EP2819646 - SPINAL FUSION SYSTEM FOR OSTEOPOROTIC VERTEBRAE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.09.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.12.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.09.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.10.2021 [2021/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aslie, Ardavan 2369 Clubhouse Drive Rocklin, California 95765 / US | [2015/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2015/02] | Representative(s) | Farrington, Graham, et al Ladas & Parry London Limited Temple Chambers 3-7 Temple Avenue London EC4Y 0DA / GB | [2015/02] | Application number, filing date | 13743994.9 | 28.01.2013 | WO2013US23425 | Priority number, date | US201261594838P | 03.02.2012 Original published format: US 201261594838 P | [2015/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013116150 | Date: | 08.08.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2819646 | Date: | 07.01.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.08.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 08.08.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.08.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/70, A61B17/80, A61B17/82, A61B17/04, A61F2/30 | [2015/39] | CPC: |
A61B17/7032 (EP);
A61B17/7041 (EP);
A61B17/7044 (EP);
A61B17/7053 (EP);
A61B17/8085 (EP);
A61B17/809 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2015/02] | A61K9/00, A61K31/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/02] | Title | German: | WIRBELSÄULENFUSIONSSYSTEM FÜR OSTEOPOROTISCHER WIRBEL | [2015/02] | English: | SPINAL FUSION SYSTEM FOR OSTEOPOROTIC VERTEBRAE | [2015/02] | French: | SYSTÈME DE FUSION VERTÉBRALE POUR VERTÈBRES OSTÉOPOROTIQUES | [2015/02] | Entry into regional phase | 29.08.2014 | National basic fee paid | 29.08.2014 | Search fee paid | 29.08.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.08.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.08.2014 | Examination requested [2015/02] | 29.02.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.06.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.10.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.12.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.04.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/40] | 20.05.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2021/40] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.06.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2018 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   11.05.2018 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP2279707 (ZIMMER SPINE [FR]) [X] 1-4,6-8,10 * column 6, paragraph 30 - column 10, paragraph 63 * * figures 3, 6, 7, 9 * [Y] 5,9; | [X]EP1502552 (SPINEOLOGY GROUP LLC [US]) [X] 1,4,7,10 * column 1, paragraphs 3-4 * * column 2, paragraph 11 - column 4, paragraph 15 * * figures 1-4 *; | [YA]FR2900561 (TORNIER SAS [FR]) [Y] 5 * page 4, line 15 - page 5, line 15 * * figures 1, 2 * [A] 1,6; | [YA]US2008021454 (CHAO NAM T [US], et al) [Y] 9 * page 4, paragraph 33 - page 5, paragraph 37 * * figures 2A-2D * [A] 1-4,7,8,10; | [A]US2010082067 (KONDRASHOV DIMITRIY G [US]) [A] 1-4,7,10 * page 1, paragraph 21 - page 3, paragraph 29 * * figures 1-4 * | International search | [X]US6616669 (OGILVIE, EJ ET AL.); | [Y]US7896902 (JEON, MD ET AL.); | [Y]EP1405606 (MULLANE, TS); | [Y]US7749528 (DE CARVALHO, RA ET AL.); | [Y]US6193756 (STUDER, A ET AL.); | [Y]US2011106260 (LAURENCE, L ET AL.) |