EP2874993 - SUBSTITUTED AMINOINDANE- AND AMINOTETRALINECARBOXYLIC ACIDS AND USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2015/22] | SUBSTITUTED AMINOINDANE- AND AMINOTETRALINCARBOXYLIC ACIDS AND USE THEREOF | ||
[2016/09] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.06.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayer Pharma Aktiengesellschaft Müllerstrasse 178 13353 Berlin / DE | [2015/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HÜBSCH, Walter Wildsteig 22 42113 Wuppertal / DE | 02 /
HAHN, Michael Rietherbach 42D 40764 Langenfeld / DE | 03 /
VAKALOPOULOS, Alexandros Heinrich-Heine-Str. 79a 40721 Hilden / DE | 04 /
LI, Volkhart Min-Jian Im Wiesengrund 40 42553 Velbert / DE | 05 /
WUNDER, Frank Schwarzer Weg 251 42117 Wuppertal / DE | 06 /
STASCH, Johannes-Peter Alfred-Nobel-Str. 109 42651 Solingen / DE | 07 /
SCHLEMMER, Karl-Heinz Wildsteig 22a 42113 Wuppertal / DE | 08 /
STOLL, Friederike Remscheider Str. 22 40215 Düsseldorf / DE | 09 /
LINDNER, Niels Bodelschwinghweg 4 42115 Wuppertal / DE | 10 /
BECKER, Eva-Maria Düsseler Höhe 22 42327 Wuppertal / DE | [2015/22] | Representative(s) | BIP Patents c/o Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH Alfred-Nobel-Straße 50 40789 Monheim am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/34] | BIP Patents c/o Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH Alfred-Nobel-Straße 10 40789 Monheim am Rhein / DE | ||
Former [2015/22] | BIP Patents c/o Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH Creative Campus Monheim Alfred-Nobel-Straße 10 40789 Monheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 13737256.1 | 16.07.2013 | [2016/34] | WO2013EP65020 | Priority number, date | EP20120177283 | 20.07.2012 Original published format: EP 12177283 | [2015/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014012935 | Date: | 23.01.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2874993 | Date: | 27.05.2015 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.01.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2874993 | Date: | 24.08.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.01.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C07C229/50, C07C255/54, A61K45/06, A61K31/197, A61K31/277, A61K31/4015, A61K31/415, A61K31/421, A61K31/45, C07D231/12, C07D263/22, C07D207/27, C07D211/76 | [2015/22] | CPC: |
A61K31/45 (EP,US);
A61K31/197 (EP,US);
A61K31/24 (EP,US);
A61K31/277 (EP,US);
A61K31/4015 (EP,US);
A61K31/415 (EP,US);
A61K31/421 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61K9/0019 (EP,US);
A61K9/0095 (EP,US);
A61K9/2018 (EP,US);
A61K9/2059 (EP,US);
A61P13/12 (EP);
A61P7/10 (EP);
A61P9/04 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
A61P9/12 (EP);
C07C227/18 (US);
C07C229/50 (EP,US);
C07C255/54 (EP,US);
C07D207/27 (EP,US);
C07D211/76 (EP,US);
C07D231/12 (EP,US);
C07D263/22 (EP,US);
A61K9/08 (EP,US);
A61K9/10 (EP,US);
C07C2602/08 (EP,US);
C07C2602/10 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/197, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/24, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/277, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/4015, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/415, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/421, A61K2300/00 (EP,US); | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/22] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SUBSTITUIERTE AMINOINDAN- UND AMINOTETRALIN-CARBONSÄUREN UND IHRE VERWENDUNG | [2015/22] | English: | SUBSTITUTED AMINOINDANE- AND AMINOTETRALINECARBOXYLIC ACIDS AND USE THEREOF | [2016/09] | French: | ACIDES AMINOINDANE- ET AMINOTÉTRALINECARBOXYLIQUES SUBSTITUÉS ET LEUR UTILISATION | [2016/09] |
Former [2015/22] | SUBSTITUTED AMINOINDANE- AND AMINOTETRALINCARBOXYLIC ACIDS AND USE THEREOF | ||
Former [2015/22] | ACIDES AMINOINDANO- ET AMINOTÉTRALINOCARBOXYLIQUES SUBSTITUÉS ET LEUR UTILISATION | Entry into regional phase | 20.02.2015 | National basic fee paid | 20.02.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.02.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.02.2015 | Examination requested [2015/22] | 01.09.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.03.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.06.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 10.06.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.06.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.03.2016 | Opposition(s) | 26.05.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.07.2013 | AL | 24.08.2016 | CY | 24.08.2016 | CZ | 24.08.2016 | DK | 24.08.2016 | EE | 24.08.2016 | FI | 24.08.2016 | HR | 24.08.2016 | LT | 24.08.2016 | LV | 24.08.2016 | MC | 24.08.2016 | MK | 24.08.2016 | MT | 24.08.2016 | NL | 24.08.2016 | PL | 24.08.2016 | RO | 24.08.2016 | RS | 24.08.2016 | SE | 24.08.2016 | SI | 24.08.2016 | SK | 24.08.2016 | SM | 24.08.2016 | TR | 24.08.2016 | BG | 24.11.2016 | NO | 24.11.2016 | GR | 25.11.2016 | IS | 24.12.2016 | PT | 26.12.2016 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 16.07.2013 | |
AL | 24.08.2016 | ||
CY | 24.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2016 | ||
DK | 24.08.2016 | ||
EE | 24.08.2016 | ||
FI | 24.08.2016 | ||
HR | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LV | 24.08.2016 | ||
MC | 24.08.2016 | ||
MK | 24.08.2016 | ||
MT | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
PL | 24.08.2016 | ||
RO | 24.08.2016 | ||
RS | 24.08.2016 | ||
SE | 24.08.2016 | ||
SI | 24.08.2016 | ||
SK | 24.08.2016 | ||
SM | 24.08.2016 | ||
TR | 24.08.2016 | ||
BG | 24.11.2016 | ||
NO | 24.11.2016 | ||
GR | 25.11.2016 | ||
PT | 26.12.2016 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 16.07.2013 | |
AL | 24.08.2016 | ||
CY | 24.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2016 | ||
DK | 24.08.2016 | ||
EE | 24.08.2016 | ||
FI | 24.08.2016 | ||
HR | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LV | 24.08.2016 | ||
MC | 24.08.2016 | ||
MK | 24.08.2016 | ||
MT | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
PL | 24.08.2016 | ||
RO | 24.08.2016 | ||
RS | 24.08.2016 | ||
SE | 24.08.2016 | ||
SI | 24.08.2016 | ||
SK | 24.08.2016 | ||
SM | 24.08.2016 | ||
BG | 24.11.2016 | ||
NO | 24.11.2016 | ||
GR | 25.11.2016 | ||
PT | 26.12.2016 | ||
Former [2019/47] | HU | 16.07.2013 | |
AL | 24.08.2016 | ||
CY | 24.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2016 | ||
DK | 24.08.2016 | ||
EE | 24.08.2016 | ||
FI | 24.08.2016 | ||
HR | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LV | 24.08.2016 | ||
MC | 24.08.2016 | ||
MT | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
PL | 24.08.2016 | ||
RO | 24.08.2016 | ||
RS | 24.08.2016 | ||
SE | 24.08.2016 | ||
SI | 24.08.2016 | ||
SK | 24.08.2016 | ||
SM | 24.08.2016 | ||
BG | 24.11.2016 | ||
NO | 24.11.2016 | ||
GR | 25.11.2016 | ||
PT | 26.12.2016 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 16.07.2013 | |
AL | 24.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2016 | ||
DK | 24.08.2016 | ||
EE | 24.08.2016 | ||
FI | 24.08.2016 | ||
HR | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LV | 24.08.2016 | ||
MC | 24.08.2016 | ||
MT | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
PL | 24.08.2016 | ||
RO | 24.08.2016 | ||
RS | 24.08.2016 | ||
SE | 24.08.2016 | ||
SI | 24.08.2016 | ||
SK | 24.08.2016 | ||
SM | 24.08.2016 | ||
BG | 24.11.2016 | ||
NO | 24.11.2016 | ||
GR | 25.11.2016 | ||
PT | 26.12.2016 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AL | 24.08.2016 | |
CZ | 24.08.2016 | ||
DK | 24.08.2016 | ||
EE | 24.08.2016 | ||
FI | 24.08.2016 | ||
HR | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LV | 24.08.2016 | ||
MC | 24.08.2016 | ||
MT | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
PL | 24.08.2016 | ||
RO | 24.08.2016 | ||
RS | 24.08.2016 | ||
SE | 24.08.2016 | ||
SI | 24.08.2016 | ||
SK | 24.08.2016 | ||
SM | 24.08.2016 | ||
BG | 24.11.2016 | ||
NO | 24.11.2016 | ||
GR | 25.11.2016 | ||
PT | 26.12.2016 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 24.08.2016 | |
CZ | 24.08.2016 | ||
DK | 24.08.2016 | ||
EE | 24.08.2016 | ||
FI | 24.08.2016 | ||
HR | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LV | 24.08.2016 | ||
MT | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
PL | 24.08.2016 | ||
RO | 24.08.2016 | ||
RS | 24.08.2016 | ||
SE | 24.08.2016 | ||
SI | 24.08.2016 | ||
SK | 24.08.2016 | ||
SM | 24.08.2016 | ||
BG | 24.11.2016 | ||
NO | 24.11.2016 | ||
GR | 25.11.2016 | ||
PT | 26.12.2016 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CZ | 24.08.2016 | |
DK | 24.08.2016 | ||
EE | 24.08.2016 | ||
FI | 24.08.2016 | ||
HR | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LV | 24.08.2016 | ||
MT | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
PL | 24.08.2016 | ||
RO | 24.08.2016 | ||
RS | 24.08.2016 | ||
SE | 24.08.2016 | ||
SI | 24.08.2016 | ||
SK | 24.08.2016 | ||
SM | 24.08.2016 | ||
BG | 24.11.2016 | ||
NO | 24.11.2016 | ||
GR | 25.11.2016 | ||
PT | 26.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | CZ | 24.08.2016 | |
DK | 24.08.2016 | ||
EE | 24.08.2016 | ||
FI | 24.08.2016 | ||
HR | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LV | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
PL | 24.08.2016 | ||
RO | 24.08.2016 | ||
RS | 24.08.2016 | ||
SE | 24.08.2016 | ||
SI | 24.08.2016 | ||
SK | 24.08.2016 | ||
SM | 24.08.2016 | ||
BG | 24.11.2016 | ||
NO | 24.11.2016 | ||
GR | 25.11.2016 | ||
PT | 26.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/32] | CZ | 24.08.2016 | |
DK | 24.08.2016 | ||
EE | 24.08.2016 | ||
FI | 24.08.2016 | ||
HR | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LV | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
PL | 24.08.2016 | ||
RO | 24.08.2016 | ||
RS | 24.08.2016 | ||
SE | 24.08.2016 | ||
SK | 24.08.2016 | ||
SM | 24.08.2016 | ||
BG | 24.11.2016 | ||
NO | 24.11.2016 | ||
GR | 25.11.2016 | ||
PT | 26.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/13] | FI | 24.08.2016 | |
HR | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LV | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
RS | 24.08.2016 | ||
SE | 24.08.2016 | ||
NO | 24.11.2016 | ||
GR | 25.11.2016 | ||
PT | 26.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | FI | 24.08.2016 | |
HR | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
RS | 24.08.2016 | ||
SE | 24.08.2016 | ||
NO | 24.11.2016 | ||
GR | 25.11.2016 | ||
PT | 26.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | FI | 24.08.2016 | |
HR | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
RS | 24.08.2016 | ||
SE | 24.08.2016 | ||
NO | 24.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 24.08.2016 | |
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
NO | 24.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 24.08.2016 | Cited in | International search | [AD]WO0035882 (ASTRAZENECA UK LTD [GB], et al) [AD] 1-11* example -; claim - *; | [AD]WO0119780 (BAYER AG [DE], et al) [AD] 1-11 * example -; claim - *; | [AD]WO02070459 (BAYER AG [DE], et al) [AD] 1-11 * example -; claim - *; | [A]WO2011141409 (BAYER PHARMA AG [DE], et al) [A] 1-11 * the whole document * | by applicant | WO9518617 | WO0006568 | WO0006569 | WO0035882 | WO0119780 | WO0242301 | WO02070459 | WO02070460 | WO02070461 | WO02070462 | WO02070510 | WO03095451 | WO2006104826 | WO2011147809 | WO2012004258 | WO2012028647 | WO2012059549 | - O.V. EVGENOV ET AL., NATURE REV. DRUG DISC., (2006), vol. 5, page 755 | - J.P. STASCH ET AL., BR. J. PHARMACOL., (2002), vol. 136, page 773 | - J.P. STASCH ET AL., J. CLIN. INVEST., (2006), vol. 116, page 2552 | - R. TAKEUCHI; H. YASUE, J., ORG. CHEM., (1993), vol. 58, no. 20, pages 5386 - 5392 | - U. GERLACH; T. WOLLMANN, TETRAHEDRON LETT., (1992), vol. 33, no. 38, pages 5499 - 5502 | - R. TAKEUCHI; H. YASUE, J. ORG. CHEM, (1993), vol. 58, no. 20, pages 5386 - 5392 | - F. WUNDER ET AL., ANAL. BIOCHEM., (2005), vol. 339, pages 104 - 112 | - HÖNICKA ET AL., J. MOL. MED., (1999), vol. 77, pages 14 - 23 | - BITLER; MCELROY, ARCH. BIOCHEM. BIOPHYS., (1957), vol. 72, page 358 | - K. WITTE; K. HU; J. SWIATEK; C. MÜSSIG; G. ERTL; B. LEMMER, "Experimental heart failure in rats: effects on cardiovascular circadian rhythms and on myocardial ß-adrenergic signaling", CARDIO- VASC. RES, (2000), vol. 47, no. 2, pages 350 - 358 |