EP2810938 - N-PHENYLPIPERAZINE DERIVATIVES THAT ARE ANTAGONISTS OF A1A, A1D ADRENOCEPTORS AND 5-HT1A RECEPTORS FOR THE TREATMENT OF BENIGN PROSTATE HYPERPLASIA, PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS CONTAINING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.07.2016 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.07.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.08.2016 [2016/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Universidade Federal Do Rio De Janeiro - UFRJ Av. Pedro Calmon, nº. 550 - 2° Andar Prédio da Reitoria - Illha do Fundão Cidade Universitária 21941-901 Rio De Janeiro - RJ / BR | For all designated states Uniao Brasiliense de Educacao e Cultura- UBEC SMPW Quadra 5 Conjunto 13, lote 08 71.735-513 Nucleo Bandeirante (Brasilia - DF) / BR | [2014/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MARTINS DA SILVA, Claudia Lucia Rua Juraci Camargo 600/901 Jardim Guanabara Rio de Janeiro - RJ / BR | 02 /
CHAGAS DA SILVA, Fernanda Rua Mora 403 Campo Grande CEP: 23013-620 Rio de Janeiro - RJ / BR | 03 /
CHAVES BARBERATO, Luana CBN 11 Lote 09 sala 101 Taguatinga Norte CEP: 72115-115 Brasília - DF / BR | 04 /
DE CAMARGO NASCENTE, Luciana Colônoa Agrícola Vicente Pires Chácara 291 Lote 08-Vicente Pires CEP: 72110-800 Brasília - DF / BR | 05 /
BARBOSA DO NASCIMENTO VIANA, Jessica Rua Almirante Tamandaré 59/702 Flamngo CEP: 22210-060 Rio de Janeiro - RJ / BR | 06 /
OLIVEIRA SILVA, Renata QNA 09 casa 32 - Taguatinga Norte CEP: 72110-090 Barsília - DF / BR | 07 /
NUNES LEMES, Laís Flávia QNM 08 Conjunto F casa 03 Ceilândia Norte CEP: 72210-086 Brasília - DF / BR | 08 /
GERMAN NOËL, François Rua Mathias Antonio dos Santos 354/103 21940-380 Rio de Janeiro / BR | 09 /
SOARES ROMEIRO, Luís Antônio Av. Parque das Aguas Claras lote 3465 Ap. 101 Águas Claras Norte CEP: 71906-500 Brasília - DF / BR | [2014/52] |
Former [2014/50] | 01 /
MARTINS DA SILVA, Claudia Lucia Rua Juraci Camargo 600/901 Jardim Guanabara Rio de Janeiro - RJ / BR | ||
02 /
CHAGAS DA SILVA, Fernanda Rua Mora 403 Campo Grande CEP: 23013-620 Rio de Janeiro - RJ / BR | |||
03 /
CHAVES BARBERATO, Luana CBN 11 Lote 09 sala 101 Taguatinga Norte CEP: 72115-115 Brasília - DF / BR | |||
04 /
DE CAMARGO NASCENTE, Luciana Colônoa Agrícola Vicente Pires Chácara 291 Lote 08-Vicente Pires CEP: 72110-800 Brasília - DF / BR | |||
05 /
BARBOSA DO NASCIMENTO VIANA, Jessica Rua Almirante Tamandaré 59/702 Flamngo CEP: 22210-060 Rio de Janeiro - RJ / BR | |||
06 /
OLIVEIRA SILVA, Renata QNA 09 casa 32 - Taguatinga Norte CEP: 72110-090 Barsília - DF / BR | |||
07 /
NUNES LEMES, Laís Flávia QNM 08 Conjunto F casa 03 Ceilândia Norte CEP: 72210-086 Brasília - DF / BR | |||
08 /
GERMAN NOËL, François Rua Mathias Antonio dos Santos 354/103 CEP: 21940-380 Jardim Guanabara - RJ / BE | |||
09 /
SOARES ROMEIRO, Luís Antônio Av. Parque das Aguas Claras lote 3465 Ap. 101 Águas Claras Norte CEP: 71906-500 Brasília - DF / BR | Representative(s) | KATZAROV S.A. Geneva Business Center 12 Avenue des Morgines 1213 Petit-Lancy / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2014/50] | KATZAROV S.A. European Patent Attorneys 19, rue des Epinettes 1227 Genève / CH | Application number, filing date | 13733873.7 | 04.01.2013 | WO2013BR00003 | Priority number, date | BR20121000187 | 05.01.2012 Original published format: BR102012000187 | [2014/50] | Filing language | PT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013102249 | Date: | 11.07.2013 | Language: | PT | [2013/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2810938 | Date: | 10.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | BR | 11.07.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.06.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C07D295/096, A61K31/473, A61P35/00, C07D317/58, A61K31/495, A61K31/496 | [2015/31] | CPC: |
C07D317/58 (EP,CN,US);
A61K31/496 (US);
A61K31/495 (US);
A61P13/02 (EP);
A61P13/08 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2014/50] | C07D219/00, A61K31/473, A61P35/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/50] | Title | German: | N-PHENYLPIPERAZINDERIVATE ALS ANTAGONISTEN VON A1A-, A1D-ADRENOREZEPTOREN UND 5-HT1A-REZEPTOREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON BENIGNER PROSTATAHYPERPLASIE, PHARMAZEUTISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN DAMIT | [2014/50] | English: | N-PHENYLPIPERAZINE DERIVATIVES THAT ARE ANTAGONISTS OF A1A, A1D ADRENOCEPTORS AND 5-HT1A RECEPTORS FOR THE TREATMENT OF BENIGN PROSTATE HYPERPLASIA, PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS CONTAINING THE SAME | [2014/50] | French: | DÉRIVÉS N-PHÉNYLPIPÉRAZINIQUES ANTAGONISTES D'ADRÉNORÉCEPTEURS A1A, A1D ET DE RÉCEPTEURS 5-HT1A DANS LE TRAITEMENT DE L'HYPERPLASIE BÉNIGNE DE LA PROSTATE, ET COMPOSITIONS PHARMACEUTIQUES LES CONTENANT | [2014/50] | Entry into regional phase | 30.07.2014 | Translation filed | 30.07.2014 | National basic fee paid | 30.07.2014 | Search fee paid | 30.07.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.07.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.08.2013 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: BR | 30.07.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.07.2014 | Examination requested [2014/50] | 26.01.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/34] | 01.03.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2016 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0624584 (DAIICHI SEIYAKU CO [JP]) [X] 1,2 * example 100 *; | [X]WO9936412 (HOECHST RES & TECH GMBH & CO [DE], et al) [X] 1,2 * example 6 *; | [X]WO2005112538 (UNIV RIO DE JANEIRO [BR], et al) [X] 1-4 * 1-(1,3-benzodioxol-5-ilethyl)-4-(2-methoxyphenyl)piperazine (LASSbio 772); page 10, line 1 - line 6; claims 1, 5, 6 *; | [X]US2009093493 (BERARDI FRANCESCO [IT], et al) [X] 1,2 * claim 5; compounds EC52, EC65, EC74 *; | [X] - MOKROSZ M J ET AL, "STRUCTURE-ACTIVITY RELATIONSHIP STUDIES OF CNS AGENTS, PART 32 EFFECT OF STRUCTURAL MODIFICATIONS IN 1-ARYLPIPERAZINE DERIVATIVES ON ALPHA1-ADRENORCEPTOR AFFINITY", ARCHIV DER PHARMAZIE, WILEY VERLAG, WEINHEIM, (19970601), vol. 330, no. 6, doi:10.1002/ARDP.19973300605, ISSN 0365-6233, pages 177 - 180, XP001033771 [X] 1,2 * table 2; compounds 8b, 9b * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/ardp.19973300605 | [X] - RATOUIS R ET AL, "Synthesis and pharmacological STUDY OF NEW PIPERAZINE DERIVATIVES. II. PHENETHYLPIPERAZINES", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, US, (19650101), vol. 8, doi:10.1021/JM00325A021, ISSN 0022-2623, pages 104 - 107, XP002315168 [X] 1,2 * table 1; compound 17 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm00325a021 | [X] - ENZA LACIVITA ET AL, "Identification of a red-emitting fluorescent ligand for in vitro visualization of human serotonin 5-HT1A receptors", BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY LETTERS, (20101101), vol. 20, no. 22, doi:10.1016/j.bmcl.2010.09.027, ISSN 0960-894X, pages 6628 - 6632, XP055196122 [X] 1,2 * page 6629, column lhc; figure 1; compounds 3, 5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bmcl.2010.09.027 | [X] - MOKROSZ J L ET AL, "QUANTITIVE ANALYSIS OF THE ALKYL CHAIN EFFECTS ON THE 5-HT1A AND 5-HT2 RECEPTOR AFFINITIES OF 4-ALKYL-1-ARYLPIPERAZINES AND THEIR ANALOGS", ARCHIV DER PHARMAZIE, WILEY VERLAG, WEINHEIM, (19950201), vol. 328, no. 2, ISSN 0365-6233, pages 143 - 148, XP002041901 [X] 1,2 * examples 1b, 4b, 4e-4g; tables 1, 2 * | [X] - C. L. KUO ET AL, "G-protein coupled receptors: SAR analyses of neurotransmitters and antagonists", JOURNAL OF CLINICAL PHARMACY AND THERAPEUTICS, (20040601), vol. 29, no. 3, doi:10.1111/j.1365-2710.2004.00563.x, ISSN 0269-4727, pages 279 - 298, XP055180749 [X] 1,2 * figure 9; example 19; table 8a * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1365-2710.2004.00563.x | [X] - JERZY L. MOKROSZ ET AL, "Structure-Activity Relationship Studies of Central Nervous System Agents. 13.4-[3-(Benzotriazol-1-yl)propyl]-1-(2-methoxyphenyl)piperazine, a New Putative 5-HT1A Receptor Antagonist, and Its Analogs", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, (19940801), vol. 37, no. 17, doi:10.1021/jm00043a014, ISSN 0022-2623, pages 2754 - 2760, XP055196206 [X] 1,2 * examples 6-8; table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm00043a014 | International search | [Y]JPH0324014 (BOEHRINGER MANNHEIM GMBH); | [X]WO9504049 (RECORDATI CHEM PHARM [IT], et al); | [Y]JPH09227380 (MITSUBISHI CHEM CORP); | [A]WO03043983 (SCHERING AG [DE]); | [Y] - PULITO VL ET AL., "Investigation of the Uroselective Properties of Four Novel alfala-Adrenergic Receptor Subtype-Selective Antagonists", J PHARM EXP THER., (2000), vol. 292, no. 1, pages 224 - 229, XP055158067 | [A] - BRADBURY RH ET AL., "Small-molecule androgen receptor downregulators as an approach to 'treatment of advanced prostate cancer", BIOORG MED CHEM LETTERS, (2011), vol. 21, pages 5442 - 5445, XP028267883 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bmcl.2011.06.122 | [A] - KUMAR CSA ET AL., "Synthesis and in vitro antiproliferative activity of novel 1-benzhydrylpiperazine derivatives against human cancer cell lines", EUR J MED CHEM, (2009), vol. 44, pages 1223 - 1229, XP025989475 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ejmech.2008.09.025 | by applicant | - OLDHAM; HA MM, NATURE, (2008), vol. 9, pages 60 - 71 | - FREDRIKSSON ET AL., MOL. PHARMACOL., (2003), vol. 63, pages 1256 - 1272 | - NAT. REV. DRUG DISCOV, (2006), vol. 5, no. 12, pages 993 - 996 | - BJARNAD6TTIR RN ET AL., GENOMICS, (2006), vol. 88, pages 263 - 273 | - OLDHAM; HAMM, NATURE, (2008), vol. 9, pages 60 - 71 | - AVELLAR ET AL., AN. ACAD. BRAS. CIENC., (2009), vol. 81, no. 3, pages 321 - 344 | - WESS, PHARMACOL. THER, (1998), vol. 80, no. 3, pages 231 - 264 | - FREDRIKSSON ET AL., MOL PHARMACOL, (2003), vol. 63, pages 1256 - 1272 | - HIEBLE ET AL., PHARMACOL REV, (1995), vol. 45, pages 267 - 270 | - MICHEL ET AL., NAUNYN SCHMIEDEBERGS ARCH PHARMACOL, (1995), vol. 352, no. 1, pages 1 - 10 | - LANGER, EUR. J. UROL, (1999), vol. 36, pages 2 - 6 | - VARMA; DENG, CAN. J. PHYSIOL. PHARMACOL., (2000), vol. 78, pages 267 - 292 | - ZHONG; MINNEMAN, EUR. J. PHARMACOL., (1999), vol. 375, pages 261 - 276 | - HUH ET AL., GENES GENET. SYST, (2010), vol. 85, no. 1, pages 65 - 73 | - SCOFIELD ET AL., J. PHARMACOL. EXP. THER, (1995), vol. 275, pages 1035 - 1042 | - HIEBLE, PHARM. ACTA. HELV., (2000), vol. 74, no. 2-3, pages 163 - 171 | - MICHELOTTI ET AL., PHARMACOL. THER, (2000), vol. 88, pages 281 - 309 | - FORRAY ET AL., MOL. PHARMACOL., (1994), vol. 45, no. 4, pages 703 - 708 | - HATANO ET AL., BR. J. PHARMACOL, (1994), vol. 113, no. 3, pages 723 - 728 | - MARSHALL ET AL., J. PHARMACOL, (1995), vol. 115, no. 5, pages 781 - 786 | - HIEBLE; RUFFOLO, EXPERT OPIN INVESTIG DRUGS, (1997), vol. 6, no. 4, pages 367 - 387 | - MALLOY ET AL., J. UROL., (199809), vol. 160, pages 937 - 943 | - MURAMATSU ET AL., BR J. UROL., (1994), vol. 74, no. 5, pages 572 - 578 | - HIEBLE ET AL., PHARMACOL. REV., (1995), vol. 45, pages 267 - 270 | - CHEN ET AL., J. UROL, (2005), vol. 174, pages 370 - 374 | - MCNEAL, UROL. CLIN. NORTH AM., (1990), vol. 17, pages 477 - 486 | - COCKETT ET AL., PROG. UROL, (1991), vol. 1, no. 6, pages 957 - 72 | - PRICE ET AL., MOL PHARMACOL, (1994), vol. 46, pages 221 - 226 | - TSENG-CRANK ET AL., J. PHARMACOL, (1995), vol. 115, pages 1475 - 1485 | - LEPOR ET AL., J. UROL, (1993), vol. 149, pages 640 - 642 | - MICHEL ET AL., J. AUTON PHARMACOL, (1996), vol. 16, pages 21 - 28 | - KOJIMA ET AL., PROSTATE, (2006), vol. 66, pages 761 - 767 | - CHAPPLE, BR J UROL, (1995), vol. 76, no. 1, pages 47 - 56 | - SHIBATA ET AL., MOL. PHARMACOL, (1995), vol. 48, pages 250 - 258 | - GOETZ ET AL., EUR. J. PHARMACOL, (1995), vol. 272, no. 2-3, pages R5 - 6 | - CHAPUT; MONTIGNI, J. PHARMACOL. THER, (1988), vol. 246, no. 1, pages 359 - 370 | - HOYER ET AL., PHARMACOL REV, (1994), vol. 46, pages 157 - 203 | - HOYER; MARTIN, NEUROPHARMACOLOGY, (1997), vol. 36, pages 419 - 428 | - SAXENA ET AL., TRENDS PHARMACOL SCI, (1998), vol. 19, pages 311 - 316 | - VILLALON ET AL., DRUG DISCOV TODAY, (1997), vol. 2, pages 294 - 300 | - VILLALON; CENTURION, NAUNYN. SCHMIEDEBERGS ARCH PHARMACOL, (2007), vol. 376, no. 1-2, pages 45 - 63 | - FREDRIKSSON ET AL., MOL PHARMACOL., (2003), vol. 1256-127, page 63 | - TRUMPP-KALLMEYER ET AL., J. MED., (1992), vol. 35, no. 19, pages 3448 - 3462 | - BARNES; SHARP, NEUROPHARMACOLOGY, (1999), vol. 38, pages 1083 - 1152 | - KOBILKA ET AL., NATURE, (1987), vol. 329, pages 75 - 79 | - FARGIN ET AL., NATURE, (1988), vol. 335, no. 6188, pages 358 - 360 | - PUCADYIL; CHATTOPADHYAY, PROGR. LIPID RES., (2006), vol. 45, pages 295 - 333 | - ABDUL ET AL., ANTICANCER RES, (1994), vol. 14, no. 3A, pages 1215 - 1220 | - DIZEYI ET AL., PROSTATE, (2004), vol. 59, no. 3, pages 328 - 336 | - ABDUL, ANTICANCER RES, (1994), vol. 14, no. 3A, pages 1215 - 1220 | - TATE; SCHERTLER, CURR OPIN STRUCT BIOL, (2009), vol. 19, no. 4, pages 386 - 395 | - KOBILKA; SCHERTLER, TRENDS PHARMACOL SCI, (2008), vol. 29, no. 2, pages 79 - 83 | - THIEL, NAT BIOTECHNOL, (2004), vol. 22, pages 513 - 519 | - PEREZ, BIOCHEM PHARMACOL, (2007), vol. 73, no. 8, pages 1051 - 1062 | - WAUGH ET AL., J. BIOL CHEM, (2001), vol. 276, no. 27, pages 25366 - 2537 | - L6PEZ-RODRIGUEZ ET AL., J. MED . CHEM, (1997), vol. 40, pages 2653 - 2656 | - LI ET AL., J. MOL. MODEL, (2008), vol. 14, no. 10, pages 957 - 966 | - LOPEZ-RODRIGUEZ ET AL., MOLPHARMACOL, (2002), vol. 62, no. 1, pages 15 - 21 | - KUBINYI., PHARMAZIE, (1995), vol. 50, pages 647 - 662 | - HUBER ET AL., BIOCHEMISTRY, (2008), vol. 47, no. 42, pages 11013 - 1 1023 | - FORRAY ET AL., PHARMACOL., (1994), vol. 45, no. 4, pages 703 - 708 | - HATANO ET AL., J. PHARMACOL, (1994), vol. 113, no. 3, pages 723 - 728 | - MARSHALL ET AL., BR J PHARMACOL, (1995), vol. 115, no. 5, pages 1 - 786 78 | - MALLOY ET AL., UROL, J., (1998), vol. 160, pages 937 - 943 | - MURAMATSU ET AL., BR J UROL., (1994), vol. 74, no. 5, pages 572 - 578 | - HIEBLE ET AL., PHARMACOL REV., (1995), vol. 45, pages 267 - 270 | - HIEBLE, PHARMA HELV ACTA, (2000), vol. 74, no. 2-3, pages 163 - 171 | - MTCHELOTTI ET AL., PHARMACOL. THER., (2000), vol. 88, pages 281 - 309 | - DIZEYL ET AL., PROSTATE, (2004), vol. 59, no. 3, pages 328 - 336 | - RATOUIS ET AL., J. MED., (1965), vol. 8, pages 271 - 273 | - LEOPOLD ET AL., J PHARM. PHARMACOL, (2003), vol. 56, no. 2, pages 247 - 255 | - MOKROSZ ET AL., ARCH PHARM, (1995), vol. 328, pages 143 - 148 | - MOKROSZ ET AL., J MED CHEM, (1996), vol. 39, pages 1125 - 1129 | - LOWRY ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM, (1951), vol. 193, no. 1, pages 265 - 275 | - RICHARDS, J PHARMACOL, (1990), vol. 99, pages 753 - 761 | - CASTOLDI, LIFE SCI, (2006), vol. 78, pages 1915 - 1924 | - NEVES ET AL., BIOORG MED. CHEM, (2010), vol. 18, no. 5, pages 1925 - 1935 | - NIZNIK ET AL., NAUNYN-SCHMIEDEBERGS ARCH.. PHARMACOL, (1985), vol. 329, pages 333 - 343 | - TERAI ET AL., EUR J PHARMACOL, (1989), vol. 173, page 177 | - HAMDI ET AL., LIFE SCI, (1992), vol. 50, pages 1529 - 1534 | - NEVES ET AL., BIOORG. MED., (2010), vol. 18, no. 5, pages 1925 - 1935 | - DE LEAN ET AL., MOL PHARMACOL., (1982), vol. 21, no. 1, page 5 IT | - MOSMANN, T., IMMUNOL METHODS., (19821216), vol. 65, no. 1 -2, pages 55 - 63 | - LORKE, D., ARCH TOXICOL, (1983), vol. 54, no. 4, pages 275 - 87 | - SCOFIELD ET AL., J. PHARMACOL EXP THER, (1995), vol. 275, pages 1035 - 1042 | - TESTA ET AL., LIFE SCI, (1995), vol. 57, no. 13, pages PL159 - 63 | - BANES ET AL., J. PHARMACOL EXP THER, (1999), vol. 291, pages 1179 - 1187 | - CARROLL ET AL., BIOORG MED CHEM LETT, (2001), vol. 11, pages 1119 - 1121 | - SHIBATA, MOL. PHARMACOL., (1995), vol. 48, pages 250 - 258 | - NEVES ET AL., BIOORG MED CHEM, (2010), vol. 18, no. 5, pages 1925 - 1935 | - NEVES ET AL., BIOORG. MED. CHEM, (2010), vol. 18, no. 5, pages 1925 - 1935 | - CHENG; PRUSOFF, BIOCHEM. PHARMACOL, (1973), vol. 22, pages 3099 - 3108 | - KOJIMA A, PROSTATE, (2006), vol. 66, pages 761 - 767 |