EP2873016 - CLINICAL CONTENT MANAGEMENT SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.11.2020 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.11.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.12.2020 [2020/53] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | For all designated states Cherry, Julie, Cheitlin 2312 Lacey Drive Milpitas, CA 95035 / US | For all designated states Pilch, Nick 634 San Carlos Avenue Albany, CA 94706 / US | For all designated states Brown, Stephen, J. 3324 Woodside Road Woodside, CA 94062 / US | [2020/18] |
Former [2015/21] | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | ||
For all designated states Cherry, Julie, Cheitlin 2312 Lacey Drive Milpitas, CA 95035 / US | |||
For all designated states Pilch, Nick 634 San Carlos Avenue Albany, CA 94706 / US | |||
For all designated states Brown, Stephen, J. 3324 Woodside Road Woodside, CA 94062 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHERRY, Julie, Cheitlin 2312 Lacey Drive Milpitas, CA 95035 / US | 02 /
PILCH, Nick 634 San Carlos Avenue Albany, CA 94706 / US | 03 /
BROWN, Stephen, J. 3324 Woodside Road Woodside, CA 94062 / US | [2015/21] | Representative(s) | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/21] | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13740468.7 | 13.07.2013 | WO2013US50413 | Priority number, date | US201261671221P | 13.07.2012 Original published format: US 201261671221 P | [2015/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2014012086 | Date: | 16.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/03] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2873016 | Date: | 20.05.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.01.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.03.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G06F19/00 | [2015/21] | CPC: |
G16H10/60 (EP,US);
G06Q10/06 (EP,US);
G16H40/67 (EP,US);
G16H70/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/21] | Title | German: | KLINISCHES INHALTSVERWALTUNGSSYSTEM | [2015/21] | English: | CLINICAL CONTENT MANAGEMENT SYSTEM | [2015/21] | French: | SYSTÈME DE GESTION DE CONTENU CLINIQUE | [2015/21] | Entry into regional phase | 13.02.2015 | National basic fee paid | 13.02.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.02.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.02.2015 | Examination requested [2015/21] | 11.09.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.10.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.02.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.03.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.08.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/53] | 25.08.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/53] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.10.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2020 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]US2008040151 (MOORE JAMES F [US]) [I] 1-8* paragraphs [0210] , [0212] , [0213] , [0231] *; | [I]US2009265185 (FINN CHRISTOPHER [US], et al) [I] 1-8 * paragraphs [0010] , [0041] , [0042] , [0050] , [0057] , [0059] * | Examination | US2002087053 | US2007005394 | US7895275 | US2011112849 | US2011161289 | by applicant | US8353827 |