EP2874693 - ELECTRIC-FIELD ASSISTED ADMINISTRATION OF TAPENTADOL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.05.2022 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.05.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.06.2022 [2022/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Grünenthal GmbH Zieglerstrasse 6 52078 Aachen / DE | [2015/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FRIEDRICH, Ingo Im Gödersfeld 28 52078 Aachen / DE | 02 /
MIKYNA, Martin Plinganserstrasse 26 81369 München / DE | 03 /
GEDAT, Sandra Auenstrasse 21 83043 Bad Aibling / DE | 04 /
GUY, Richard H. 3, Southville Terrace Lyncombe Vale Bath BA2 4LZ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/22] | 01 /
FRIEDRICH, Ingo Im Gödersfeld 28 52078 Aachen / DE | ||
02 /
MIKYNA, Martin Schäftlarnstrasse 64 81371 München / DE | |||
03 /
GEDAT, Sandra Auenstrasse 21 83043 Bad Aibling / DE | |||
04 /
GUY, Richard H. 3, Southville Terrace Lyncombe Vale Bath BA2 4LZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 13737148.0 | 15.07.2013 | WO2013EP02095 | Priority number, date | EP20120005317 | 20.07.2012 Original published format: EP 12005317 | US201261673948P | 20.07.2012 Original published format: US 201261673948 P | [2015/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014012652 | Date: | 23.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2874693 | Date: | 27.05.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.01.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.01.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/30, A61N1/04, A61K9/00, A61K9/70, A61N1/32 | [2015/22] | CPC: |
A61N1/0448 (EP,US);
A61K41/0047 (US);
A61K31/135 (EP,US);
A61K47/38 (EP,US);
A61K9/0009 (EP,US);
A61K9/06 (EP,US);
A61K9/703 (EP,US);
A61K9/7084 (EP,US);
A61N1/0412 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/22] | Title | German: | DURCH EIN ELEKTRISCHES FELD UNTERSTÜTZTE VERABREICHUNG VON TAPENTADOL | [2015/22] | English: | ELECTRIC-FIELD ASSISTED ADMINISTRATION OF TAPENTADOL | [2015/22] | French: | ADMINISTRATION ASSISTÉE PAR CHAMP ÉLECTRIQUE DE TAPENTADOL | [2015/22] | Entry into regional phase | 24.11.2014 | National basic fee paid | 24.11.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.11.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.11.2014 | Examination requested [2015/22] | 06.11.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.10.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.05.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/26] | 22.02.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2022/26] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.10.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2021 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US5605536 (SIBALIS DAN [US]) [Y] 1,4-15 * abstract * * column 1, lines 35-55 * * column 2, line 26 - column 6, line 39 *; | [Y]US2003199808 (HENLEY JULIAN L [US], et al) [Y] 1,4-15 * abstract ** paragraphs [0009] - [0010] - [0 24] - [0045] *; | [YD]US2010189793 (MEYER ELISABETH [DE], et al) [YD] 1-3,6-15 * the whole document *; | [YD]DE102010024558 (AMW GMBH [DE]) [YD] 1-15 * abstract *; | [Y] - YOGESHVAR N. KALIA ET AL, "Iontophoretic drug delivery", ADVANCED DRUG DELIVERY REVIEWS, (20040301), vol. 56, no. 5, doi:10.1016/j.addr.2003.10.026, ISSN 0169-409X, pages 619 - 658, XP055043329 [Y] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] , [00 2] , [ 3.2] , [ 4.1] , [ 4.1.1] * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.addr.2003.10.026 | [Y] - RIEMSMA ROB ET AL, "Systematic review of tapentadol in chronic severe pain", CURRENT MEDICAL RESEARCH AND OPINION,, (20111001), vol. 27, no. 10, ISSN 1473-4877, pages 1907 - 1930, XP009164351 [Y] 1-15 * abstract * * page 1908 - page 1911 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1185/03007995.2011.611494 | by applicant | US5533995 | US5830175 | US2009062720 | US2010189793 | US2010247617 | DE102010024558 | - TZSCHENTKE T. M. ET AL., TAPENTADOL HYDROCHLORIDE, DRUGS OF THE FUTURE, (2006), vol. 31, pages 1053 - 1061 | - B. MUDRY; R. H. GUY; M.B. DELGADO-CHARRO, BIOPHYS. J., (2006), vol. 90, pages 2822 - 2830 | - B. MUDRY; R. H. GUY; M.B. DELGADO- CHARRO, J. CONTROL. RELEASE, (2006), vol. 111, pages 362 - 367 | - B. MUDRY; R. H. GUY; M.B. DELGADO-CHARRO, J. PHARM. SCI., (2006), vol. 95, pages 561 - 569 |