EP2875356 - METHOD FOR DIAGNOSING SCLERODERMA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.06.2017 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.06.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.07.2017 [2017/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INSERM - Institut National de la Santé et de la Recherche Médicale 101, rue de Tolbiac 75013 Paris / FR | For all designated states Université d'Aix Marseille 58, boulevard Charles Livon Marseille 7 13284 Marseille Cedex 07 / FR | For all designated states Assistance Publique Hôpitaux de Marseille 80 Rue Brochier 13005 Marseille / FR | [2015/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LAMBERT, Nathalie INSERM UMRs 1097 Parc Scientifique de Luminy 163 avenue de Luminy F-13288 Marseille cedex 09 / FR | 02 /
AUGER, Isabelle INSERM UMRs 1097 Parc Scientifique de Luminy 163 avenue de Luminy F-13288 Marseille cedex 09 / FR | 03 /
ROUDIER, Jean INSERM UMRs 1097 Parc Scientifique de Luminy 163 avenue de Luminy F-13288 Marseille cedex 09 / FR | [2015/22] | Representative(s) | Hirsch, Denise Marie Inserm Transfert IP Department 7 rue Watt 75013 Paris / FR | [2015/22] | Application number, filing date | 13744473.3 | 23.07.2013 | WO2013EP65490 | Priority number, date | EP20120305893 | 23.07.2012 Original published format: EP 12305893 | [2015/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014016284 | Date: | 30.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2875356 | Date: | 27.05.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.01.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.01.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/564, G01N33/68 | [2015/22] | CPC: |
G01N33/564 (EP,US);
G01N33/6803 (US);
G01N33/6854 (EP,US);
G01N2800/101 (EP,US);
G01N2800/20 (EP,US);
G01N2800/24 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/22] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR DIAGNOSE VON SKLERODERMIE | [2015/22] | English: | METHOD FOR DIAGNOSING SCLERODERMA | [2015/22] | French: | MÉTHODE DE DIAGNOSTIC D'UNE SCLÉRODERMIE | [2015/22] | Entry into regional phase | 23.01.2015 | National basic fee paid | 23.01.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.01.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.01.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.01.2015 | Examination requested [2015/22] | 01.02.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/28] | 03.03.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2017/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2016 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO2007013124 (AVVEDIMENTO VITTORIO ENRICO [IT], et al) [Y] 1-3,6 * abstract *; | [YA] - F. ALKASSAB ET AL, "An allograft inflammatory factor 1 (AIF1) single nucleotide polymorphism (SNP) is associated with anticentromere antibody positive systemic sclerosis", RHEUMATOLOGY, (20070801), vol. 46, no. 8, doi:10.1093/rheumatology/kem057, ISSN 1462-0324, pages 1248 - 1251, XP055048095 [Y] 1-3,6 * abstract * [A] 4,5 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/rheumatology/kem057 | [XI] - AFFYMETRIX, "GeneChip TM Human Genome U133 Plus 2.0 Array", 20030101, (20030101), pages 1 - 2, XP007921349 [X] 9-11 * the whole document * [I] 6-8 |