EP2869847 - IMMUNOCONJUGATES COMPRISING ANTI-CD79B ANTIBODIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2015/20] | IMMUNOCONJUGATES COMPRISING ANTI - CD79B ANTIBODIES | ||
[2017/13] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.10.2018 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.11.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.09.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.08.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Genentech, Inc. 1 DNA Way South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | [2015/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
POLAKIS, Paul 1 DNA Way South San Francisco, California 94080 / US | 02 /
POLSON, Andrew 1 DNA Way South San Francisco, California 94080 / US | 03 /
SPENCER, Susan Diane 1 DNA Way South San Francisco, California 94080 / US | 04 /
YU, Shang-Fan 1 DNA Way South San Francisco, California 94080 / US | 05 /
ZHENG, Bing 1 DNA Way South San Francisco, California 94080 / US | [2015/20] | Representative(s) | Woolley, Lindsey Claire Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [2017/49] |
Former [2015/20] | Woolley, Lindsey Claire Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | Application number, filing date | 13737118.3 | 08.07.2013 | [2017/49] | WO2013US49519 | Priority number, date | US201261669268P | 09.07.2012 Original published format: US 201261669268 P | US201261726742P | 15.11.2012 Original published format: US 201261726742 P | [2015/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014011521 | Date: | 16.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2869847 | Date: | 13.05.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.01.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2869847 | Date: | 06.12.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.01.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A61K47/68, A61P35/00 | [2017/13] | CPC: |
A61K47/6809 (EP,KR,US);
A61K47/6867 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/706 (EP,KR,US);
A61K45/06 (KR,US);
A61K47/6849 (EP,KR,US);
A61K47/6851 (US);
|
Former IPC [2015/20] | A61K47/48, A61P35/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/20] | Extension states | BA | 27.01.2015 | ME | 27.01.2015 | Title | German: | IMMUNKONJUGATE MIT ANTI-CD79B-ANTIKÖRPERN | [2015/20] | English: | IMMUNOCONJUGATES COMPRISING ANTI-CD79B ANTIBODIES | [2017/13] | French: | IMMUNOCONJUGUÉS COMPRENANT DES ANTICORPS ANTI-CD79B | [2015/20] |
Former [2015/20] | IMMUNOCONJUGATES COMPRISING ANTI - CD79B ANTIBODIES | Entry into regional phase | 27.01.2015 | National basic fee paid | 27.01.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.01.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.01.2015 | Examination requested [2015/20] | 26.08.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.03.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.07.2017 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 17.07.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 17.07.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.09.2017 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 21.09.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.03.2017 | Opposition(s) | 07.09.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.07.2013 | AL | 06.12.2017 | AT | 06.12.2017 | CY | 06.12.2017 | CZ | 06.12.2017 | DK | 06.12.2017 | EE | 06.12.2017 | FI | 06.12.2017 | HR | 06.12.2017 | LT | 06.12.2017 | LV | 06.12.2017 | MC | 06.12.2017 | MK | 06.12.2017 | NL | 06.12.2017 | PL | 06.12.2017 | PT | 06.12.2017 | RO | 06.12.2017 | RS | 06.12.2017 | SE | 06.12.2017 | SI | 06.12.2017 | SK | 06.12.2017 | SM | 06.12.2017 | BG | 06.03.2018 | NO | 06.03.2018 | GR | 07.03.2018 | IS | 06.04.2018 | GB | 08.07.2018 | IE | 08.07.2018 | IT | 08.07.2018 | LU | 08.07.2018 | MT | 08.07.2018 | TR | 08.07.2018 | ES | 09.07.2018 | BE | 31.07.2018 | CH | 31.07.2018 | FR | 31.07.2018 | LI | 31.07.2018 | [2024/42] |
Former [2020/33] | HU | 08.07.2013 | |
AL | 06.12.2017 | ||
AT | 06.12.2017 | ||
CY | 06.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 06.12.2017 | ||
DK | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
MC | 06.12.2017 | ||
MK | 06.12.2017 | ||
NL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PT | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
RS | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SI | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
SM | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
IS | 06.04.2018 | ||
GB | 08.07.2018 | ||
IE | 08.07.2018 | ||
IT | 08.07.2018 | ||
LU | 08.07.2018 | ||
MT | 08.07.2018 | ||
ES | 09.07.2018 | ||
BE | 31.07.2018 | ||
CH | 31.07.2018 | ||
FR | 31.07.2018 | ||
LI | 31.07.2018 | ||
Former [2020/31] | HU | 08.07.2013 | |
AT | 06.12.2017 | ||
CY | 06.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 06.12.2017 | ||
DK | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
MC | 06.12.2017 | ||
MK | 06.12.2017 | ||
NL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PT | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
RS | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SI | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
SM | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
GB | 08.07.2018 | ||
IE | 08.07.2018 | ||
IT | 08.07.2018 | ||
LU | 08.07.2018 | ||
MT | 08.07.2018 | ||
ES | 09.07.2018 | ||
BE | 31.07.2018 | ||
CH | 31.07.2018 | ||
FR | 31.07.2018 | ||
LI | 31.07.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | HU | 08.07.2013 | |
AT | 06.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 06.12.2017 | ||
DK | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
MC | 06.12.2017 | ||
NL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PT | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
RS | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SI | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
SM | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
GB | 08.07.2018 | ||
IE | 08.07.2018 | ||
IT | 08.07.2018 | ||
LU | 08.07.2018 | ||
MT | 08.07.2018 | ||
ES | 09.07.2018 | ||
BE | 31.07.2018 | ||
CH | 31.07.2018 | ||
FR | 31.07.2018 | ||
LI | 31.07.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AT | 06.12.2017 | |
CZ | 06.12.2017 | ||
DK | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
MC | 06.12.2017 | ||
NL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
RS | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SI | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
SM | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
GB | 08.07.2018 | ||
IE | 08.07.2018 | ||
IT | 08.07.2018 | ||
LU | 08.07.2018 | ||
MT | 08.07.2018 | ||
ES | 09.07.2018 | ||
BE | 31.07.2018 | ||
CH | 31.07.2018 | ||
FR | 31.07.2018 | ||
LI | 31.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/47] | AT | 06.12.2017 | |
CZ | 06.12.2017 | ||
DK | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
MC | 06.12.2017 | ||
NL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
RS | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SI | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
SM | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
GB | 08.07.2018 | ||
IE | 08.07.2018 | ||
IT | 08.07.2018 | ||
LU | 08.07.2018 | ||
ES | 09.07.2018 | ||
BE | 31.07.2018 | ||
CH | 31.07.2018 | ||
FR | 31.07.2018 | ||
LI | 31.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AT | 06.12.2017 | |
CZ | 06.12.2017 | ||
DK | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
MC | 06.12.2017 | ||
NL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
RS | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SI | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
SM | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
GB | 08.07.2018 | ||
IE | 08.07.2018 | ||
IT | 08.07.2018 | ||
LU | 08.07.2018 | ||
BE | 31.07.2018 | ||
CH | 31.07.2018 | ||
FR | 31.07.2018 | ||
LI | 31.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AT | 06.12.2017 | |
CZ | 06.12.2017 | ||
DK | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
MC | 06.12.2017 | ||
NL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
RS | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SI | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
SM | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
GB | 08.07.2018 | ||
IE | 08.07.2018 | ||
LU | 08.07.2018 | ||
BE | 31.07.2018 | ||
CH | 31.07.2018 | ||
FR | 31.07.2018 | ||
LI | 31.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AT | 06.12.2017 | |
CZ | 06.12.2017 | ||
DK | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
MC | 06.12.2017 | ||
NL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
RS | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SI | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
SM | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
GB | 08.07.2018 | ||
IE | 08.07.2018 | ||
LU | 08.07.2018 | ||
CH | 31.07.2018 | ||
LI | 31.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/19] | AT | 06.12.2017 | |
CZ | 06.12.2017 | ||
DK | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
MC | 06.12.2017 | ||
NL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
RS | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SI | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
SM | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
IE | 08.07.2018 | ||
LU | 08.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/17] | AT | 06.12.2017 | |
CZ | 06.12.2017 | ||
DK | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
MC | 06.12.2017 | ||
NL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
RS | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SI | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
SM | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
LU | 08.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/15] | AT | 06.12.2017 | |
CZ | 06.12.2017 | ||
DK | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
MC | 06.12.2017 | ||
NL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
RS | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SI | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
SM | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 06.12.2017 | |
CZ | 06.12.2017 | ||
DK | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
NL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
RS | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SI | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
SM | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | AT | 06.12.2017 | |
CZ | 06.12.2017 | ||
DK | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
NL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
RS | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
SM | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 06.12.2017 | |
CZ | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
NL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
RS | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
SM | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/38] | AT | 06.12.2017 | |
CZ | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
NL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
RS | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
SM | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CZ | 06.12.2017 | |
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
NL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
RS | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
SM | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/34] | FI | 06.12.2017 | |
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
NL | 06.12.2017 | ||
RS | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | FI | 06.12.2017 | |
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
RS | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/22] | FI | 06.12.2017 | |
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | Cited in | International search | [YD]US2011076287 (COHEN ROBERT L [US], et al); | [XDYI]US8088378 (CHEN YVONNE [US], et al) | by applicant | US4676980 | US4737456 | US4816567 | EP0328147 | EP0404097 | WO9301161 | US5208020 | WO9308829 | WO9316185 | WO9411026 | US5362852 | WO9429351 | US5500362 | US5571894 | US5587458 | US5624821 | US5648260 | US5648237 | WO9730087 | US5731168 | US5750373 | US5770429 | US5789199 | US5821337 | US5840523 | WO9858964 | US5869046 | WO9922764 | US5959177 | WO9951642 | US6040498 | US6075181 | WO0061739 | US6150584 | US6171586 | US6194551 | US6214345 | WO0129246 | US6248516 | US6267958 | WO0231140 | US6417429 | US6420548 | US2002164328 | WO02088172 | WO03011878 | WO03026577 | US2003096743 | WO03043583 | US2003115614 | US2003130189 | US6602684 | US6602677 | US2003157108 | US6630579 | WO03085119 | WO03084570 | WO03085107 | WO2004032828 | US2004093621 | US6737056 | US2004110704 | US2004110282 | US2004109865 | US2004132140 | WO2004056312 | US2005014934 | US2005079574 | WO2005035586 | WO2005035778 | US2005119455 | US2005123546 | WO2005053742 | WO2005100402 | US2005260186 | US2005266000 | US6982321 | US2006025576 | WO2006029879 | WO2006044908 | US7041870 | US2006104968 | US7087409 | US7125978 | US7189826 | US2007061900 | US2007117126 | US2007160598 | US2007237764 | US2007292936 | US7332581 | US2008050310 | US2008069820 | US7371826 | US7375078 | WO2008077546 | US2009002360 | US7498298 | US7521541 | US7527791 | WO2009089004 | WO2009099741 | WO2010009124 | US2010034837 | US2011076287 | US8088378 |