EP2870598 - SYSTEM FOR SELECTIVELY REVEALING INDICIA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 08.01.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.01.2016 | Withdrawal of application | published on 10.02.2016 [2016/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gojo Industries, Inc. One Gojo Plaza Suite 500 P.O. Box 991 Akron, OH 44309 / US | [2015/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PELFREY, Keith Allen 828 Pegan Drive Wadsworth, Ohio 44281 / US | 02 /
WEGELIN, Jackson W. 2508 Graham Road Stow, Ohio 44224 / US | [2015/20] | Representative(s) | Tetzner, Michael, et al Tetzner & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Van-Gogh-Strasse 3 81479 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/20] | Tetzner, Michael, et al TETZNER & PARTNER mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Van-Gogh-Strasse 3 81479 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13740437.2 | 09.07.2013 | WO2013US49670 | Priority number, date | US201213544684 | 09.07.2012 Original published format: US201213544684 | [2015/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014011602 | Date: | 16.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2870598 | Date: | 13.05.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.01.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.01.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G09F23/02 | [2015/20] | CPC: |
G09F23/02 (EP);
G09F2023/0025 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/20] | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUR SELEKTIVEN ENTHÜLLUNG VON INDIZIEN | [2015/20] | English: | SYSTEM FOR SELECTIVELY REVEALING INDICIA | [2015/20] | French: | SYSTÈME POUR RÉVÉLER DE MANIÈRE SÉLECTIVE DES INDICES | [2015/20] | Entry into regional phase | 14.01.2015 | National basic fee paid | 14.01.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.01.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.01.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.01.2015 | Examination requested [2015/20] | 28.12.2015 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2016/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5153760 (AHMED ADEL A A [US]) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2766278 (WERQUIN GILBERT [FR]) [A] 1-8* the whole document *; | [A]US2008244940 (MESIKA YIGAL [US]) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [A]US2010011637 (ZHANG YUDONG [US]) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [X]EP2164060 (GOJO IND INC [US]) [X] 1-20 * the whole document * |