EP2809147 - GLYPHOSATE RESISTANT PLANTS AND ASSOCIATED METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.07.2019 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.08.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.03.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dow AgroSciences LLC 9330 Zionsville Road Indianapolis, IN 46268 / US | [2014/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIRA, Justin M. 8974 Windpointe Pass Zionsville, Indiana 46077 / US | 02 /
CICCHILLO, Robert M. 553 Stafford Drive Westfield, Indiana 46074 / US | 03 /
YERKES, Carla 4571 South State Road 47 Crawfordsville, Indiana 47933 / US | 04 /
ROBINSON, Andrew E. 7623 Hickory Road Brownsburg, Indiana 46112 / US | [2014/50] | Representative(s) | f & e patent Braunsberger Feld 29 51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/50] | f & e patent Fleischer, Engels & Partner mbB, Patentanwälte Braunsberger Feld 29 51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | Application number, filing date | 13744288.5 | 01.02.2013 | [2018/38] | WO2013US24410 | Priority number, date | US201261593555P | 01.02.2012 Original published format: US 201261593555 P | US201261625222P | 17.04.2012 Original published format: US 201261625222 P | [2014/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013116700 | Date: | 08.08.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2809147 | Date: | 10.12.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.08.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2809147 | Date: | 19.09.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 08.08.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.07.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/82, C12N15/63, C12N15/29, A01H5/00, C07K14/415, C12N9/10, A01N57/20, C12N9/02, C12N15/62 | [2018/14] | CPC: |
C12N15/8221 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C12N9/1092 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A01H5/00 (RU);
A01H5/10 (RU);
A01N57/20 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C07K14/415 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C12N15/62 (EP,KR,US);
C12N15/8205 (CN,US);
C12N15/8209 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C12N15/8214 (CN,US);
C12N15/8241 (CN,US);
C12N15/8245 (CN,US);
C12N15/8247 (CN,US);
C12N15/8261 (CN);
C12N15/8274 (EP,CN,US);
C12N15/8275 (EP,CN,KR,RU,US);
C12N15/8281 (CN,US);
C12N15/8283 (CN,US);
C12N15/8286 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C12N9/0069 (EP,CN,US);
C12N9/0071 (EP,CN,US);
C12N9/1085 (EP,CN,US);
C12N9/96 (US);
C12Y113/00 (EP,CN,US);
C12Y114/11 (EP,CN,US);
C12Y205/01019 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C07K2319/00 (CN);
|
Former IPC [2014/50] | A01H5/00, C12N15/29, C12N15/63, C12N15/82 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/50] | Extension states | BA | 29.08.2014 | Title | German: | GLYPHOSATRESISTENTE PFLANZEN UND ZUGEHÖRIGE VERFAHREN | [2014/50] | English: | GLYPHOSATE RESISTANT PLANTS AND ASSOCIATED METHODS | [2014/50] | French: | PLANTES RÉSISTANTES AU GLYPHOSATE ET PROCÉDÉS ASSOCIÉS | [2014/50] | Entry into regional phase | 29.08.2014 | National basic fee paid | 29.08.2014 | Search fee paid | 29.08.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.08.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.08.2014 | Examination requested [2014/50] | 01.02.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.12.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.04.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.09.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.01.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.03.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.08.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 03.08.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.08.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP17168214.9 / EP3219200 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.12.2016 | Opposition(s) | 20.06.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 19.09.2018 | AT | 19.09.2018 | CY | 19.09.2018 | CZ | 19.09.2018 | DK | 19.09.2018 | EE | 19.09.2018 | FI | 19.09.2018 | HR | 19.09.2018 | LT | 19.09.2018 | LV | 19.09.2018 | MC | 19.09.2018 | MK | 19.09.2018 | PL | 19.09.2018 | RO | 19.09.2018 | RS | 19.09.2018 | SE | 19.09.2018 | SI | 19.09.2018 | SK | 19.09.2018 | SM | 19.09.2018 | TR | 19.09.2018 | BG | 19.12.2018 | NO | 19.12.2018 | GR | 20.12.2018 | IS | 19.01.2019 | PT | 19.01.2019 | IE | 01.02.2019 | LU | 01.02.2019 | MT | 01.02.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/26] | AL | 19.09.2018 | |
AT | 19.09.2018 | ||
CY | 19.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2018 | ||
DK | 19.09.2018 | ||
EE | 19.09.2018 | ||
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
MC | 19.09.2018 | ||
PL | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
RS | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
SI | 19.09.2018 | ||
SK | 19.09.2018 | ||
SM | 19.09.2018 | ||
TR | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
PT | 19.01.2019 | ||
IE | 01.02.2019 | ||
LU | 01.02.2019 | ||
MT | 01.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 19.09.2018 | |
AT | 19.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2018 | ||
DK | 19.09.2018 | ||
EE | 19.09.2018 | ||
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
MC | 19.09.2018 | ||
PL | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
RS | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
SI | 19.09.2018 | ||
SK | 19.09.2018 | ||
SM | 19.09.2018 | ||
TR | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
PT | 19.01.2019 | ||
IE | 01.02.2019 | ||
LU | 01.02.2019 | ||
MT | 01.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 19.09.2018 | |
AT | 19.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2018 | ||
DK | 19.09.2018 | ||
EE | 19.09.2018 | ||
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
MC | 19.09.2018 | ||
PL | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
RS | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
SI | 19.09.2018 | ||
SK | 19.09.2018 | ||
SM | 19.09.2018 | ||
TR | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
PT | 19.01.2019 | ||
IE | 01.02.2019 | ||
LU | 01.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 19.09.2018 | |
AT | 19.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2018 | ||
DK | 19.09.2018 | ||
EE | 19.09.2018 | ||
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
MC | 19.09.2018 | ||
PL | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
RS | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
SI | 19.09.2018 | ||
SK | 19.09.2018 | ||
SM | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
PT | 19.01.2019 | ||
IE | 01.02.2019 | ||
LU | 01.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 19.09.2018 | |
AT | 19.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2018 | ||
DK | 19.09.2018 | ||
EE | 19.09.2018 | ||
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
MC | 19.09.2018 | ||
PL | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
RS | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
SI | 19.09.2018 | ||
SK | 19.09.2018 | ||
SM | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
PT | 19.01.2019 | ||
LU | 01.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | AL | 19.09.2018 | |
AT | 19.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2018 | ||
DK | 19.09.2018 | ||
EE | 19.09.2018 | ||
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
MC | 19.09.2018 | ||
PL | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
RS | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
SK | 19.09.2018 | ||
SM | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
PT | 19.01.2019 | ||
LU | 01.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/45] | AL | 19.09.2018 | |
AT | 19.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2018 | ||
DK | 19.09.2018 | ||
EE | 19.09.2018 | ||
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
MC | 19.09.2018 | ||
PL | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
RS | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
SK | 19.09.2018 | ||
SM | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
PT | 19.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AL | 19.09.2018 | |
AT | 19.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2018 | ||
DK | 19.09.2018 | ||
EE | 19.09.2018 | ||
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
PL | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
RS | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
SK | 19.09.2018 | ||
SM | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
PT | 19.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 19.09.2018 | |
AT | 19.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2018 | ||
EE | 19.09.2018 | ||
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
PL | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
RS | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
SK | 19.09.2018 | ||
SM | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
PT | 19.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AL | 19.09.2018 | |
AT | 19.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2018 | ||
EE | 19.09.2018 | ||
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
PL | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
RS | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
SK | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | AL | 19.09.2018 | |
CZ | 19.09.2018 | ||
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
PL | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
RS | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AL | 19.09.2018 | |
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
RS | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 19.09.2018 | |
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
RS | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | FI | 19.09.2018 | |
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
RS | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | FI | 19.09.2018 | |
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
RS | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 19.09.2018 | |
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 19.09.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2010078156 (SAPPHIRE ENERGY INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-14 * paragraphs [0225] , [ 282] , [ 462]; claims 1, 38, 39; sequence 10 *; | [XI] - "RecName: Full=3-phosphoshikimate 1-carboxyvinyltransferase {ECO:0000256|HAMAP-Rule:MF_00210, ECO:0000256|RuleBase:RU000531}; EC=2.5.1.19 {ECO:0000256|HAMAP-Rule:MF_00210, ECO:0000256|RuleBase:RU000531}; AltName: Full=5-enolpyruvylshikimate-3-phosphate synthase {ECO:0000256|HAMAP-Rule:MF_00210};", UniProt, (20081014), Database accession no. B5HND8, URL: EBI, XP002740889 [X] 1 * the whole document * [I] 2,3 | [YD] - HAGHANI K ET AL, "Comparative studies of wild type Escherichia coli 5-enolpyruvylshikimate 3-phosphate synthase with three glyphosate-insensitive mutated forms: Activity, stability and structural characterization", BIOCHIMICA ET BIOPHYSICA ACTA (BBA) - PROTEINS & PROTEOMICS, ELSEVIER, NETHERLANDS, vol. 1784, no. 9, doi:10.1016/J.BBAPAP.2007.07.021, ISSN 1570-9639, (20080901), pages 1167 - 1175, (20080812), XP023785470 [YD] 1-14 * abstract * * page 1174, column 1, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bbapap.2007.07.021 | [Y] - POLLEGIONI LOREDANO ET AL, "Molecular basis of glyphosate resistance - different approaches through protein engineering", FEBS JOURNAL, (201108), vol. 278, no. 16, pages 2753 - 2766, XP002740890 [Y] 1-14 * page 2755 - page 2757; figure 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1742-4658.2011.08214.x | International search | [A]US2011124503 (WRIGHT TERRY R [US], et al); | [A]US2011195845 (LIRA JUSTIN M [US], et al); | [A]US2011289620 (CUI YUNXING [US], et al); | [X] - "3-PHOSPHOSHIKIMATE 1-CARBOXYVINYLTRANSFERASE [STREPTOMYCES SVICEUS ATCC 29083].", GENEBANK, (20110922), Database accession no. ZP_06917240.1, URL: NCBI, XP008176476 | [Y] - WRIGHT, TERRY R. ET AL., "Robust crop resistance to broadleaf and grass herbicides provided by aryloxyalkanoate dioxygenase transgenes", PNAS, (20100923), vol. 107, no. 47, pages 20240 - 20245, XP055079634 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.1013154107 | by applicant | EP0242246 | US4769061 | US4810648 | EP0333033 | US4940838 | US4940835 | US4975374 | EP0418175 | EP0470856 | EP0487352 | EP0496630 | EP0496631 | WO9301294 | WO9302197 | EP0527036 | EP0560482 | US5266361 | US5268463 | US5332808 | WO9420627 | US5364780 | EP0625505 | EP0625508 | US5424276 | US5428147 | US5464763 | EP0682659 | US5506195 | US5510474 | US5510471 | US5510417 | US5591616 | US5599670 | US5607914 | WO9727207 | US5659026 | US5658772 | US5717084 | US5728925 | US5767373 | US5789156 | US5814618 | US5965387 | US6096947 | US6245968 | US6268549 | US6504082 | US6506559 | US2003066102 | US6573099 | US2003135879 | WO03080809 | US2003217393 | WO03102198 | US6720475 | US6730824 | WO2005014791 | US2005064474 | WO2005084190 | US7058515 | USRE39247E | WO2006110586 | WO2007053482 | WO2008021207 | US2009104700 | US2009111188 | US7838733 | - COMAI et al., Science, (19830000), vol. 221, pages 370 - 71 | - "Comparative studies of wild type Escherichia coli 5-enolpyruvylshikimate 3-phosphate synthase ....and structural characterization", HAGHANI K. et al., Biochimica et Biophysica Acta (BBA) - Proteins & Proteomics, Elsevier, vol. 1784, pages 1167 - 1175 | - POLLEGIONI L. et al., "Molecular basis of glyphosate resistance - different approaches through protein engineering", FEBS Journal, vol. 278, no. 16, pages 2753 - 2766, XP002740890 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1742-4658.2011.08214.x | - LEE et al., EMBOJ, (19880000), vol. 7, page 1241 | - MIKI et al., Theor. Appl. Genet., (19900000), vol. 80, page 449 | - NAKAMURA et al., Nucl. Acids Res., (20000000), vol. 28, page 292 | - RUSSELL; BARTON, J. Mol. Biol., (19940000), vol. 244, pages 332 - 50 | - HIGGINS; SHARP, CABIOS, (19890000), vol. 5, pages 151 - 3 | - HIGGINS et al., Comput. Appl. Biosci., (19920000), vol. 8, pages 189 - 91 | - ALTSCHUL et al., J. Mol. Biol., (19900000), vol. 215, pages 403 - 10 | - PEARSON, Comput. Methods Genome Res. ΓProc. Int. Symp.1, Plenum, (19920000), pages 111 - 20 | - AUSUBEL et al., Short Protocols in Molecular Biology, Wiley, (19970000), pages 2 - 40 | - MEINKOTH; WAHL, Anal. Biochem., (19840000), vol. 138, pages 267 - 84 | - HOFTE; WHITELEY, Microbiol. Rev., (19890000), vol. 53, no. 2, pages 242 - 55 | - ADANG et al., Gene, (19850000), vol. 36, pages 289 - 300 | - MULLER, Protein Sci., (20060000), vol. 15, no. 6, pages 1356 - 68 | - ELKINS et al., Biochemistry, (20020000), vol. 41, no. 16, pages 5185 - 92 | - CHAKRABARTI et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (20050000), vol. 102, no. 34, pages 12035 - 40 | - LARSON et al., Protein Sci., (20020000), vol. 11, pages 2804 - 13 | - CRAMERI et al., Nat. Biotechnol., (19970000), vol. 15, pages 436 - 8 | - STEMMER, Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19940000), vol. 91, pages 10747 - 51 | - STEMMER, Nature, (19940000), vol. 370, pages 389 - 91 | - STEMMER, Bio/Technology, (19950000), vol. 13, pages 549 - 53 | - CRAMERI et al., Nat. Med., (19960000), vol. 2, pages 100 - 3 | - CRAMERI et al., Nat. Biotechnol., (19960000), vol. 14, pages 315 - 9 | - "Algorithms and Thermodynamics for RNA Secondary Structure Prediction: A Practical Guide", ZUCKER et al., RNA Biochemistry and Biotechnology, Kluwer Academic Publishers, (19990000), vol. 11-43 | - ZUCKER et al., J. Mol. Biol., (19990000), vol. 288, pages 911 - 40 | - "RNA Secondary Structure Prediction", ZUCKER et al., Current Protocols in Nucleic Acid Chemistry, John Wiley & Sons, (20000000), pages 1 - 10 | - EDDY; DURBIN, Nucl. Acids Res., (19940000), vol. 22, pages 2079 - 88 | - GORODKIN et al., Nucleic Acids Res., (19970000), vol. 25, no. 18, pages 3724 - 32 | - GORODKIN et al., Proceedings International Conference on Intelligent Systems for Molecular Biology , (19970000), vol. 5, pages 120 - 123 | - AUSUBEL, Current Protocols in Molecular Biology | - PALVA et al., Gene, (19830000), vol. 22, pages 229 - 235 | - CALLIS et al., J. Biol. Chem., (19900000), vol. 265, pages 12486 - 12493 | - VERDAGUER et al., Plant Molecular Biology, (19960000), vol. 31, pages 1129 - 1139 | - ODELL et al., Nature, (19850000), vol. 313, pages 810 - 812 | - MCELROY et al., Plant Cell, (19900000), vol. 2, pages 163 - 171 | - CHRISTENSEN et al., Plant Mol. Biol., (19890000), vol. 12, pages 619 - 632 | - CHRISTENSEN et al., Plant Mol. Biol., (19920000), vol. 18, pages 675 - 689 | - LAST et al., Theor. Appl. Genet., (19910000), vol. 81, pages 581 - 588 | - CHABOUTE et al., Plant Molecular Biology, (19870000), vol. 8, pages 179 - 191 | - WARD et al., Plant Mol. Biol., (19930000), vol. 22, pages 361 - 366 | - METT et al., PNAS, (19930000), vol. 90, pages 4567 - 4571 | - HERSHEY et al., Mol. Gen. Genetics, (19910000), vol. 227, pages 229 - 237 | - GATZ et al., Mol. Gen. Genetics, (19940000), vol. 243, pages 32 - 38 | - GATZ et al., Mol. Gen. Genet., (19910000), vol. 227, pages 229 - 237 | - SCHENA et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. U.S.A., (19910000), vol. 88, page 10421 | - MCNELLIS et al., Plant J., (19980000), vol. 14, no. 2, pages 247 - 257 | - ONO S; KUSAMA M; OGURA R; HIRATSUKA K., "Evaluation of the Use of the Tobacco PR-la Promoter to Monitor Defense Gene Expression by the Luciferase Bioluminescence Reporter System", Biosci Biotechnol Biochem., (20110923), vol. 75, no. 9, pages 1796 - 800 | - TAKAHASHI et al., Plant Physiol., (19920000), vol. 99, pages 383 - 390 | - GERLACH et al., PNAS USA, (19820000), vol. 79, pages 2981 - 2985 | - WALKER et al., PNAS, (19870000), vol. 84, no. 19, pages 6624 - 6628 | - YAMAMOTO et al., Plant J., (19970000), vol. 12, no. 2, pages 255 - 265 | - FEINBAUM et al., Mol. Gen. Genet., (19910000), vol. 226, page 449 | - LAM; CHUA, Science, (19900000), vol. 248, page 471 | - MATSUOKA et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19930000), vol. 90, no. 20, pages 9586 - 9590 | - OROZCO et al., Plant Mol. Bio., (19930000), vol. 23, no. 6, pages 1129 - 1138 | - YAMAGUCHI-SHINOZAKI et al., Plant Mol. Biol., (19900000), vol. 15, page 905 | - KARES et al., Plant Mol. Biol., (19900000), vol. 15, page 225 | - HERSHEY et al., Mol. Gen. Gene., (19910000), vol. 227, pages 229 - 237 | - GATZ et al., Mol. Gen. Genet., (19940000), vol. 243, pages 32 - 38 | - ZANG et al., Plant Sciences, (19970000), vol. 129, pages 81 - 89 | - HAJELA et al., Plant Physiol., (19900000), vol. 93, pages 1246 - 1252 | - WILHELM et al., Plant Mol Biol, (19930000), vol. 23, pages 1073 - 1077 | - OUELLET et al., FEBS Lett., (19980000), pages 423 - 324,328 | - KIRCH et al., Plant Mol Biol., (19970000), vol. 33, pages 897 - 909 | - SCHNEIDER et al., Plant Physiol., (19970000), vol. 113, pages 335 - 45 | - CHAUDHARY et al., Plant Mol. Biol., (19960000), vol. 30, pages 1247 - 57 | - KASUGA et al., Nature Biotechnology, (19990000), vol. 18, pages 287 - 291 | - VILARDELL et al., Plant Mol. Biol., (19910000), vol. 17, pages 985 - 93 | - RAGHOTHAMA et al., Plant Mol Biol, (19930000), vol. 23, pages 1117 - 28 | - BARROS et al., Plant Mol., (19920000), vol. 19, pages 665 - 75 | - MARRS et al., Dev. Genet., (19930000), vol. 14, pages 27 - 41 | - WATERS et al., J. Experimental Botany, (19960000), vol. 47, pages 325 - 338 | - YAMAGUCHI-SHINOZAKI et al., Mol. Gen. Genetics, (19930000), vol. 236, pages 331 - 340 | - GUEVARA-GARCIA et al., Plant J., (19930000), vol. 4, no. 3, pages 495 - 505 | - HANSEN et al., Mol. Gen. Genet., (19970000), vol. 254, no. 3, pages 337 - 343 | - BUSTOS et al., The Plant Cell, (19890000), vol. 1, pages 839 - 853 | - BELANGER et al., Genetics, (19910000), vol. 129, pages 863 - 972 | - FOBERT et al., "T-DNA tagging of a seed coat-specific cryptic promoter in tobacco", Plant J., (19940000), vol. 4, pages 567 - 577, XP002030412 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1046/j.1365-313X.1994.6040567.x | - CHOPRA et al., "Alleles of the maize P gene with distinct tissue specificities encode Myb-homologous proteins with C-terminal replacements", Plant Cell, (19960000), vol. 7, pages 1149 - 1158 | - ERRATUM, Plant Cell, (19970000), vol. 1, page 109 | - BELENGER; KRIZ, "Molecular basis for Allelic Polymorphism of the maize Globulin-1 gene", Genetics, (19910000), vol. 129, pages 863 - 972 | - MUHITCH et al., "Isolation of a Promoter Sequence From the Glutamine Synthetasei- Gene Capable of Conferring Tissue-Specific Gene Expression in Transgenic Maize", Plant Science, (20020000), vol. 163, pages 865 - 872, XP002311751 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0168-9452(02)00235-2 | - THOMPSON; MYATT, Plant Mol. Biol., (19970000), vol. 34, pages 687 - 692 | - "Vectors for Plant Transformation", GRUBER et al., Methods in Plant Molecular Biology and Biotechnology, CRC Press, (19930000), pages 89 - 119 | - DEPICKER et al., Mol. and Appl. Genet., (19820000), vol. 1, pages 561 - 573 | - SHAW et al., Nucleic Acids Research, (19840000), vol. 12, no. 20, pages 7831 - 7846 | - GUERINEAU et al., Mol. Gen. Genet., (19910000), vol. 262, pages 141 - 144 | - PROUDFOOT, Cell, (19910000), vol. 64, pages 671 - 674 | - SANFACON et al., Genes Dev., (19910000), vol. 5, pages 141 - 149 | - MOGEN et al., Plant Cell, (19900000), vol. 2, pages 1261 - 1272 | - MUNROE et al., Gene, (19900000), vol. 91, pages 151 - 158 | - BALLAS et al., Nucleic Acids Res., (19890000), vol. 17, pages 7891 - 7903 | - JOSHI et al., Nucleic Acid Res., (19870000), vol. 15, pages 9627 - 9639 | - ELROY-STEIN et al., Proc. Nat. Acad. Sci. USA, (19890000), vol. 86, pages 6126 - 6130 | - CARRINGTON; FREED, Journal of Virology, (19900000), vol. 64, pages 1590 - 1597 | - ALLISON et al., Virology, (19860000), vol. 154, pages 9 - 20 | - MACEJAK et al., Nature, (19910000), vol. 353, pages 90 - 94 | - JOBLING et al., Nature, (19870000), vol. 325, pages 622 - 625 | - GALLIE et al., Molecular Biology of RNA, (19890000), pages 237 - 256 | - LOMMEL et al., Virology, (19910000), vol. 81, pages 382 - 385 | - DELLA-CIOPPA et al., Plant Physiology, (19870000), vol. 84, pages 965 - 968 | - CHAUBET et al., Journal of Molecular Biology, (19920000), vol. 225, pages 569 - 574 | - NELSON et al., Plant Physiol, (19980000), vol. 117, no. 4, pages 1235 - 1252 | - SULLIVAN et al., Plant Cell, vol. 3, no. 12, pages 1337 - 48 | - SULLIVAN et al., Planta, (19950000), vol. 196, no. 3, pages 477 - 84 | - SULLIVAN et al., J. Biol. Chem., (19920000), vol. 267, no. 26, pages 18999 - 9004 | - ROGERS, J. Biol. Chem., (19850000), vol. 260, pages 3731 - 3738 | - REISS, Plant Physiol. (Life Sci. Adv., (19940000), vol. 13, pages 143 - 149 | - HERRERA ESTRELLA et al., Nature, (19830000), vol. 303, pages 209 - 213 | - MEIJER et al., Plant Mol. Biol., (19910000), vol. 16, pages 807 - 820 | - HERRERA-ESTRELLA, EMBO J., (19830000), vol. 2, pages 987 - 995 | - FRALEY et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci USA, (19830000), vol. 80, page 4803 | - MARSH, Gene, (19840000), vol. 32, pages 481 - 485 | - WALDRON et al., Plant Mol. Biol., (19850000), vol. 5, pages 103 - 108 | - ZHIJIAN et al., Plant Science, (19950000), vol. 108, pages 219 - 227 | - HARTMAN, Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci., USA, (19880000), vol. 85, page 8047 | - TAMURA, Biosci. Biotechnol. Biochem., (19950000), vol. 59, pages 2336 - 2338 | - LEE et al., EMBO J., (19880000), vol. 7, pages 1241 - 1248 | - SMEDA et al., Plant Physiol., (19930000), vol. 103, pages 911 - 917 | - HERRERA ESTRELLA et al., EMBO J., (19830000), vol. 2, pages 987 - 992 | - JONES et al., Mol. Gen. Genet., (19870000), vol. 210, pages 86 - 91 | - BRETAGNE-SAGNARD et al., Transgenic Res., (19960000), vol. 5, pages 131 - 137 | - HILLE et al., Plant Mol. Biol., (19900000), vol. 7, pages 171 - 176 | - GUERINEAU et al., Plant Mol. Biol., (19900000), vol. 15, pages 127 - 136 | - STALKER et al., Science, (19880000), vol. 242, pages 419 - 423 | - SHAW et al., Science, (19860000), vol. 233, pages 478 - 481 | - DEBLOCK et al., EMBO J., (19870000), vol. 6, pages 2513 - 2518 | - WOHLLEBEN et al., Gene, (19880000), vol. 70, pages 25 - 37 | - GORDON-KAMM et al., Plant Cell, (19900000), vol. 2, page 603 | - UCHIMIYA et al., BioTechnology, (19930000), vol. 11, page 835 | - WHITE et al., Nucl. Acids Res., (19900000), vol. 18, page 1062 | - SPENCER et al., Theor. Appl. Genet., (19900000), vol. 79, pages 625 - 631 | - ANZAI et al., Mol. Gen. Gen., (19890000), vol. 219, page 492 | - JEFFERSON et al., EMBO Journal, vol. 6, no. 13, pages 3901 - 3907 | - YE et al., Science, (20000000), vol. 287, pages 303 - 305 | - TAYLOR; BRIGGS, The Plant Cell, (19900000), vol. 2, pages 115 - 127 | - DELLAPORTA et al., Chromosome Structure and Function, Kluwer Academic Publishers, (19880000), pages 263 - 282 | - KAO et al., Plant Cell, (19960000), vol. 8, pages 1171 - 1179 | - SCHEFFLER et al., Mol. Gen. Genet., (19940000), vol. 242, pages 40 - 48 | - WIENAND et al., Mol. Gen. Genet., (19860000), vol. 203, pages 202 - 207 | - CHANDLER et al., Plant Cell, (19890000), vol. 1, pages 1175 - 1183 | - GROTEWOLD et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci USA, (19910000), vol. 88, pages 4587 - 4591 | - GROTEWOLD et al., Cell, (19940000), vol. 76, pages 543 - 553 | - SIDORENKO et al., Plant Mol. Biol., (19990000), vol. 39, pages 11 - 19 | - RALSTON et al., Genetics, (19880000), vol. 119, pages 185 - 197 | - NASH et al., Plant Cell, (19900000), vol. 2, no. 11, pages 1039 - 1049 | - BOLTE et al., J. Cell Science, (20040000), vol. 117, pages 943 - 54 | - KATO et al., Plant Physiol, (20020000), vol. 129, pages 913 - 42 | - TEERI et al., EMBO J., (19890000), vol. 8, page 343 | - SHEEN et al., Plant J., (19950000), vol. 8, no. 5, pages 777 - 84 | - DIETRICH et al., Biotechniques, (20020000), vol. 2, no. 2, pages 286 - 293 | - SUTCLIFFE, Proc. Nat'l. Acad. Sci. U.S.A., (19780000), vol. 75, page 3737 | - ZUKOWSKY et al., Proc. Nat'l. Acad. Sci. U.S.A., (19830000), vol. 80, page 1101 | - IKUTA et al., Biotech., (19900000), vol. 8, page 241 | - KATZ et al., J. Gen. Microbiol., (19830000), vol. 129, page 2703 | - GOTO-FUMIYUKI et al., Nat. Biotechnol., (19990000), vol. 17, pages 282 - 6 | - MIKI, Methods in Plant Molecular Biology and Biotechnology, CRC Press, Inc., (19930000), pages 67 - 88 | - D'HALLUIN et al., Plant Cell, (19920000), vol. 4, pages 1495 - 505 | - KLEIN et al., Nature, (19870000), vol. 327, pages 70 - 3 | - SANFORD et al., Part. Sci. Technol., (19870000), vol. 5, page 27 | - SANFORD, Trends Biotech., (19880000), vol. 6, page 299 | - SANFORD, Physiol. Plant, (19900000), vol. 79, page 206 | - KLEIN et al., Biotechnology, (19920000), vol. 10, page 268 | - KAEPPLER et al., Plant Cell Rep., (19900000), vol. 9, pages 415 - 8 | - HORSCH et al., Science, (19850000), vol. 227, page 1229 | - KADO, Crit. Rev. Plant. Sci., (19910000), vol. 10, page 1 | - MOLONEY et al., Plant Cell Reports, (19890000), vol. 8, page 238 | - Aerobacterium Protocols, Humana Press Inc., vol. 1, pages 15 - 41 | - KOMORI et al., Plant Physiol., (20070000), vol. 145, pages 1155 - 60 | - BEVAN, Nuc. Acid Res., (19840000), vol. 12, pages 8711 - 21 | - HORSCH et al., Science, (19850000), vol. 227, pages 1229 - 31 | - BEVAN et al., Ann. Rev. Genet, (19820000), vol. 16, pages 357 - 84 | - ROGERS et al., Methods Enzymol., (19860000), vol. 118, pages 627 - 41 | - HERNALSTEEN et al., EMBO J, (19840000), vol. 3, pages 3039 - 41 | - HOOYKASS-VAN SLOGTEREN et al., Nature, (19840000), vol. 311, pages 763 - 4 | - GRIMSLEY et al., Nature, (19870000), vol. 325, pages 1677 - 9 | - BOULTON et al., Plant Mol. Biol., (19890000), vol. 12, pages 31 - 40 | - GOULD et al., Plant Physiol., (19910000), vol. 95, pages 426 - 34 | - Plant Cell Culture Protocols (Methods in Molecular Biology, Humana Press, (19990000), vol. 111 | - "Protoplasts Isolation and Culture", EVANS et al., Handbook of Plant Cell Culture, Macmillian Publishing Company, (19830000), pages 124 - 176 | - "Regeneration of Plants", BINDING, Plant Protoplasts, CRC Press, (19850000), pages 21 - 73 | - KLEE et al., Ann. Rev. of Plant Phys., (19870000), vol. 38, pages 467 - 486 | - PUCHTA et al., PNAS USA, (19960000), vol. 93, pages 5055 - 5060 | - KUMAR et al., Trends in Plant Sci., (20010000), vol. 6, no. 4, pages 155 - 159 | - ARAKI et al., J. Mol. Biol., (19850000), vol. 182, pages 191 - 203 | - MAESER; KAHLMANN, Mol. Gen. Genet., (19910000), vol. 230, pages 170 - 176 | - JONES et al., Science, (19940000), vol. 266, page 789 | - MARTIN et al., Science, (19930000), vol. 262, page 1432 | - MINDRINOS et al., Cell, (19940000), vol. 78, page 1089 | - GEISER et al., Gene, (19860000), vol. 48, page 109 | - ESTRUCH et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci., (19960000), vol. 93, pages 5389 - 94 | - VAN DAMME et al., Plant Molec. Biol., (19940000), vol. 24, page 825 | - ABE et al., J. Biol. Chem., (19870000), vol. 262, page 16793 | - HUUB et al., Plant Molec. Biol., (19930000), vol. 21, page 985 | - SUMITANI et al., Biosci. Biotech. Biochem., (19930000), vol. 57, page 1243 | - HAMMOCK et al., Nature, (19900000), vol. 344, page 458 | - J. Biol. Chem., vol. 269, page 9 | - PANG, Gene, (19920000), vol. 116, page 165 | - KRAMER et al., Insect Molec. Biol., (19930000), vol. 23, page 691 | - KAWALLECK et al., Plant Molec. Biol., (19930000), vol. 21, page 673 | - BOTELLA et al., Plant Molec. Biol., (19940000), vol. 24, page 757 | - GRIESS et al., Plant Physiol., (19940000), vol. 104, page 1467 | - JAYNES et al., Plant Sci., (19930000), vol. 89, page 43 | - BEACHY et al., Ann. Rev. Phytopathol., (19900000), vol. 28, page 451 | - TAVLADORAKI et al., Nature, (19930000), vol. 266, page 469 | - LAMB et al., Bio/Technology, (19920000), vol. 10, page 1436 | - TOUBART et al., Plant J., (19920000), vol. 2, page 367 | - LONGEMANN et al., Bio/Technology, (19920000), vol. 10, page 3305 | - LEE et al., EMBOJ., (19880000), vol. 7, page 1241 | - DE GREEF et al., Bio/Technology, (19890000), vol. 7, page 61 | - MARSHALL et al., Theor. Appl. Genet., (19920000), vol. 83, page 435 | - PRZIBILLA et al., Plant Cell, (19910000), vol. 3, page 169 | - HAYES et al., Biochem. J., (19920000), vol. 285, page 173 | - BRUSSIAN et al., EMBO J., (19890000), vol. 8, no. 4, pages 1237 - 1245 | - KNULTZON et al., Proc. Nat. Acad. Sci. USA, (19920000), vol. 89, page 2624 | - VAN HARTINGSVELDT et al., Gene, (19930000), vol. 127, page 87 | - RABOY et al., Maydica, (19900000), vol. 35, page 383 | - SHIROZA et al., J. Bacteriol., (19880000), vol. 170, page 810 | - STEINMETZ et al., Mol. Gen. Genel., (19850000), vol. 200, page 220 | - PEN et al., Bio/Technology, (19920000), vol. 10, page 292 | - SOGAARD et al., J. Biol. Chem., (19930000), vol. 268, page 22480 | - FISHER et al., Plant Physiol., (19930000), vol. 102, page 10450 | - HOOD et al., "Commercial Production of Avidin from Transgenic Maize; Characterization of Transformants, Production, Processing, Extraction and Purification", Molecular Breeding, (19970000), vol. 3, pages 291 - 306, XP002077009 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1023/A:1009676322162 | - TOWBIN et al., "Electrophoretic transfer of proteins from polyacrylamide gels to nitrocellulose sheets: procedure and some applications", Proc Natl Acad Sci USA, (19790000), vol. 76, no. 9, pages 4350 - 4354, XP000884060 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.76.9.4350 | - RENART et al., "Transfer of proteins from gels to diazobenzyloxymethyl-paper and detection with antisera: a method for studying antibody specificity and antigen structure", Proc Natl Acad Sci USA, vol. 76, no. 7, pages 3116 - 3120 | - WINGE, Innov. Pharma. Tech., (20000000), vol. 00, pages 18 - 24 | - "GENBANK", Database accession no. ZP_06917240.1 | - "GENBANK", Database accession no. YP 004922608.1 | - "GENBANK", Database accession no. ZP 04696613 | - "GENBANK", Database accession no. NC_010572 | - "GENBANK", Database accession no. P17688 | - "GENBANK", Database accession no. EU977181 | - "Genbank", Database accession no. ZP -06917240.1 | - LANZETTA et al., Anal. Bioch., (19790000), vol. 100, pages 95 - 7 | - VERDAGUER et al., Plant Mol. Biol., (19960000), vol. 31, pages 1129 - 1139 | - HUANG et al., J. Bacteriol., (19900000), vol. 172, pages 1814 - 1822 | - "Genbank", Database accession no. NC 003075 | - DUARTE et al., BMC Evol. Biol., vol. 10, page 61 | - "Genbank", Database accession no. AT4G24610 | - "Genbank", Database accession no. U16123.1 | - POPELKA JC; XU J; ALTPETER F., "Generation of rye with low transgene copy number after biolistic gene transfer and production of (Secale cereale L.) plants instantly marker-free transgenic rye", Transgenic Res., (20031000), vol. 12, no. 5, pages 587 - 96 | - ZHAO et al., "Agrobacterium-mediated sorghum transformation", Plant Mol Biol., (20001200), vol. 44, no. 6, pages 789 - 98, XP002533153 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1023/A:1026507517182 | - TINGAY et al., "Agrobacterium tumefaciens-mediated barley transformation", The Plant Journal, (19970000), vol. 11, pages 1369 - 1376, XP009080096 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1046/j.1365-313X.1997.11061369.x | - CHENG et al., "Genetic Transformation of Wheat Mediated by Agrobacterium tumefaciens", Plant Physiol., (19971100), vol. 115, no. 3, pages 971 - 980, XP002918248 | - HIEI et al., "Transformation of rice mediated by Agrobacterium tumefaciens", Plant Mol. Biol., (19970900), vol. 35, no. 1-2, pages 205 - 18, XP002124031 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1023/A:1005847615493 | - ZENG P.; VADNAIS D.A.; ZHANG Z.; POLACCO J.C., Plant Cell Rep., (20040000), vol. 22, no. 7, pages 478 - 482 | - PAZ M.; MARTINEZ J.; KALVIG A.; FONGER T.; WANG K., Plant Cell Rep., (20050000), vol. 25, pages 206 - 213 | - TOKI et al., Plant Physiology, (19920000), vol. 100, pages 1503 - 07 | - PAEK et al., Mol Cells, (19980000), vol. 8, no. 3, pages 336 - 42 | - MCELROY et al., The Plant Cell, (19900000), vol. 2, no. 2, pages 163 - 171 | - WOHLLEBEN et al., Gene, (19880000), vol. 70, no. 1, pages 25 - 37 | - CHENAULT et al., Plant Physiology, (19930000), vol. 101, no. 4, pages 1395 - 1396 | - WU et al., Transgenic Research, (20080000), vol. 17, pages 425 - 436 | - LIVAK; SCHMITTGEN, Methods, (20010000), vol. 25, pages 402 - 8 | - GAUTIER et al., Plant Science, (20000000), vol. 153, pages 81 - 91 | - Methods, (20010000), vol. 25, pages 402 - 8 |