EP2810229 - A MOBILE PAYMENT METHOD AND A SYSTEM THEREFORE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.11.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.11.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.12.2020 [2020/53] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SEQR Group AB Seamless Box 6234 102 34 Stockholm / SE | [2016/11] |
Former [2014/50] | For all designated states Seamless Distribution AB Dalagatan 100, 8 tr 11343 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SIGNARSSON, Mikael Krusbärsvägen 12 S-194 66 Upplands Väsby / SE | [2014/50] | Representative(s) | Brann AB P.O. Box 3690 Sveavägen 63 103 59 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/50] | Brann AB P.O. Box 12246 102 26 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 13743058.3 | 15.01.2013 | WO2013SE00006 | Priority number, date | SE20120000074 | 03.02.2012 Original published format: SE 1200074 | US201261595843P | 07.02.2012 Original published format: US 201261595843 P | [2014/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2013115700 | Date: | 08.08.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/32] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2810229 | Date: | 10.12.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.08.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 31.10.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.09.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q20/00, G07F7/02 | [2015/41] | CPC: |
G06Q20/322 (EP,US);
G06Q20/027 (SE);
G06Q20/102 (US);
G06Q20/16 (SE);
G06Q20/20 (SE);
G06Q20/204 (EP,US);
G06Q20/32 (SE);
G06Q20/327 (US);
G06Q20/3276 (EP,US);
G06Q20/3278 (SE);
G06Q20/34 (SE);
G06Q20/40 (US);
|
Former IPC [2014/50] | G06Q20/20, G06Q20/16, G06Q20/32, G06Q20/34 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/50] | Title | German: | MOBILES ZAHLUNGSVERFAHREN UND SYSTEM DAFÜR | [2014/50] | English: | A MOBILE PAYMENT METHOD AND A SYSTEM THEREFORE | [2014/50] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PAIEMENT MOBILE ET SYSTÈME ASSOCIÉ | [2014/50] | Entry into regional phase | 19.08.2014 | National basic fee paid | 19.08.2014 | Search fee paid | 19.08.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.08.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.08.2014 | Examination requested [2014/50] | 08.04.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.03.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.09.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.08.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/53] | 24.08.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2020/53] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.03.2017 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to indicate the wish to proceed further with the application | 08.04.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 08.04.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 20.05.2016 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 08.04.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 08.04.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 20.05.2016 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2019 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   24.05.2019 | 31.01.2020 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1528518 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]); | [A]US2009254485 (BAENTSCH MICHAEL [CH], et al); | [I]US2011131104 (ROSE GREGORY GORDON [US], et al); | [A]US2011137797 (STALS LUC [DE], et al) | International search | [A]EP2088549 (ACCENTURE GLOBAL SERVICES GMBH [CH]); | [A]US2010320266 (WHITE SPENCER NEIL [US]); | [A]US2011225057 (WEBB TIM [US], et al) | by applicant | EP1528518 | US2009254485 | US2011131104 | US2011137797 |