EP2805978 - ACTIVE ENERGY BEAM-CURABLE WATER-BASED RESIN COMPOSITION, ACTIVE ENERGY BEAM-CURABLE WATER-BASED COATING AND ARTICLE COATED WITH COATING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.04.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.07.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.04.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.05.2021 [2021/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DIC Corporation 35-58, Sakashita 3-chome Itabashi-ku Tokyo 174-8520 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2014/48] | For all designated states DIC Corporation 35-58, Sakashita 3-chome Itabashi-ku Tokyo 174-8520 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MIYAKE Masahiro c/o DIC Corporation Sakai Plant 3 Takasago 1-chome Takaishi-shi Osaka 592-0001 / JP | 02 /
MUKAI Takashi c/o DIC Corporation Sakai Plant 3 Takasago 1-chome Takaishi-shi Osaka 592-0001 / JP | [2014/48] | Representative(s) | Beckmann, Claus, et al Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [2014/48] | Application number, filing date | 13738337.8 | 10.01.2013 | WO2013JP50291 | Priority number, date | JP20120007025 | 17.01.2012 Original published format: JP 2012007025 | [2014/48] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013108707 | Date: | 25.07.2013 | Language: | JA | [2013/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2805978 | Date: | 26.11.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 25.07.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.07.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C09D4/06, C08G18/67, C09D5/02, C09D133/14, C08G18/62, C08G18/75, C09D133/06, C09D175/16, C09D133/10 | [2020/31] | CPC: |
C09D5/02 (EP,KR,US);
C08G18/67 (KR);
C08G18/6229 (EP,CN,US);
C09D133/10 (US);
C08G18/6254 (CN);
C08G18/673 (EP,CN,US);
C08G18/73 (CN);
C08G18/755 (EP,CN,US);
C08G18/758 (EP,CN,US);
C08L75/04 (KR);
C08L75/06 (KR);
C09D133/066 (EP,US);
C09D133/14 (EP,KR,US);
C09D175/06 (KR);
C09D175/16 (EP,CN,US);
C09D4/00 (KR);
C09D4/06 (EP,US);
C09D5/00 (KR);
| C-Set: |
C08G18/673, C08G18/62 (EP);
C09D133/066, C08L75/04 (EP,US) |
Former IPC [2015/34] | C08G18/67, C09D5/02, C09D133/14, C08G18/62, C08G18/75, C09D133/06, C09D175/16, C09D133/10 | ||
Former IPC [2014/48] | C08G18/67, C09D5/02, C09D133/14 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/48] | Title | German: | DURCH AKTIVENERGIESTRAHLEN HÄRTBARE WÄSSRIGE HARZZUSAMMENSETZUNG, DURCH AKTIVENERGIESTRAHLEN HÄRTBARE WÄSSRIGE BESCHICHTUNG UND MIT DER BESCHICHTUNG BESCHICHTETER ARTIKEL | [2014/48] | English: | ACTIVE ENERGY BEAM-CURABLE WATER-BASED RESIN COMPOSITION, ACTIVE ENERGY BEAM-CURABLE WATER-BASED COATING AND ARTICLE COATED WITH COATING | [2014/48] | French: | COMPOSITION DE RÉSINE À BASE D'EAU DURCISSABLE PAR UN FAISCEAU D'ÉNERGIE ACTIVE, REVÊTEMENT À BASE D'EAU DURCISSABLE PAR UN FAISCEAU D'ÉNERGIE ACTIVE ET ARTICLE REVÊTU DU REVÊTEMENT | [2014/48] | Entry into regional phase | 16.05.2014 | Translation filed | 16.05.2014 | National basic fee paid | 16.05.2014 | Search fee paid | 16.05.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.05.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.05.2014 | Examination requested [2014/48] | 18.01.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.12.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.03.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.06.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.07.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.12.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/18] | 23.12.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2021/18] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.12.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP1002817 (SHOWA DENKO KK [JP]) [X] 8 * paragraphs [0001] , [00 7] , [0 21] , [0 27] , [0 73]; example 1; claim - * [A] 1-7; | [XA]JP2002216845 (NIPPON SYNTHETIC CHEM IND) [X] 8 * paragraphs [0001] , [0 20] , [0 24] , [0 27]; example 1 *[A] 1-7; | [XA]US2003069353 (SUGANUMA HAJIME [JP], et al) [X] 8 * paragraphs [0001] , [0 16] - [0017] - [0 20] , [0 56] , [0 61] - [0062]; example -; claim - * [A] 1-7; | [X]WO2006137569 (NIPPON PAINT CO LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1-8 * page 1, lines 7-8 * * page 3, lines 26-30 * * page 11, line 20 - page 12, line 27 * * examples 1-5; claim - * | International search | [A]JPH03250014 (MITSUBISHI CHEM IND); | [A]JPH05271384 (OLIN CORP.); | [A]JP2002270235 (NISSHIN SPINNING); | [A]JP2003064149 (DAINIPPON INK & CHEMICALS); | [A]JP2004244435 (MITSUBISHI CHEM CORP); | [X]JP2007002048 (NIPPON PAINT CO LTD, et al); | [A]JP2008156659 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD); | [AP]JP2012214759 (DAIKIN IND LTD) | by applicant | JP2004010779 | WO2008056569 |