EP2872404 - HEAT-SHRINKING INSTALLATION COMPRISING HEAT DIFFUSION MEANS FORMING A UNITARY ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.01.2019 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.02.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.10.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sleever International Company 15 avenue Arago 91420 Morangis / FR | [2015/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FRESNEL, Eric 1 impasse du Moulin Vert F-75014 Paris / FR | [2015/21] | Representative(s) | Parzy, Benjamin Alain, et al Cabinet Boettcher 16, rue Médéric 75017 Paris / FR | [2015/21] | Application number, filing date | 13735329.8 | 12.07.2013 | [2018/10] | WO2013EP64794 | Priority number, date | FR20120056748 | 12.07.2012 Original published format: FR 1256748 | [2015/21] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014009529 | Date: | 16.01.2014 | Language: | FR | [2014/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2872404 | Date: | 20.05.2015 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.01.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2872404 | Date: | 07.03.2018 | Language: | FR | [2018/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.01.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B29C61/00, B65B53/06, B65B59/04, // B29C63/42 | [2017/42] | CPC: |
B65B53/063 (EP,CN);
B29C61/00 (EP,CN);
B65B59/04 (EP,CN);
B29C63/423 (EP,CN)
|
Former IPC [2015/21] | B65B53/06, B65B59/00, B65B59/04, F27B9/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/21] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WÄRMESCHRUMPFANLAGE MIT EINER WÄRMEDISPERSIONSVORRICHTUNG ALS EINHEITLICHE ANORDNUNG | [2015/21] | English: | HEAT-SHRINKING INSTALLATION COMPRISING HEAT DIFFUSION MEANS FORMING A UNITARY ASSEMBLY | [2015/21] | French: | INSTALLATION DE THERMORETRACTION COMPORTANT DES MOYENS DE DIFFUSION DE CHALEUR FORMANT UN ENSEMBLE UNITAIRE | [2015/21] | Entry into regional phase | 17.12.2014 | National basic fee paid | 17.12.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.12.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.12.2014 | Examination requested [2015/21] | 03.09.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.11.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.03.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.05.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.10.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.02.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.08.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.10.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.01.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 25.01.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.01.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.11.2015 | Opposition(s) | 10.12.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.07.2013 | AL | 07.03.2018 | CY | 07.03.2018 | CZ | 07.03.2018 | DK | 07.03.2018 | EE | 07.03.2018 | FI | 07.03.2018 | HR | 07.03.2018 | LT | 07.03.2018 | LV | 07.03.2018 | MC | 07.03.2018 | MK | 07.03.2018 | MT | 07.03.2018 | RO | 07.03.2018 | RS | 07.03.2018 | SI | 07.03.2018 | SK | 07.03.2018 | SM | 07.03.2018 | TR | 07.03.2018 | BG | 07.06.2018 | NO | 07.06.2018 | GR | 08.06.2018 | IS | 07.07.2018 | LU | 12.07.2018 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 12.07.2013 | |
AL | 07.03.2018 | ||
CY | 07.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2018 | ||
DK | 07.03.2018 | ||
EE | 07.03.2018 | ||
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
MC | 07.03.2018 | ||
MK | 07.03.2018 | ||
MT | 07.03.2018 | ||
RO | 07.03.2018 | ||
RS | 07.03.2018 | ||
SI | 07.03.2018 | ||
SK | 07.03.2018 | ||
SM | 07.03.2018 | ||
TR | 07.03.2018 | ||
BG | 07.06.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | ||
GR | 08.06.2018 | ||
LU | 12.07.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | HU | 12.07.2013 | |
AL | 07.03.2018 | ||
CY | 07.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2018 | ||
DK | 07.03.2018 | ||
EE | 07.03.2018 | ||
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
MC | 07.03.2018 | ||
MT | 07.03.2018 | ||
RO | 07.03.2018 | ||
RS | 07.03.2018 | ||
SI | 07.03.2018 | ||
SK | 07.03.2018 | ||
SM | 07.03.2018 | ||
TR | 07.03.2018 | ||
BG | 07.06.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | ||
GR | 08.06.2018 | ||
LU | 12.07.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 07.03.2018 | |
CY | 07.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2018 | ||
DK | 07.03.2018 | ||
EE | 07.03.2018 | ||
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
MC | 07.03.2018 | ||
MT | 07.03.2018 | ||
RO | 07.03.2018 | ||
RS | 07.03.2018 | ||
SI | 07.03.2018 | ||
SK | 07.03.2018 | ||
SM | 07.03.2018 | ||
TR | 07.03.2018 | ||
BG | 07.06.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | ||
GR | 08.06.2018 | ||
LU | 12.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/17] | AL | 07.03.2018 | |
CY | 07.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2018 | ||
DK | 07.03.2018 | ||
EE | 07.03.2018 | ||
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
MC | 07.03.2018 | ||
MT | 07.03.2018 | ||
RO | 07.03.2018 | ||
RS | 07.03.2018 | ||
SI | 07.03.2018 | ||
SK | 07.03.2018 | ||
SM | 07.03.2018 | ||
BG | 07.06.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | ||
GR | 08.06.2018 | ||
LU | 12.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/15] | AL | 07.03.2018 | |
CY | 07.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2018 | ||
DK | 07.03.2018 | ||
EE | 07.03.2018 | ||
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
MC | 07.03.2018 | ||
MT | 07.03.2018 | ||
RO | 07.03.2018 | ||
RS | 07.03.2018 | ||
SI | 07.03.2018 | ||
SK | 07.03.2018 | ||
SM | 07.03.2018 | ||
BG | 07.06.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | ||
GR | 08.06.2018 | ||
Former [2019/13] | AL | 07.03.2018 | |
CY | 07.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2018 | ||
DK | 07.03.2018 | ||
EE | 07.03.2018 | ||
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
MT | 07.03.2018 | ||
RO | 07.03.2018 | ||
RS | 07.03.2018 | ||
SI | 07.03.2018 | ||
SK | 07.03.2018 | ||
SM | 07.03.2018 | ||
BG | 07.06.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | ||
GR | 08.06.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | AL | 07.03.2018 | |
CY | 07.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2018 | ||
DK | 07.03.2018 | ||
EE | 07.03.2018 | ||
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
MT | 07.03.2018 | ||
RO | 07.03.2018 | ||
RS | 07.03.2018 | ||
SK | 07.03.2018 | ||
SM | 07.03.2018 | ||
BG | 07.06.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | ||
GR | 08.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AL | 07.03.2018 | |
CY | 07.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2018 | ||
EE | 07.03.2018 | ||
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
MT | 07.03.2018 | ||
RO | 07.03.2018 | ||
RS | 07.03.2018 | ||
SK | 07.03.2018 | ||
SM | 07.03.2018 | ||
BG | 07.06.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | ||
GR | 08.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AL | 07.03.2018 | |
CY | 07.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2018 | ||
EE | 07.03.2018 | ||
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
MT | 07.03.2018 | ||
RO | 07.03.2018 | ||
RS | 07.03.2018 | ||
SK | 07.03.2018 | ||
BG | 07.06.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | ||
GR | 08.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 07.03.2018 | |
CY | 07.03.2018 | ||
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
MT | 07.03.2018 | ||
RS | 07.03.2018 | ||
BG | 07.06.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | ||
GR | 08.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CY | 07.03.2018 | |
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
MT | 07.03.2018 | ||
RS | 07.03.2018 | ||
BG | 07.06.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | ||
GR | 08.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | CY | 07.03.2018 | |
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
RS | 07.03.2018 | ||
BG | 07.06.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | ||
GR | 08.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 07.03.2018 | |
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | ||
GR | 08.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | CY | 07.03.2018 | |
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | Cited in | International search | [A]FR2280555 (SITUNO HOLDING SA [LU]) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [Y]EP1050466 (KALLFASS GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [Y]JP2001171620 (FUJI SEAL INC) [Y] 2-16 * abstract *; | [XY]WO0157458 (BTU INT [US]) [X] 1 * the whole document * [Y] 2-16; | [YA]EP1232948 (ITALDIBIPACK SPA [IT]) [Y] 16 * paragraphs [0003] - [0007] - [0015] - [0019] - [0 34] - [0037]; figure -; claim 9 * [A] 1-15; | [Y]EP2103527 (FUJI SEAL INT INC [JP]) [Y] 1-16* the whole document * | Examination | CN201193111Y | US2005236833 |