EP2855903 - CATALYST PROTECTION DEVICE AND CATALYST PROTECTION METHOD FOR INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.07.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 18.08.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.05.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | [2015/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KONDO, Shinya C/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | 02 /
TAKAMA, Yasuyuki C/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | 03 /
ASO, Koji C/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | [2015/15] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/38] | J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
Former [2015/15] | Smith, Samuel Leonard J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 13735404.9 | 30.05.2013 | [2017/38] | WO2013IB01202 | Priority number, date | JP20120126029 | 01.06.2012 Original published format: JP 2012126029 | [2015/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013179132 | Date: | 05.12.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2855903 | Date: | 08.04.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.12.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2855903 | Date: | 20.09.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.12.2013 | Classification | IPC: | F02D41/02, F02D41/30, F01N11/00, F01N3/20 | [2017/20] | CPC: |
F01N11/002 (EP,RU,US);
F01N3/2033 (RU,US);
F01N3/2066 (RU,US);
F02D41/0235 (EP,US);
F02D41/3005 (EP,US);
F01N2550/02 (EP,US);
F01N2900/1602 (EP,US);
F02D2041/0265 (EP,US);
F02D2200/0802 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2015/15] | F02D41/02, F01N3/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KATALYSATORSCHUTZVORRICHTUNG UND KATALYSATORSCHUTZVERFAHREN FÜR EINE BRENNKRAFTMASCHINE | [2015/15] | English: | CATALYST PROTECTION DEVICE AND CATALYST PROTECTION METHOD FOR INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE | [2015/15] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ DE PROTECTION DE CATALYSEUR POUR MOTEUR À COMBUSTION INTERNE | [2015/15] | Entry into regional phase | 26.11.2014 | National basic fee paid | 26.11.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.11.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.11.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.11.2014 | Examination requested [2015/15] | 12.07.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.11.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.05.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.07.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 28.07.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.07.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.07.2016 | Opposition(s) | 21.06.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.05.2013 | AL | 20.09.2017 | AT | 20.09.2017 | CY | 20.09.2017 | CZ | 20.09.2017 | DK | 20.09.2017 | EE | 20.09.2017 | ES | 20.09.2017 | FI | 20.09.2017 | HR | 20.09.2017 | IT | 20.09.2017 | LT | 20.09.2017 | LV | 20.09.2017 | MC | 20.09.2017 | MK | 20.09.2017 | NL | 20.09.2017 | PL | 20.09.2017 | PT | 20.09.2017 | RO | 20.09.2017 | RS | 20.09.2017 | SE | 20.09.2017 | SI | 20.09.2017 | SK | 20.09.2017 | SM | 20.09.2017 | TR | 20.09.2017 | BG | 20.12.2017 | NO | 20.12.2017 | GR | 21.12.2017 | IS | 20.01.2018 | IE | 30.05.2018 | LU | 30.05.2018 | MT | 30.05.2018 | BE | 31.05.2018 | CH | 31.05.2018 | LI | 31.05.2018 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 30.05.2013 | |
AT | 20.09.2017 | ||
CY | 20.09.2017 | ||
CZ | 20.09.2017 | ||
DK | 20.09.2017 | ||
EE | 20.09.2017 | ||
ES | 20.09.2017 | ||
FI | 20.09.2017 | ||
HR | 20.09.2017 | ||
IT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LV | 20.09.2017 | ||
MC | 20.09.2017 | ||
MK | 20.09.2017 | ||
NL | 20.09.2017 | ||
PL | 20.09.2017 | ||
PT | 20.09.2017 | ||
RO | 20.09.2017 | ||
RS | 20.09.2017 | ||
SE | 20.09.2017 | ||
SI | 20.09.2017 | ||
SK | 20.09.2017 | ||
SM | 20.09.2017 | ||
TR | 20.09.2017 | ||
BG | 20.12.2017 | ||
NO | 20.12.2017 | ||
GR | 21.12.2017 | ||
IS | 20.01.2018 | ||
IE | 30.05.2018 | ||
LU | 30.05.2018 | ||
MT | 30.05.2018 | ||
BE | 31.05.2018 | ||
CH | 31.05.2018 | ||
LI | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2020/30] | HU | 30.05.2013 | |
AT | 20.09.2017 | ||
CZ | 20.09.2017 | ||
DK | 20.09.2017 | ||
EE | 20.09.2017 | ||
ES | 20.09.2017 | ||
FI | 20.09.2017 | ||
HR | 20.09.2017 | ||
IT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LV | 20.09.2017 | ||
MC | 20.09.2017 | ||
NL | 20.09.2017 | ||
PL | 20.09.2017 | ||
PT | 20.09.2017 | ||
RO | 20.09.2017 | ||
RS | 20.09.2017 | ||
SE | 20.09.2017 | ||
SI | 20.09.2017 | ||
SK | 20.09.2017 | ||
SM | 20.09.2017 | ||
TR | 20.09.2017 | ||
BG | 20.12.2017 | ||
NO | 20.12.2017 | ||
GR | 21.12.2017 | ||
IS | 20.01.2018 | ||
IE | 30.05.2018 | ||
LU | 30.05.2018 | ||
MT | 30.05.2018 | ||
BE | 31.05.2018 | ||
CH | 31.05.2018 | ||
LI | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | AT | 20.09.2017 | |
CZ | 20.09.2017 | ||
DK | 20.09.2017 | ||
EE | 20.09.2017 | ||
ES | 20.09.2017 | ||
FI | 20.09.2017 | ||
HR | 20.09.2017 | ||
IT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LV | 20.09.2017 | ||
MC | 20.09.2017 | ||
NL | 20.09.2017 | ||
PL | 20.09.2017 | ||
PT | 20.09.2017 | ||
RO | 20.09.2017 | ||
RS | 20.09.2017 | ||
SE | 20.09.2017 | ||
SI | 20.09.2017 | ||
SK | 20.09.2017 | ||
SM | 20.09.2017 | ||
TR | 20.09.2017 | ||
BG | 20.12.2017 | ||
NO | 20.12.2017 | ||
GR | 21.12.2017 | ||
IS | 20.01.2018 | ||
IE | 30.05.2018 | ||
LU | 30.05.2018 | ||
MT | 30.05.2018 | ||
BE | 31.05.2018 | ||
CH | 31.05.2018 | ||
LI | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 20.09.2017 | |
CZ | 20.09.2017 | ||
DK | 20.09.2017 | ||
EE | 20.09.2017 | ||
ES | 20.09.2017 | ||
FI | 20.09.2017 | ||
HR | 20.09.2017 | ||
IT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LV | 20.09.2017 | ||
MC | 20.09.2017 | ||
NL | 20.09.2017 | ||
PL | 20.09.2017 | ||
RO | 20.09.2017 | ||
RS | 20.09.2017 | ||
SE | 20.09.2017 | ||
SI | 20.09.2017 | ||
SK | 20.09.2017 | ||
SM | 20.09.2017 | ||
TR | 20.09.2017 | ||
BG | 20.12.2017 | ||
NO | 20.12.2017 | ||
GR | 21.12.2017 | ||
IS | 20.01.2018 | ||
IE | 30.05.2018 | ||
LU | 30.05.2018 | ||
MT | 30.05.2018 | ||
BE | 31.05.2018 | ||
CH | 31.05.2018 | ||
LI | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AT | 20.09.2017 | |
CZ | 20.09.2017 | ||
DK | 20.09.2017 | ||
EE | 20.09.2017 | ||
ES | 20.09.2017 | ||
FI | 20.09.2017 | ||
HR | 20.09.2017 | ||
IT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LV | 20.09.2017 | ||
MC | 20.09.2017 | ||
NL | 20.09.2017 | ||
PL | 20.09.2017 | ||
RO | 20.09.2017 | ||
RS | 20.09.2017 | ||
SE | 20.09.2017 | ||
SI | 20.09.2017 | ||
SK | 20.09.2017 | ||
SM | 20.09.2017 | ||
BG | 20.12.2017 | ||
NO | 20.12.2017 | ||
GR | 21.12.2017 | ||
IS | 20.01.2018 | ||
IE | 30.05.2018 | ||
LU | 30.05.2018 | ||
MT | 30.05.2018 | ||
BE | 31.05.2018 | ||
CH | 31.05.2018 | ||
LI | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 20.09.2017 | |
CZ | 20.09.2017 | ||
DK | 20.09.2017 | ||
EE | 20.09.2017 | ||
ES | 20.09.2017 | ||
FI | 20.09.2017 | ||
HR | 20.09.2017 | ||
IT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LV | 20.09.2017 | ||
MC | 20.09.2017 | ||
NL | 20.09.2017 | ||
PL | 20.09.2017 | ||
RO | 20.09.2017 | ||
RS | 20.09.2017 | ||
SE | 20.09.2017 | ||
SI | 20.09.2017 | ||
SK | 20.09.2017 | ||
SM | 20.09.2017 | ||
BG | 20.12.2017 | ||
NO | 20.12.2017 | ||
GR | 21.12.2017 | ||
IS | 20.01.2018 | ||
IE | 30.05.2018 | ||
LU | 30.05.2018 | ||
BE | 31.05.2018 | ||
CH | 31.05.2018 | ||
LI | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/19] | AT | 20.09.2017 | |
CZ | 20.09.2017 | ||
DK | 20.09.2017 | ||
EE | 20.09.2017 | ||
ES | 20.09.2017 | ||
FI | 20.09.2017 | ||
HR | 20.09.2017 | ||
IT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LV | 20.09.2017 | ||
MC | 20.09.2017 | ||
NL | 20.09.2017 | ||
PL | 20.09.2017 | ||
RO | 20.09.2017 | ||
RS | 20.09.2017 | ||
SE | 20.09.2017 | ||
SI | 20.09.2017 | ||
SK | 20.09.2017 | ||
SM | 20.09.2017 | ||
BG | 20.12.2017 | ||
NO | 20.12.2017 | ||
GR | 21.12.2017 | ||
IS | 20.01.2018 | ||
IE | 30.05.2018 | ||
LU | 30.05.2018 | ||
CH | 31.05.2018 | ||
LI | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/17] | AT | 20.09.2017 | |
CZ | 20.09.2017 | ||
DK | 20.09.2017 | ||
EE | 20.09.2017 | ||
ES | 20.09.2017 | ||
FI | 20.09.2017 | ||
HR | 20.09.2017 | ||
IT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LV | 20.09.2017 | ||
MC | 20.09.2017 | ||
NL | 20.09.2017 | ||
PL | 20.09.2017 | ||
RO | 20.09.2017 | ||
RS | 20.09.2017 | ||
SE | 20.09.2017 | ||
SI | 20.09.2017 | ||
SK | 20.09.2017 | ||
SM | 20.09.2017 | ||
BG | 20.12.2017 | ||
NO | 20.12.2017 | ||
GR | 21.12.2017 | ||
IS | 20.01.2018 | ||
LU | 30.05.2018 | ||
CH | 31.05.2018 | ||
LI | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AT | 20.09.2017 | |
CZ | 20.09.2017 | ||
DK | 20.09.2017 | ||
EE | 20.09.2017 | ||
ES | 20.09.2017 | ||
FI | 20.09.2017 | ||
HR | 20.09.2017 | ||
IT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LV | 20.09.2017 | ||
MC | 20.09.2017 | ||
NL | 20.09.2017 | ||
PL | 20.09.2017 | ||
RO | 20.09.2017 | ||
RS | 20.09.2017 | ||
SE | 20.09.2017 | ||
SI | 20.09.2017 | ||
SK | 20.09.2017 | ||
SM | 20.09.2017 | ||
BG | 20.12.2017 | ||
NO | 20.12.2017 | ||
GR | 21.12.2017 | ||
IS | 20.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.05.2018 | ||
LI | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/06] | AT | 20.09.2017 | |
CZ | 20.09.2017 | ||
DK | 20.09.2017 | ||
EE | 20.09.2017 | ||
ES | 20.09.2017 | ||
FI | 20.09.2017 | ||
HR | 20.09.2017 | ||
IT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LV | 20.09.2017 | ||
MC | 20.09.2017 | ||
NL | 20.09.2017 | ||
PL | 20.09.2017 | ||
RO | 20.09.2017 | ||
RS | 20.09.2017 | ||
SE | 20.09.2017 | ||
SI | 20.09.2017 | ||
SK | 20.09.2017 | ||
SM | 20.09.2017 | ||
BG | 20.12.2017 | ||
NO | 20.12.2017 | ||
GR | 21.12.2017 | ||
IS | 20.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 20.09.2017 | |
CZ | 20.09.2017 | ||
DK | 20.09.2017 | ||
EE | 20.09.2017 | ||
ES | 20.09.2017 | ||
FI | 20.09.2017 | ||
HR | 20.09.2017 | ||
IT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LV | 20.09.2017 | ||
NL | 20.09.2017 | ||
PL | 20.09.2017 | ||
RO | 20.09.2017 | ||
RS | 20.09.2017 | ||
SE | 20.09.2017 | ||
SI | 20.09.2017 | ||
SK | 20.09.2017 | ||
SM | 20.09.2017 | ||
BG | 20.12.2017 | ||
NO | 20.12.2017 | ||
GR | 21.12.2017 | ||
IS | 20.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | AT | 20.09.2017 | |
CZ | 20.09.2017 | ||
DK | 20.09.2017 | ||
EE | 20.09.2017 | ||
ES | 20.09.2017 | ||
FI | 20.09.2017 | ||
HR | 20.09.2017 | ||
IT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LV | 20.09.2017 | ||
NL | 20.09.2017 | ||
PL | 20.09.2017 | ||
RO | 20.09.2017 | ||
RS | 20.09.2017 | ||
SE | 20.09.2017 | ||
SK | 20.09.2017 | ||
SM | 20.09.2017 | ||
BG | 20.12.2017 | ||
NO | 20.12.2017 | ||
GR | 21.12.2017 | ||
IS | 20.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 20.09.2017 | |
CZ | 20.09.2017 | ||
EE | 20.09.2017 | ||
ES | 20.09.2017 | ||
FI | 20.09.2017 | ||
HR | 20.09.2017 | ||
IT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LV | 20.09.2017 | ||
NL | 20.09.2017 | ||
PL | 20.09.2017 | ||
RO | 20.09.2017 | ||
RS | 20.09.2017 | ||
SE | 20.09.2017 | ||
SK | 20.09.2017 | ||
SM | 20.09.2017 | ||
BG | 20.12.2017 | ||
NO | 20.12.2017 | ||
GR | 21.12.2017 | ||
IS | 20.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/21] | CZ | 20.09.2017 | |
FI | 20.09.2017 | ||
HR | 20.09.2017 | ||
LT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LV | 20.09.2017 | ||
NL | 20.09.2017 | ||
RS | 20.09.2017 | ||
SE | 20.09.2017 | ||
BG | 20.12.2017 | ||
NO | 20.12.2017 | ||
GR | 21.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/15] | FI | 20.09.2017 | |
HR | 20.09.2017 | ||
LT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LV | 20.09.2017 | ||
NL | 20.09.2017 | ||
RS | 20.09.2017 | ||
SE | 20.09.2017 | ||
BG | 20.12.2017 | ||
NO | 20.12.2017 | ||
GR | 21.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/12] | FI | 20.09.2017 | |
HR | 20.09.2017 | ||
LT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LV | 20.09.2017 | ||
RS | 20.09.2017 | ||
SE | 20.09.2017 | ||
BG | 20.12.2017 | ||
NO | 20.12.2017 | ||
GR | 21.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | FI | 20.09.2017 | |
HR | 20.09.2017 | ||
LT | 20.09.2017 | ||
RS | 20.09.2017 | ||
SE | 20.09.2017 | ||
BG | 20.12.2017 | ||
NO | 20.12.2017 | ||
GR | 21.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | FI | 20.09.2017 | |
LT | 20.09.2017 | ||
SE | 20.09.2017 | ||
NO | 20.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/08] | FI | 20.09.2017 | |
LT | 20.09.2017 | ||
NO | 20.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | LT | 20.09.2017 | |
NO | 20.12.2017 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US5414994 (CULLEN MICHAEL J [US], et al) [Y] 2,3 * column 5, line 8 - column 5, line 18 *; | [I]DE19648427 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [I] 1,11 * column 1, line 60 - column 3, line 54; figure 2 *; | [Y]WO03029634 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE], et al) [Y] 6-10* page 6 - page 7; figure 3 *; | [I]US2004206068 (MICHELINI JOHN OTTAVIO [US]) [I] 1,11 * paragraph [0050] - paragraph [0066]; figure 4 *; | [IY]US2012014410 (KACHI MASAHIRO [JP], et al) [I] 1,4,5,11 * paragraphs [0003] , [00 5] , [0 12] , [0 35] * * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0045]; figure 3 * * paragraph [0054] - paragraph [0056] * [Y] 2,3,6-10 | by applicant | JP2011220214 |