EP2806738 - PLANT DISEASE CONTROL COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 23.09.2016 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.09.2016 | Withdrawal of application | published on 26.10.2016 [2016/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Chemical Company, Limited 27-1, Shinkawa 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8260 / JP | [2014/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IWATA, Atsushi c/o Sumitomo Chemical Company, Limited 27-1, Shinkawa 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8260 / JP | 02 /
KURAHASHI, Makoto c/o Sumitomo Chemical Company, Limited 2-1, Takatsukasa 4-chome Takarazuka-shi, Hyogo 665-8555 / JP | [2014/49] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/49] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13741192.2 | 21.01.2013 | WO2013JP51682 | Priority number, date | JP20120011777 | 24.01.2012 Original published format: JP 2012011777 | [2014/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013111893 | Date: | 01.08.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2806738 | Date: | 03.12.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.08.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 01.08.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.07.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A01N37/30, A01N43/36, A01N43/38, A01P3/00 | [2014/49] | CPC: |
A01N43/36 (EP,US);
A01N37/18 (US)
| C-Set: |
A01N43/36, A01N37/30, A01N43/38, A01N2300/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/49] | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR BEKÄMPFUNG VON PFLANZENBEFALL | [2014/49] | English: | PLANT DISEASE CONTROL COMPOSITION | [2014/49] | French: | COMPOSITION DE LUTTE CONTRE LES MALADIES DES PLANTES | [2014/49] | Entry into regional phase | 21.08.2014 | National basic fee paid | 21.08.2014 | Search fee paid | 21.08.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.08.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.08.2014 | Examination requested [2014/49] | 25.01.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.09.2016 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2016/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH07149701 (HODOGAYA CHEMICAL CO LTD) [A] 1-5 * abstract * * paragraphs [0054] - [0058] * * tables 2-5 *; | [A]WO2011124586 (JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA NV [BE]; BYLEMANS DANY LEOPOLD JOZEFIEN [BE]; LE) [A] 1-5 * paragraphs [0001] - [0007] - [00 9] , [0 15] , [0 34] *; | [A]WO2010137676 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO [JP]; SAITO SHIGERU [JP]) [A] 1-5 * page 1, line 1 - line 15 * * Treatment examples; page 28 - page 33 * | [A] - "Syngenta Seedcare Soybean Portfolio Outshines the Competition TM", Syngenta Seedcare, (20110101), URL: http://www.syngentaebiz.com/productsystem/ImageHandler.ashx?ImID=06930505-ca17-4b8a-9076-41af0cd70580&fTy=0&t=0, (20150624), XP055197890 [A] 1-5 * page 2 - page 5 * | [A] - CHASTAGNER G A ET AL, "Efficacy of fungicides in controlling leaf spot on bulbous iris", ACTA HORTICULTURAE, INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY FOR HORTICULTURAL SCIENCE, BE, (20050101), vol. 673, ISSN 0567-7572, pages 509 - 512, XP009112498 [A] 1-5 * abstract * * tables 1-3 * | [A] - MIHOKO ITAGAKI ET AL, "Biological activities and structure-activity relationship of substitution compounds of N-[2-(3-indolyl)ethyl]succinamic acid and N-[2-(1-naphthyl)ethyl]succinamic acid, derived from a new category of root-promoting substances, N-(phenethyl)succinamic acid analogs", PLANT AND SOIL ; AN INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL ON PLANT-SOIL RELATIONSHIPS, KLUWER ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS, DO, (20030801), vol. 255, no. 1, ISSN 1573-5036, pages 67 - 75, XP019293082 [A] 1-5 * abstract * * figures 1-3 * * table 1 * | International search | [Y]JPH11255607 (SNOW BRAND SEED CO., LTD., ASAHI CHEMICAL INDUSTRY CO., LTD); | [Y]JP2001139405 (SNOW BRAND SEED CO., LTD., ASAHI CHEMICAL INDUSTRY CO., LTD.); | [Y]JPH07149701 (HODOGAYA CHEMICAL CO., LTD.); | [Y]JP2009132690 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL COMPANY, LIMITED); | [Y]JP2009501709 (BAYER CROPSCIENCE SA); | [Y]JP2003176258 (ISHIHARA SANGYO KAISHA, LTD.) |