EP3017462 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR TREATING A SUBSTRATE SURFACE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.07.2018 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.08.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.04.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EV Group E. Thallner GmbH DI Erich Thallner Strasse 1 4782 St. Florian am Inn / AT | [2016/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHMIDBAUER, Martin Enzenkirchen 3 A-4761 Enzenkirchen / AT | 02 /
ZENGER, Tobias Königsberger Strasse 17 94036 Passau / DE | 03 /
SCHMID, Florian Aubachberg 32 A-4941 Mehrnbach / AT | 04 /
WIESER, Thomas Herbert-Zill-Strasse 11 84375 Kirchdorf am Inn / DE | 05 /
STELZHAMMER, Hermann Pötting 43 A-4754 Andrichsfurt / AT | 06 /
TRACKSDORF, Martin Herbert-Wöhl-Strasse 3/6 4780 Schärding / AT | [2017/20] |
Former [2016/19] | 01 /
SCHMIDBAUER, Martin Enzenkirchen 3 A-4761 Enzenkirchen / AT | ||
02 /
ZENGER, Tobias Königsberger Strasse 17 94036 Passau / DE | |||
03 /
SCHMID, Florian Aubachberg 32 A-4941 Mehrnbach / AT | |||
04 /
WIESER, Thomas Herbert Zillstrasse 11 84375 Kirchdorf am Inn / DE | |||
05 /
STELZHAMMER, Hermann Pötting 43 A-4754 Andrichsfurt / AT | |||
06 /
TRACKSDORF, Martin Herbert-Wöhl-Strasse 3/6 4780 Schärding / AT | Representative(s) | Schneider, Sascha, et al Becker & Müller Patentanwälte Turmstraße 22 40878 Ratingen / DE | [2016/19] | Application number, filing date | 13734389.3 | 04.07.2013 | [2016/19] | WO2013EP64151 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015000520 | Date: | 08.01.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3017462 | Date: | 11.05.2016 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.01.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3017462 | Date: | 13.09.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/37] | Type: | B9 Corrected patent specification | No.: | EP3017462 | Date: | 27.12.2017 | [2017/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.01.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/67, H01L21/02, H01L21/66 | [2017/14] | CPC: |
H01L21/67103 (EP,US);
H01L21/0206 (US);
H01L21/67051 (US);
H01L21/67109 (EP,US);
H01L21/6715 (EP,US);
H01L22/20 (US);
H01L22/30 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2016/19] | H01L21/67 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/19] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR BEHANDLUNG EINER SUBSTRATOBERFLÄCHE | [2016/19] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR TREATING A SUBSTRATE SURFACE | [2016/19] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT DE TRAITER LA SURFACE D'UN SUBSTRAT | [2016/19] | Entry into regional phase | 12.01.2016 | National basic fee paid | 12.01.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.01.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.02.2015 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 12.01.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.01.2016 | Examination requested [2016/19] | 03.08.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.11.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.04.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.08.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 02.08.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.08.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.08.2016 | Opposition(s) | 14.06.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.07.2013 | AL | 13.09.2017 | CY | 13.09.2017 | CZ | 13.09.2017 | DK | 13.09.2017 | EE | 13.09.2017 | ES | 13.09.2017 | FI | 13.09.2017 | HR | 13.09.2017 | IT | 13.09.2017 | LT | 13.09.2017 | LV | 13.09.2017 | MC | 13.09.2017 | MK | 13.09.2017 | MT | 13.09.2017 | NL | 13.09.2017 | PL | 13.09.2017 | PT | 13.09.2017 | RO | 13.09.2017 | RS | 13.09.2017 | SE | 13.09.2017 | SI | 13.09.2017 | SK | 13.09.2017 | SM | 13.09.2017 | TR | 13.09.2017 | BG | 13.12.2017 | NO | 13.12.2017 | GR | 14.12.2017 | IS | 13.01.2018 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 04.07.2013 | |
CY | 13.09.2017 | ||
CZ | 13.09.2017 | ||
DK | 13.09.2017 | ||
EE | 13.09.2017 | ||
ES | 13.09.2017 | ||
FI | 13.09.2017 | ||
HR | 13.09.2017 | ||
IT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LV | 13.09.2017 | ||
MC | 13.09.2017 | ||
MK | 13.09.2017 | ||
MT | 13.09.2017 | ||
NL | 13.09.2017 | ||
PL | 13.09.2017 | ||
PT | 13.09.2017 | ||
RO | 13.09.2017 | ||
RS | 13.09.2017 | ||
SE | 13.09.2017 | ||
SI | 13.09.2017 | ||
SK | 13.09.2017 | ||
SM | 13.09.2017 | ||
TR | 13.09.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
NO | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
IS | 13.01.2018 | ||
Former [2020/30] | HU | 04.07.2013 | |
CZ | 13.09.2017 | ||
DK | 13.09.2017 | ||
EE | 13.09.2017 | ||
ES | 13.09.2017 | ||
FI | 13.09.2017 | ||
HR | 13.09.2017 | ||
IT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LV | 13.09.2017 | ||
MC | 13.09.2017 | ||
MT | 13.09.2017 | ||
NL | 13.09.2017 | ||
PL | 13.09.2017 | ||
PT | 13.09.2017 | ||
RO | 13.09.2017 | ||
RS | 13.09.2017 | ||
SE | 13.09.2017 | ||
SI | 13.09.2017 | ||
SK | 13.09.2017 | ||
SM | 13.09.2017 | ||
TR | 13.09.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
NO | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
IS | 13.01.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | CZ | 13.09.2017 | |
DK | 13.09.2017 | ||
EE | 13.09.2017 | ||
ES | 13.09.2017 | ||
FI | 13.09.2017 | ||
HR | 13.09.2017 | ||
IT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LV | 13.09.2017 | ||
MC | 13.09.2017 | ||
MT | 13.09.2017 | ||
NL | 13.09.2017 | ||
PL | 13.09.2017 | ||
PT | 13.09.2017 | ||
RO | 13.09.2017 | ||
RS | 13.09.2017 | ||
SE | 13.09.2017 | ||
SI | 13.09.2017 | ||
SK | 13.09.2017 | ||
SM | 13.09.2017 | ||
TR | 13.09.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
NO | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
IS | 13.01.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | CZ | 13.09.2017 | |
DK | 13.09.2017 | ||
EE | 13.09.2017 | ||
ES | 13.09.2017 | ||
FI | 13.09.2017 | ||
HR | 13.09.2017 | ||
IT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LV | 13.09.2017 | ||
MC | 13.09.2017 | ||
MT | 13.09.2017 | ||
NL | 13.09.2017 | ||
PL | 13.09.2017 | ||
RO | 13.09.2017 | ||
RS | 13.09.2017 | ||
SE | 13.09.2017 | ||
SI | 13.09.2017 | ||
SK | 13.09.2017 | ||
SM | 13.09.2017 | ||
TR | 13.09.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
NO | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
IS | 13.01.2018 | ||
Former [2019/15] | CZ | 13.09.2017 | |
DK | 13.09.2017 | ||
EE | 13.09.2017 | ||
ES | 13.09.2017 | ||
FI | 13.09.2017 | ||
HR | 13.09.2017 | ||
IT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LV | 13.09.2017 | ||
MC | 13.09.2017 | ||
MT | 13.09.2017 | ||
NL | 13.09.2017 | ||
PL | 13.09.2017 | ||
RO | 13.09.2017 | ||
RS | 13.09.2017 | ||
SE | 13.09.2017 | ||
SI | 13.09.2017 | ||
SK | 13.09.2017 | ||
SM | 13.09.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
NO | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
IS | 13.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | CZ | 13.09.2017 | |
DK | 13.09.2017 | ||
EE | 13.09.2017 | ||
ES | 13.09.2017 | ||
FI | 13.09.2017 | ||
HR | 13.09.2017 | ||
IT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LV | 13.09.2017 | ||
MT | 13.09.2017 | ||
NL | 13.09.2017 | ||
PL | 13.09.2017 | ||
RO | 13.09.2017 | ||
RS | 13.09.2017 | ||
SE | 13.09.2017 | ||
SI | 13.09.2017 | ||
SK | 13.09.2017 | ||
SM | 13.09.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
NO | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
IS | 13.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CZ | 13.09.2017 | |
DK | 13.09.2017 | ||
EE | 13.09.2017 | ||
ES | 13.09.2017 | ||
FI | 13.09.2017 | ||
HR | 13.09.2017 | ||
IT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LV | 13.09.2017 | ||
MT | 13.09.2017 | ||
NL | 13.09.2017 | ||
PL | 13.09.2017 | ||
RO | 13.09.2017 | ||
RS | 13.09.2017 | ||
SE | 13.09.2017 | ||
SK | 13.09.2017 | ||
SM | 13.09.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
NO | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
IS | 13.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | CZ | 13.09.2017 | |
DK | 13.09.2017 | ||
EE | 13.09.2017 | ||
ES | 13.09.2017 | ||
FI | 13.09.2017 | ||
HR | 13.09.2017 | ||
IT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LV | 13.09.2017 | ||
NL | 13.09.2017 | ||
PL | 13.09.2017 | ||
RO | 13.09.2017 | ||
RS | 13.09.2017 | ||
SE | 13.09.2017 | ||
SK | 13.09.2017 | ||
SM | 13.09.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
NO | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
IS | 13.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | CZ | 13.09.2017 | |
EE | 13.09.2017 | ||
ES | 13.09.2017 | ||
FI | 13.09.2017 | ||
HR | 13.09.2017 | ||
IT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LV | 13.09.2017 | ||
NL | 13.09.2017 | ||
PL | 13.09.2017 | ||
RO | 13.09.2017 | ||
RS | 13.09.2017 | ||
SE | 13.09.2017 | ||
SK | 13.09.2017 | ||
SM | 13.09.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
NO | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
IS | 13.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/21] | CZ | 13.09.2017 | |
ES | 13.09.2017 | ||
FI | 13.09.2017 | ||
HR | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LV | 13.09.2017 | ||
NL | 13.09.2017 | ||
RS | 13.09.2017 | ||
SE | 13.09.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
NO | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/15] | ES | 13.09.2017 | |
FI | 13.09.2017 | ||
HR | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LV | 13.09.2017 | ||
NL | 13.09.2017 | ||
RS | 13.09.2017 | ||
SE | 13.09.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
NO | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/12] | ES | 13.09.2017 | |
FI | 13.09.2017 | ||
HR | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LV | 13.09.2017 | ||
RS | 13.09.2017 | ||
SE | 13.09.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
NO | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | ES | 13.09.2017 | |
FI | 13.09.2017 | ||
HR | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
RS | 13.09.2017 | ||
SE | 13.09.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
NO | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | FI | 13.09.2017 | |
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
SE | 13.09.2017 | ||
NO | 13.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/08] | FI | 13.09.2017 | |
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
NO | 13.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | LT | 13.09.2017 | |
NO | 13.12.2017 | Cited in | International search | [YA]US4507078 (TAM JOHANN [US], et al) [Y] 2,7,10 * column 6, line 15 - line 49 * * figure 1 *[A] 1,8; | [XYI]US2012304921 (MIYAMOTO HIDENORI [JP], et al) [X] 1,3,4,6,8,9 * paragraph [0154] - paragraph [0187] * * figures 7-20 * [Y] 2,7,10 [I] 5 | Examination | US2005245005 | by applicant | WO2012US66404 |