EP2855427 - METHOD FOR PREPARING NITROGEN COMPOUNDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.02.2018 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.03.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Commissariat à l'Énergie Atomique et aux Énergies Alternatives 25, Rue Leblanc Bâtiment "Le Ponant D" 75015 Paris / FR | [2017/16] |
Former [2015/15] | For all designated states Commissariat à l'Énergie Atomique et aux Énergies Alternatives 25, rue Leblanc Bâtiment "Le Ponant D" 75015 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CANTAT, Thibault 150 avenue de Verdun F-92130 Issy Les Moulineaux / FR | 02 /
GOMES, Christophe 42 rue Prosper Legouté F-92160 Antony / FR | 03 /
JACQUET, Olivier 10 rue Alexandre Dumas F-91400 Orsay / FR | [2015/15] | Representative(s) | Gevers & Orès Immeuble le Palatin 2 3 Cours du Triangle CS 80165 92939 Paris La Défense Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2017/16] | Gevers & Orès 41 avenue de Friedland 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2015/15] | Majidi, Assieh, et al Cabinet Orès 36, rue de Saint-Pétersbourg 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 13739803.8 | 04.06.2013 | [2017/16] | WO2013IB54601 | Priority number, date | FR20120055238 | 05.06.2012 Original published format: FR 1255238 | [2015/15] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013182993 | Date: | 12.12.2013 | Language: | FR | [2013/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2855427 | Date: | 08.04.2015 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.12.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2855427 | Date: | 19.04.2017 | Language: | FR | [2017/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.12.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C07C257/12, C07C235/02, C07C235/06, C07D239/70, C07D239/74, C07D239/88, C07D263/56, C07D471/04, C07D473/00 | [2015/15] | CPC: |
C07D239/88 (EP,US);
C07C257/12 (EP,US);
C07D235/02 (EP,US);
C07D235/06 (EP,US);
C07D239/70 (EP,US);
C07D239/74 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON STICKSTOFFVERBINDUNGEN | [2015/15] | English: | METHOD FOR PREPARING NITROGEN COMPOUNDS | [2015/15] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION DE COMPOSÉS AZOTÉS | [2015/15] | Entry into regional phase | 17.12.2014 | National basic fee paid | 17.12.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.12.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.12.2014 | Examination requested [2015/15] | 20.07.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.12.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.03.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 13.03.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.03.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.12.2016 | Opposition(s) | 22.01.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.06.2013 | AL | 19.04.2017 | AT | 19.04.2017 | CY | 19.04.2017 | CZ | 19.04.2017 | DK | 19.04.2017 | EE | 19.04.2017 | ES | 19.04.2017 | FI | 19.04.2017 | HR | 19.04.2017 | IT | 19.04.2017 | LT | 19.04.2017 | LV | 19.04.2017 | MC | 19.04.2017 | MK | 19.04.2017 | MT | 19.04.2017 | NL | 19.04.2017 | PL | 19.04.2017 | PT | 19.04.2017 | RO | 19.04.2017 | RS | 19.04.2017 | SE | 19.04.2017 | SI | 19.04.2017 | SK | 19.04.2017 | SM | 19.04.2017 | TR | 19.04.2017 | IE | 04.06.2017 | LU | 04.06.2017 | BE | 30.06.2017 | CH | 30.06.2017 | LI | 30.06.2017 | BG | 19.07.2017 | NO | 19.07.2017 | GR | 20.07.2017 | IS | 19.08.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/28] | HU | 04.06.2013 | |
AT | 19.04.2017 | ||
CY | 19.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 19.04.2017 | ||
DK | 19.04.2017 | ||
EE | 19.04.2017 | ||
ES | 19.04.2017 | ||
FI | 19.04.2017 | ||
HR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LV | 19.04.2017 | ||
MC | 19.04.2017 | ||
MK | 19.04.2017 | ||
MT | 19.04.2017 | ||
NL | 19.04.2017 | ||
PL | 19.04.2017 | ||
PT | 19.04.2017 | ||
RO | 19.04.2017 | ||
RS | 19.04.2017 | ||
SE | 19.04.2017 | ||
SI | 19.04.2017 | ||
SK | 19.04.2017 | ||
SM | 19.04.2017 | ||
TR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IE | 04.06.2017 | ||
LU | 04.06.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
BG | 19.07.2017 | ||
NO | 19.07.2017 | ||
GR | 20.07.2017 | ||
IS | 19.08.2017 | ||
Former [2020/15] | HU | 04.06.2013 | |
AT | 19.04.2017 | ||
CY | 19.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 19.04.2017 | ||
DK | 19.04.2017 | ||
EE | 19.04.2017 | ||
ES | 19.04.2017 | ||
FI | 19.04.2017 | ||
HR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LV | 19.04.2017 | ||
MC | 19.04.2017 | ||
MK | 19.04.2017 | ||
MT | 19.04.2017 | ||
NL | 19.04.2017 | ||
PL | 19.04.2017 | ||
RO | 19.04.2017 | ||
RS | 19.04.2017 | ||
SE | 19.04.2017 | ||
SI | 19.04.2017 | ||
SK | 19.04.2017 | ||
SM | 19.04.2017 | ||
TR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IE | 04.06.2017 | ||
LU | 04.06.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
BG | 19.07.2017 | ||
NO | 19.07.2017 | ||
GR | 20.07.2017 | ||
IS | 19.08.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 04.06.2013 | |
AT | 19.04.2017 | ||
CY | 19.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 19.04.2017 | ||
DK | 19.04.2017 | ||
EE | 19.04.2017 | ||
ES | 19.04.2017 | ||
FI | 19.04.2017 | ||
HR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LV | 19.04.2017 | ||
MC | 19.04.2017 | ||
MK | 19.04.2017 | ||
MT | 19.04.2017 | ||
NL | 19.04.2017 | ||
PL | 19.04.2017 | ||
RO | 19.04.2017 | ||
RS | 19.04.2017 | ||
SE | 19.04.2017 | ||
SI | 19.04.2017 | ||
SK | 19.04.2017 | ||
SM | 19.04.2017 | ||
IE | 04.06.2017 | ||
LU | 04.06.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
BG | 19.07.2017 | ||
NO | 19.07.2017 | ||
GR | 20.07.2017 | ||
IS | 19.08.2017 | ||
Former [2019/48] | HU | 04.06.2013 | |
AT | 19.04.2017 | ||
CY | 19.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 19.04.2017 | ||
DK | 19.04.2017 | ||
EE | 19.04.2017 | ||
ES | 19.04.2017 | ||
FI | 19.04.2017 | ||
HR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LV | 19.04.2017 | ||
MC | 19.04.2017 | ||
MT | 19.04.2017 | ||
NL | 19.04.2017 | ||
PL | 19.04.2017 | ||
RO | 19.04.2017 | ||
RS | 19.04.2017 | ||
SE | 19.04.2017 | ||
SI | 19.04.2017 | ||
SK | 19.04.2017 | ||
SM | 19.04.2017 | ||
IE | 04.06.2017 | ||
LU | 04.06.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
BG | 19.07.2017 | ||
NO | 19.07.2017 | ||
GR | 20.07.2017 | ||
IS | 19.08.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 04.06.2013 | |
AT | 19.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 19.04.2017 | ||
DK | 19.04.2017 | ||
EE | 19.04.2017 | ||
ES | 19.04.2017 | ||
FI | 19.04.2017 | ||
HR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LV | 19.04.2017 | ||
MC | 19.04.2017 | ||
MT | 19.04.2017 | ||
NL | 19.04.2017 | ||
PL | 19.04.2017 | ||
RO | 19.04.2017 | ||
RS | 19.04.2017 | ||
SE | 19.04.2017 | ||
SI | 19.04.2017 | ||
SK | 19.04.2017 | ||
SM | 19.04.2017 | ||
IE | 04.06.2017 | ||
LU | 04.06.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
BG | 19.07.2017 | ||
NO | 19.07.2017 | ||
GR | 20.07.2017 | ||
IS | 19.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 19.04.2017 | |
CZ | 19.04.2017 | ||
DK | 19.04.2017 | ||
EE | 19.04.2017 | ||
ES | 19.04.2017 | ||
FI | 19.04.2017 | ||
HR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LV | 19.04.2017 | ||
MC | 19.04.2017 | ||
MT | 19.04.2017 | ||
NL | 19.04.2017 | ||
PL | 19.04.2017 | ||
RO | 19.04.2017 | ||
RS | 19.04.2017 | ||
SE | 19.04.2017 | ||
SI | 19.04.2017 | ||
SK | 19.04.2017 | ||
SM | 19.04.2017 | ||
IE | 04.06.2017 | ||
LU | 04.06.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
BG | 19.07.2017 | ||
NO | 19.07.2017 | ||
GR | 20.07.2017 | ||
IS | 19.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 19.04.2017 | |
CZ | 19.04.2017 | ||
DK | 19.04.2017 | ||
EE | 19.04.2017 | ||
ES | 19.04.2017 | ||
FI | 19.04.2017 | ||
HR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LV | 19.04.2017 | ||
MC | 19.04.2017 | ||
NL | 19.04.2017 | ||
PL | 19.04.2017 | ||
RO | 19.04.2017 | ||
RS | 19.04.2017 | ||
SE | 19.04.2017 | ||
SI | 19.04.2017 | ||
SK | 19.04.2017 | ||
SM | 19.04.2017 | ||
IE | 04.06.2017 | ||
LU | 04.06.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
BG | 19.07.2017 | ||
NO | 19.07.2017 | ||
GR | 20.07.2017 | ||
IS | 19.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/25] | AT | 19.04.2017 | |
CZ | 19.04.2017 | ||
DK | 19.04.2017 | ||
EE | 19.04.2017 | ||
ES | 19.04.2017 | ||
FI | 19.04.2017 | ||
HR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LV | 19.04.2017 | ||
MC | 19.04.2017 | ||
NL | 19.04.2017 | ||
PL | 19.04.2017 | ||
RO | 19.04.2017 | ||
RS | 19.04.2017 | ||
SE | 19.04.2017 | ||
SI | 19.04.2017 | ||
SK | 19.04.2017 | ||
SM | 19.04.2017 | ||
IE | 04.06.2017 | ||
LU | 04.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
BG | 19.07.2017 | ||
NO | 19.07.2017 | ||
GR | 20.07.2017 | ||
IS | 19.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 19.04.2017 | |
CZ | 19.04.2017 | ||
DK | 19.04.2017 | ||
EE | 19.04.2017 | ||
ES | 19.04.2017 | ||
FI | 19.04.2017 | ||
HR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LV | 19.04.2017 | ||
MC | 19.04.2017 | ||
NL | 19.04.2017 | ||
PL | 19.04.2017 | ||
RO | 19.04.2017 | ||
RS | 19.04.2017 | ||
SE | 19.04.2017 | ||
SK | 19.04.2017 | ||
SM | 19.04.2017 | ||
LU | 04.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
BG | 19.07.2017 | ||
NO | 19.07.2017 | ||
GR | 20.07.2017 | ||
IS | 19.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 19.04.2017 | |
CZ | 19.04.2017 | ||
DK | 19.04.2017 | ||
EE | 19.04.2017 | ||
ES | 19.04.2017 | ||
FI | 19.04.2017 | ||
HR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LV | 19.04.2017 | ||
MC | 19.04.2017 | ||
NL | 19.04.2017 | ||
PL | 19.04.2017 | ||
RO | 19.04.2017 | ||
RS | 19.04.2017 | ||
SE | 19.04.2017 | ||
SK | 19.04.2017 | ||
SM | 19.04.2017 | ||
BG | 19.07.2017 | ||
NO | 19.07.2017 | ||
GR | 20.07.2017 | ||
IS | 19.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 19.04.2017 | |
CZ | 19.04.2017 | ||
DK | 19.04.2017 | ||
EE | 19.04.2017 | ||
ES | 19.04.2017 | ||
FI | 19.04.2017 | ||
HR | 19.04.2017 | ||
LT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LV | 19.04.2017 | ||
MC | 19.04.2017 | ||
NL | 19.04.2017 | ||
PL | 19.04.2017 | ||
RO | 19.04.2017 | ||
RS | 19.04.2017 | ||
SE | 19.04.2017 | ||
SK | 19.04.2017 | ||
BG | 19.07.2017 | ||
NO | 19.07.2017 | ||
GR | 20.07.2017 | ||
IS | 19.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | AT | 19.04.2017 | |
DK | 19.04.2017 | ||
EE | 19.04.2017 | ||
ES | 19.04.2017 | ||
FI | 19.04.2017 | ||
HR | 19.04.2017 | ||
LT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LV | 19.04.2017 | ||
NL | 19.04.2017 | ||
PL | 19.04.2017 | ||
RS | 19.04.2017 | ||
SE | 19.04.2017 | ||
BG | 19.07.2017 | ||
NO | 19.07.2017 | ||
GR | 20.07.2017 | ||
IS | 19.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 19.04.2017 | |
ES | 19.04.2017 | ||
FI | 19.04.2017 | ||
HR | 19.04.2017 | ||
LT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LV | 19.04.2017 | ||
NL | 19.04.2017 | ||
PL | 19.04.2017 | ||
RS | 19.04.2017 | ||
SE | 19.04.2017 | ||
BG | 19.07.2017 | ||
NO | 19.07.2017 | ||
GR | 20.07.2017 | ||
IS | 19.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 19.04.2017 | |
ES | 19.04.2017 | ||
FI | 19.04.2017 | ||
HR | 19.04.2017 | ||
LT | 19.04.2017 | ||
NL | 19.04.2017 | ||
NO | 19.07.2017 | ||
GR | 20.07.2017 | ||
IS | 19.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | NL | 19.04.2017 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0652202 (JAPAN RES DEV CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1,14 * claims 1,6 * * page 4, lines 30-32 * * page 14; examples 23-32 *; | [A] - ALINEZHAD, HESHMATOLLAH ET AL, "Synthesis of Benzimidazole Derivatives Using Heterogeneous ZnO Nanoparticles", SYNTHETIC COMMUNICATIONS, (201201), vol. 42, no. 1, ISSN 0039-7911, pages 102 - 108, XP002686063 [A] 1,14 * page 105; table 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1080/00397911.2010.522294 | [A] - WEITH, W., "Methenyldiphenyldiamine", CHEMISCHE BERICHTE, (1876), vol. 9, pages 454 - 463, XP002686064 [A] 1,14 * page 457, paragraph last - page 458, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/cber.187600901142 | [A] - ANGELA DIBENEDETTO ET AL, "Reaction of silylalkylmono- and silylalkyldi-amines with carbon dioxide: evidence of formation of inter- and intra-molecular ammonium carbamates and their conversion into organic carbamates of industrial interest under carbon dioxide catalysis", GREEN CHEMISTRY, (20020729), vol. 4, no. 5, doi:10.1039/b205319p, ISSN 1463-9262, pages 439 - 443, XP055009762 [A] 1,14 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/b205319p | [AD] - TOSHIYASU SAKAKURA ET AL, "Transformation of carbon dioxide", CHEMICAL REVIEWS, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, US, vol. 107, no. 6, doi:10.1021/CR068357U, ISSN 0009-2665, (20070601), pages 2365 - 2387, (20070613), XP002657706 [AD] 1,14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/CR068357U | by applicant | - SAKAKURA, T.; CHOI, J. C.; YASUDA, H., CHEM REV, (2007), vol. 107, page 2365 | - A. J. MORRIS; G. J. MEYER; E. FUJITA, ACC. CHEM. RES., (2009), vol. 42, page 1983 | - A. BERKEFELD; W. E. PIERS; M. PARVEZ, J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (2010), vol. 132, page 10660 | - "Panorama des voies de valorisation du C02", ADEME, (201006), URL: http://www2.ademe.fr/servlet/getDoc?cid=96&m=3&id=72052&pl=30&ref=12441 | - M. GALL; J. M. MCCALL; R. E. TENBRINK; P. F. VONVOIGTLANDER; J. S. MOHRLAND, JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, (1988), vol. 31, pages 1816 - 1820 | - S. ENTHALER; K. SCHRÔDER; S. INOUE; B. ECKHARDT; K. JUNGE; M. BELLER; M. DRIE?, EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, (2010), vol. 25, pages 4893 - 4901 | - K.-M. CHENG; Y.-Y. HUANG; J.-J. HUANG; K. KANEKO; M. KIMURA; H. TAKAYAMA; S.-H. JUANG; F. F. WONG, BIOORGANIC AND MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY LETTERS, (2010), vol. 20, no. 22, pages 6781 - 6784 | - A. MEKHALFIA; R. MUTTER; W. HEAL; B. CHEN, TETRAHEDRON, (2006), vol. 62, no. 24, pages 5617 - 5625 | - KHAKSAR, SAMAD; VAHDAT, SEYED MOHAMMAD; HEYDARI, AKBAR; TAJBAKHSH, MAHMOOD, JOURNAL OF FLUORINE CHEMISTRY, (2010), vol. 131, no. 12, pages 1377 - 1381 | - C.L. SMITH ET AL., JOURNAL OFORGANOMETALLIC CHEMISTRY, (1974), vol. 81, pages 33 - 40 | - G.D. HOMER, JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, (1973), vol. 95, no. 23, pages 7700 - 7707 | - L. SPIALTER ET AL., JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, (1971), vol. 93, no. 22, pages 5682 - 5686 | - R. WEST, JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, (1954), pages 6015 - 6017 | - U. PLEISS; R. VOGES, Synthesis and Applications of Isotopically Labelled Compounds, WILEY-VCH, (2001), vol. 7 | - YONG-JOO KIM; MAX P. BERNSTEIN; ANGELA S. GALIANO ROTH; FLOYD E. ROMESBERG; PAUL G. WILLIARD; DAVID J. FULLER; AIDAN T. HARRISON;, J ORG. CHEM., (1991), vol. 56, pages 4435 - 4439 | - CHRISTOPHER J. DINSMORE; SWATI P. MERCER, ORGANIC LETTERS, (2004), vol. 6, no. 17, pages 2885 - 2888 | - JOHN T. GROVES; YOSHIHITO WATANABE, J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1988), vol. 110, pages 8443 - 8452 | - JOHN T. GROVES; YOSHIHITO WATANABET, J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1988), vol. 110, pages 8443 - 8452 | - T. A. KOCHINA; D. V. VRAZHNOV; E. N. SINOTOVA; V. V. AVRORIN; M. YU. KATSAP; YU. V. MYKHOV, RUSSIAN JOURNAL OF GéNéRAL CHEMISTRY, (2002), vol. 72, no. 8, pages 1222 - 1224 | - E. A. SHISHIGIN; V. V. AVRORIN; T. A. KOCHINA; E. N. SINOTOVA, RUSSIAN JOURNAL OF GENERAL CHEMISTRY, (2005), vol. 75, no. 1, page 152 | - PLEISS, R. VOGES, Synthesis and Applications of Isotopically Labelled Compounds, WILEY-VCH, (2001), vol. 7 | - J. Z. HO, HELVETICA CHIMICA ACTA, (2005), vol. 88, page 1040 | - V. EKHATO; S. BONACORSI JR., J., LABEL COMPD. RADIOPHARM, (2011), vol. 54, pages 202 - 205 | - KENNETH K. CHAN; JAMES A. STAROSCIK, JOURNAL OF MéDICINAL CHEMISTRY, (1977), vol. 20, no. 4, page 598 |