EP2867837 - SYSTEM FOR THE SECURE TRANSMISSION OF DIGITAL DATA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.06.2019 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.07.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nepting 18 rue Auguste Comte 34000 Montpellier / FR | [2015/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AUBRY-TRIAL, Martine 334 Avenue des Costières F-34130 Saint Aunes / FR | 02 /
COTTE, Jean-François 13 Chemin de Massacos F-34800 Peret / FR | 03 /
DALMAS, Jean-Paul 35 Bis de Massane F-34670 Baillargues / FR | 04 /
RENAULT, Frédéric 22 rue des Frères Platter F-34000 Montpellier / FR | [2018/32] |
Former [2015/19] | 01 /
AUBRY-TRIAL, Martine 334 Avenue des Costières F-34130 Saint Aunes / FR | ||
02 /
COTTE, Jean-François 13 Chemin de Massacos F-34800 Peret / FR | |||
03 /
DALMAS, Jean-Paul 35 Bis de Massane F-34670 Baillargues / FR | |||
04 /
RENAULT, Frédéric 5 rue Bonnié F-34000 Montpellier / FR | Representative(s) | Rhein, Alain Cabinet BREV & SUD 55 Avenue Clément Ader 34170 Castelnau-le-Lez / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2015/19] | Rhein, Alain Cabinet BREV&SUD 55 Avenue Clément Ader 34170 Castelnau le Lez / FR | Application number, filing date | 13734134.3 | 11.06.2013 | [2018/32] | WO2013FR51352 | Priority number, date | FR20120056217 | 29.06.2012 Original published format: FR 1256217 | FR20130055175 | 05.06.2013 Original published format: FR 1355175 | [2015/19] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014001677 | Date: | 03.01.2014 | Language: | FR | [2014/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2867837 | Date: | 06.05.2015 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.01.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2867837 | Date: | 08.08.2018 | Language: | FR | [2018/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.01.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H04W12/06, G06Q20/32, H04L29/06 | [2018/10] | CPC: |
H04L63/0492 (EP,US);
G06Q20/18 (EP);
G06Q20/3278 (EP);
G06Q20/341 (EP);
G06Q20/363 (EP);
H04W12/033 (EP,US);
H04W12/06 (EP,US);
H04W12/12 (EP,US);
H04W12/40 (EP,US);
H04L63/168 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2015/19] | G06Q20/18, G06Q20/34, H04W12/00, G06Q20/36 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/19] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUM SICHEREN ÜBERTRAGEN VON DIGITALEN DATEN | [2015/19] | English: | SYSTEM FOR THE SECURE TRANSMISSION OF DIGITAL DATA | [2015/19] | French: | SYSTÈME DE TRANSMISSION SÉCURISÉE DE DONNÉES NUMÉRIQUES | [2018/10] |
Former [2015/19] | SYSTEME DE TRANSMISSION SECURISEE DE DONNEES NUMERIQUES | Entry into regional phase | 13.01.2015 | National basic fee paid | 13.01.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.01.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.01.2015 | Examination requested [2015/19] | 28.07.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.02.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.06.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 25.06.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.06.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.02.2018 | Opposition(s) | 09.05.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.06.2013 | AL | 08.08.2018 | AT | 08.08.2018 | CZ | 08.08.2018 | DK | 08.08.2018 | EE | 08.08.2018 | FI | 08.08.2018 | HR | 08.08.2018 | LT | 08.08.2018 | LV | 08.08.2018 | MK | 08.08.2018 | RS | 08.08.2018 | SI | 08.08.2018 | SK | 08.08.2018 | SM | 08.08.2018 | TR | 08.08.2018 | BG | 08.11.2018 | NO | 08.11.2018 | GR | 09.11.2018 | IS | 08.12.2018 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/32] | HU | 11.06.2013 | |
AL | 08.08.2018 | ||
AT | 08.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2018 | ||
DK | 08.08.2018 | ||
EE | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
RS | 08.08.2018 | ||
SI | 08.08.2018 | ||
SK | 08.08.2018 | ||
SM | 08.08.2018 | ||
TR | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 08.08.2018 | |
AT | 08.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2018 | ||
DK | 08.08.2018 | ||
EE | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
RS | 08.08.2018 | ||
SI | 08.08.2018 | ||
SK | 08.08.2018 | ||
SM | 08.08.2018 | ||
TR | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 08.08.2018 | |
AT | 08.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2018 | ||
DK | 08.08.2018 | ||
EE | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
RS | 08.08.2018 | ||
SI | 08.08.2018 | ||
SK | 08.08.2018 | ||
SM | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 08.08.2018 | |
AT | 08.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2018 | ||
DK | 08.08.2018 | ||
EE | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
RS | 08.08.2018 | ||
SK | 08.08.2018 | ||
SM | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AL | 08.08.2018 | |
AT | 08.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2018 | ||
EE | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
RS | 08.08.2018 | ||
SK | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/22] | AL | 08.08.2018 | |
AT | 08.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
RS | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 08.08.2018 | |
AT | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
RS | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | AT | 08.08.2018 | |
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
RS | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 08.08.2018 | |
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
RS | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 08.08.2018 | |
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 08.08.2018 | Cited in | International search | [XI]EP1965596 (GEMPLUS CARD INT [FR]) [X] 1,2,6,7 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0037] * * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0044] * [I] 3-5,8,9; | [A]WO2010052722 (WALLETEX MICROELECTRONICS LTD [CN], et al) [A] 1-9 * abstract * * figures 1,2 * * page 1, line 1 - line 4 * * page 2, line 7 - line 14 * * page 3, line 22 - line 25 * * page 4, line 14 - line 27 * * page 15, line 1 - line 19 * * page 18, line 13 - line 28 *; | [A]WO2011080273 (GEMALTO SA [FR], et al) [A] 1-9 * figures 1,2 * * page 3, line 11 - line 20 * * page 9, line 8 - line 12 ** page 9, line 21 - page 10, line 8 * |