EP2806392 - INFORMATION PROCESSING METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR NETWORK TRADING PLATFORM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.09.2016 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.09.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.10.2016 [2016/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states eFuture (Beijing) Royalstone Information Technology Inc. 8/F Building 2 Topnew Tower 15 Guanghua Road Chaoyang District Beijing 100026 / CN | [2014/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAN, Yanchun 8/F Building 2 Topnew Tower 15 Guanghua Road Chaoyang District Beijing 100026 / CN | [2014/48] | Representative(s) | Wächter, Jochen, et al Kroher-Strobel Rechts- und Patentanwälte PartmbB Bavariaring 20 80336 München / DE | [2014/48] | Application number, filing date | 13738231.3 | 18.01.2013 | WO2013CN70665 | Priority number, date | CN2012119291 | 20.01.2012 Original published format: CN201210019291 | [2014/48] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013107376 | Date: | 25.07.2013 | Language: | ZH | [2013/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2806392 | Date: | 26.11.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 25.07.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.07.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q30/06, G06Q30/02 | [2015/33] | CPC: |
G06Q30/0202 (EP,US);
G06Q30/02 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2014/48] | G06Q30/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/48] | Title | German: | INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN UND --SYSTEM FÜR EINE NETZWERKHANDELSPLATTFORM | [2014/48] | English: | INFORMATION PROCESSING METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR NETWORK TRADING PLATFORM | [2014/48] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATIONS DESTINÉS À UNE PLATEFORME DE COMMERCE EN RÉSEAU | [2014/48] | Entry into regional phase | 12.08.2014 | Translation filed | 12.08.2014 | National basic fee paid | 12.08.2014 | Search fee paid | 12.08.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.08.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.08.2014 | Examination requested [2014/48] | 29.01.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.04.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/43] | 31.05.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the invitation to file a copy of earlier search results or a statement of non-availability not received in time [2016/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO0210984 (TRIPLEHOP TECHNOLOGIES INC [US], et al) [I] 1-15* the whole document * | International search | [A]WO0210984 (TRIPLEHOP TECHNOLOGIES INC [US], et al); | [X]CN101073094 (LYHOO INC [US]); | [A]US7308356 (MELAKU MAKONNEN [US], et al); | [A]US2011125770 (BATTESTINI AGATHE [US], et al) |