EP2867390 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING TINPLATE AND PRODUCT PRODUCED THEREWITH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 18.02.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.08.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.02.2022 | Revocation of patent | published on 23.03.2022 [2022/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tata Steel IJmuiden B.V. Wenckebachstraat 1 1951 JZ Velsen-Noord / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2015/19] | For all designated states Tata Steel IJmuiden BV Wenckebachstraat1 NL-1951 JZ VELSEN-NOORD / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PENNING, Jan, Paul Tata Steel Nederland Technology B.V. Group Intellectual Property Services - 3G.37 P.O. Box 10000 NL-1970 CA IJmuiden / NL | 02 /
SCHNETZ, Kokkie Tata Steel Nederland Technology B.V. Group Intellectual Property Services - 3G.37 P.O. Box 10000 NL-1970 CA IJmuiden / NL | [2015/19] | Representative(s) | Müller Schupfner & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB (Muc) Bavariaring 11 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/19] | Bodin, Andre Tata Steel Nederland Technology B.V. Group Intellectual Property Services P.O. Box 10000 - 3G.37 1970 CA IJmuiden / NL | Application number, filing date | 13733301.9 | 02.07.2013 | [2017/36] | WO2013EP63912 | Priority number, date | EP20120174561 | 02.07.2012 Original published format: EP 12174561 | [2015/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014006031 | Date: | 09.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2867390 | Date: | 06.05.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.01.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2867390 | Date: | 06.09.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.01.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C25D5/48, C25D11/34, C25D3/30 | [2015/19] | CPC: |
C25D5/48 (EP);
C23C22/76 (EP);
C25D11/34 (EP);
C25D3/30 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/19] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR PRODUKTION VON WEISSBLECH, UND DAMIT HERGESTELLTER GEGENSTAND | [2017/09] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING TINPLATE AND PRODUCT PRODUCED THEREWITH | [2015/19] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE FER BLANC ET ARTICLE FABRIQUÉ AVEC CELUI-CI | [2017/09] |
Former [2015/19] | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON WEISSBLECH UND DAMIT HERGESTELLTER GEGENSTAND | ||
Former [2015/19] | PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE FER BLANC ET PRODUIT FABRIQUÉ À L'AIDE DU PROCÉDÉ | Entry into regional phase | 02.02.2015 | National basic fee paid | 02.02.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.02.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.02.2015 | Examination requested [2015/19] | 25.06.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.09.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.10.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.02.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.05.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 24.05.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.05.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.09.2016 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
30.05.2018
04.06.2018
ADMISSIBLE ArcelorMittal France Research & Development Intellectual Property Immeuble Le Cezanne 6, Rue Campra 93200 St Denis Cedex / FR Opponent's representative Lavoix 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [2019/36] |
Former [2018/27] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
30.05.2018
ArcelorMittal France Research & Development Intellectual Property Immeuble Le Cezanne 6, Rue Campra 93200 St Denis Cedex / FR | 20.06.2018 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 20.09.2018 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 26.09.2019 | Date of oral proceedings | 07.11.2019 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 07.11.2019 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 15.02.2022 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2022/12] | Appeal following opposition | 19.12.2019 | Appeal received No. T0054/20 | 05.03.2020 | Statement of grounds filed | 15.02.2022 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor withdrawn | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 02.07.2013 | AL | 06.09.2017 | AT | 06.09.2017 | CY | 06.09.2017 | CZ | 06.09.2017 | DK | 06.09.2017 | EE | 06.09.2017 | FI | 06.09.2017 | HR | 06.09.2017 | LT | 06.09.2017 | LV | 06.09.2017 | MC | 06.09.2017 | MK | 06.09.2017 | PL | 06.09.2017 | PT | 06.09.2017 | RO | 06.09.2017 | SE | 06.09.2017 | SI | 06.09.2017 | SM | 06.09.2017 | BG | 06.12.2017 | NO | 06.12.2017 | GR | 07.12.2017 | IS | 06.01.2018 | IE | 02.07.2018 | LU | 02.07.2018 | MT | 02.07.2018 | CH | 31.07.2018 | LI | 31.07.2018 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 02.07.2013 | |
AT | 06.09.2017 | ||
CY | 06.09.2017 | ||
CZ | 06.09.2017 | ||
DK | 06.09.2017 | ||
EE | 06.09.2017 | ||
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
HR | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
MC | 06.09.2017 | ||
MK | 06.09.2017 | ||
PL | 06.09.2017 | ||
PT | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
SI | 06.09.2017 | ||
SM | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
NO | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
IS | 06.01.2018 | ||
IE | 02.07.2018 | ||
LU | 02.07.2018 | ||
MT | 02.07.2018 | ||
CH | 31.07.2018 | ||
LI | 31.07.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | HU | 02.07.2013 | |
AT | 06.09.2017 | ||
CZ | 06.09.2017 | ||
DK | 06.09.2017 | ||
EE | 06.09.2017 | ||
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
HR | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
MC | 06.09.2017 | ||
PL | 06.09.2017 | ||
PT | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
SI | 06.09.2017 | ||
SM | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
NO | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
IS | 06.01.2018 | ||
IE | 02.07.2018 | ||
LU | 02.07.2018 | ||
MT | 02.07.2018 | ||
CH | 31.07.2018 | ||
LI | 31.07.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AT | 06.09.2017 | |
CZ | 06.09.2017 | ||
DK | 06.09.2017 | ||
EE | 06.09.2017 | ||
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
HR | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
MC | 06.09.2017 | ||
PL | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
SI | 06.09.2017 | ||
SM | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
NO | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
IS | 06.01.2018 | ||
IE | 02.07.2018 | ||
LU | 02.07.2018 | ||
MT | 02.07.2018 | ||
CH | 31.07.2018 | ||
LI | 31.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AT | 06.09.2017 | |
CZ | 06.09.2017 | ||
DK | 06.09.2017 | ||
EE | 06.09.2017 | ||
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
HR | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
MC | 06.09.2017 | ||
PL | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
SI | 06.09.2017 | ||
SM | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
NO | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
IS | 06.01.2018 | ||
IE | 02.07.2018 | ||
LU | 02.07.2018 | ||
CH | 31.07.2018 | ||
LI | 31.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/19] | AT | 06.09.2017 | |
CZ | 06.09.2017 | ||
DK | 06.09.2017 | ||
EE | 06.09.2017 | ||
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
HR | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
MC | 06.09.2017 | ||
PL | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
SI | 06.09.2017 | ||
SM | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
NO | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
IS | 06.01.2018 | ||
IE | 02.07.2018 | ||
LU | 02.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/17] | AT | 06.09.2017 | |
CZ | 06.09.2017 | ||
DK | 06.09.2017 | ||
EE | 06.09.2017 | ||
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
HR | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
MC | 06.09.2017 | ||
PL | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
SI | 06.09.2017 | ||
SM | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
NO | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
IS | 06.01.2018 | ||
LU | 02.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/15] | AT | 06.09.2017 | |
CZ | 06.09.2017 | ||
DK | 06.09.2017 | ||
EE | 06.09.2017 | ||
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
HR | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
MC | 06.09.2017 | ||
PL | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
SI | 06.09.2017 | ||
SM | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
NO | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
IS | 06.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 06.09.2017 | |
CZ | 06.09.2017 | ||
DK | 06.09.2017 | ||
EE | 06.09.2017 | ||
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
HR | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
PL | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
SI | 06.09.2017 | ||
SM | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
NO | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
IS | 06.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | AT | 06.09.2017 | |
CZ | 06.09.2017 | ||
DK | 06.09.2017 | ||
EE | 06.09.2017 | ||
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
HR | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
PL | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
SM | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
NO | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
IS | 06.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 06.09.2017 | |
CZ | 06.09.2017 | ||
EE | 06.09.2017 | ||
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
HR | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
PL | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
SM | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
NO | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
IS | 06.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/21] | CZ | 06.09.2017 | |
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
HR | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
NO | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/12] | FI | 06.09.2017 | |
HR | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
NO | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | FI | 06.09.2017 | |
HR | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
NO | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | FI | 06.09.2017 | |
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
NO | 06.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/08] | FI | 06.09.2017 | |
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
NO | 06.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | LT | 06.09.2017 | |
NO | 06.12.2017 | Cited in | International search | [Y]GB416608 (JOHN CAMPBELL, et al) [Y] 1-9 * page 2, lines 77-108 *; | [X]US3616307 (SNYDER RICHARD G) [X] 1-12 * column 2, lines 43-72 *; | [Y]US4339310 (ODA NOBUYUKI, et al) [Y] 1-9 * abstract * * column 1, lines 27-64 ** column 3, lines 28-55 *; | [Y]EP1445352 (EUROPA METALLI SPA [IT]) [Y] 1-9 * abstract * * claims 1-8,33 *; | [XY]EP1767665 (RASSELSTEIN GMBH [DE]) [X] 10-12 * paragraphs [0001] , [0003] , [0010] , [0011] , [0017] - [0020] - [0022] , [0024] , [0029] , [0030] , [0032] * * pages 9-12; tables 1,2 * [Y] 1-9; | [X]US2010181201 (BIBBER JOHN W [US]) [X] 1-12 * abstract * * paragraphs [0006] , [0007] * * examples 4,6,7,10,14,18 *; | [XP]WO2012097926 (HENKEL AG & CO KGAA [DE], et al) [XP] 1-12 * abstract * * page 13; table 1 * * claims 1-15 * | Examination | WO2013104530 | Opposition | CA2858004 |