EP2880484 - OMNI-DIRECTIONAL REFLECTOR COMPRISING A FRUSTO-CONICAL SURFACE FOR A LIGHT-EMITTING DIODE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2015/24] | OMNI-DIRECTIONAL REFLECTOR COMPRISING A FRUSTO-CONICAL SURFACE FOR A!LIGHT-EMITTING DIODE | ||
[2020/43] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.05.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.11.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.05.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.06.2021 [2021/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GE Lighting Solutions, LLC 1975 Noble Road Bldg. 338 Nela Park East Cleveland, OH 44112 / US | [2015/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CAI, Dengke 1975 Noble Drive East Cleveland, OH 44112 / US | 02 /
CHINNIAH, Jeyachandrabose 1975 Noble Drive East Cleveland, OH 44112 / US | 03 /
KUENZLER, Glenn, Howard 1975 Noble Drive East Cleveland, OH 44112 / US | [2015/24] | Representative(s) | Dennemeyer & Associates S.A. Landaubogen 1-3 81373 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/24] | Cleary, Fidelma GPO Europe GE International Inc. The Ark 201 Talgarth Road Hammersmith London W6 8BJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 13742302.6 | 27.06.2013 | WO2013US48023 | Priority number, date | US201213566623 | 03.08.2012 Original published format: US201213566623 | [2015/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014022033 | Date: | 06.02.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2880484 | Date: | 10.06.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.02.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.02.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.03.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G02B19/00, F21K9/232, F21K9/60, F21V7/00, F21V7/24, // F21V13/02, F21Y115/10, H01L33/58 | [2020/43] | CPC: |
G02B19/0028 (EP,CN,KR,US);
F21K9/232 (EP,KR,US);
F21K9/60 (EP,US);
F21K9/64 (EP,KR,US);
F21V13/02 (EP,CN,KR,US);
F21V3/061 (EP,CN,KR,US);
F21V3/062 (EP,CN,KR,US);
F21V3/08 (EP,CN,KR,US);
F21V7/0066 (EP,CN,KR,US);
F21V7/24 (EP,US);
G02B19/0061 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H01L33/58 (EP,CN,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2015/24] | G02B19/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/24] | Title | German: | OMNIDIREKTIONALER REFLEKTOR MIT EINER KEGELSTUMPFFÖRMIGEN OBERFLÄCHE FÜR EINE LED-LAMPE | [2020/43] | English: | OMNI-DIRECTIONAL REFLECTOR COMPRISING A FRUSTO-CONICAL SURFACE FOR A LIGHT-EMITTING DIODE | [2020/43] | French: | REFLECTEUR OMNIDIRECTIONNEL COMPRENANT UNE SURFACE TRONCONIQUE POUR UNE SOURCE LUMINEUSE LED | [2020/43] |
Former [2015/24] | OMNIDIREKTIONALER REFLEKTOR MIT KEGELSTUMPFFÖRMIGER OBERFLÄCHE FÜR EINE LEUCHTDIODE | ||
Former [2015/24] | OMNI-DIRECTIONAL REFLECTOR COMPRISING A FRUSTO-CONICAL SURFACE FOR A!LIGHT-EMITTING DIODE | ||
Former [2015/24] | RÉFLECTEUR OMNIDIRECTIONNEL COMPORTANT UNE SURFACE TRONCONIQUE POUR UNE DIODE ÉLECTROLUMINESCENTE | Entry into regional phase | 03.03.2015 | National basic fee paid | 03.03.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.03.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.02.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.03.2015 | Examination requested [2015/24] | 04.03.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division to which search results under Rule 164(2) EPC are annexed (Time limit: M06) [2016/14] | 04.03.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.09.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.04.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.10.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.11.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.01.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/24] | 10.02.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2021/24] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.03.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2020 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]EP1338844 (VALEO VISION [FR]) [Y] 3,4* figure 6 *; | [XYI]US2009129097 (EWERT JURGEN E [US], et al) [X] 1 * figure 1 * [Y] 3,4 [I] 2,5,6,19 | Examination | US2009129097 | US2007085105 | EP1338844 |