EP2864845 - AUTOMATED RECONFIGURATION OF A DISCRETE EVENT CONTROL LOOP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.07.2017 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | [2015/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RICHTER, Jan Keilerstr. 5 91207 Lauf a. d. Pegnitz / DE | 02 /
MOOR, Thomas Marktplatz 8 96172 Mühlhausen / DE | 03 /
WITTMANN, Thomas Sieglitzhofer Str. 50 91054 Erlangen / DE | [2015/18] | Application number, filing date | 13734037.8 | 01.07.2013 | [2016/36] | WO2013EP63783 | Priority number, date | EP20120176671 | 17.07.2012 Original published format: EP 12176671 | [2015/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014012776 | Date: | 23.01.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2864845 | Date: | 29.04.2015 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.01.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2864845 | Date: | 07.09.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.01.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G05B9/03 | [2015/18] | CPC: |
G05B9/03 (EP,US);
G05B13/04 (US);
G05B17/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/18] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUTOMATISIERTE REKONFIGURATION EINES EREIGNISDISKRETEN REGELKREISES | [2015/18] | English: | AUTOMATED RECONFIGURATION OF A DISCRETE EVENT CONTROL LOOP | [2015/18] | French: | RECONFIGURATION AUTOMATISÉE D'UN CIRCUIT DE RÉGLAGE À ÉVÉNEMENTS DISCRETS | [2015/18] | Entry into regional phase | 20.01.2015 | National basic fee paid | 20.01.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.01.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.05.2014 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 20.01.2015 | Examination requested [2015/18] | 11.08.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.02.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.05.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 21.06.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 21.06.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.02.2016 | Opposition(s) | 08.06.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 01.07.2013 | AL | 07.09.2016 | CY | 07.09.2016 | CZ | 07.09.2016 | DK | 07.09.2016 | EE | 07.09.2016 | ES | 07.09.2016 | FI | 07.09.2016 | HR | 07.09.2016 | IT | 07.09.2016 | LT | 07.09.2016 | LV | 07.09.2016 | MC | 07.09.2016 | MK | 07.09.2016 | MT | 07.09.2016 | NL | 07.09.2016 | PL | 07.09.2016 | RO | 07.09.2016 | RS | 07.09.2016 | SE | 07.09.2016 | SI | 07.09.2016 | SK | 07.09.2016 | SM | 07.09.2016 | TR | 07.09.2016 | BG | 07.12.2016 | NO | 07.12.2016 | GR | 08.12.2016 | IS | 07.01.2017 | PT | 09.01.2017 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/51] | HU | 01.07.2013 | |
AL | 07.09.2016 | ||
CY | 07.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2016 | ||
DK | 07.09.2016 | ||
EE | 07.09.2016 | ||
ES | 07.09.2016 | ||
FI | 07.09.2016 | ||
HR | 07.09.2016 | ||
IT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LV | 07.09.2016 | ||
MC | 07.09.2016 | ||
MK | 07.09.2016 | ||
MT | 07.09.2016 | ||
NL | 07.09.2016 | ||
PL | 07.09.2016 | ||
RO | 07.09.2016 | ||
RS | 07.09.2016 | ||
SE | 07.09.2016 | ||
SI | 07.09.2016 | ||
SK | 07.09.2016 | ||
SM | 07.09.2016 | ||
BG | 07.12.2016 | ||
NO | 07.12.2016 | ||
GR | 08.12.2016 | ||
IS | 07.01.2017 | ||
PT | 09.01.2017 | ||
Former [2019/47] | HU | 01.07.2013 | |
AL | 07.09.2016 | ||
CY | 07.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2016 | ||
DK | 07.09.2016 | ||
EE | 07.09.2016 | ||
ES | 07.09.2016 | ||
FI | 07.09.2016 | ||
HR | 07.09.2016 | ||
IT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LV | 07.09.2016 | ||
MC | 07.09.2016 | ||
MT | 07.09.2016 | ||
NL | 07.09.2016 | ||
PL | 07.09.2016 | ||
RO | 07.09.2016 | ||
RS | 07.09.2016 | ||
SE | 07.09.2016 | ||
SI | 07.09.2016 | ||
SK | 07.09.2016 | ||
SM | 07.09.2016 | ||
BG | 07.12.2016 | ||
NO | 07.12.2016 | ||
GR | 08.12.2016 | ||
IS | 07.01.2017 | ||
PT | 09.01.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 01.07.2013 | |
AL | 07.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2016 | ||
DK | 07.09.2016 | ||
EE | 07.09.2016 | ||
ES | 07.09.2016 | ||
FI | 07.09.2016 | ||
HR | 07.09.2016 | ||
IT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LV | 07.09.2016 | ||
MC | 07.09.2016 | ||
MT | 07.09.2016 | ||
NL | 07.09.2016 | ||
PL | 07.09.2016 | ||
RO | 07.09.2016 | ||
RS | 07.09.2016 | ||
SE | 07.09.2016 | ||
SI | 07.09.2016 | ||
SK | 07.09.2016 | ||
SM | 07.09.2016 | ||
BG | 07.12.2016 | ||
NO | 07.12.2016 | ||
GR | 08.12.2016 | ||
IS | 07.01.2017 | ||
PT | 09.01.2017 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AL | 07.09.2016 | |
CZ | 07.09.2016 | ||
DK | 07.09.2016 | ||
EE | 07.09.2016 | ||
ES | 07.09.2016 | ||
FI | 07.09.2016 | ||
HR | 07.09.2016 | ||
IT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LV | 07.09.2016 | ||
MC | 07.09.2016 | ||
MT | 07.09.2016 | ||
NL | 07.09.2016 | ||
PL | 07.09.2016 | ||
RO | 07.09.2016 | ||
RS | 07.09.2016 | ||
SE | 07.09.2016 | ||
SI | 07.09.2016 | ||
SK | 07.09.2016 | ||
SM | 07.09.2016 | ||
BG | 07.12.2016 | ||
NO | 07.12.2016 | ||
GR | 08.12.2016 | ||
IS | 07.01.2017 | ||
PT | 09.01.2017 | ||
Former [2018/47] | AL | 07.09.2016 | |
CZ | 07.09.2016 | ||
DK | 07.09.2016 | ||
EE | 07.09.2016 | ||
ES | 07.09.2016 | ||
FI | 07.09.2016 | ||
HR | 07.09.2016 | ||
IT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LV | 07.09.2016 | ||
MT | 07.09.2016 | ||
NL | 07.09.2016 | ||
PL | 07.09.2016 | ||
RO | 07.09.2016 | ||
RS | 07.09.2016 | ||
SE | 07.09.2016 | ||
SI | 07.09.2016 | ||
SK | 07.09.2016 | ||
SM | 07.09.2016 | ||
BG | 07.12.2016 | ||
NO | 07.12.2016 | ||
GR | 08.12.2016 | ||
IS | 07.01.2017 | ||
PT | 09.01.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CZ | 07.09.2016 | |
DK | 07.09.2016 | ||
EE | 07.09.2016 | ||
ES | 07.09.2016 | ||
FI | 07.09.2016 | ||
HR | 07.09.2016 | ||
IT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LV | 07.09.2016 | ||
MT | 07.09.2016 | ||
NL | 07.09.2016 | ||
PL | 07.09.2016 | ||
RO | 07.09.2016 | ||
RS | 07.09.2016 | ||
SE | 07.09.2016 | ||
SI | 07.09.2016 | ||
SK | 07.09.2016 | ||
SM | 07.09.2016 | ||
BG | 07.12.2016 | ||
NO | 07.12.2016 | ||
GR | 08.12.2016 | ||
IS | 07.01.2017 | ||
PT | 09.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/37] | CZ | 07.09.2016 | |
DK | 07.09.2016 | ||
EE | 07.09.2016 | ||
ES | 07.09.2016 | ||
FI | 07.09.2016 | ||
HR | 07.09.2016 | ||
IT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LV | 07.09.2016 | ||
NL | 07.09.2016 | ||
PL | 07.09.2016 | ||
RO | 07.09.2016 | ||
RS | 07.09.2016 | ||
SE | 07.09.2016 | ||
SI | 07.09.2016 | ||
SK | 07.09.2016 | ||
SM | 07.09.2016 | ||
BG | 07.12.2016 | ||
NO | 07.12.2016 | ||
GR | 08.12.2016 | ||
IS | 07.01.2017 | ||
PT | 09.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/34] | CZ | 07.09.2016 | |
DK | 07.09.2016 | ||
EE | 07.09.2016 | ||
ES | 07.09.2016 | ||
FI | 07.09.2016 | ||
HR | 07.09.2016 | ||
IT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LV | 07.09.2016 | ||
NL | 07.09.2016 | ||
PL | 07.09.2016 | ||
RO | 07.09.2016 | ||
RS | 07.09.2016 | ||
SE | 07.09.2016 | ||
SK | 07.09.2016 | ||
SM | 07.09.2016 | ||
BG | 07.12.2016 | ||
NO | 07.12.2016 | ||
GR | 08.12.2016 | ||
IS | 07.01.2017 | ||
PT | 09.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/32] | CZ | 07.09.2016 | |
EE | 07.09.2016 | ||
ES | 07.09.2016 | ||
FI | 07.09.2016 | ||
HR | 07.09.2016 | ||
IT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LV | 07.09.2016 | ||
NL | 07.09.2016 | ||
PL | 07.09.2016 | ||
RO | 07.09.2016 | ||
RS | 07.09.2016 | ||
SE | 07.09.2016 | ||
SK | 07.09.2016 | ||
SM | 07.09.2016 | ||
BG | 07.12.2016 | ||
NO | 07.12.2016 | ||
GR | 08.12.2016 | ||
IS | 07.01.2017 | ||
PT | 09.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/13] | ES | 07.09.2016 | |
FI | 07.09.2016 | ||
HR | 07.09.2016 | ||
LT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LV | 07.09.2016 | ||
NL | 07.09.2016 | ||
RS | 07.09.2016 | ||
SE | 07.09.2016 | ||
NO | 07.12.2016 | ||
GR | 08.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | ES | 07.09.2016 | |
FI | 07.09.2016 | ||
HR | 07.09.2016 | ||
LT | 07.09.2016 | ||
RS | 07.09.2016 | ||
SE | 07.09.2016 | ||
NO | 07.12.2016 | ||
GR | 08.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | FI | 07.09.2016 | |
HR | 07.09.2016 | ||
LT | 07.09.2016 | ||
RS | 07.09.2016 | ||
SE | 07.09.2016 | ||
NO | 07.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 07.09.2016 | |
LT | 07.09.2016 | ||
NO | 07.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 07.09.2016 | Cited in | International search | [I]DE19857894 (BODENSEEWERK GERAETETECH [DE]) [I] 1-13 * column 3, lines 5-19 *; | [A]US6085127 (VOS DAVID W [US]) [A] 1-13* abstract *; | [A]CN102243280 (CHINA ELECTRIC POWER RES INST, et al) [A] 1-13 * abstract * | by applicant | WO2013017168 | - SAMPATH; LAFORTUNE, "Diagnosability of Discrete-Event Systems", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON AUTOMATION CONTROL, (199509), vol. 40, no. 9 | - YOO; GARCIA, "Diagnosis of behaviors of inter- est in partially-observed discrete-event systems", SYSTEMS AND CONTROL LETTERS, (2008), vol. 57, no. 12, pages 1023 - 1029 |