EP2880338 - DOUBLE-CLUTCH GEARBOX FOR COMMERCIAL VEHICLES AND METHOD FOR SHIFTING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.04.2017 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.04.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.05.2017 [2017/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZF Friedrichshafen AG Graf-von-Soden-Platz 1 88046 Friedrichshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/24] | For all designated states ZF Friedrichshafen AG Graf-von-Soden-Platz 1 88046 Friedrichshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUNOLD, Bernard Weidenring 6 88046 Friedrichshafen / DE | [2015/24] | Application number, filing date | 13735010.4 | 08.07.2013 | WO2013EP64339 | Priority number, date | DE201210213517 | 01.08.2012 Original published format: DE102012213517 | [2015/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014019808 | Date: | 06.02.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2880338 | Date: | 10.06.2015 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.02.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.02.2014 | Classification | IPC: | F16H37/04, F16H3/00, F16H61/688, F16H63/30, F16D11/14, F16D21/02, F16D11/00 | [2015/24] | CPC: |
F16H37/046 (EP);
F16D11/14 (EP);
F16D21/02 (EP);
F16H3/006 (EP);
F16H63/30 (EP);
F16D2011/002 (EP);
F16D21/04 (EP);
F16H2063/3093 (EP);
F16H2200/0078 (EP);
F16H2200/0095 (EP);
F16H3/095 (EP);
F16H3/097 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/24] | Title | German: | DOPPELKUPPLUNGSGETRIEBE FÜR NUTZFAHRZEUGE UND VERFAHREN ZUR SCHALTUNG DESSELBEN | [2015/24] | English: | DOUBLE-CLUTCH GEARBOX FOR COMMERCIAL VEHICLES AND METHOD FOR SHIFTING SAME | [2015/24] | French: | TRANSMISSION À DOUBLE EMBRAYAGE POUR VÉHICULES UTILITAIRES ET PROCÉDÉ PERMETTANT UNE SÉLECTION DE VITESSE | [2015/24] | Entry into regional phase | 11.12.2014 | National basic fee paid | 11.12.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.12.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.12.2014 | Examination requested [2015/24] | 05.09.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.07.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.12.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/20] | 09.01.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/20] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.07.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2016 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]DE102005033027 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]) [Y] 1-4,7-13 * paragraphs [0001] - [0016] - [0027] , [0048] - [0065] - [0077]; figures 1-8,14 * * paragraphs [0017] , [0018] , [0071] , [0076]; figures 13a-13e *; | [Y]WO2007031193 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE], et al) [Y] 1-4,7-13 * page 7, paragraph 2 - page 8, paragraph 1; figures 1-18 *; | [XYI]EP2128495 (ZAHNRADFABRIK FRIEDRICHSHAFEN [DE]) [X] 1-3,6-10 * the whole document * [Y] 4 [I] 11,13; | [Y]DE10224357 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]) [Y] 4 * the whole document *; | [A]DE102010003924 (ZAHNRADFABRIK FRIEDRICHSHAFEN [DE]) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1323953 (KANZAKI KOKYUKOKI MFG CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,14,15 * paragraphs [0058] - [0075]; figures 5a-9b *; | [A]US2009301241 (MARTIN WILLIAM WESLEY [GB], et al) [A] 14,15 * paragraphs [0069] - [0075]; figures 1,4,6,7a-7f *; | [A]DE102004049274 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]) [A] 1,14,15 * the whole document * | by applicant | DE102006015661 |