EP2822666 - METHODS AND APPARATUSES FOR WATER PURIFICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.12.2022 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.09.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.12.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.01.2023 [2023/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Chang, Huei Meng 489 Sinclair Frontage Rd Milpitas, CA 95035 / US | [2016/37] |
Former [2015/03] | For all designated states Chang, Huei Meng Blk 412B Fernvale Link 18-27 Singapore 792412 / SG | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHANG, Huei Meng c/o 489 Sinclair Frontage Rd Milpitas, CA 95035 / US | 02 /
LEE, Yee Chun 489 Sinclair Frontage Road Milpitas, CA 95035 / US | 03 /
RAJU, Narayan D. 489 Sinclair Frontage Road Milpitas, CA 95035 / US | 04 /
TAN, Ah Beng 489 Sinclair Frontage Road Milpitas, CA 95035 / US | [2016/37] |
Former [2015/03] | 01 /
CHANG, Huei Meng Blk 412B Fernvale Link 18-27 Singapore 792412 / SG | ||
02 /
LEE, Yee Chun 489 Sinclair Frontage Road Milpitas, CA 95035 / US | |||
03 /
RAJU, Narayan D. 489 Sinclair Frontage Road Milpitas, CA 95035 / US | |||
04 /
TAN, Ah Beng 489 Sinclair Frontage Road Milpitas, CA 95035 / US | Representative(s) | K & H Bonapat Patentanwälte Koch · von Behren & Partner mbB Donnersbergerstraße 22A 80634 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/03] | Dienwiebel, Thomas Dienwiebel Transatlantic Intellectual Property Lechnerstraße 25a 82067 Ebenhausen / DE | Application number, filing date | 13735593.9 | 11.01.2013 | WO2013SG00017 | Priority number, date | US201261585293P | 11.01.2012 Original published format: US 201261585293 P | US201261727661P | 16.11.2012 Original published format: US 201261727661 P | US201313733842 | 03.01.2013 Original published format: US201313733842 | [2015/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2013105905 | Date: | 18.07.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/29] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2822666 | Date: | 14.01.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.07.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 17.10.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.12.2015 | Classification | IPC: | B01D3/32, B01D3/02, C02F1/04, B01D1/00, B01D3/00, B01D1/04, B01D1/22, B01D1/24, B01D1/28, B01D1/30, B01D5/00 | [2016/02] | CPC: |
B01D1/04 (EP,US);
B01D1/00 (CN);
C02F1/043 (US);
B01D1/0082 (CN);
B01D1/14 (US);
B01D1/22 (EP,US);
B01D1/24 (EP,US);
B01D1/28 (EP,US);
B01D1/284 (US);
B01D1/30 (CN);
B01D1/305 (EP,US);
B01D5/006 (EP,US);
C02F1/04 (CN);
C02F1/52 (CN);
B01D1/2818 (US);
|
Former IPC [2015/03] | B01D3/32, B01D3/02, C02F1/04, B01D1/00, B01D3/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/03] | Extension states | BA | 01.12.2014 | ME | 01.12.2014 | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNGEN ZUR WASSERREINIGUNG | [2015/03] | English: | METHODS AND APPARATUSES FOR WATER PURIFICATION | [2015/03] | French: | PROCÉDÉS ET APPAREILS DE PURIFICATION D'EAU | [2015/03] | Entry into regional phase | 11.08.2014 | National basic fee paid | 01.12.2014 | Search fee paid | 01.12.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.12.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/03] | 01.12.2014 | Examination requested [2015/03] | 20.07.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.09.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.01.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.08.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.11.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.05.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.08.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/01] | 30.08.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2023/01] | Public notification(s) | Invitation to give notice of appointment of a professional representative (EPO Form 2502B dated 06/04/2016) | Chang, Huei Meng Blk 412B Fernvale Link 18-27 Singapore 792412 / SG | [2016/32] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.09.2017 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the search fee | 01.12.2014 | Request for further processing filed | 01.12.2014 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 11.12.2014 | Decision despatched | 01.12.2014 | Request for further processing filed | 01.12.2014 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 11.12.2014 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 01.12.2014 | Request for further processing filed | 01.12.2014 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 11.12.2014 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees TR, SM, SK, SI, SE, RS, RO, PT, PL, NO, NL, MT, MK, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, HR, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT, AL | 01.12.2014 | Request for further processing filed | 01.12.2014 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 11.12.2014 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 02.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.02.2018 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   31.07.2018 | 31.01.2021 | 09   M06   Fee paid on   02.08.2021 | 31.01.2022 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US4030985 (BARBA DIEGO, et al) [X] 1,2,6-11,13,17,19 * column 6, line 53 - column 7, line 68; figure 1 * [I] 3-5,12,14-16,18,20; | [XI]US4235281 (FITCH ROBERT E [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6-11,13,17,19 * column 5, line 37 - column 7, line 68; figures 1-4 * [I] 5,12,14-16,18,20; | [A]US4693091 (O'MARA RAYMOND D [US], et al) [A] 12,18,20* column 1, line 16 - line 62 *; | [XI]US5645694 (STEWART JAMES M [US], et al) [X] 1,2,6-13,17,19 * column 6, line 15 - column 8, line 7; figures 1-3 * [I] 3-5,14-16,18,20; | [XI]US5772850 (MORRIS BOBBY D [US]) [X] 1,2,6-11,13,17,19 * column 4, line 50 - column 6, line 50; figure 2 * [I] 3-5,12,14-16,18,20 | International search | [A]US5108548 (KEANE BRIAN H [AU], et al); | [A]WO2008130254 (EQUUS ENVIRONMENTAL LTD [NZ], et al); | [A]US2008277261 (PAXTON GREGORY MARK [AU]); | [A]US2008308403 (MALONEY GERALD F [US], et al); | [A]WO2011050317 (ALTELA INC [US], et al) |