EP2807186 - VACCINES AGAINST CLOSTRIDIUM DIFFICILE COMPRISING RECOMBINANT TOXINS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.11.2016 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck Sharp & Dohme LLC 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, New Jersey 07065 / US | For all designated states Intervet International B.V. Wim de Körverstraat 35 5831 AN Boxmeer / NL | [2022/42] |
Former [2014/49] | For all designated states Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ 07065-0907 / US | ||
For all designated states Intervet International B.V. Wim de Körverstraat 35 5831 AN Boxmeer / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HEINRICHS, Jon Henry 770 Sumneytown Pike West Point Pennsylvania 19486 / US | 02 /
BODMER, Jean-Luc 4 Abbott Lane, Unit 1 Concord Massachusetts 01742 / US | 03 /
SECORE, Susan Lynn 770 Sumneytown Pike West Point Pennsylvania 19486 / US | 04 /
GOERKE, Aaron Rudy 1 DNA Way Mail Stop 43A South San Francisco California 94080-4990 / US | 05 /
CARO-AGUILAR, Ivette 770 Sumneytown Pike West Point Pennsylvania 19486 / US | 06 /
GENTILE, Marie-Pierre 770 Sumneytown Pike West Point Pennsylvania 19486 / US | 07 /
HORTON, Melanie S. 770 Sumneytown Pike West Point Pennsylvania19486 / US | 08 /
MIEZEIEWSKI, Matthew Ryan 770 Sumneytown Pike West Point Pennsylvania 19486 / US | 09 /
SKINNER, Julie M. 770 Sumneytown Pike West Point Pennsylvania 19486 / US | 10 /
SONDERMEIJER, Paulus Jacobus Antonius Wim de Korverstraat 35 5381 AN Boxmeer / NL | 11 /
SUBRAMANIAN, Shyamsundar 770 Sumneytown Pike West Point Pennsylvania 19486 / US | 12 /
van der HEIJDEN-LIEFKENS, Karin Huberdina Antonia Wimde Korverstraat 35 5831 AN Boxmeer / NL | 13 /
WANG, Su 770 Sumneytown Pike West Point Pennsylvania 19486 / US | 14 /
XIE, Jinfu 770 Sumneytown Pike West Point Pennsylvania 19486 / US | 15 /
XOCONOSTLE, Rachel Flora 770 Sumneytown Pike West Point Pennsylvania 19486 / US | 16 /
ZORMAN, Julie 770 Sumneytown Pike West Point Pennsylvania 19486 / US | [2014/49] | Representative(s) | Merck Sharp & Dohme LLC 120 Moorgate London EC2M 6UR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/49] | Böhles, Elena, et al Merck Sharp & Dohme Limited Hertford Road Hoddesdon, Herts EN11 9BU / GB | Application number, filing date | 13740509.8 | 25.01.2013 | WO2013US23189 | Priority number, date | US201261591631P | 27.01.2012 Original published format: US 201261591631 P | US201261596419P | 08.02.2012 Original published format: US 201261596419 P | US201261703754P | 20.09.2012 Original published format: US 201261703754 P | [2014/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013112867 | Date: | 01.08.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2807186 | Date: | 03.12.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.08.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 01.08.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.01.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C07K14/33, A61K39/08, A61K39/00, A61K38/00, C12N9/10, C12N9/52 | [2016/04] | CPC: |
C12N9/1051 (EP,US);
C07K14/33 (EP,CN,US);
A61K39/08 (EP,CN,US);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P37/04 (EP);
C12N9/1077 (EP,US);
C12N9/52 (EP,US);
A61K2039/55505 (EP,CN,US);
A61K2039/55577 (EP,CN,US);
A61K38/00 (EP,CN,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2014/49] | C07K14/33 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/49] | Extension states | BA | 27.08.2014 | ME | 27.08.2014 | Title | German: | IMPFSTOFFE GEGEN CLOSTRIDIUM DIFFICILE MIT REKOMBINANTEN TOXINEN | [2014/49] | English: | VACCINES AGAINST CLOSTRIDIUM DIFFICILE COMPRISING RECOMBINANT TOXINS | [2014/49] | French: | VACCINS CONTRE CLOSTRIDIUM DIFFICILE COMPRENANT DES TOXINES RECOMBINANTES | [2014/49] | Entry into regional phase | 27.08.2014 | National basic fee paid | 27.08.2014 | Search fee paid | 27.08.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.08.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.08.2014 | Examination requested [2014/49] | 20.07.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.11.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.05.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.11.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.05.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.04.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.01.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.12.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.07.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 08.09.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.11.2016 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 08.09.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 08.09.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 17.09.2021 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 15.01.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 15.01.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 27.01.2020 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 13.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 11.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 11.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2010093801 (CEDARS SINAI MEDICAL CENTER [US], et al) [X] 26,29 * pages 4, 5, 17 - page 18; claim 13 *; | [XI] - Toxin From ET AL, "STRUCTURAL STUDIES ON ACTINADP RIBOSYLATING BINARY A thesis submitted for the degree ofDoctor ofPhilosophy", (20100201), URL: http://opus.bath.ac.uk/24677/1/UnivBath_PhD_2010_A_Sundriyal.pdf, (20151218), XP055237657 [X] 20,25,36,39 * page 159 - page 11; figure 5.20 * [I] 21-24,27,28,30-35,38 | [A] - Hossein Khademi ET AL, "THE ROLE OF CDT IN THE PATHOGENESIS OF CLOSTRIDIUM DIFFICILE ASSOCIATED DISEASE", (20110410), URL: http://rudar.ruc.dk/bitstream/1800/6614/1/Bachelor project final report.pdf, (20151218), XP055237659 [A] 20-36,38,39 * the whole document * | [A] - A. SUNDRIYAL ET AL, "Structural Basis for Substrate Recognition in the Enzymatic Component of ADP-ribosyltransferase Toxin CDTa from Clostridium difficile", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, US, (20091016), vol. 284, no. 42, doi:10.1074/jbc.M109.043018, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 28713 - 28719, XP055237661 [A] 20-36,38,39 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.M109.043018 | [AP] - Jon H Heinrichs ET AL, "DESIGN, PRODUCTION AND PRE-CLINICAL EVALUATION OF A NOVEL TOXIN-BASED VACCINE FOR THE PREVENTION OF Clostridium difficile DISEASE", 4th INTERNATIONAL CLOSTRIDIUM DIFFICILE SYMPOSIUM, (20120920), page 30, URL: http://www.icds.si/icds-2012/docs/abstract_book.pdf, (20141029), XP055149657 [AP] 20-36,38,39 * the whole document * | International search | [A]US6573003 (WILLIAMS JAMES A [US], et al); | [Y]US2011053244 (OYLER GEORGE A [US], et al); | [Y]WO2011068953 (UNIV TUFTS [US], et al); | [YP]US2012269841 (SIDHU MANINDER K [US], et al); | [YP] - WANG ET AL., "A Chimeric Toxin Vaccine Protects against Primary and Recurrent Clostridium difficile Infection.", INFECT. IMMUN., (20120521), vol. 80, no. 8, pages 2678 - 2688, XP002730906 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/IAI.00215-12 | by applicant | WO9859053 | WO9920304 | WO0061761 | WO2005058353 | US7226597 | US7470674 | US7625559 | US7713535 | WO2011060431 | WO2011068953 | WO2012028741 | US2012269841 | - CAMPBELL et al., Infect Control Hosp Epidemiol, (20090000), vol. 30, no. 6, pages 526 - 33 | - RUPNIK et al., Nature Reviews, (20090000), vol. 7, pages 527 - 36 | - BARTLETT, J.G., Clin Infect Dis., (20080000), vol. 46, no. 10, pages 1489 - 92 | - GORBACH, S.L., N Engl J Med, (19990000), vol. 341, no. 22, pages 1690 - 1 | - KELLY et al., N Engl J Med, (19940000), vol. 330, no. 4, pages 257 - 62 | - DUPONT et al., Current Opinion in Infectious Diseases, (20080000), vol. 21, pages 500 - 507 | - ASLAM et al., Lancet, (20050000), vol. 365, no. 9469, page 1464 | - LOO et al., N Engl J Med, (20060000), vol. 365, no. 18, pages 1693 - 703 | - MCDONALD et al., N Engl J Med, (20050000), vol. 353, no. 23, pages 2433 - 41 | - MUTO, C.A., Infect Control Hosp Epidemiol, (20050000), vol. 26, no. 1, pages 10 - 2 | - PEPIN et al., Cmaj, (20040000), vol. 171, no. 5, pages 466 - 72 | - ZAR et al., Clin Infect Dis, (20070000), vol. 45, no. 3, pages 302 - 7 | - MMWR Morb Mortal Wkly Rep, (20080000), vol. 57, no. 13, pages 340 - 3 | - HIRSCHHORN et al., J Infect Dis, (19940000), vol. 169, no. 1, pages 127 - 33 | - KARLSTROM et al., Clin Infect Dis, (19980000), vol. 26, no. 1, pages 141 - 5 | - KYNE et al., J Infect, (19980000), vol. 36, no. 3, pages 287 - 8 | - LAMBERT et al., Infect Control Hosp Epidemiol, (20090000), vol. 30, no. 10, pages 945 - 51 | - NOREN et al., J Clin Microbiol, (20040000), vol. 42, no. 8, pages 3635 - 43 | - PALTANSING et al., Clin Microbiol Infect, (20070000), vol. 13, no. 11, pages 1058 - 64 | - SCHIRMER; AKTORIES, Biochimica et Biophysica Acta, (20040000), vol. 1673, pages 66 - 74 | - "Clostridium and Bacillus proteins", Microbiol Mol Biol Rev, (20040000), vol. 68, no. 3, pages 373 - 402 | - GERIC, B. et al., Journal of Infectious Diseases, (20060000), vol. 193, no. 8, pages 1143 - 1150 | - SCHWAN, C. et al., PLoS Pathog, (20090000), vol. 5, no. 10, page e1000626 | - BACCI et al., Emerg. Infect. Dis., (20110000), vol. 17, no. 6, pages 976 - 82 | - GOLDENBERG SD, Journal of Infection, (20110000), vol. 62, pages 355 - 62 | - LYERLY et al., Current Microbiology, (19900000), vol. 21, pages 29 - 32 | - TORRES et al., Infection and Immunity, (19950000), vol. 63, no. 12, pages 4619 - 4627 | - KIM et al., Infection and Immunity, (19870000), vol. 55, no. 12, pages 2984 - 2992 | - FERNIE et al., Devel. Biol. Standard, (19830000), vol. 53, pages 325 - 32 | - LIBBY et al., Infect Immun, (19820000), vol. 36, pages 822 - 9 | - GHOSE et al., Infection and Immunity, vol. 75, no. 6, pages 2826 - 2832 | - GARDINER et al., Vaccine, (20090000), vol. 27, pages 3598 - 3604 | - BUSCH et al., J. Biol. Chem., (20000000), vol. 275, no. 18, pages 13228 - 234 | - BARR; MITCHELL, Immunology and Cell Biology, (19960000), vol. 74, pages 8 - 25 | - NEEDLEMAN; WUNSCH, J. Mol. Biol., (19700000), vol. 48, page 443 | - SMITH; WATERMAN, Adv. Appl. Math., (19810000), vol. 2, page 482 | - GERHARD et al., Journal of Medical Microbiology, (20080000), vol. 57, pages 765 - 770 | - SPYRES et al., Infection and Immunity, (20030000), vol. 71, no. 6, pages 3294 - 3301 | - BUSCH et al., J. Biol. Chem., (19980000), vol. 273, no. 31, pages 19566 - 19572 | - REINERT et al., J. Mol. Biol., vol. 351, pages 973 - 81 | - ZIEGLER et al., J. Mol. Biol., (20070000), vol. 377, pages 1346 - 56 | - PRUITT et al., J. Biol. Chem., (20120000), vol. 287, pages 8013 - 8020 | - TEICHERT et al., Infect and Immun., (20060000), vol. 74, pages 6006 - 6010 | - JANK et al., J. Biol. Chem., (20070000), vol. 282, no. 48, pages 35222 - 35231 | - BARROSO et al., Microbial Pathogenesis, (19940000), vol. 16, pages 297 - 303 | - BUSCH et al., Journal of Biological Chemistry, (19980000), vol. 273, pages 18566 - 19572 | - "NCBI", Database accession no. ZP 05328744.10 | - "NCBI", Database accession no. ZP 06891228.1 | - "NCBI", Database accession no. ZP 05400113.1 | - "NCBI", Database accession no. YP 003213639.1 | - "GenBank", Database accession no. CAA80815.1 | - "GenBank", Database accession no. CAC19891.1 | - "GenBank", Database accession no. AAG18011.1 | - "NCBI", Database accession no. ZP 05349824.1 | - PERELLE et al., "Production of a complete binary toxin actin -specific ADP-ribosyltransferase by Clostridium difficile CD 196", Infection and Immunity, (19970000), vol. 65, no. 4, pages 1402 - 1407 | - SUNDRIYAL et al., "Structural basis for substrate recognition in enzymatic components of ADP-ribosyltransferase toxin CDTa from Clostridium difficile", Journal of Biological Chemistry, (20090000), vol. 284, no. 42, doi:doi:10.1074/jbc.M109.043018, pages 28713 - 28719, XP055237661 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.M109.043018 | - PERELLE et al., "Evidence that Arg-295, Glu-378 and Glu-380 are active site residues of the ADP-ribosyltransferase activity of iota toxin", FEBS Letters, (19960000), vol. 395, pages 191 - 194 | - NAGAHAMA et al., "Characterization of the enzymatic component of Clostridium perfringens Iota toxin", Journal of Bacteriology, (20000000), vol. 182, no. 8, pages 2096 - 2103 | - TSUGE et al., "Crystal structure and site directed mutagenesis of the enzymatic components from Clostridium perfringens Iota toxin", J. Mol. Biol, (20030000), vol. 325, doi:doi:10.1016/S0022-2836(02)01247-0, pages 471 - 483, XP027180828 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0022-2836(02)01247-0 | - GULKE et al., "Characterization of the enzymatic component of the ADP-ribosyltransferase toxin CDTa from Clostridium difficile", Infection and Immunity, (20010000), vol. 69, no. 10, doi:doi:10.1128/IAI.69.10.6004-6011.2001, pages 6004 - 6011, XP055116891 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/IAI.69.10.6004-6011.2001 | - TSUGE et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (20080000), vol. 105, pages 7399 - 7404 | - "GenBank", Database accession no. AEC11575.1 | - "GenBank", Database accession no. AEC11569.1 | - "GenBank", Database accession no. AEC11560.1 | - "GenBank", Database accession no. AAB67304.2 | - "GenBank", Database accession no. AEC11578.1 | - "GenBank", Database accession no. AEC11570.1 | - "GenBank", Database accession no. AEC11585.1 | - "GenBank", Database accession no. AEC11576.1 | - "GenBank", Database accession no. AEC11558.1 | - "GenBank", Database accession no. AEC11564.1 | - "GenBank", Database accession no. AEC11579.1 | - "GenBank", Database accession no. AAB67305.1 | - BAUER et al., Lancet, (20110000), vol. 377, no. 9759, pages 63 - 73 | - GERDING et al., Nat Rev Gastroenterol Hepatol., (20110000), vol. 8, no. 2, pages 67 - 8 | - BARTH et al., Microbiol. Mol. Biol. Rev., (20040000), vol. 68, no. 3, pages 373 - 402 | - DAUBENBERGER, C.A., Curr. Opin. Mol. Ther., (20070000), vol. 9, no. 1, pages 45 - 52 | - DUTHIE et al., Immunological Reviews, (20110000), vol. 239, no. 1, pages 178 - 196 | - HEDAYAT et al., Medicinal Research Reviews, (20120000), vol. 32, no. 2, pages 294 - 325 | - SKENE; SUTTON, Methods, (20060000), vol. 40, pages 53 - 59 | - KLEIN et al., "Analysis of aluminum hydroxyphosphate vaccine adjuvants by Al MAS NMR", J. Pharm. Sci., (20000000), vol. 89, no. 3, doi:doi:10.1002/(SICI)1520-6017(200003)89:3<311::AID-JPS3>3.0.CO;2-8, pages 311 - 21, XP002740453 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/(SICI)1520-6017(200003)89:3<311::AID-JPS3>3.0.CO;2-8 | - BURGER et al., Biochem Biophys Res. Commun., (20030000), vol. 307, no. 3, pages 584 - 8 | - YANG et al., BMC Microbiol., (20080000), vol. 8, page 192 | - S. KABA et al., Journal of Virological Methods, (20040000), vol. 122, pages 113 - 118 | - SUNDRIYAL et al., Protein Expression and Purification, (20100000), vol. 74, pages 42 - 48 |