EP2877468 - COMPOUNDS AND METHODS FOR TREATING HIV [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.06.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 21.07.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.03.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ViiV Healthcare UK Limited 980 Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | [2017/17] |
Former [2015/23] | For all designated states VIIV Healthcare UK Limited 980 Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DE LA ROSA, Martha Alicia c/o GlaxoSmithKline Global Patents Five Moore Drive Research Triangle Park, North Carolina 27709 / US | 02 /
JOHNS, Brian, Alvin c/o GlaxoSmithKline Global Patents Five Moore Drive Research Triangle Park, North Carolina 27709 / US | 03 /
KAZMIERSKI, Wieslaw, Mieczyslaw c/o GlaxoSmithKline Global Patents Five Moore Drive Research Triangle Park, North Carolina 27709 / US | 04 /
SAMANO, Vicente c/o GlaxoSmithKline Global Patents Five Moore Drive Research Triangle Park, North Carolina 27709 / US | 05 /
SUWANDI, Lita c/o GlaxoSmithKline Global Patents Five Moore Drive Research Triangle Park, North Carolina 27709 / US | 06 /
TEMELKOFF, David c/o GlaxoSmithKline Global Patents Five Moore Drive Research Triangle Park, North Carolina 27709 / US | 07 /
VELTHUISEN, Emile c/o GlaxoSmithKline Global Patents Five Moore Drive Research Triangle Park, North Carolina 27709 / US | 08 /
WEATHERHEAD, Jason, Gordon c/o GlaxoSmithKline Global Patents Five Moore Drive Research Triangle Park, North Carolina 27709 / US | [2015/23] | Representative(s) | Gladwin, Amanda Rachel, et al GlaxoSmithKline Global Patents (CN925.1) 980 Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | [2015/23] | Application number, filing date | 13744796.7 | 10.07.2013 | [2017/34] | WO2013IB01501 | Priority number, date | US201261670800P | 12.07.2012 Original published format: US 201261670800 P | US201261671787P | 15.07.2012 Original published format: US 201261671787 P | US201361755047P | 22.01.2013 Original published format: US 201361755047 P | US201361764716P | 14.02.2013 Original published format: US 201361764716 P | [2015/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014009794 | Date: | 16.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2877468 | Date: | 03.06.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.01.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2877468 | Date: | 23.08.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.01.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C07D471/04, C07D471/08, C07D471/14, C07D491/10, A61K31/437, A61P31/18 | [2015/23] | CPC: |
C07D471/14 (EP,US);
A61P31/14 (EP);
A61P31/18 (EP);
C07D471/04 (EP,US);
C07D471/08 (EP,US);
C07D491/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/23] | Extension states | BA | 21.01.2015 | ME | 21.01.2015 | Title | German: | VERBINDUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON HIV | [2015/23] | English: | COMPOUNDS AND METHODS FOR TREATING HIV | [2015/23] | French: | COMPOSÉS ET PROCÉDÉS DE TRAITEMENT DU VIH | [2015/23] | Entry into regional phase | 21.01.2015 | National basic fee paid | 21.01.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.01.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.01.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.01.2015 | Examination requested [2015/23] | 11.02.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.06.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.03.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.03.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.06.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 29.06.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.06.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.02.2016 | Opposition(s) | 24.05.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.07.2013 | AL | 23.08.2017 | AT | 23.08.2017 | CY | 23.08.2017 | CZ | 23.08.2017 | DK | 23.08.2017 | EE | 23.08.2017 | FI | 23.08.2017 | HR | 23.08.2017 | LT | 23.08.2017 | LV | 23.08.2017 | MC | 23.08.2017 | MK | 23.08.2017 | PL | 23.08.2017 | RO | 23.08.2017 | RS | 23.08.2017 | SI | 23.08.2017 | SK | 23.08.2017 | SM | 23.08.2017 | TR | 23.08.2017 | BG | 23.11.2017 | NO | 23.11.2017 | GR | 24.11.2017 | IS | 23.12.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 10.07.2013 | |
AT | 23.08.2017 | ||
CY | 23.08.2017 | ||
CZ | 23.08.2017 | ||
DK | 23.08.2017 | ||
EE | 23.08.2017 | ||
FI | 23.08.2017 | ||
HR | 23.08.2017 | ||
LT | 23.08.2017 | ||
LV | 23.08.2017 | ||
MC | 23.08.2017 | ||
MK | 23.08.2017 | ||
PL | 23.08.2017 | ||
RO | 23.08.2017 | ||
RS | 23.08.2017 | ||
SI | 23.08.2017 | ||
SK | 23.08.2017 | ||
SM | 23.08.2017 | ||
TR | 23.08.2017 | ||
BG | 23.11.2017 | ||
NO | 23.11.2017 | ||
GR | 24.11.2017 | ||
IS | 23.12.2017 | ||
Former [2020/28] | HU | 10.07.2013 | |
AT | 23.08.2017 | ||
CZ | 23.08.2017 | ||
DK | 23.08.2017 | ||
EE | 23.08.2017 | ||
FI | 23.08.2017 | ||
HR | 23.08.2017 | ||
LT | 23.08.2017 | ||
LV | 23.08.2017 | ||
MC | 23.08.2017 | ||
PL | 23.08.2017 | ||
RO | 23.08.2017 | ||
RS | 23.08.2017 | ||
SI | 23.08.2017 | ||
SK | 23.08.2017 | ||
SM | 23.08.2017 | ||
TR | 23.08.2017 | ||
BG | 23.11.2017 | ||
NO | 23.11.2017 | ||
GR | 24.11.2017 | ||
IS | 23.12.2017 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 23.08.2017 | |
CZ | 23.08.2017 | ||
DK | 23.08.2017 | ||
EE | 23.08.2017 | ||
FI | 23.08.2017 | ||
HR | 23.08.2017 | ||
LT | 23.08.2017 | ||
LV | 23.08.2017 | ||
MC | 23.08.2017 | ||
PL | 23.08.2017 | ||
RO | 23.08.2017 | ||
RS | 23.08.2017 | ||
SI | 23.08.2017 | ||
SK | 23.08.2017 | ||
SM | 23.08.2017 | ||
TR | 23.08.2017 | ||
BG | 23.11.2017 | ||
NO | 23.11.2017 | ||
GR | 24.11.2017 | ||
IS | 23.12.2017 | ||
Former [2019/15] | AT | 23.08.2017 | |
CZ | 23.08.2017 | ||
DK | 23.08.2017 | ||
EE | 23.08.2017 | ||
FI | 23.08.2017 | ||
HR | 23.08.2017 | ||
LT | 23.08.2017 | ||
LV | 23.08.2017 | ||
MC | 23.08.2017 | ||
PL | 23.08.2017 | ||
RO | 23.08.2017 | ||
RS | 23.08.2017 | ||
SI | 23.08.2017 | ||
SK | 23.08.2017 | ||
SM | 23.08.2017 | ||
BG | 23.11.2017 | ||
NO | 23.11.2017 | ||
GR | 24.11.2017 | ||
IS | 23.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 23.08.2017 | |
CZ | 23.08.2017 | ||
DK | 23.08.2017 | ||
EE | 23.08.2017 | ||
FI | 23.08.2017 | ||
HR | 23.08.2017 | ||
LT | 23.08.2017 | ||
LV | 23.08.2017 | ||
PL | 23.08.2017 | ||
RO | 23.08.2017 | ||
RS | 23.08.2017 | ||
SI | 23.08.2017 | ||
SK | 23.08.2017 | ||
SM | 23.08.2017 | ||
BG | 23.11.2017 | ||
NO | 23.11.2017 | ||
GR | 24.11.2017 | ||
IS | 23.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/25] | AT | 23.08.2017 | |
CZ | 23.08.2017 | ||
DK | 23.08.2017 | ||
EE | 23.08.2017 | ||
FI | 23.08.2017 | ||
HR | 23.08.2017 | ||
LT | 23.08.2017 | ||
LV | 23.08.2017 | ||
PL | 23.08.2017 | ||
RO | 23.08.2017 | ||
RS | 23.08.2017 | ||
SK | 23.08.2017 | ||
SM | 23.08.2017 | ||
BG | 23.11.2017 | ||
NO | 23.11.2017 | ||
GR | 24.11.2017 | ||
IS | 23.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 23.08.2017 | |
CZ | 23.08.2017 | ||
DK | 23.08.2017 | ||
FI | 23.08.2017 | ||
HR | 23.08.2017 | ||
LT | 23.08.2017 | ||
LV | 23.08.2017 | ||
PL | 23.08.2017 | ||
RS | 23.08.2017 | ||
BG | 23.11.2017 | ||
NO | 23.11.2017 | ||
GR | 24.11.2017 | ||
IS | 23.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/12] | AT | 23.08.2017 | |
FI | 23.08.2017 | ||
HR | 23.08.2017 | ||
LT | 23.08.2017 | ||
LV | 23.08.2017 | ||
PL | 23.08.2017 | ||
RS | 23.08.2017 | ||
BG | 23.11.2017 | ||
NO | 23.11.2017 | ||
GR | 24.11.2017 | ||
IS | 23.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 23.08.2017 | |
FI | 23.08.2017 | ||
HR | 23.08.2017 | ||
LT | 23.08.2017 | ||
PL | 23.08.2017 | ||
RS | 23.08.2017 | ||
BG | 23.11.2017 | ||
NO | 23.11.2017 | ||
GR | 24.11.2017 | ||
IS | 23.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 23.08.2017 | |
FI | 23.08.2017 | ||
HR | 23.08.2017 | ||
LT | 23.08.2017 | ||
RS | 23.08.2017 | ||
NO | 23.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/08] | FI | 23.08.2017 | |
LT | 23.08.2017 | ||
NO | 23.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | LT | 23.08.2017 | |
NO | 23.11.2017 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2012019003 (SQUIBB BRISTOL MYERS CO [US], et al) [A] 1-17 * page 1, line 4 - line 8 * * claims 1, 8 *; | [AP]WO2013012649 (GLAXOSMITHKLINE LLC [US], et al) [AP] 1-17 * paragraph [0002] * * table 1; compounds 1-146 * * claims 1, 57 *; | [AP]WO2013073875 (KOREA RES INST CHEM TECH [KR]) [AP] 1-17 * the whole document * | by applicant | GB427857 | WO02074769 | US4107288 | US5145684 | - Fieser and Fieser's Reagents for Organic Synthesis, JOHN WILEY AND SONS, (1991), vol. 1-15 | - Rodd's Chemistry of Carbon Compounds, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, (1989), vol. 1-5 | - Organic Reactions, JOHN WILEY AND SONS, (1991), vol. 1-40 | - March's Advanced Organic Chemistry, JOHN WILEY AND SONS | - Remington's Pharmaceutical Sciences, 17th ed.,, MACK PUBLISHING COMPANY, (1985), page 1418 | - Remington's Pharmaceutical Sciences, MACK PUBLISHING COMPANY | - HAZEN ET AL., "In vitro antiviral activity of the novel, tyrosyl-based human immunodeficiency virus (HIV) type 1 protease inhibitor brecanavir (GW640385) in combination with other antiretrovirals and against a panel of protease inhibitor-resistant HIV", ANTIMICROB. AGENTS CHEMOTHER, (2007), vol. 51, pages 3147 - 3154 | - PAUWELS ET AL., "Sensitive and rapid assay on MT-4 cells for the detection of antiviral compounds against the AIDS virus", J. OF VIROLOGICAL METHODS, (1987), vol. 16, doi:doi:10.1016/0166-0934(87)90002-4, pages 171 - 185, XP023695757 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0166-0934(87)90002-4 | WO2003US39644 | WO2003US39975 | WO2003US39619 | WO2003US39618 | WO2003US39740 | WO2003US39732 |