
SK | 15.11.2017 | ||
SM | 15.11.2017 | ||
BG | 15.02.2018 | ||
NO | 15.02.2018 | ||
GR | 16.02.2018 | ||
GB | 28.06.2018 | ||
IE | 28.06.2018 | ||
LU | 28.06.2018 | ||
CH | 30.06.2018 | ||
LI | 30.06.2018 | ||
Former [2019/19] | CY | 15.11.2017 | |
CZ | 15.11.2017 | ||
DK | 15.11.2017 | ||
EE | 15.11.2017 | ||
ES | 15.11.2017 | ||
FI | 15.11.2017 | ||
HR | 15.11.2017 | ||
IT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LV | 15.11.2017 | ||
MC | 15.11.2017 | ||
MT | 15.11.2017 | ||
NL | 15.11.2017 | ||
PL | 15.11.2017 | ||
RO | 15.11.2017 | ||
RS | 15.11.2017 | ||
SE | 15.11.2017 | ||
SI | 15.11.2017 | ||
SK | 15.11.2017 | ||
SM | 15.11.2017 | ||
BG | 15.02.2018 | ||
NO | 15.02.2018 | ||
GR | 16.02.2018 | ||
IE | 28.06.2018 | ||
LU | 28.06.2018 | ||
Former [2019/17] | CY | 15.11.2017 | |
CZ | 15.11.2017 | ||
DK | 15.11.2017 | ||
EE | 15.11.2017 | ||
ES | 15.11.2017 | ||
FI | 15.11.2017 | ||
HR | 15.11.2017 | ||
IT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LV | 15.11.2017 | ||
MC | 15.11.2017 | ||
MT | 15.11.2017 | ||
NL | 15.11.2017 | ||
PL | 15.11.2017 | ||
RO | 15.11.2017 | ||
RS | 15.11.2017 | ||
SE | 15.11.2017 | ||
SI | 15.11.2017 | ||
SK | 15.11.2017 | ||
SM | 15.11.2017 | ||
BG | 15.02.2018 | ||
NO | 15.02.2018 | ||
GR | 16.02.2018 | ||
LU | 28.06.2018 | ||
Former [2019/15] | CY | 15.11.2017 | |
CZ | 15.11.2017 | ||
DK | 15.11.2017 | ||
EE | 15.11.2017 | ||
ES | 15.11.2017 | ||
FI | 15.11.2017 | ||
HR | 15.11.2017 | ||
IT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LV | 15.11.2017 | ||
MC | 15.11.2017 | ||
MT | 15.11.2017 | ||
NL | 15.11.2017 | ||
PL | 15.11.2017 | ||
RO | 15.11.2017 | ||
RS | 15.11.2017 | ||
SE | 15.11.2017 | ||
SI | 15.11.2017 | ||
SK | 15.11.2017 | ||
SM | 15.11.2017 | ||
BG | 15.02.2018 | ||
NO | 15.02.2018 | ||
GR | 16.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | CY | 15.11.2017 | |
CZ | 15.11.2017 | ||
DK | 15.11.2017 | ||
EE | 15.11.2017 | ||
ES | 15.11.2017 | ||
FI | 15.11.2017 | ||
HR | 15.11.2017 | ||
IT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LV | 15.11.2017 | ||
MT | 15.11.2017 | ||
NL | 15.11.2017 | ||
PL | 15.11.2017 | ||
RO | 15.11.2017 | ||
RS | 15.11.2017 | ||
SE | 15.11.2017 | ||
SI | 15.11.2017 | ||
SK | 15.11.2017 | ||
SM | 15.11.2017 | ||
BG | 15.02.2018 | ||
NO | 15.02.2018 | ||
GR | 16.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CY | 15.11.2017 | |
CZ | 15.11.2017 | ||
DK | 15.11.2017 | ||
EE | 15.11.2017 | ||
ES | 15.11.2017 | ||
FI | 15.11.2017 | ||
HR | 15.11.2017 | ||
IT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LV | 15.11.2017 | ||
MT | 15.11.2017 | ||
NL | 15.11.2017 | ||
PL | 15.11.2017 | ||
RO | 15.11.2017 | ||
RS | 15.11.2017 | ||
SE | 15.11.2017 | ||
SK | 15.11.2017 | ||
SM | 15.11.2017 | ||
BG | 15.02.2018 | ||
NO | 15.02.2018 | ||
GR | 16.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | CY | 15.11.2017 | |
CZ | 15.11.2017 | ||
DK | 15.11.2017 | ||
EE | 15.11.2017 | ||
ES | 15.11.2017 | ||
FI | 15.11.2017 | ||
HR | 15.11.2017 | ||
IT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LV | 15.11.2017 | ||
NL | 15.11.2017 | ||
PL | 15.11.2017 | ||
RO | 15.11.2017 | ||
RS | 15.11.2017 | ||
SE | 15.11.2017 | ||
SK | 15.11.2017 | ||
SM | 15.11.2017 | ||
BG | 15.02.2018 | ||
NO | 15.02.2018 | ||
GR | 16.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | CY | 15.11.2017 | |
CZ | 15.11.2017 | ||
DK | 15.11.2017 | ||
EE | 15.11.2017 | ||
ES | 15.11.2017 | ||
FI | 15.11.2017 | ||
HR | 15.11.2017 | ||
IT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LV | 15.11.2017 | ||
NL | 15.11.2017 | ||
PL | 15.11.2017 | ||
RS | 15.11.2017 | ||
SE | 15.11.2017 | ||
SK | 15.11.2017 | ||
SM | 15.11.2017 | ||
BG | 15.02.2018 | ||
NO | 15.02.2018 | ||
GR | 16.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 15.11.2017 | |
CZ | 15.11.2017 | ||
DK | 15.11.2017 | ||
EE | 15.11.2017 | ||
ES | 15.11.2017 | ||
FI | 15.11.2017 | ||
HR | 15.11.2017 | ||
LT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LV | 15.11.2017 | ||
NL | 15.11.2017 | ||
PL | 15.11.2017 | ||
RS | 15.11.2017 | ||
SE | 15.11.2017 | ||
SK | 15.11.2017 | ||
SM | 15.11.2017 | ||
BG | 15.02.2018 | ||
NO | 15.02.2018 | ||
GR | 16.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | CY | 15.11.2017 | |
CZ | 15.11.2017 | ||
DK | 15.11.2017 | ||
EE | 15.11.2017 | ||
ES | 15.11.2017 | ||
FI | 15.11.2017 | ||
HR | 15.11.2017 | ||
LT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LV | 15.11.2017 | ||
NL | 15.11.2017 | ||
RS | 15.11.2017 | ||
SE | 15.11.2017 | ||
SK | 15.11.2017 | ||
BG | 15.02.2018 | ||
NO | 15.02.2018 | ||
GR | 16.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | ES | 15.11.2017 | |
FI | 15.11.2017 | ||
HR | 15.11.2017 | ||
LT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LV | 15.11.2017 | ||
NL | 15.11.2017 | ||
RS | 15.11.2017 | ||
SE | 15.11.2017 | ||
BG | 15.02.2018 | ||
NO | 15.02.2018 | ||
GR | 16.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/22] | ES | 15.11.2017 | |
FI | 15.11.2017 | ||
LT | 15.11.2017 | ||
NL | 15.11.2017 | ||
NO | 15.02.2018 | Cited in | International search | [XI]EP1681528 (VALEO THERMAL SYS JAPAN CO [JP]) [X] 1-9,11,12 * paragraphs [0062] , [0083]; figures 2,4; claim 23 * * paragraph [0085] - paragraph [0090]; figures 5-7 * [I] 10; | [X]DE102006035210 (MODINE MFG CO [US]) [X] 1-4,6-8,10,12 * paragraph [0021]; figure 3 *; | [X]FR2869679 (VALEO CLIMATISATION SA [FR]) [X] 1-4,6-10,12 * page 10, paragraph 2; figures 2,3 * * page 13, paragraph 3 - paragraph 4 *; | [X]JPH05115934 (FURUKAWA ALUMINIUM) [X] 1-4,6-8,11,12 * abstract * | Examination | DE102005050366 | US2010051252 |