EP2872015 - SYSTEM FOR THE PREPARATION OF BEVERAGES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.06.2018 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.06.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.07.2018 [2018/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states N.V. Nutricia Eerste Stationsstraat 186 2712 HM Zoetermeer / NL | [2015/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FOSTER, Jody, James 17 Roe Gardens Ruddington Nottingham NG11 6AQ / GB | [2015/21] | Representative(s) | V.O. P.O. Box 87930 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2015/21] | Jansen, Cornelis Marinus, et al V.O. Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 13735014.6 | 09.07.2013 | WO2013EP64439 | Priority number, date | WO2012EP63483 | 10.07.2012 Original published format: PCT/EP2012/063483 | [2015/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2014009339 | Date: | 16.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/03] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2872015 | Date: | 20.05.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.01.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.12.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A47J31/40, A61J9/00, B65D85/804 | [2015/21] | CPC: |
A47J31/401 (EP);
B65D85/8043 (EP,US);
A47J31/407 (EP);
A61J9/00 (EP);
A61L2/07 (EP);
A61L2202/23 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/21] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ZUBEREITUNG VON GETRÄNKEN | [2015/21] | English: | SYSTEM FOR THE PREPARATION OF BEVERAGES | [2015/21] | French: | SYSTÈME POUR LA PRÉPARATION DE BOISSONS | [2015/21] | Entry into regional phase | 09.02.2015 | National basic fee paid | 09.02.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.02.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.02.2015 | Examination requested [2015/21] | 11.08.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.02.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/27] | 28.02.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2018/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2017 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XAI]WO9830455 (FRIEDMAN MARK M [IL], et al) [X] 55,57,60 * page 5, line 31 - page 6, line 5; figure 1 * [A] 1,6,10,29,43,64 [I] 56,59; | [A]AU696136B (CHARMAYNE MARIA OLDANI) [A] 1,16 * page 5, line 17 - page 8, line 15; figures 1-13 *; | [A]WO2006077259 (NESTEC SA [CH], et al) [A] 62,63 * page 7, line 28 - page 8, line 8; figure 1 *; | [XAI]WO2006129302 (VASERMAN ELCHANAN [IL]) [X] 55,57,58,60 * page 6, paragraphs 1-7; figures 1,2,6 * [A] 1,5,6,10-12,14-17,21,22,24-27,29,43,64 [I] 56,59; | [A]WO2008146115 (PINESCHI MASSIMILIANO [IT]) [A] 2-4,7-15,18,29,43 * page 12, line 26 - page 14, line 32; figure 1 * * page 18, line 21 - page 20, line 16 *; | [XAI]US2008302711 (WINDMILLER DAVID MITCHELL [US]) [X] 29,32-36 * paragraphs [0107] - [0136]; figures 1-10 * [A] 1,16,64 [I] 37-44,48,50-54; | [AD]WO2009143164 (GRINON IND [US], et al) [AD] 1 * paragraphs [0005] , [0035]; figures 1-2c *; | [A]WO2010025392 (PEPSICO INC [US], et al) [A] 1,5,6,10,23-27,62 * paragraphs [0027] - [0036] - [0 40]; figures 1, 4a-4c *; | [AD]WO2010028282 (RAZBABY INNOVATIVE BABY PRODUC [US], et al) [AD] 2-4,7-9,11,12,18-20,62,64 * paragraphs [0029] - [0046]; figure 4 *; | [A]US2011024537 (GONZALEZ OSMAY [US]) [A] 1,11,12,14-17,19* paragraphs [0003] , [0062] - [0070]; figures 1-5 *; | [A]CH702947 (ZWIMPFER MICHAEL [CH]) [A] 1,5-10,13,16-18,20,21,23-27,29,43 * the whole document * | by applicant | WO9830455 | EP1633226 | WO2006077259 | WO2009143164 | WO2010028282 | WO2011042489 |