EP2873244 - CODING TIMING INFORMATION FOR VIDEO CODING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.11.2018 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.12.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.11.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.09.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.05.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.03.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Qualcomm Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | [2015/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Ye-Kui 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | [2015/21] | Representative(s) | Bentall, Mark James Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [2018/01] |
Former [2015/21] | Bentall, Mark James Reddie & Grose LLP 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 13737978.0 | 08.07.2013 | [2018/01] | WO2013US49614 | Priority number, date | US201261670066P | 10.07.2012 Original published format: US 201261670066 P | US201313802045 | 13.03.2013 Original published format: US201313802045 | [2015/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014011570 | Date: | 16.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2873244 | Date: | 20.05.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.01.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2873244 | Date: | 03.01.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.01.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H04N19/70, H04N19/46, H04N19/31, H04N19/573 | [2015/21] | CPC: |
H04N19/70 (EP,IL,KR,RU,US);
H04N19/31 (EP,IL,KR,RU,US);
H04N19/50 (KR,RU,US);
H04N19/146 (KR);
H04N19/44 (KR,RU);
H04N19/46 (EP,IL,KR,RU,US);
H04N19/573 (EP,IL,RU,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/21] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | CODIERZEITINFORMATIONEN ZUR VIDEOCODIERUNG | [2015/21] | English: | CODING TIMING INFORMATION FOR VIDEO CODING | [2015/21] | French: | CODAGE D'INFORMATIONS TEMPORELLES DESTINÉ À UN CODAGE VIDÉO | [2015/21] | Entry into regional phase | 10.02.2015 | National basic fee paid | 10.02.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.02.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.05.2014 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 10.02.2015 | Examination requested [2015/21] | 02.09.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.03.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.07.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.11.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.03.2017 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 15.05.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.09.2017 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 25.09.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 25.09.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.11.2017 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 24.11.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.03.2016 | Opposition(s) | 05.10.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 03.01.2018 | CY | 03.01.2018 | CZ | 03.01.2018 | EE | 03.01.2018 | HR | 03.01.2018 | LT | 03.01.2018 | LV | 03.01.2018 | MC | 03.01.2018 | MK | 03.01.2018 | PL | 03.01.2018 | PT | 03.01.2018 | RO | 03.01.2018 | RS | 03.01.2018 | SK | 03.01.2018 | SM | 03.01.2018 | BG | 03.04.2018 | IS | 03.05.2018 | LU | 08.07.2018 | MT | 08.07.2018 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/28] | AL | 03.01.2018 | |
CY | 03.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.01.2018 | ||
EE | 03.01.2018 | ||
HR | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LV | 03.01.2018 | ||
MC | 03.01.2018 | ||
PL | 03.01.2018 | ||
PT | 03.01.2018 | ||
RO | 03.01.2018 | ||
RS | 03.01.2018 | ||
SK | 03.01.2018 | ||
SM | 03.01.2018 | ||
BG | 03.04.2018 | ||
IS | 03.05.2018 | ||
LU | 08.07.2018 | ||
MT | 08.07.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 03.01.2018 | |
CY | 03.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.01.2018 | ||
EE | 03.01.2018 | ||
HR | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LV | 03.01.2018 | ||
MC | 03.01.2018 | ||
PL | 03.01.2018 | ||
RO | 03.01.2018 | ||
RS | 03.01.2018 | ||
SK | 03.01.2018 | ||
SM | 03.01.2018 | ||
BG | 03.04.2018 | ||
IS | 03.05.2018 | ||
LU | 08.07.2018 | ||
MT | 08.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/17] | AL | 03.01.2018 | |
CY | 03.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.01.2018 | ||
EE | 03.01.2018 | ||
HR | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LV | 03.01.2018 | ||
MC | 03.01.2018 | ||
PL | 03.01.2018 | ||
RO | 03.01.2018 | ||
RS | 03.01.2018 | ||
SK | 03.01.2018 | ||
SM | 03.01.2018 | ||
BG | 03.04.2018 | ||
IS | 03.05.2018 | ||
LU | 08.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/15] | AL | 03.01.2018 | |
CY | 03.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.01.2018 | ||
EE | 03.01.2018 | ||
HR | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LV | 03.01.2018 | ||
MC | 03.01.2018 | ||
PL | 03.01.2018 | ||
RO | 03.01.2018 | ||
RS | 03.01.2018 | ||
SK | 03.01.2018 | ||
SM | 03.01.2018 | ||
BG | 03.04.2018 | ||
IS | 03.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AL | 03.01.2018 | |
CY | 03.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.01.2018 | ||
EE | 03.01.2018 | ||
HR | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LV | 03.01.2018 | ||
PL | 03.01.2018 | ||
RO | 03.01.2018 | ||
RS | 03.01.2018 | ||
SK | 03.01.2018 | ||
SM | 03.01.2018 | ||
BG | 03.04.2018 | ||
IS | 03.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AL | 03.01.2018 | |
CY | 03.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.01.2018 | ||
EE | 03.01.2018 | ||
HR | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LV | 03.01.2018 | ||
PL | 03.01.2018 | ||
RO | 03.01.2018 | ||
RS | 03.01.2018 | ||
SK | 03.01.2018 | ||
BG | 03.04.2018 | ||
IS | 03.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | AL | 03.01.2018 | |
CY | 03.01.2018 | ||
EE | 03.01.2018 | ||
HR | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LV | 03.01.2018 | ||
PL | 03.01.2018 | ||
RO | 03.01.2018 | ||
RS | 03.01.2018 | ||
BG | 03.04.2018 | ||
IS | 03.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 03.01.2018 | |
CY | 03.01.2018 | ||
HR | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LV | 03.01.2018 | ||
PL | 03.01.2018 | ||
RS | 03.01.2018 | ||
BG | 03.04.2018 | ||
IS | 03.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/41] | CY | 03.01.2018 | |
HR | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LV | 03.01.2018 | ||
PL | 03.01.2018 | ||
RS | 03.01.2018 | ||
BG | 03.04.2018 | ||
IS | 03.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | CY | 03.01.2018 | |
HR | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LV | 03.01.2018 | ||
PL | 03.01.2018 | ||
RS | 03.01.2018 | ||
IS | 03.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/36] | CY | 03.01.2018 | |
HR | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
PL | 03.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | CY | 03.01.2018 | |
HR | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | Cited in | International search | [A] - HAQUE M ET AL, "Simplifications of HRD parameters for Temporal Scalability", 10. JCT-VC MEETING; 101. MPEG MEETING; 11-7-2012 - 20-7-2012; STOCKHOLM; (JOINT COLLABORATIVE TEAM ON VIDEO CODING OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16 ); URL: HTTP://WFTP3.ITU.INT/AV-ARCH/JCTVC-SITE/,, (20120703), no. JCTVC-J0272, XP030112634 [A] 1-49 * the whole document * | [A] - BROSS (HHI) B, "Suggested bug-fixes for HEVC text specification draft 6", 100. MPEG MEETING; 30-4-2012 - 4-5-2012; GENEVA; (MOTION PICTURE EXPERT GROUP OR ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11),, (20120427), no. m24021, XP030052546 [A] 1-49 * page 249 * | [XP] - Y-K WANG (QUALCOMM), "AHG9: On fixed_pic_rate_flag", 10. JCT-VC MEETING; 101. MPEG MEETING; 11-7-2012 - 20-7-2012; STOCKHOLM; (JOINT COLLABORATIVE TEAM ON VIDEO CODING OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16 ); URL: HTTP://WFTP3.ITU.INT/AV-ARCH/JCTVC-SITE/,, (20120715), no. JCTVC-J0570, XP030112932 [XP] 1-49 * the whole document * |