EP2882812 - SUBCRITICALLY FORMULATED COATINGS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.03.2018 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 31.03.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Evonik Degussa GmbH Rellinghauser Straße 1-11 45128 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/25] | For all designated states Evonik Degussa GmbH Rellinghauser Strasse 1-11 45128 Essen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHATTKA, Jan, Hendrik Heidelberger Landstraße 99g 64297 Darmstadt / DE | 02 /
MATTEN, Thomas Schubertstraße 23 51427 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | 03 /
FENGLER, Stephan Am Lohwald 18 60488 Frankfurt / DE | 04 /
HEILEN, Wernfried Fuerst-Bentheim-Straße 50 46519 Alpen / DE | 05 /
HERMES, Florian Bleichstr. 48 60313 Frankfurt / DE | 06 /
JUNG, Herbert Brunnenstr. 3 63791 Karlstein / DE | [2015/25] | Application number, filing date | 13737207.4 | 10.07.2013 | [2017/18] | WO2013EP64564 | Priority number, date | DE201210213978 | 07.08.2012 Original published format: DE102012213978 | [2015/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014023505 | Date: | 13.02.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2882812 | Date: | 17.06.2015 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.02.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2882812 | Date: | 03.05.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.02.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C09D5/00 | [2015/25] | CPC: |
C09D5/00 (EP,US);
C09D133/064 (US);
C09D125/06 (US);
C09D133/02 (US);
C09D133/06 (US);
C09D7/65 (CN)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/25] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | UNTERKRITISCH FORMULIERTE BESCHICHTUNGEN | [2015/25] | English: | SUBCRITICALLY FORMULATED COATINGS | [2015/25] | French: | REVÊTEMENT DE FORMULE SOUS-CRITIQUE | [2015/25] | Entry into regional phase | 26.01.2015 | National basic fee paid | 26.01.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.01.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.01.2015 | Examination requested [2015/25] | 18.08.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.01.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.03.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 27.03.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.03.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.01.2017 | Opposition(s) | 06.02.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.07.2013 | AL | 03.05.2017 | CY | 03.05.2017 | CZ | 03.05.2017 | DK | 03.05.2017 | EE | 03.05.2017 | ES | 03.05.2017 | FI | 03.05.2017 | HR | 03.05.2017 | IT | 03.05.2017 | LT | 03.05.2017 | LV | 03.05.2017 | MC | 03.05.2017 | MK | 03.05.2017 | MT | 03.05.2017 | NL | 03.05.2017 | PL | 03.05.2017 | PT | 03.05.2017 | RO | 03.05.2017 | RS | 03.05.2017 | SE | 03.05.2017 | SI | 03.05.2017 | SK | 03.05.2017 | SM | 03.05.2017 | TR | 03.05.2017 | IE | 10.07.2017 | LU | 10.07.2017 | BE | 31.07.2017 | CH | 31.07.2017 | FR | 31.07.2017 | LI | 31.07.2017 | BG | 03.08.2017 | GB | 03.08.2017 | NO | 03.08.2017 | GR | 04.08.2017 | IS | 03.09.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/28] | HU | 10.07.2013 | |
CY | 03.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 03.05.2017 | ||
DK | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
ES | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
IT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
MC | 03.05.2017 | ||
MK | 03.05.2017 | ||
MT | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
PT | 03.05.2017 | ||
RO | 03.05.2017 | ||
RS | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
SI | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
SM | 03.05.2017 | ||
TR | 03.05.2017 | ||
IE | 10.07.2017 | ||
LU | 10.07.2017 | ||
BE | 31.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
FR | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
GB | 03.08.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
Former [2020/15] | HU | 10.07.2013 | |
CY | 03.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 03.05.2017 | ||
DK | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
ES | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
IT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
MC | 03.05.2017 | ||
MK | 03.05.2017 | ||
MT | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RO | 03.05.2017 | ||
RS | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
SI | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
SM | 03.05.2017 | ||
TR | 03.05.2017 | ||
IE | 10.07.2017 | ||
LU | 10.07.2017 | ||
BE | 31.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
FR | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
GB | 03.08.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 10.07.2013 | |
CY | 03.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 03.05.2017 | ||
DK | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
ES | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
IT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
MC | 03.05.2017 | ||
MK | 03.05.2017 | ||
MT | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RO | 03.05.2017 | ||
RS | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
SI | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
SM | 03.05.2017 | ||
IE | 10.07.2017 | ||
LU | 10.07.2017 | ||
BE | 31.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
FR | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
GB | 03.08.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
Former [2019/47] | HU | 10.07.2013 | |
CY | 03.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 03.05.2017 | ||
DK | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
ES | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
IT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
MC | 03.05.2017 | ||
MT | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RO | 03.05.2017 | ||
RS | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
SI | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
SM | 03.05.2017 | ||
IE | 10.07.2017 | ||
LU | 10.07.2017 | ||
BE | 31.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
FR | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
GB | 03.08.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 10.07.2013 | |
CZ | 03.05.2017 | ||
DK | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
ES | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
IT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
MC | 03.05.2017 | ||
MT | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RO | 03.05.2017 | ||
RS | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
SI | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
SM | 03.05.2017 | ||
IE | 10.07.2017 | ||
LU | 10.07.2017 | ||
BE | 31.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
FR | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
GB | 03.08.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
Former [2019/30] | CZ | 03.05.2017 | |
DK | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
ES | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
IT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
MC | 03.05.2017 | ||
MT | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RO | 03.05.2017 | ||
RS | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
SI | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
SM | 03.05.2017 | ||
IE | 10.07.2017 | ||
LU | 10.07.2017 | ||
BE | 31.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
FR | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
GB | 03.08.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CZ | 03.05.2017 | |
DK | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
ES | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
IT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
MT | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RO | 03.05.2017 | ||
RS | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
SI | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
SM | 03.05.2017 | ||
IE | 10.07.2017 | ||
LU | 10.07.2017 | ||
BE | 31.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
FR | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
GB | 03.08.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CZ | 03.05.2017 | |
DK | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
ES | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
IT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RO | 03.05.2017 | ||
RS | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
SI | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
SM | 03.05.2017 | ||
IE | 10.07.2017 | ||
LU | 10.07.2017 | ||
BE | 31.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
FR | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
GB | 03.08.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/34] | CZ | 03.05.2017 | |
DK | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
ES | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
IT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RO | 03.05.2017 | ||
RS | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
SI | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
SM | 03.05.2017 | ||
IE | 10.07.2017 | ||
LU | 10.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
FR | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/25] | CZ | 03.05.2017 | |
DK | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
ES | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
IT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RO | 03.05.2017 | ||
RS | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
SI | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
SM | 03.05.2017 | ||
IE | 10.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
FR | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | CZ | 03.05.2017 | |
DK | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
ES | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
IT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RO | 03.05.2017 | ||
RS | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
SM | 03.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | CZ | 03.05.2017 | |
DK | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
ES | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
IT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RO | 03.05.2017 | ||
RS | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
SM | 03.05.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | CZ | 03.05.2017 | |
DK | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
ES | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RO | 03.05.2017 | ||
RS | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | DK | 03.05.2017 | |
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
ES | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RS | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | ES | 03.05.2017 | |
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RS | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | ES | 03.05.2017 | |
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RS | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | ES | 03.05.2017 | |
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0022633 (ROHM & HAAS [US]) [X] 1-14 * Ansprüche 1-46; Beispiele 1-5 *; | [X]WO0068304 (NESTE CHEMICALS OY [FI], et al) [X] 1-14 * Ansprüche 1-14; Beispiele 1-5 *; | [X]EP1197503 (ROHM & HAAS [US]) [X] 1-14* Ansprüche 1-5; Beispiele 1-5 *; | [X]WO2007006766 (BASF AG [DE], et al) [X] 1-14 * Ansprüche 1-16, insbesondere Anspruch 14; Beispiele auf Seiten 13-26 *; | [X]WO2011009875 (BASF SE [DE], et al) [X] 1-14 * Ansprüche 1-17; Beispiele auf Seiten 20-36 * | by applicant | EP0022633 | EP0022633 | EP0073529 | EP0188325 | WO2007006766 | WO2011009875 | - STRAUSS ET AL., SURFACE COATINGS AUSTRALIA, (1987), vol. 24, no. 11, pages 6 - 15 | - C.J. MCDONALD; M.J. DEVON, ADVANCES IN COLLOID AND INTERFACE SCIENCE, vol. 99, no. 3, pages 181 - 213 |