EP2859421 - FORECASTING MAINTENANCE OPERATIONS TO BE APPLIED TO AN ENGINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.03.2017 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SNECMA 2 Boulevard du Général Martial Valin 75015 Paris / FR | [2016/19] |
Former [2015/16] | For all designated states SNECMA 2, Boulevard du Général Martial Valin 75015 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ANFRIANI, Alexandre c/o SNECMA PI (AJI) Rond-Point René Ravaud - Réau F-77550 Moissy-Cramayel Cedex / FR | 02 /
BRUN, Cyril c/o SNECMA PI (AJI) Rond-Point René Ravaud - Réau F-77550 Moissy-Cramayel Cedex / FR | 03 /
SEMPERE, Julian c/o SNECMA PI (AJI) Rond-Point René Ravaud - Réau F-77550 Moissy-Cramayel Cedex / FR | [2015/16] | Representative(s) | Brevalex Tour Trinity 1 B Place de la Défense 92400 Courbevoie / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2015/16] | Brevalex 95, rue d'Amsterdam 75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR | Application number, filing date | 13733370.4 | 07.06.2013 | [2016/19] | WO2013FR51306 | Priority number, date | FR20120055384 | 08.06.2012 Original published format: FR 1255384 | [2015/16] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013182823 | Date: | 12.12.2013 | Language: | FR | [2013/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2859421 | Date: | 15.04.2015 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.12.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2859421 | Date: | 11.05.2016 | Language: | FR | [2016/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.12.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G05B23/02, G06Q10/00, G06Q50/30 | [2015/16] | CPC: |
G05B23/0283 (EP,US);
B64F5/60 (EP,US);
G06Q10/20 (EP,US);
G06Q50/40 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/16] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORHERSAGE VON WARTUNGSOPERATIONEN FÜR EINEN MOTOR | [2015/16] | English: | FORECASTING MAINTENANCE OPERATIONS TO BE APPLIED TO AN ENGINE | [2015/16] | French: | PRÉVISION D'OPÉRATIONS DE MAINTENANCE À APPLIQUER SUR UN MOTEUR | [2016/07] |
Former [2015/16] | PREVISION D'OPERATIONS DE MAINTENANCE A APPLIQUER SUR UN MOTEUR | Entry into regional phase | 05.12.2014 | National basic fee paid | 05.12.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.12.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.12.2014 | Examination requested [2015/16] | 06.03.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.01.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.03.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 23.03.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.03.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.01.2016 | Opposition(s) | 14.02.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.06.2013 | AL | 11.05.2016 | AT | 11.05.2016 | BG | 11.05.2016 | CY | 11.05.2016 | CZ | 11.05.2016 | DK | 11.05.2016 | EE | 11.05.2016 | ES | 11.05.2016 | FI | 11.05.2016 | HR | 11.05.2016 | IS | 11.05.2016 | LT | 11.05.2016 | LV | 11.05.2016 | MC | 11.05.2016 | MK | 11.05.2016 | MT | 11.05.2016 | NL | 11.05.2016 | PL | 11.05.2016 | RO | 11.05.2016 | RS | 11.05.2016 | SI | 11.05.2016 | SK | 11.05.2016 | SM | 11.05.2016 | TR | 11.05.2016 | IE | 07.06.2016 | LU | 07.06.2016 | BE | 30.06.2016 | CH | 30.06.2016 | LI | 30.06.2016 | NO | 11.08.2016 | GR | 12.08.2016 | PT | 12.09.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/45] | HU | 07.06.2013 | |
AT | 11.05.2016 | ||
BG | 11.05.2016 | ||
CY | 11.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 11.05.2016 | ||
DK | 11.05.2016 | ||
EE | 11.05.2016 | ||
ES | 11.05.2016 | ||
FI | 11.05.2016 | ||
HR | 11.05.2016 | ||
IS | 11.05.2016 | ||
LT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LV | 11.05.2016 | ||
MC | 11.05.2016 | ||
MK | 11.05.2016 | ||
MT | 11.05.2016 | ||
NL | 11.05.2016 | ||
PL | 11.05.2016 | ||
RO | 11.05.2016 | ||
RS | 11.05.2016 | ||
SI | 11.05.2016 | ||
SK | 11.05.2016 | ||
SM | 11.05.2016 | ||
TR | 11.05.2016 | ||
IE | 07.06.2016 | ||
LU | 07.06.2016 | ||
BE | 30.06.2016 | ||
CH | 30.06.2016 | ||
LI | 30.06.2016 | ||
NO | 11.08.2016 | ||
GR | 12.08.2016 | ||
PT | 12.09.2016 | ||
Former [2018/38] | HU | 07.06.2013 | |
AT | 11.05.2016 | ||
BG | 11.05.2016 | ||
CY | 11.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 11.05.2016 | ||
DK | 11.05.2016 | ||
EE | 11.05.2016 | ||
ES | 11.05.2016 | ||
FI | 11.05.2016 | ||
HR | 11.05.2016 | ||
IS | 11.05.2016 | ||
LT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LV | 11.05.2016 | ||
MC | 11.05.2016 | ||
MK | 11.05.2016 | ||
MT | 11.05.2016 | ||
NL | 11.05.2016 | ||
PL | 11.05.2016 | ||
RO | 11.05.2016 | ||
RS | 11.05.2016 | ||
SI | 11.05.2016 | ||
SK | 11.05.2016 | ||
SM | 11.05.2016 | ||
IE | 07.06.2016 | ||
LU | 07.06.2016 | ||
BE | 30.06.2016 | ||
CH | 30.06.2016 | ||
LI | 30.06.2016 | ||
NO | 11.08.2016 | ||
GR | 12.08.2016 | ||
PT | 12.09.2016 | ||
Former [2018/32] | HU | 07.06.2013 | |
AT | 11.05.2016 | ||
CY | 11.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 11.05.2016 | ||
DK | 11.05.2016 | ||
EE | 11.05.2016 | ||
ES | 11.05.2016 | ||
FI | 11.05.2016 | ||
HR | 11.05.2016 | ||
IS | 11.05.2016 | ||
LT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LV | 11.05.2016 | ||
MC | 11.05.2016 | ||
MK | 11.05.2016 | ||
MT | 11.05.2016 | ||
NL | 11.05.2016 | ||
PL | 11.05.2016 | ||
RO | 11.05.2016 | ||
RS | 11.05.2016 | ||
SI | 11.05.2016 | ||
SK | 11.05.2016 | ||
SM | 11.05.2016 | ||
IE | 07.06.2016 | ||
LU | 07.06.2016 | ||
BE | 30.06.2016 | ||
CH | 30.06.2016 | ||
LI | 30.06.2016 | ||
NO | 11.08.2016 | ||
GR | 12.08.2016 | ||
PT | 12.09.2016 | ||
Former [2018/30] | HU | 07.06.2013 | |
AT | 11.05.2016 | ||
CY | 11.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 11.05.2016 | ||
DK | 11.05.2016 | ||
EE | 11.05.2016 | ||
ES | 11.05.2016 | ||
FI | 11.05.2016 | ||
HR | 11.05.2016 | ||
IS | 11.05.2016 | ||
LT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LV | 11.05.2016 | ||
MC | 11.05.2016 | ||
MK | 11.05.2016 | ||
NL | 11.05.2016 | ||
PL | 11.05.2016 | ||
RO | 11.05.2016 | ||
RS | 11.05.2016 | ||
SI | 11.05.2016 | ||
SK | 11.05.2016 | ||
SM | 11.05.2016 | ||
IE | 07.06.2016 | ||
LU | 07.06.2016 | ||
BE | 30.06.2016 | ||
CH | 30.06.2016 | ||
LI | 30.06.2016 | ||
NO | 11.08.2016 | ||
GR | 12.08.2016 | ||
PT | 12.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/25] | AT | 11.05.2016 | |
CZ | 11.05.2016 | ||
DK | 11.05.2016 | ||
EE | 11.05.2016 | ||
ES | 11.05.2016 | ||
FI | 11.05.2016 | ||
HR | 11.05.2016 | ||
LT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LV | 11.05.2016 | ||
MC | 11.05.2016 | ||
NL | 11.05.2016 | ||
PL | 11.05.2016 | ||
RO | 11.05.2016 | ||
RS | 11.05.2016 | ||
SI | 11.05.2016 | ||
SK | 11.05.2016 | ||
SM | 11.05.2016 | ||
IE | 07.06.2016 | ||
BE | 30.06.2016 | ||
CH | 30.06.2016 | ||
LI | 30.06.2016 | ||
NO | 11.08.2016 | ||
GR | 12.08.2016 | ||
PT | 12.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/18] | AT | 11.05.2016 | |
CZ | 11.05.2016 | ||
DK | 11.05.2016 | ||
EE | 11.05.2016 | ||
ES | 11.05.2016 | ||
FI | 11.05.2016 | ||
HR | 11.05.2016 | ||
LT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LV | 11.05.2016 | ||
MC | 11.05.2016 | ||
NL | 11.05.2016 | ||
PL | 11.05.2016 | ||
RO | 11.05.2016 | ||
RS | 11.05.2016 | ||
SK | 11.05.2016 | ||
SM | 11.05.2016 | ||
BE | 30.06.2016 | ||
NO | 11.08.2016 | ||
GR | 12.08.2016 | ||
PT | 12.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 11.05.2016 | |
CZ | 11.05.2016 | ||
DK | 11.05.2016 | ||
EE | 11.05.2016 | ||
ES | 11.05.2016 | ||
FI | 11.05.2016 | ||
HR | 11.05.2016 | ||
LT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LV | 11.05.2016 | ||
NL | 11.05.2016 | ||
PL | 11.05.2016 | ||
RO | 11.05.2016 | ||
RS | 11.05.2016 | ||
SK | 11.05.2016 | ||
SM | 11.05.2016 | ||
BE | 30.06.2016 | ||
NO | 11.08.2016 | ||
GR | 12.08.2016 | ||
PT | 12.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | CZ | 11.05.2016 | |
DK | 11.05.2016 | ||
EE | 11.05.2016 | ||
ES | 11.05.2016 | ||
FI | 11.05.2016 | ||
HR | 11.05.2016 | ||
LT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LV | 11.05.2016 | ||
NL | 11.05.2016 | ||
PL | 11.05.2016 | ||
RO | 11.05.2016 | ||
RS | 11.05.2016 | ||
SK | 11.05.2016 | ||
BE | 30.06.2016 | ||
NO | 11.08.2016 | ||
GR | 12.08.2016 | ||
PT | 12.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | CZ | 11.05.2016 | |
DK | 11.05.2016 | ||
EE | 11.05.2016 | ||
ES | 11.05.2016 | ||
FI | 11.05.2016 | ||
HR | 11.05.2016 | ||
LT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LV | 11.05.2016 | ||
NL | 11.05.2016 | ||
RO | 11.05.2016 | ||
RS | 11.05.2016 | ||
BE | 30.06.2016 | ||
NO | 11.08.2016 | ||
GR | 12.08.2016 | ||
PT | 12.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | DK | 11.05.2016 | |
ES | 11.05.2016 | ||
FI | 11.05.2016 | ||
HR | 11.05.2016 | ||
LT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LV | 11.05.2016 | ||
NL | 11.05.2016 | ||
RS | 11.05.2016 | ||
BE | 30.06.2016 | ||
NO | 11.08.2016 | ||
GR | 12.08.2016 | ||
PT | 12.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | ES | 11.05.2016 | |
FI | 11.05.2016 | ||
HR | 11.05.2016 | ||
LT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LV | 11.05.2016 | ||
NL | 11.05.2016 | ||
RS | 11.05.2016 | ||
BE | 30.06.2016 | ||
NO | 11.08.2016 | ||
GR | 12.08.2016 | ||
PT | 12.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | ES | 11.05.2016 | |
FI | 11.05.2016 | ||
HR | 11.05.2016 | ||
LT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LV | 11.05.2016 | ||
NL | 11.05.2016 | ||
RS | 11.05.2016 | ||
NO | 11.08.2016 | ||
GR | 12.08.2016 | ||
PT | 12.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | ES | 11.05.2016 | |
FI | 11.05.2016 | ||
HR | 11.05.2016 | ||
LT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LV | 11.05.2016 | ||
NL | 11.05.2016 | ||
RS | 11.05.2016 | ||
NO | 11.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | FI | 11.05.2016 | |
LT | 11.05.2016 | ||
NL | 11.05.2016 | ||
NO | 11.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | LT | 11.05.2016 | |
NO | 11.08.2016 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2006126608 (PEREIRA ASHLEY A [CA], et al) [A] 1,10 * paragraphs [0005] , [0010] , [0014] , [0015] , [0033] - [0045] - [0050] , [0054] ** figures 1,2 *; | [A]US2008234979 (COSTINER SORIN [US], et al) [A] 1,10 * paragraphs [0001] - [0023] - [0028] - [0032] *; | [A] - MURAD S SAMHOURI, "An intelligent opportunistic maintenance (OM) system: A genetic algorithm approach", SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY FOR HUMANITY (TIC-STH), 2009 IEEE TORONTO INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20090926), ISBN 978-1-4244-3877-8, pages 60 - 65, XP031655835 [A] 1,10 * the whole document * |