EP2811171 - HYBRID CONSTRUCTION MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.08.2017 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KYB Corporation World Trade Center Building 4-1, Hamamatsu-cho 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-6111 / JP | [2016/03] |
Former [2014/50] | For all designated states Kayaba Industry Co., Ltd. World Trade Center Bldg. 4-1 Hamamatsu-cho 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-6111 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FUKUDA, Shunsuke c/o KYB Corporation World Trade Center Bldg. 4-1 Hamamatsu-cho 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-6111 / JP | 02 /
YOSHIDA, Nobuyoshi c/o KYB Corporation World Trade Center Bldg. 4-1 Hamamatsu-cho 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-6111 / JP | [2016/40] |
Former [2014/50] | 01 /
FUKUDA, Shunsuke c/o KAYABA INDUSTRY CO. LTD. World Trade Center Bldg. 4-1 Hamamatsu-cho 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-6111 / JP | ||
02 /
YOSHIDA, Nobuyoshi c/o KAYABA INDUSTRY CO. LTD. World Trade Center Bldg. 4-1 Hamamatsu-cho 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-6111 / JP | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2016/40] |
Former [2014/50] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13744241.4 | 24.01.2013 | [2016/40] | WO2013JP51433 | Priority number, date | JP20120022286 | 03.02.2012 Original published format: JP 2012022286 | [2014/50] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013115053 | Date: | 08.08.2013 | Language: | JA | [2013/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2811171 | Date: | 10.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2811171 | Date: | 05.10.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 08.08.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.11.2015 | Classification | IPC: | F15B11/02, E02F9/20, F15B11/00, F15B11/17, F15B21/14, E02F9/22, F15B11/08, F15B21/00, F15B7/00 | [2015/51] | CPC: |
E02F9/20 (KR);
E02F9/2095 (EP,US);
E02F9/2217 (EP,US);
E02F9/2242 (EP,US);
E02F9/2267 (EP,US);
E02F9/2292 (EP,US);
E02F9/2296 (EP,US);
F15B11/00 (KR);
F15B11/02 (KR);
F15B11/08 (US);
F15B11/17 (EP,KR,US);
F15B21/001 (US);
F15B21/14 (EP,KR,US);
F15B7/001 (US);
F15B2211/20576 (EP,US);
F15B2211/2654 (EP,US);
F15B2211/355 (US);
F15B2211/40515 (US);
|
Former IPC [2014/50] | F15B11/02, E02F9/20, F15B11/00, F15B11/17, F15B21/14 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/50] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HYBRIDBAUMASCHINE | [2014/50] | English: | HYBRID CONSTRUCTION MACHINE | [2014/50] | French: | MACHINE DE CONSTRUCTION HYBRIDE | [2014/50] | Entry into regional phase | 21.08.2014 | Translation filed | 21.08.2014 | National basic fee paid | 21.08.2014 | Search fee paid | 21.08.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.08.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.08.2014 | Examination requested [2014/50] | 22.06.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.08.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 23.08.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.08.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.06.2016 | Opposition(s) | 06.07.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.01.2013 | AL | 05.10.2016 | AT | 05.10.2016 | BE | 05.10.2016 | CY | 05.10.2016 | CZ | 05.10.2016 | DK | 05.10.2016 | EE | 05.10.2016 | ES | 05.10.2016 | FI | 05.10.2016 | HR | 05.10.2016 | IT | 05.10.2016 | LT | 05.10.2016 | LV | 05.10.2016 | MC | 05.10.2016 | MK | 05.10.2016 | NL | 05.10.2016 | PL | 05.10.2016 | RO | 05.10.2016 | RS | 05.10.2016 | SE | 05.10.2016 | SI | 05.10.2016 | SK | 05.10.2016 | SM | 05.10.2016 | TR | 05.10.2016 | BG | 05.01.2017 | NO | 05.01.2017 | GR | 06.01.2017 | GB | 24.01.2017 | IE | 24.01.2017 | LU | 24.01.2017 | MT | 24.01.2017 | CH | 31.01.2017 | FR | 31.01.2017 | LI | 31.01.2017 | IS | 05.02.2017 | PT | 06.02.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 24.01.2013 | |
AT | 05.10.2016 | ||
BE | 05.10.2016 | ||
CY | 05.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2016 | ||
DK | 05.10.2016 | ||
EE | 05.10.2016 | ||
ES | 05.10.2016 | ||
FI | 05.10.2016 | ||
HR | 05.10.2016 | ||
IT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LV | 05.10.2016 | ||
MC | 05.10.2016 | ||
MK | 05.10.2016 | ||
NL | 05.10.2016 | ||
PL | 05.10.2016 | ||
RO | 05.10.2016 | ||
RS | 05.10.2016 | ||
SE | 05.10.2016 | ||
SI | 05.10.2016 | ||
SK | 05.10.2016 | ||
SM | 05.10.2016 | ||
TR | 05.10.2016 | ||
BG | 05.01.2017 | ||
NO | 05.01.2017 | ||
GR | 06.01.2017 | ||
GB | 24.01.2017 | ||
IE | 24.01.2017 | ||
LU | 24.01.2017 | ||
MT | 24.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
FR | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
IS | 05.02.2017 | ||
PT | 06.02.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 24.01.2013 | |
AT | 05.10.2016 | ||
BE | 05.10.2016 | ||
CY | 05.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2016 | ||
DK | 05.10.2016 | ||
EE | 05.10.2016 | ||
ES | 05.10.2016 | ||
FI | 05.10.2016 | ||
HR | 05.10.2016 | ||
IT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LV | 05.10.2016 | ||
MC | 05.10.2016 | ||
MK | 05.10.2016 | ||
NL | 05.10.2016 | ||
PL | 05.10.2016 | ||
RO | 05.10.2016 | ||
RS | 05.10.2016 | ||
SE | 05.10.2016 | ||
SI | 05.10.2016 | ||
SK | 05.10.2016 | ||
SM | 05.10.2016 | ||
BG | 05.01.2017 | ||
NO | 05.01.2017 | ||
GR | 06.01.2017 | ||
GB | 24.01.2017 | ||
IE | 24.01.2017 | ||
LU | 24.01.2017 | ||
MT | 24.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
FR | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
IS | 05.02.2017 | ||
PT | 06.02.2017 | ||
Former [2019/47] | HU | 24.01.2013 | |
AT | 05.10.2016 | ||
BE | 05.10.2016 | ||
CY | 05.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2016 | ||
DK | 05.10.2016 | ||
EE | 05.10.2016 | ||
ES | 05.10.2016 | ||
FI | 05.10.2016 | ||
HR | 05.10.2016 | ||
IT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LV | 05.10.2016 | ||
MC | 05.10.2016 | ||
NL | 05.10.2016 | ||
PL | 05.10.2016 | ||
RO | 05.10.2016 | ||
RS | 05.10.2016 | ||
SE | 05.10.2016 | ||
SI | 05.10.2016 | ||
SK | 05.10.2016 | ||
SM | 05.10.2016 | ||
BG | 05.01.2017 | ||
NO | 05.01.2017 | ||
GR | 06.01.2017 | ||
GB | 24.01.2017 | ||
IE | 24.01.2017 | ||
LU | 24.01.2017 | ||
MT | 24.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
FR | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
IS | 05.02.2017 | ||
PT | 06.02.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 24.01.2013 | |
AT | 05.10.2016 | ||
BE | 05.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2016 | ||
DK | 05.10.2016 | ||
EE | 05.10.2016 | ||
ES | 05.10.2016 | ||
FI | 05.10.2016 | ||
HR | 05.10.2016 | ||
IT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LV | 05.10.2016 | ||
MC | 05.10.2016 | ||
NL | 05.10.2016 | ||
PL | 05.10.2016 | ||
RO | 05.10.2016 | ||
RS | 05.10.2016 | ||
SE | 05.10.2016 | ||
SI | 05.10.2016 | ||
SK | 05.10.2016 | ||
SM | 05.10.2016 | ||
BG | 05.01.2017 | ||
NO | 05.01.2017 | ||
GR | 06.01.2017 | ||
GB | 24.01.2017 | ||
IE | 24.01.2017 | ||
LU | 24.01.2017 | ||
MT | 24.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
FR | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
IS | 05.02.2017 | ||
PT | 06.02.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 05.10.2016 | |
BE | 05.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2016 | ||
DK | 05.10.2016 | ||
EE | 05.10.2016 | ||
ES | 05.10.2016 | ||
FI | 05.10.2016 | ||
HR | 05.10.2016 | ||
IT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LV | 05.10.2016 | ||
MC | 05.10.2016 | ||
NL | 05.10.2016 | ||
PL | 05.10.2016 | ||
RO | 05.10.2016 | ||
RS | 05.10.2016 | ||
SE | 05.10.2016 | ||
SI | 05.10.2016 | ||
SK | 05.10.2016 | ||
SM | 05.10.2016 | ||
BG | 05.01.2017 | ||
NO | 05.01.2017 | ||
GR | 06.01.2017 | ||
GB | 24.01.2017 | ||
IE | 24.01.2017 | ||
LU | 24.01.2017 | ||
MT | 24.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
FR | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
IS | 05.02.2017 | ||
PT | 06.02.2017 | ||
Former [2018/13] | AT | 05.10.2016 | |
BE | 05.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2016 | ||
DK | 05.10.2016 | ||
EE | 05.10.2016 | ||
ES | 05.10.2016 | ||
FI | 05.10.2016 | ||
HR | 05.10.2016 | ||
IT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LV | 05.10.2016 | ||
MC | 05.10.2016 | ||
NL | 05.10.2016 | ||
PL | 05.10.2016 | ||
RO | 05.10.2016 | ||
RS | 05.10.2016 | ||
SE | 05.10.2016 | ||
SI | 05.10.2016 | ||
SK | 05.10.2016 | ||
SM | 05.10.2016 | ||
BG | 05.01.2017 | ||
NO | 05.01.2017 | ||
GR | 06.01.2017 | ||
GB | 24.01.2017 | ||
IE | 24.01.2017 | ||
LU | 24.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
FR | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
IS | 05.02.2017 | ||
PT | 06.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 05.10.2016 | |
BE | 05.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2016 | ||
DK | 05.10.2016 | ||
EE | 05.10.2016 | ||
ES | 05.10.2016 | ||
FI | 05.10.2016 | ||
HR | 05.10.2016 | ||
IT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LV | 05.10.2016 | ||
MC | 05.10.2016 | ||
NL | 05.10.2016 | ||
PL | 05.10.2016 | ||
RO | 05.10.2016 | ||
RS | 05.10.2016 | ||
SE | 05.10.2016 | ||
SI | 05.10.2016 | ||
SK | 05.10.2016 | ||
SM | 05.10.2016 | ||
BG | 05.01.2017 | ||
NO | 05.01.2017 | ||
GR | 06.01.2017 | ||
GB | 24.01.2017 | ||
LU | 24.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
FR | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
IS | 05.02.2017 | ||
PT | 06.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 05.10.2016 | |
BE | 05.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2016 | ||
DK | 05.10.2016 | ||
EE | 05.10.2016 | ||
ES | 05.10.2016 | ||
FI | 05.10.2016 | ||
HR | 05.10.2016 | ||
IT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LV | 05.10.2016 | ||
MC | 05.10.2016 | ||
NL | 05.10.2016 | ||
PL | 05.10.2016 | ||
RO | 05.10.2016 | ||
RS | 05.10.2016 | ||
SE | 05.10.2016 | ||
SI | 05.10.2016 | ||
SK | 05.10.2016 | ||
SM | 05.10.2016 | ||
BG | 05.01.2017 | ||
NO | 05.01.2017 | ||
GR | 06.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
FR | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
IS | 05.02.2017 | ||
PT | 06.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/42] | AT | 05.10.2016 | |
BE | 05.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2016 | ||
DK | 05.10.2016 | ||
EE | 05.10.2016 | ||
ES | 05.10.2016 | ||
FI | 05.10.2016 | ||
HR | 05.10.2016 | ||
IT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LV | 05.10.2016 | ||
MC | 05.10.2016 | ||
NL | 05.10.2016 | ||
PL | 05.10.2016 | ||
RO | 05.10.2016 | ||
RS | 05.10.2016 | ||
SE | 05.10.2016 | ||
SK | 05.10.2016 | ||
SM | 05.10.2016 | ||
BG | 05.01.2017 | ||
NO | 05.01.2017 | ||
GR | 06.01.2017 | ||
IS | 05.02.2017 | ||
PT | 06.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/38] | AT | 05.10.2016 | |
BE | 05.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2016 | ||
DK | 05.10.2016 | ||
EE | 05.10.2016 | ||
ES | 05.10.2016 | ||
FI | 05.10.2016 | ||
HR | 05.10.2016 | ||
IT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LV | 05.10.2016 | ||
NL | 05.10.2016 | ||
PL | 05.10.2016 | ||
RO | 05.10.2016 | ||
RS | 05.10.2016 | ||
SE | 05.10.2016 | ||
SK | 05.10.2016 | ||
SM | 05.10.2016 | ||
BG | 05.01.2017 | ||
NO | 05.01.2017 | ||
GR | 06.01.2017 | ||
IS | 05.02.2017 | ||
PT | 06.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 05.10.2016 | |
BE | 05.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2016 | ||
DK | 05.10.2016 | ||
EE | 05.10.2016 | ||
ES | 05.10.2016 | ||
FI | 05.10.2016 | ||
HR | 05.10.2016 | ||
IT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LV | 05.10.2016 | ||
NL | 05.10.2016 | ||
PL | 05.10.2016 | ||
RO | 05.10.2016 | ||
RS | 05.10.2016 | ||
SE | 05.10.2016 | ||
SK | 05.10.2016 | ||
SM | 05.10.2016 | ||
NO | 05.01.2017 | ||
GR | 06.01.2017 | ||
IS | 05.02.2017 | ||
PT | 06.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/36] | AT | 05.10.2016 | |
BE | 05.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2016 | ||
DK | 05.10.2016 | ||
EE | 05.10.2016 | ||
ES | 05.10.2016 | ||
FI | 05.10.2016 | ||
HR | 05.10.2016 | ||
LT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LV | 05.10.2016 | ||
NL | 05.10.2016 | ||
PL | 05.10.2016 | ||
RO | 05.10.2016 | ||
RS | 05.10.2016 | ||
SE | 05.10.2016 | ||
SK | 05.10.2016 | ||
NO | 05.01.2017 | ||
GR | 06.01.2017 | ||
IS | 05.02.2017 | ||
PT | 06.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/34] | AT | 05.10.2016 | |
BE | 05.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2016 | ||
DK | 05.10.2016 | ||
ES | 05.10.2016 | ||
FI | 05.10.2016 | ||
HR | 05.10.2016 | ||
LT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LV | 05.10.2016 | ||
NL | 05.10.2016 | ||
PL | 05.10.2016 | ||
RS | 05.10.2016 | ||
SE | 05.10.2016 | ||
NO | 05.01.2017 | ||
GR | 06.01.2017 | ||
IS | 05.02.2017 | ||
PT | 06.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/33] | AT | 05.10.2016 | |
BE | 05.10.2016 | ||
DK | 05.10.2016 | ||
ES | 05.10.2016 | ||
FI | 05.10.2016 | ||
HR | 05.10.2016 | ||
LT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LV | 05.10.2016 | ||
NL | 05.10.2016 | ||
PL | 05.10.2016 | ||
RS | 05.10.2016 | ||
SE | 05.10.2016 | ||
NO | 05.01.2017 | ||
GR | 06.01.2017 | ||
IS | 05.02.2017 | ||
PT | 06.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/26] | AT | 05.10.2016 | |
BE | 05.10.2016 | ||
ES | 05.10.2016 | ||
FI | 05.10.2016 | ||
HR | 05.10.2016 | ||
LT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LV | 05.10.2016 | ||
NL | 05.10.2016 | ||
PL | 05.10.2016 | ||
RS | 05.10.2016 | ||
SE | 05.10.2016 | ||
NO | 05.01.2017 | ||
GR | 06.01.2017 | ||
IS | 05.02.2017 | ||
PT | 06.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/12] | LV | 05.10.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]JP2011163291 (KYB CO LTD); | [A]JP2011174491 (KYB CO LTD); | [A]JPH09268604 (SAMSUNG HEAVY IND); | [A]JPS6113006U (TOSHIBA MACHINE CO., LTD.) | by applicant | JP2011241947 |