EP2855071 - TORCH FOR TUNGSTEN INERT GAS WELDING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.09.2023 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.05.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LV | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Energy Global GmbH & Co. KG Otto-Hahn-Ring 6 81739 München / DE | [2021/04] |
Former [2017/35] | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2015/15] | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HANEBUTH, Henning Markt Schwabener Str. 25 85652 Pliening OT Gelting / DE | 02 /
WERNER, Christian Jaspersstraße 15 14612 Falkensee / DE | [2023/40] |
Former [2015/15] | 01 /
HANEBUTH, Henning Markt Schwabener Str. 25 85652 Pliening OT Gelting / DE | ||
02 /
WERNER, Christian Jaspersstrasse 15 14612 Falkensee / DE | Application number, filing date | 13742625.0 | 26.07.2013 | [2023/40] | WO2013EP65825 | Priority number, date | DE201210213453 | 31.07.2012 Original published format: DE102012213453 | [2015/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2014019958 | Date: | 06.02.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/06] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2855071 | Date: | 08.04.2015 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.02.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2855071 | Date: | 04.10.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.04.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B23K9/28, B23K9/29, B23K9/02, B23K9/167 | [2015/15] | CPC: |
B23K9/285 (EP,CN,US);
B23K9/0213 (EP,CN,US);
B23K9/167 (EP,CN,US);
B23K9/296 (EP,CN,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BRENNER FÜR DAS WOLFRAM-INERTGAS-SCHWEIßEN | [2015/15] | English: | TORCH FOR TUNGSTEN INERT GAS WELDING | [2015/15] | French: | CHALUMEAU POUR LE SOUDAGE AU TUNGSTÈNE ET AU GAZ INERTE | [2015/15] | Entry into regional phase | 05.01.2015 | National basic fee paid | 05.01.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.01.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.01.2015 | Examination requested [2015/15] | 20.05.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.03.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.10.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.06.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.08.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 28.08.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.08.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.03.2019 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 19.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 19.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 04.10.2023 | HR | 04.10.2023 | LT | 04.10.2023 | LV | 04.10.2023 | NL | 04.10.2023 | PL | 04.10.2023 | RS | 04.10.2023 | SE | 04.10.2023 | BG | 04.01.2024 | NO | 04.01.2024 | GR | 05.01.2024 | IS | 04.02.2024 | PT | 05.02.2024 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/25] | ES | 04.10.2023 | |
HR | 04.10.2023 | ||
LT | 04.10.2023 | ||
NL | 04.10.2023 | ||
PL | 04.10.2023 | ||
RS | 04.10.2023 | ||
SE | 04.10.2023 | ||
BG | 04.01.2024 | ||
NO | 04.01.2024 | ||
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
PT | 05.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/24] | ES | 04.10.2023 | |
HR | 04.10.2023 | ||
LT | 04.10.2023 | ||
NL | 04.10.2023 | ||
RS | 04.10.2023 | ||
SE | 04.10.2023 | ||
BG | 04.01.2024 | ||
NO | 04.01.2024 | ||
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
PT | 05.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 04.10.2023 | |
NL | 04.10.2023 | ||
BG | 04.01.2024 | ||
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | NL | 04.10.2023 | |
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/17] | NL | 04.10.2023 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE2732756 (BABCOCK AG) [A] 1-15 * figures 1,2 *; | [A]JP2000024780 (HITACHI LTD) [A] 1-15* abstract *; | [I]EP2008750 (EWM HIGHTEC WELDING GMBH [DE], et al) [I] 1-15 * figures 7,8b,9c *; | [ID]DE102009008250 (KJELLBERG FINSTERWALDE PLASMA [DE]) [ID] 1-15 * figures 1,2 *; | [I]EP2366485 (EWM HIGHTEC WELDING GMBH [DE]) [I] 1-15 * figure 3b * | by applicant | DE102009008250 |