EP2868082 - ENCODING AND DECODING VIDEO SEQUENCES COMPRISING REFERENCE PICTURE SETS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.04.2017 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [2016/22] |
Former [2015/19] | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (PUBL) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STRÖM, Jacob Heleneborgsgatan 6c 2tr. S-117 32 Stockholm / SE | 02 /
SAMUELSSON, Jonatan Stadshagsplan 1 S-112 50 Stockholm / SE | 03 /
SJÖBERG, Rickard Robert Almströmsgatan 9a S-113 36 Stockholm / SE | [2015/19] | Representative(s) | Ericsson Patent Development Torshamnsgatan 21-23 164 80 Stockholm / SE | [2016/22] |
Former [2015/19] | Egrelius, Fredrik Ericsson AB Patent Unit Kista Device, Service & Media Torshamnsgatan 21-23 164 80 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 13737454.2 | 01.07.2013 | [2016/22] | WO2013SE50835 | Priority number, date | US201261666235P | 29.06.2012 Original published format: US 201261666235 P | [2015/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014003682 | Date: | 03.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2868082 | Date: | 06.05.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.01.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2868082 | Date: | 01.06.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.01.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H04N19/105, H04N19/176, H04N19/70, H04N19/463, H04N19/136, H04N19/174, H04N19/58 | [2016/10] | CPC: |
H04N19/58 (EP,RU,US);
H04N19/105 (EP,RU,US);
H04N19/136 (EP,RU,US);
H04N19/139 (US);
H04N19/174 (EP,RU,US);
H04N19/176 (EP,RU,US);
H04N19/463 (EP,RU,US);
H04N19/50 (RU);
H04N19/70 (EP,RU,US);
|
Former IPC [2015/19] | H04N7/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/19] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KODIERUNG UND DEKODIERUNG VON VIDEOSEQUENZEN DIE REFERENZBILDMENGEN UMFASSEN | [2016/10] | English: | ENCODING AND DECODING VIDEO SEQUENCES COMPRISING REFERENCE PICTURE SETS | [2015/19] | French: | CODAGE ET DÉCODAGE DE SÉQUENCES VIDÉO COMPRENANT DES ENSEMBLES D'IMAGES DE RÉFÉRENCE | [2015/19] |
Former [2015/19] | CODIERUNG UND DECODIERUNG VON VIDEOSEQUENZEN MIT REFERENZBILDSÄTZEN | Entry into regional phase | 23.12.2014 | National basic fee paid | 23.12.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.12.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.12.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.12.2014 | Examination requested [2015/19] | 22.07.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.08.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.11.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.11.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.03.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.04.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 25.04.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.04.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP16169607.5 / EP3079363 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.07.2015 | Opposition(s) | 02.03.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 01.07.2013 | AL | 01.06.2016 | AT | 01.06.2016 | BG | 01.06.2016 | CY | 01.06.2016 | EE | 01.06.2016 | HR | 01.06.2016 | LT | 01.06.2016 | LV | 01.06.2016 | MC | 01.06.2016 | MK | 01.06.2016 | PL | 01.06.2016 | RO | 01.06.2016 | RS | 01.06.2016 | SE | 01.06.2016 | SI | 01.06.2016 | SK | 01.06.2016 | SM | 01.06.2016 | LU | 01.07.2016 | MT | 31.07.2016 | NO | 01.09.2016 | GR | 02.09.2016 | IS | 01.10.2016 | PT | 03.10.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/38] | HU | 01.07.2013 | |
AT | 01.06.2016 | ||
BG | 01.06.2016 | ||
CY | 01.06.2016 | ||
EE | 01.06.2016 | ||
HR | 01.06.2016 | ||
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LV | 01.06.2016 | ||
MC | 01.06.2016 | ||
MK | 01.06.2016 | ||
PL | 01.06.2016 | ||
RO | 01.06.2016 | ||
RS | 01.06.2016 | ||
SE | 01.06.2016 | ||
SI | 01.06.2016 | ||
SK | 01.06.2016 | ||
SM | 01.06.2016 | ||
LU | 01.07.2016 | ||
MT | 31.07.2016 | ||
NO | 01.09.2016 | ||
GR | 02.09.2016 | ||
IS | 01.10.2016 | ||
PT | 03.10.2016 | ||
Former [2018/32] | HU | 01.07.2013 | |
AT | 01.06.2016 | ||
CY | 01.06.2016 | ||
EE | 01.06.2016 | ||
HR | 01.06.2016 | ||
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LV | 01.06.2016 | ||
MC | 01.06.2016 | ||
MK | 01.06.2016 | ||
PL | 01.06.2016 | ||
RO | 01.06.2016 | ||
RS | 01.06.2016 | ||
SE | 01.06.2016 | ||
SI | 01.06.2016 | ||
SK | 01.06.2016 | ||
SM | 01.06.2016 | ||
LU | 01.07.2016 | ||
MT | 31.07.2016 | ||
NO | 01.09.2016 | ||
GR | 02.09.2016 | ||
IS | 01.10.2016 | ||
PT | 03.10.2016 | ||
Former [2018/30] | HU | 01.07.2013 | |
AT | 01.06.2016 | ||
CY | 01.06.2016 | ||
EE | 01.06.2016 | ||
HR | 01.06.2016 | ||
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LV | 01.06.2016 | ||
MC | 01.06.2016 | ||
MK | 01.06.2016 | ||
PL | 01.06.2016 | ||
RO | 01.06.2016 | ||
RS | 01.06.2016 | ||
SE | 01.06.2016 | ||
SI | 01.06.2016 | ||
SK | 01.06.2016 | ||
SM | 01.06.2016 | ||
LU | 01.07.2016 | ||
NO | 01.09.2016 | ||
GR | 02.09.2016 | ||
IS | 01.10.2016 | ||
PT | 03.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 01.06.2016 | |
EE | 01.06.2016 | ||
HR | 01.06.2016 | ||
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LV | 01.06.2016 | ||
MC | 01.06.2016 | ||
PL | 01.06.2016 | ||
RO | 01.06.2016 | ||
RS | 01.06.2016 | ||
SE | 01.06.2016 | ||
SI | 01.06.2016 | ||
SK | 01.06.2016 | ||
SM | 01.06.2016 | ||
LU | 01.07.2016 | ||
NO | 01.09.2016 | ||
GR | 02.09.2016 | ||
IS | 01.10.2016 | ||
PT | 03.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/23] | AT | 01.06.2016 | |
EE | 01.06.2016 | ||
HR | 01.06.2016 | ||
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LV | 01.06.2016 | ||
MC | 01.06.2016 | ||
PL | 01.06.2016 | ||
RO | 01.06.2016 | ||
RS | 01.06.2016 | ||
SE | 01.06.2016 | ||
SI | 01.06.2016 | ||
SK | 01.06.2016 | ||
SM | 01.06.2016 | ||
NO | 01.09.2016 | ||
GR | 02.09.2016 | ||
IS | 01.10.2016 | ||
PT | 03.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/18] | AT | 01.06.2016 | |
EE | 01.06.2016 | ||
HR | 01.06.2016 | ||
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LV | 01.06.2016 | ||
MC | 01.06.2016 | ||
PL | 01.06.2016 | ||
RO | 01.06.2016 | ||
RS | 01.06.2016 | ||
SE | 01.06.2016 | ||
SK | 01.06.2016 | ||
SM | 01.06.2016 | ||
NO | 01.09.2016 | ||
GR | 02.09.2016 | ||
IS | 01.10.2016 | ||
PT | 03.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 01.06.2016 | |
EE | 01.06.2016 | ||
HR | 01.06.2016 | ||
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LV | 01.06.2016 | ||
PL | 01.06.2016 | ||
RO | 01.06.2016 | ||
RS | 01.06.2016 | ||
SE | 01.06.2016 | ||
SK | 01.06.2016 | ||
SM | 01.06.2016 | ||
NO | 01.09.2016 | ||
GR | 02.09.2016 | ||
IS | 01.10.2016 | ||
PT | 03.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | EE | 01.06.2016 | |
HR | 01.06.2016 | ||
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LV | 01.06.2016 | ||
PL | 01.06.2016 | ||
RO | 01.06.2016 | ||
RS | 01.06.2016 | ||
SE | 01.06.2016 | ||
SK | 01.06.2016 | ||
NO | 01.09.2016 | ||
GR | 02.09.2016 | ||
IS | 01.10.2016 | ||
Former [2016/52] | HR | 01.06.2016 | |
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LV | 01.06.2016 | ||
RS | 01.06.2016 | ||
SE | 01.06.2016 | ||
NO | 01.09.2016 | ||
GR | 02.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | HR | 01.06.2016 | |
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LV | 01.06.2016 | ||
RS | 01.06.2016 | ||
NO | 01.09.2016 | ||
GR | 02.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | HR | 01.06.2016 | |
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LV | 01.06.2016 | ||
RS | 01.06.2016 | ||
NO | 01.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | LT | 01.06.2016 | |
NO | 01.09.2016 | Cited in | International search | [I] - FLYNN D ET AL, "JCT-VC AHG report: Reference picture buffering and list construction (AHG21)", 7. JCT-VC MEETING; 98. MPEG MEETING; 21-11-2011 - 30-11-2011; GENEVA; (JOINT COLLABORATIVE TEAM ON VIDEO CODING OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16 ); URL: HTTP://WFTP3.ITU.INT/AV-ARCH/JCTVC-SITE/,, (20111121), no. JCTVC-G021, XP030110020 [I] 1-32 * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [3.2.1] * * paragraph [3.2.3] - paragraph [3.2.5] * | [I] - HANNUKSELA M M ET AL, "AHG21: Removal of reference picture list modification", 8. JCT-VC MEETING; 99. MPEG MEETING; 1-2-2012 - 10-2-2012; SAN JOSE; (JOINT COLLABORATIVE TEAM ON VIDEO CODING OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16 ); URL: HTTP://WFTP3.ITU.INT/AV-ARCH/JCTVC-SITE/,, (20120120), no. JCTVC-H0426, XP030111453 [I] 1-32 * page 8 - page 9 * * figure 2 * | [I] - QIU SHEN ET AL, "Buffer requirement analysis and reference picture marking for temporal scalable video coding", PACKET VIDEO 2007, IEEE, PI, (20071101), ISBN 978-1-4244-0980-8, pages 91 - 97, XP031170603 [I] 1-32 * paragraph [000I] - paragraph [00IV] * * tables I-IX * * figure 1 * | [I] - SJÖBERG R ET AL, "Absolute signaling of reference pictures", 6. JCT-VC MEETING; 97. MPEG MEETING; 14-7-2011 - 22-7-2011; TORINO; (JOINT COLLABORATIVE TEAM ON VIDEO CODING OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16 ); URL: HTTP://WFTP3.ITU.INT/AV-ARCH/JCTVC-SITE/,, (20110722), no. JCTVC-F493, XP030009516 [I] 1-32 * page 5 - page 7 * * paragraph [1.1.2] * * paragraph [0003] * * figures 3-5 * * abstract * * table 1 * | [I] - ZHAO J ET AL, "AHG21: Parameterized RPS Models", 8. JCT-VC MEETING; 99. MPEG MEETING; 1-2-2012 - 10-2-2012; SAN JOSE; (JOINT COLLABORATIVE TEAM ON VIDEO CODING OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16 ); URL: HTTP://WFTP3.ITU.INT/AV-ARCH/JCTVC-SITE/,, (20120121), no. JCTVC-H0551, XP030111578 [I] 1-32 * paragraph [0002] * * table 2 * | [I] - ZHAO J ET AL, "AHG15: Parameterized RPS Models", 9. JCT-VC MEETING; 100. MPEG MEETING; 27-4-2012 - 7-5-2012; GENEVA; (JOINT COLLABORATIVE TEAM ON VIDEO CODING OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16 ); URL: HTTP://WFTP3.ITU.INT/AV-ARCH/JCTVC-SITE/,, (20120417), no. JCTVC-I0388, XP030112151 [I] 1-32 * paragraph [0002] * * table 2 * |