EP2804625 - METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR EXPANDING IMMUNOSUPPRESSIVE T REGULATORY CELLS IN VITRO AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.08.2017 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.08.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.09.2017 [2017/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Northeastern University 360 Huntington Avenue 900RP Boston, Massachusetts 02115 / US | [2014/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SITKOVSKY, Michail 85 East India Row Unit 24B Boston Massachusetts 02110 / US | 02 /
OHTA, Akio 22 Glazer Road Newton Massachusetts 02459 / US | 03 /
OHTA, Akiko 22 Glazer Road Newton Massachusetts 02459 / US | [2014/48] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Micaela Nadia, et al Modiano & Partners Thierschstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | [2014/48] | Application number, filing date | 13738627.2 | 17.01.2013 | WO2013US21948 | Priority number, date | US201261587329P | 17.01.2012 Original published format: US 201261587329 P | [2014/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013109759 | Date: | 25.07.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2804625 | Date: | 26.11.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.07.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 25.07.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.09.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/00, A61K35/17, C12N5/0783, A61K35/12 | [2015/22] | CPC: |
C12N5/0637 (EP,US);
A61K35/17 (US);
A61K39/4611 (EP);
A61K39/4621 (EP);
A61K39/46433 (EP);
A61K39/46434 (EP);
A61K2035/122 (EP,US);
A61K2039/5158 (US);
C12N2500/02 (EP,US);
C12N2501/01 (EP,US);
C12N2501/2302 (EP,US);
C12N2501/51 (EP,US);
C12N2501/515 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2014/48] | A61K39/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/48] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUR EXPANSION VON IMMUNSUPPRESSIVEN REGULATORISCHEN T-ZELLEN IN VITRO UND VERWENDUNGEN DAVON | [2014/48] | English: | METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR EXPANDING IMMUNOSUPPRESSIVE T REGULATORY CELLS IN VITRO AND USES THEREOF | [2014/48] | French: | MÉTHODES ET COMPOSITIONS DE DÉVELOPPEMENT IN VITRO DE LYMPHOCYTES T RÉGULATEURS IMMUNOSUPPRESSEURS ET UTILISATIONS DE CELLES-CI | [2014/48] | Entry into regional phase | 12.08.2014 | National basic fee paid | 12.08.2014 | Search fee paid | 12.08.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.08.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.08.2014 | Examination requested [2014/48] | 25.04.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.11.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.04.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/38] | 15.05.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/38] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.11.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2017 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2010178299 (SITKOVSKY MICHAIL V [US], et al) [X] 8-12 * paragraphs [0119] , [0252]; table 1 *; | [Y]WO2011126806 (UNIV PENNSYLVANIA [US], et al) [Y] 1-7,13-15 * claims 1,6,8,12,21-23 *; | [X] - K.S. CARSWELL ET AL, "Low oxygen tension enhances the stimulation and proliferation of human T lymphocytes in the presence of IL-2", CYTOTHERAPY, (20000101), vol. 2, no. 1, doi:10.1080/146532400539026, ISSN 1465-3249, pages 25 - 37, XP055184483 [X] 1-7,13-15 * page 26, column 2, paragraph 2; figures 1,3,4; tables 1,3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1080/146532400539026 | [Y] - GODFREY WAYNE R ET AL, "In vitro-expanded human CD4+CD25+ T-regulatory cells can markedly inhibit allogeneic dendritic cell-stimulated MLR cultures", BLOOD, AMERICAN SOCIETY OF HEMATOLOGY, US, (20040715), vol. 104, no. 2, doi:10.1182/BLOOD-2004-01-0151, ISSN 0006-4971, pages 453 - 461, XP002457226 [Y] 1-7,13-15 * page 454, column 1, paragraph 1; figure 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1182/blood-2004-01-0151 | [Y] - JEREMY BEN-SHOSHAN ET AL, "Hypoxia controls CD4+CD25+ regulatory T-cell homeostasis via hypoxia-inducible factor-1[alpha]", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, (20080912), vol. 38, no. 9, doi:10.1002/eji.200838318, ISSN 0014-2980, pages 2412 - 2418, XP055184473 [Y] 1-7,13-15 * page 2413, paragraph 2; figures 1-2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/eji.200838318 | [Y] - J. S. BOOMER ET AL, "An Enigmatic Tail of CD28 Signaling", COLD SPRING HARBOR PERSPECTIVES IN BIOLOGY, (20100609), vol. 2, no. 8, doi:10.1101/cshperspect.a002436, pages a002436 - a002436, XP055184340 [Y] 1-7,13-15 * page 10, column 2, paragraph 2; figures 1-3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1101/cshperspect.a002436 | [X] - SITKOVSKY M V ET AL, "Physiological control of immune response and inflammatory tissue damage by hypoxia-inducible factors and adenosine A2A receptors", ANNUAL REVIEW OF IMMUNOLOGY, ANNUAL REVIEWS INC, US, vol. 22, doi:10.1146/ANNUREV.IMMUNOL.22.012703.104731, ISSN 0732-0582, (20040401), pages 657 - 682,V, (20031212), XP002579776 [X] 8-12 * page 663, column 1, paragraph 2; figure 4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1146/ANNUREV.IMMUNOL.22.012703.104731 | [I] - SITKOVSKY ET AL, "T regulatory cells: hypoxia-adenosinergic suppression and re-direction of the immune response", TRENDS IN IMMUNOLOGY, ELSEVIER LTD. * TRENDS JOURNALS, GB, vol. 30, no. 3, doi:10.1016/J.IT.2008.12.002, ISSN 1471-4906, (20090301), pages 102 - 108, (20090207), XP026002067 [I] 8-12 * page 103, column 1, paragraph 2; figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.it.2008.12.002 | [X] - ALEXANDER CHOUKER ET AL, MOLECULAR MEDICINE, (20080101), vol. 14, no. 3-4, doi:10.2119/2007-00075.Chouker, ISSN 1076-1551, page 1, XP055184264 [X] 8-12 * page 117, column 2, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2119/2007-00075.Chouker | International search | [Y]US2006292164 (HORWITZ DAVID A [US]); | [X]US2010178299 (SITKOVSKY MICHAIL V [US], et al); | [A] - ZHENG ET AL., "IL-2 is Essential for TGF-beta to Convert Naive CD4+CD25- Cells to CD25 +Foxp3+ Regulatory T Cells for Expansion of These Cells", THE JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, (20070215), vol. 178, no. 4, pages 2018 - 2027, XP002646457 | [A] - MAHIC ET AL., "Differentiation of Naive CD4+ T cells into CD4+CD25+FOXP3+ Regulator T Cells by Continuous Antigen Stimulation", JOURNAL OF LEUKOCYTE BIOLOGY, (20080501), vol. 83, pages 1111 - 1117, XP055055463 |