EP2806262 - STRUCTURED ILLUMINATION DEVICE, STRUCTURED ILLUMINATION MICROSCOPE DEVICE, AND STRUCTURED ILLUMINATION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 16.04.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.04.2021 | New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings | 16.04.2021 | Withdrawal of application | published on 19.05.2021 [2021/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nikon Corporation 15-3, Konan 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-6290 / JP | [2015/36] |
Former [2014/48] | For all designated states Nikon Corporation 12-1 Yurakucho 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo100-8331 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OUCHI, Yumiko C/O NIKON CORPORATION 12-1 Yurakucho 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8331 / JP | 02 /
TAKASAGO, Kazuhiro C/O NIKON CORPORATION 12-1 Yurakucho 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8331 / JP | 03 /
NAKAYAMA, Hiroaki C/O NIKON CORPORATION 12-1 Yurakucho 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8331 / JP | [2014/48] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2014/48] | Application number, filing date | 13739110.8 | 17.01.2013 | WO2013JP00207 | Priority number, date | JP20120008100 | 18.01.2012 Original published format: JP 2012008100 | JP20120238077 | 29.10.2012 Original published format: JP 2012238077 | [2014/48] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013108626 | Date: | 25.07.2013 | Language: | JA | [2013/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2806262 | Date: | 26.11.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 25.07.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.08.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/01, G01N21/27, G01N21/64, G02B21/00, G02B21/36, G02B27/58 | [2015/39] | CPC: |
G02B21/0032 (EP,US);
G02B21/06 (US);
G01N21/6458 (EP,US);
G01N21/648 (EP,US);
G02B21/0076 (EP,US);
G02B21/367 (EP,US);
G02B27/58 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2014/48] | G01N21/01, G01N21/27, G01N21/64, G02B21/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/48] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG FÜR STRUKTURIERTE BELEUCHTUNG, MIKROSKOPVORRICHTUNG MIT STRUKTURIERTER BELEUCHTUNG SOWIE VERFAHREN FÜR STRUKTURIERTE BELEUCHTUNG | [2014/48] | English: | STRUCTURED ILLUMINATION DEVICE, STRUCTURED ILLUMINATION MICROSCOPE DEVICE, AND STRUCTURED ILLUMINATION METHOD | [2014/48] | French: | DISPOSITIF STRUCTURÉ D'ÉCLAIRAGE, DISPOSITIF STRUCTURÉ DE MICROSCOPE À ÉCLAIRAGE, ET PROCÉDÉ STRUCTURÉ D'ÉCLAIRAGE | [2014/48] | Entry into regional phase | 14.08.2014 | Translation filed | 14.08.2014 | National basic fee paid | 14.08.2014 | Search fee paid | 14.08.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.08.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.08.2014 | Examination requested [2014/48] | 16.03.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.05.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.11.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.07.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.10.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.04.2021 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2021/20] | 15.04.2021 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 09.11.2021 | 09.11.2021 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.05.2019 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE10155002 (ZEISS CARL JENA GMBH [DE]) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [X]EP1617259 (ZEISS CARL JENA GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,4,15,30 * abstract * * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0023] *; | [Y]EP1617271 (ZEISS CARL JENA GMBH [DE]) [Y] 4* the whole document *; | [X]JP2007199571 (NIKON CORP) [X] 1 * abstract *; | [XAYI]US2009168158 (SCHWERTNER MICHAEL [DE], et al) [X] 1,6,8-11,14,15,26,29-31 * the whole document * [A] 3,5,12,13,19-25,27,28 [Y] 4 [I] 2,7,16-18; | [E]WO2014017067 (NIKON CORP [JP]) [E] 1,2,5-16,26-31 * the whole document * | International search | [A]JPH11242189 (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO); | [A]JP2006268004 (NIKON CORP); | [A]WO2007043382 (NIKON CORP [JP], et al); | [A]JP2009063666 (OLYMPUS CORP); | [A]JP2009098215 (NIKON CORP); | [X]WO2011135819 (NIKON CORP [JP], et al) | by applicant | US6239909 | US8115806 |