EP2811736 - OPTIMUM CAMERA SETTING DEVICE AND OPTIMUM CAMERA SETTING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.02.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.02.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.03.2019 [2019/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006 Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [2014/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YOSHIO, Hiroaki c/o Panasonic Corporation Intellectual Property Center Planning and Management Group 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61 Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 02 /
MORI, Kaori c/o Panasonic Corporation Intellectual Property Center Planning and Management Group 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61 Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 03 /
YOKOMITSU, Sumio c/o Panasonic Corporation Intellectual Property Center Planning and Management Group 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61 Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2014/50] | Representative(s) | Vigand, Philippe, et al Novagraaf International SA Chemin de l'Echo 3 1213 Onex - Genève / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2014/50] | Vigand, Philippe, et al Novagraaf International SA 3 chemin de l'Echo 1213 Onex Geneva / CH | Application number, filing date | 13744190.3 | 29.01.2013 | WO2013JP00468 | Priority number, date | JP20120016700 | 30.01.2012 Original published format: JP 2012016700 | [2014/50] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013114862 | Date: | 08.08.2013 | Language: | JA | [2013/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2811736 | Date: | 10.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 08.08.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.11.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/225, H04N5/232, H04N7/18 | [2014/50] | CPC: |
G06V40/16 (EP,US);
G06F18/40 (US);
G06V10/945 (EP,US);
G06V20/52 (EP,US);
H04N23/61 (EP,US);
H04N23/611 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/50] | Title | German: | OPTIMALE KAMERAEINSTELLUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND OPTIMALES KAMERAEINSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN | [2014/50] | English: | OPTIMUM CAMERA SETTING DEVICE AND OPTIMUM CAMERA SETTING METHOD | [2014/50] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ DE RÉGLAGE D'APPAREIL PHOTO OPTIMAL | [2014/50] | Entry into regional phase | 23.07.2014 | Translation filed | 23.07.2014 | National basic fee paid | 23.07.2014 | Search fee paid | 23.07.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.07.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.07.2014 | Examination requested [2014/50] | 10.03.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.06.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.10.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.04.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.09.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/10] | 28.09.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/10] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.06.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2007115363 (NAKAMURA MITSUMI [JP]) [X] 1,10 * the whole document * [I] 2-9,11-19; | [XI]US2009268074 (SUGINO YOUICHI [JP]) [X] 1,10 * the whole document * [I] 2-9,11-19; | [A]US2010033579 (YOKOHATA MASAHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1-19* the whole document *; | [XI]US2011019027 (FUJITA HIDETO [JP], et al) [X] 1,10 * the whole document * [I] 2-9,11-19; | [I]US2011043628 (YUN IL DONG [KR]) [I] 1-19 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]JP2002027435 (TAKEYA KK); | [X]JP2010161718 (CANON KK); | [XP]JP2012213124 (SECOM CO LTD) | by applicant | JP2008172425 |