EP2850433 - USE OF TROP-2 AS PREDICTIVE MARKER OF RESPONSE TO ANTI-TUMOR THERAPY BASED ON INHIBITORS OF AKT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2015/13] | USE OF TROP-2 AS PREDICTIVE MARKER OF RESPONSE TO ANTI-TUMOR THERAPY BASED ON INHIBITORS OF CD9, AKT AND MOLECULES OF THE TETRASPANIN SIGNALLING NETWORK | ||
[2018/10] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.06.2019 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.07.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.02.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ONCOXX Biotech s.r.l. Via Garibaldi Vico XVII, 15 66034 Lanciano / IT | [2015/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GUERRA, Emanuela Unità di Patologia Oncologica,c/o CeSI-MeT Fondazione Università "G. D'Annunzio" Via Polacchi 11 66100 Chieti (IT) / IT | 02 /
ALBERTI, Saverio Unità di Patologia Oncologica, c/o CeSI-MeT Fondazione Università "G. D'Annunzio" Via Polacchi 11 66100 Chieti (IT) / IT | [2018/33] |
Former [2015/13] | 01 /
GUERRA, Emanuela Unità di Patologia Oncologica CeSI Fondazione Università "G. D'Annunzio" Via Colle dell'Ara 66100 Chieti Scalo (CH) / IT | ||
02 /
ALBERTI, Saverio Unità di Patologia Oncologica CeSI Fondazione Università "G. D'Annunzio" Via Colle dell'Ara 66100 Chieti Scalo (CH) / IT | Representative(s) | Statti, Francesco Isea S.R.L. Via G. Carducci, 6 62012 Civitanova Marche / IT | [2015/13] | Application number, filing date | 13739819.4 | 16.05.2013 | [2018/33] | WO2013IT00139 | Priority number, date | IT2012CH00008 | 16.05.2012 Original published format: IT CH20120008 | [2015/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2013171777 | Date: | 21.11.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/47] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2850433 | Date: | 25.03.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.11.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2850433 | Date: | 15.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.03.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.03.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/574, A61P35/00, G01N33/50 | [2018/10] | CPC: |
G01N33/5748 (EP,CN,US);
A61K31/4375 (US);
A61K31/4985 (US);
A61K31/713 (US);
A61K39/39558 (US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
C07K16/30 (US);
C12Q1/6886 (US);
G01N33/5011 (US);
G01N33/5088 (US);
C12Q2600/106 (US);
G01N2333/82 (EP,CN,US);
|
Former IPC [2015/13] | G01N33/574, A61P35/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/13] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VON TROP-2 ALS PRÄDIKTIVER MARKER DER REAKTION AUF EINE ANTITUMORTHERAPIE AUF GRUNDLAGE VON AKT-HEMMERN | [2018/10] | English: | USE OF TROP-2 AS PREDICTIVE MARKER OF RESPONSE TO ANTI-TUMOR THERAPY BASED ON INHIBITORS OF AKT | [2018/10] | French: | UTILISATION DE TROP-2 EN TANT QUE MARQUEUR PRÉDICTIF DE RÉPONSE À UNE THÉRAPIE ANTICANCÉREUSE À BASE D'INHIBITEURS D'AKT | [2018/10] |
Former [2015/13] | VERWENDUNG VON TROP-2 ALS PRÄDIKTIVER MARKER DER REAKTION AUF EINE ANTITUMORTHERAPIE AUF GRUNDLAGE VON CD9- UND AKT-HEMMERN SOWIE MOLEKÜLE AUS DEM TETRASPANIN-SIGNALISIERUNGSNETZWERKS | ||
Former [2015/13] | USE OF TROP-2 AS PREDICTIVE MARKER OF RESPONSE TO ANTI-TUMOR THERAPY BASED ON INHIBITORS OF CD9, AKT AND MOLECULES OF THE TETRASPANIN SIGNALLING NETWORK | ||
Former [2015/13] | UTILISATION DE TROP-2 EN TANT QUE MARQUEUR PRÉDICTIF DE RÉPONSE À UNE THÉRAPIE ANTICANCÉREUSE À BASE D'INHIBITEURS DE CD9, AKT ET DE MOLÉCULES DU RÉSEAU DE SIGNALISATION DE LA TÉTRASPANINE | Entry into regional phase | 16.12.2014 | National basic fee paid | 16.12.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.12.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.12.2014 | Examination requested [2015/13] | 15.07.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.03.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division to which search results under Rule 164(2) EPC are annexed (Time limit: M04) [2016/16] | 22.03.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.07.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.02.2017 | Invitation to indicate the basis for amendments (Time limit: M01) | 03.04.2017 | Reply to an invitation to indicate the basis for amendments | 20.06.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.10.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.07.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 04.07.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.07.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.03.2016 | Opposition(s) | 16.05.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.05.2013 | AL | 15.08.2018 | AT | 15.08.2018 | CY | 15.08.2018 | CZ | 15.08.2018 | DK | 15.08.2018 | EE | 15.08.2018 | ES | 15.08.2018 | FI | 15.08.2018 | HR | 15.08.2018 | IT | 15.08.2018 | LT | 15.08.2018 | LV | 15.08.2018 | MC | 15.08.2018 | MK | 15.08.2018 | MT | 15.08.2018 | NL | 15.08.2018 | PL | 15.08.2018 | RO | 15.08.2018 | RS | 15.08.2018 | SE | 15.08.2018 | SI | 15.08.2018 | SK | 15.08.2018 | SM | 15.08.2018 | TR | 15.08.2018 | BG | 15.11.2018 | NO | 15.11.2018 | GR | 16.11.2018 | IS | 15.12.2018 | PT | 15.12.2018 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 16.05.2013 | |
AL | 15.08.2018 | ||
AT | 15.08.2018 | ||
CY | 15.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
DK | 15.08.2018 | ||
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
ES | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
MC | 15.08.2018 | ||
MT | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
PL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
SI | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
SM | 15.08.2018 | ||
TR | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
PT | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 16.05.2013 | |
AL | 15.08.2018 | ||
AT | 15.08.2018 | ||
CY | 15.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
DK | 15.08.2018 | ||
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
ES | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
MC | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
PL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
SI | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
SM | 15.08.2018 | ||
TR | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
PT | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 15.08.2018 | |
AT | 15.08.2018 | ||
CY | 15.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
DK | 15.08.2018 | ||
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
ES | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
MC | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
PL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
SI | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
SM | 15.08.2018 | ||
TR | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
PT | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 15.08.2018 | |
AT | 15.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
DK | 15.08.2018 | ||
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
ES | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
MC | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
PL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
SI | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
SM | 15.08.2018 | ||
TR | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
PT | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 15.08.2018 | |
AT | 15.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
DK | 15.08.2018 | ||
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
ES | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
MC | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
PL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
SI | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
SM | 15.08.2018 | ||
TR | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/07] | AL | 15.08.2018 | |
AT | 15.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
DK | 15.08.2018 | ||
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
ES | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
MC | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
PL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
SI | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
SM | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 15.08.2018 | |
AT | 15.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
DK | 15.08.2018 | ||
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
ES | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
PL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
SI | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
SM | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 15.08.2018 | |
AT | 15.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
DK | 15.08.2018 | ||
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
ES | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
PL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
SM | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AL | 15.08.2018 | |
AT | 15.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
ES | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
PL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/22] | AL | 15.08.2018 | |
AT | 15.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
PL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AL | 15.08.2018 | |
AT | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 15.08.2018 | |
AT | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | AT | 15.08.2018 | |
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 15.08.2018 | |
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | FI | 15.08.2018 | |
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 15.08.2018 | |
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 15.08.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [IY]WO2011130654 (GENENTECH INC [US], et al) [I] 1-10 * abstract * [Y] 1-10; | [X] - JOYCE VARUGHESE ET AL, "Uterine serous papillary carcinomas overexpress human trophoblast-cell-surface marker (trop-2) and are highly sensitive to immunotherapy with hRS7, a humanized anti-trop-2 monoclonal antibody", CANCER, (20110715), vol. 117, no. 14, doi:10.1002/cncr.25891, ISSN 0008-543X, pages 3163 - 3172, XP055057457 [X] 6 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/cncr.25891 | [X] - JOYCE VARUGHESE ET AL, "Cervical carcinomas overexpress human trophoblast cell-surface marker (Trop-2) and are highly sensitive to immunotherapy with hRS7, a humanized monoclonal anti-Trop-2 antibody", AMERICAN JOURNAL OF OBSTETRICS & GYNECOLOGY, MOSBY, ST LOUIS, MO, US, vol. 205, no. 6, doi:10.1016/J.AJOG.2011.06.093, ISSN 0002-9378, (20110629), pages 567.e1 - 567.e7, (20110713), XP028116550 [X] 6 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ajog.2011.06.093 | [X] - JOYCE VARUGHESE ET AL, "High-grade, chemotherapy-resistant primary ovarian carcinoma cell lines overexpress human trophoblast cell-surface marker (Trop-2) and are highly sensitive to immunotherapy with hRS7, a humanized monoclonal anti-Trop-2 antibody", GYNECOLOGIC ONCOLOGY, ACADEMIC PRESS, LONDON, GB, vol. 122, no. 1, doi:10.1016/J.YGYNO.2011.03.002, ISSN 0090-8258, (20110303), pages 171 - 177, (20110310), XP028221428 [X] 6 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ygyno.2011.03.002 | [X] - RHODA RAJI ET AL, "Uterine and ovarian carcinosarcomas overexpressing Trop-2 are sensitive to hRS7, a humanized anti-Trop-2 antibody", JOURNAL OF EXPERIMENTAL & CLINICAL CANCER RESEARCH, (20110101), vol. 30, no. 1, doi:10.1158/0008-5472.CAN-07-6135, ISSN 1756-9966, page 106, XP055052404 [X] 6 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/1756-9966-30-106 | [Y] - M TREROTOLA ET AL, "Upregulation of Trop-2 quantitatively stimulates human cancer growth", ONCOGENE, (20110220), vol. 32, no. 2, doi:10.1038/onc.2012.36, ISSN 0950-9232, pages 222 - 233, XP055057442 [Y] 1-10 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/onc.2012.36 | [Y] - ELIANA BIGNOTTI ET AL, "Trop-2 protein overexpression is an independent marker for predicting disease recurrence in endometrioid endometrial carcinoma", BMC CLINICAL PATHOLOGY, GB, (20120101), vol. 12, no. 1, doi:10.1186/1756-0500-5-65, ISSN 1472-6890, page 22, XP055255567 [Y] 1-10 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/1472-6890-12-22 | [I] - JAU-CHEN LIN ET AL, "TROP2 is epigenetically inactivated and modulates IGF-1R signalling in lung adenocarcinoma", EMBO MOLECULAR MEDICINE, Weinheim, (20120315), vol. 4, no. 6, doi:10.1002/emmm.201200222, ISSN 1757-4676, pages 472 - 485, XP055255417 [I] 1-10 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/emmm.201200222 | International search | [A]WO2011085276 (WEISS GLEN, et al) [A] 1-6,8,10 * abstract *; | [A]CA2798778 (LIVTECH INC [JP]) [A] 1-6,8,10 * page 41 - page 43 *; | [A] - VARUGHESE JOYCE ET AL, "Uterine serous papillary carcinomas overexpress human trophoblast-cell-surface marker (Trop-2) and are highly sensitive to immunotherapy with hRS7, a humanized anti-Trop-2 monoclonal antibody.", CANCER 15 JUL 2011, (20110715), vol. 117, no. 14, ISSN 1097-0142, pages 3163 - 3172, XP055057457 [A] 1-6,8,10 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/cncr.25891 | [A] - VARUGHESE JOYCE ET AL, "Cervical carcinomas overexpress human trophoblast cell-surface marker (Trop-2) and are highly sensitive to immunotherapy with hRS7, a humanized monoclonal anti-Trop-2 antibody.", AMERICAN JOURNAL OF OBSTETRICS AND GYNECOLOGY DEC 2011, (201112), vol. 205, no. 6, ISSN 1097-6868, pages 567.e1 - 7, XP028116550 [A] 1-6,8,10 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ajog.2011.06.093 | [A] - VARUGHESE JOYCE ET AL, "High-grade, chemotherapy-resistant primary ovarian carcinoma cell lines overexpress human trophoblast cell-surface marker (Trop-2) and are highly sensitive to immunotherapy with hRS7, a humanized monoclonal anti-Trop-2 antibody.", GYNECOLOGIC ONCOLOGY JUL 2011, (201107), vol. 122, no. 1, ISSN 1095-6859, pages 171 - 177, XP028221428 [A] 1-6,8,10 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ygyno.2011.03.002 | [A] - RAJI RHODA ET AL, "Uterine and ovarian carcinosarcomas overexpressing Trop-2 are sensitive to hRS7, a humanized anti-Trop-2 antibody.", JOURNAL OF EXPERIMENTAL & CLINICAL CANCER RESEARCH : CR 2011, (2011), vol. 30, ISSN 1756-9966, page 106, XP055052404 [A] 1-6,8,10 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/1756-9966-30-106 | [A] - TREROTOLA M ET AL, "Upregulation of Trop-2 quantitatively stimulates human cancer growth.", ONCOGENE 10 JAN 2013, (20120220), vol. 32, no. 2, ISSN 1476-5594, pages 222 - 233, XP055057442 [A] 1-6,8,10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/onc.2012.36 | [A] - NAKASHIMA KAZUE ET AL, "Serological identification of TROP2 by recombinant cDNA expression cloning using sera of patients with esophageal squamous cell carcinoma.", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF CANCER. JOURNAL INTERNATIONAL DU CANCER 20 DEC 2004, (20041220), vol. 112, no. 6, ISSN 0020-7136, pages 1029 - 1035, XP002694347 [A] 1-6,8,10 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/ijc.20517 | [A] - HUAYI HUANG ET AL, "Aberrant expression of novel and previously described cell membrane markers in human breast cancer cell lines and tumors", CLINICAL CANCER RESEARCH, THE AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR CANCER RESEARCH, US, (20050615), vol. 11, no. 12, doi:10.1158/1078-0432.CCR-04-2107, ISSN 1078-0432, pages 4357 - 4364, XP008128315 [A] 1-6,8,10 * page 4363, column 2, paragraph 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1158/1078-0432.CCR-04-2107 | Examination | - ELIANA BIGNOTTI ET AL, "Trop-2 protein overexpression is an independent marker for predicting disease recurrence in endometrioid endometrial carcinoma", BMC CLINICAL PATHOLOGY, GB, (20120101), vol. 12, no. 1, doi:10.1186/1756-0500-5-65, ISSN 1472-6890, page 22, XP055255567 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/1472-6890-12-22 | - JAU-CHEN LIN ET AL, "TROP2 is epigenetically inactivated and modulates IGF-1R signalling in lung adenocarcinoma", EMBO MOLECULAR MEDICINE, Weinheim, (20120315), vol. 4, no. 6, doi:10.1002/emmm.201200222, ISSN 1757-4676, pages 472 - 485, XP055255417 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/emmm.201200222 | by applicant | - ALBERTI, S., "HIKE, a candidate protein binding site for PH domains, is a major regulatory region of Gbeta proteins.", PROTEINS, (1999), vol. 35, pages 360 - 363 | - ALBERTI, S.; S. MIOTTI ET AL., "Biochemical characterization of Trop-2, a cell surface molecule expressed by human carcinomas: formal proof that the monoclonal antibodies T16 and MOv-16 recognize Trop-2.", HYBRIDOMA, (1992), vol. 11, pages 539 - 5 | - ALBERTI, S.; M. NUTINI ET AL., "DNA methylation prevents the amplification of TROPI, a tumor associated cell surface antigen gene", PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1994), vol. 91, pages 5833 - 7 | - BALZAR, M.; I. H. BRIAIRE-DE BRUIJN ET AL., "Epidermal growth factor-like repeats mediate lateral and reciprocal interactions of Ep-CAM molecules in homophilic adhesions.", MOL. CELL. BIOL., (2001), vol. 21, no. 7, doi:doi:10.1128/MCB.21.7.2570-2580.2001, pages 2570 - 80, XP055101614 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/MCB.21.7.2570-2580.2001 | - BARREIRO, O.; M. ZAMAI ET AL., "Endothelial adhesion receptors are recruited to adherent leukocytes by inclusion in preformed tetraspanin nanoplatforms.", J CELL BIOL, (2008), vol. 183, no. 3, pages 527 - 42 | - BASU, A.; D. M. GOLDENBERG ET AL., "The epithelial/carcinoma antigen EGP-1, recognized by monoclonal antibody RS7-3G11, is phosphorylated on serine 303.", INT. J. CANCER, (1995), vol. 62, doi:doi:10.1002/ijc.2910620419, pages 472 - 479, XP009098359 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/ijc.2910620419 | - BROWN, W. J.; M. G. FARQUHAR, "Immunoperoxidase methods for the localization of antigens in cultured cells and tissue sections by electron microscopy.", METHODS CELL BIOL, (1989), vol. 31, pages 553 - 69 | - BRUMMELKAMP, T. R.; R. BERNARDS ET AL., "A System for Stable Expression of Short Interfering RNAs in Mammalian Cells.", SCIENCE, (2002), vol. 296, no. 5567, doi:doi:10.1126/science.1068999, pages 550 - 553, XP002626048 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1068999 | - CHALK, A. M.; C. WAHLESTEDT ET AL., "Improved and automated prediction of effective siRNA.", BIOCHEM BIOPHYS RES COMMUN, (2004), vol. 319, no. 1, doi:doi:10.1016/j.bbrc.2004.04.181, pages 264 - 74, XP004509878 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bbrc.2004.04.181 | - CHONG, J. M.; D. W. SPEICHER, "Determination of Disulfide Bond Assignments and N-Glycosylation Sites of the Human Gastrointestinal Carcinoma Antigen GA733-2 (C017-lA, EGP, KSI-4, KSA, and Ep-CAM).", J. BIOL. CHEM., (2001), vol. 276, no. 8, pages 5804 - 5813 | - CICCARELLI, F.; A. ACCIARITO ET AL., "Large and diverse numbers of human diseases with HIKE mutations.", HUM. MOL. GENET., (2000), vol. 9, doi:doi:10.1093/hmg/9.6.1001, pages 1001 - 7, XP002213878 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/hmg/9.6.1001 | - CUBAS, R.; S. ZHANG ET AL., "Trop2 expression contributes to tumor pathogenesis by activating the ERK MAPK pathway.", MOL CANCER, (2010), vol. 9, no. 1, doi:doi:10.1186/1476-4598-9-253, page 253, XP021077991 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/1476-4598-9-253 | - EL SEWEDY, T.; M. FORNARO ET AL., "Cloning of the murine Trop2 gene: conservation of a PIP2-binding sequence in the cytoplasmic domain of Trop-2.", INT J CANCER, (1998), vol. 75, no. 2, doi:doi:10.1002/(SICI)1097-0215(19980119)75:2<324::AID-IJC24>3.0.CO;2-B, pages 324 - 30, XP000929390 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/(SICI)1097-0215(19980119)75:2<324::AID-IJC24>3.0.CO;2-B | - ELBASHIR, S. M.; J. HARBORTH ET AL., "Duplexes of 21-nucleotide RNAs mediate RNA interference in cultured mammalian cells.", NATURE, (2001), vol. 411, no. 6836, doi:doi:10.1038/35078107, pages 494 - 8, XP002529540 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/35078107 | - FORNARO, M.; R. DELL'ARCIPRETE ET AL., "Cloning of the gene encoding TROP-2, a cell-surface glycoprotein expressed by human carcinomas.", INT. J. CANCER, (1995), vol. 62, doi:doi:10.1002/ijc.2910620520, pages 610 - 8, XP000925819 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/ijc.2910620520 | - FREELEY, M.; J. PARK ET AL., "Loss of PTEN expression does not contribute to PDK-1 activity and PKC activation-loop phosphorylation in Jurkat leukaemic T cells.", CELL SIGNAL, (2007), vol. 19, no. 12, doi:doi:10.1016/j.cellsig.2007.07.020, pages 2444 - 57, XP022289757 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.cellsig.2007.07.020 | - GIULIETTI, A.; L. OVERBERGH ET AL., "An overview of real-time quantitative PCR: applications to quantify cytokine gene expression.", METHODS, (2001), vol. 25, no. 4, doi:doi:10.1006/meth.2001.1261, pages 386 - 401, XP002272122 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/meth.2001.1261 | - GUERRA, E.; M. TREROTOLA ET AL., "A bi-cistronic CYCLIN D1-TROP2 mRNA chimera demonstrates a novel oncogenic mechanism in human cancer.", CANCER RES, (2008), vol. 68, no. 19, pages 8113 - 8121 | - HAKOMORI, S. 1., "Inaugural Article: The glycosynapse.", PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (2002), vol. 99, no. 1, pages 225 - 32 | - HEMLER, M. E., "Tetraspanin proteins mediate cellular penetration, invasion, and fusion events and define a novel type of membrane microdomain.", ANNU REV CELL DEV BIOL, (2003), vol. 19, pages 397 - 422 | - JACINTO, E.; V. FACCHINETTI ET AL., "SfNI/MIPI maintains rictor-mTOR complex integrity and regulates Akt phosphorylation and substrate specificity.", CELL, (2006), vol. 127, no. 1, pages 125 - 37 | - KLEIN, C. E.; B. HARTMANN ET AL., "Expression of 38-kD cell-surface glycoprotein in transformed human keratinocyte cell lines, basal cell carcinomas, and epithelial germs.", J. INVEST. DERMATOL., (1990), vol. 95, pages 74 - 82 | - KOUL, D.; R. SHEN ET AL., "Targeting integrin-linked kinase inhibits Akt signaling pathways and decreases tumor progression of human glioblastoma.", MOL CANCER THER, (2005), vol. 4, no. 11, pages 1681 - 8 | - LE NAOUR, F.; M. ANDRE ET AL., "Membrane microdomains and proteomics: lessons from tetraspanin microdomains and comparison with lipid rafts.", PROTEOMICS, (2006), vol. 6, no. 24, pages 6447 - 54 | - LEVY, S.; T. SHOHAM, "The tetraspanin web modulates immune- signalling complexes.", NAT REV IMMUNOL, (2005), vol. 5, no. 2, doi:doi:10.1038/nri1548, pages 136 - 48, XP055418748 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nri1548 | - LINNENBACH, A. J.; B. A. SENG ET AL., "Retroposition in a family of carcinoma-associated antigen genes.", MOL. CELL. BIOL., (1993), vol. 13, pages 1507 - 1515 | - LIVAK, K. J.; T. D. SCHMITTGEN, "Analysis of relative gene expression data using real-time quantitative PCR and the 2(-Delta Delta C(T)) Method.", METHODS, (2001), vol. 25, no. 4, pages 402 - 8 | - MINGUEZ, P.; S. GOTZ ET AL., "SNOW, a web-based tool for the statistical analysis of protein-protein interaction networks.", NUCLEIC ACIDS RES, (2009), vol. 37, pages W 109 - 14 | - NAQUET, P.; H. LEPESANT ET AL., "Establishment and characterization of mouse thymic epithelial cell lines.", THYMUS, (1989), vol. 13, no. 3-4, pages 217 - 26 | - PAREKH, D. B.; W. ZIEGLER ET AL., "Multiple pathways control protein kinase C phosphorylation.", EMBO J, (2000), vol. 19, no. 4, pages 496 - 503 | - POLISHCHUK, R. S.; E. V. POLISHCHUK ET AL., "Correlative light-electron microscopy reveals the saccular-tabular ultrastructure of carriers operating between the Golgi apparatus and the plasma membrane.", J. CELL BIOL., (2000), vol. 148, pages 45 - 58 | - ROSSE, C.; M. LINCH ET AL., "PKC and the control of localized signal dynamics.", NAT REV MOL CELL BIOL, (2010), vol. 11, no. 2, doi:doi:10.1038/nrm2847, pages 103 - 12, XP009173519 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nrm2847 | - ROSSI, C.; A. DI LENA ET AL., "Intestinal tumour chemoprevention with the antioxidant lipoic acid stimulates the growth of breast cancer.", EUR J CANCER, (2008), vol. 44, doi:doi:10.1016/j.ejca.2008.08.021, pages 2696 - 2704, XP025632381 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ejca.2008.08.021 | - SARBASSOV, D. D.; D. A. GUERTIN ET AL., "Phosphorylation and regulation of Akt/PKB by the rictor-mTOR complex.", SCIENCE, (2005), vol. 307, no. 5712, doi:doi:10.1126/science.1106148, pages 1098 - 101, XP002379044 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1106148 | - SEMIZAROV, D.; L. FROST ET AL., "Specificity of short interfering RNA determined through gene expression signatures.", PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (2003), vol. 100, no. 11, doi:doi:10.1073/pnas.1131959100, pages 6347 - 52, XP002316495 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.1131959100 | - TREROTOLA, M.; P. CANTANELLI ET AL., "Up-regulation of Trop-2 quantitatively stimulates human cancer growth.", ONCOGENE, (2013), vol. 32, pages 222 - 233 | - TREROTOLA, M.; S. RATHORE ET AL., "CD133, Trop-2 and alpha2betal integrin surface receptors as markers of putative human prostate cancer stem cells.", AM J TRANSL RES, (2010), vol. 2, no. 2, pages 135 - 44 | - WANG, J.; R. DAY ET AL., "Identification of Trop-2 as an oncogene and an attractive therapeutic target in colon cancers.", MOL CANCER THER, (2008), vol. 7, no. 2, doi:doi:10.1158/1535-7163.MCT-07-2003, pages 280 - 5, XP002541438 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1158/1535-7163.MCT-07-2003 | - WEN, H. C.; W. C. HUANG ET AL., "Negative regulation of phosphatidylinositol 3-kinase and Akt signalling pathway by PKC.", CELL SIGNAL, (2003), vol. 15, no. 1, pages 37 - 45 | - ZHANG, X. A.; A. L. BONTRAGER ET AL., "Transmembrane-4 superfamily proteins associate with activated protein kinase C (PKC) and link PKC to specific beta(l) integrins.", J BIOL CHEM, (2001), vol. 276, no. 27, pages 25005 - 13 | WO2009IT00035 |