EP2880123 - NEW IRIDIUM-BASED COMPLEXES FOR ECL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.08.2017 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For:DE
Roche Diagnostics GmbH Sandhofer Straße 116 68305 Mannheim / DE | For:AL
AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
MK
MT
NL
NO
PL
PT
RO
RS
SE
SI
SK
SM
TR
F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2015/24] | For:DE
Roche Diagnostics GmbH Sandhofer Straße 116 68305 Mannheim / DE | ||
For:AL
AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
MK
MT
NL
NO
PL
PT
RO
RS
SE
SI
SK
SM
TR
F.Hoffmann-La Roche AG Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BERGMANN, Frank Faltergatter 5 82393 Iffeldorf / DE | 02 /
CYSEWSKI, Robert Broniewskiego 2A PL-89-620 Chojnice / PL | 03 /
DE COLA, Luisa 5a Boulevard du President Edwards F-67000 Strasbourg / FR | 04 /
DZIADEK, Sebastian Elilandstr. 2 83671 Benediktbeuern / DE | 05 /
FERNANDEZ HERNANDEZ, Jesus Miguel Calle Poetisa Dionisia Garcia, 3, 4ºC 30100 Murcia / ES | 06 /
JOSEL, Hans-Peter Ulmenstr. 28 82362 Weilheim / DE | 07 /
SEIDEL, Christoph Ammerstr. 39 82362 Weilheim / DE | [2016/40] |
Former [2015/24] | 01 /
BERGMANN, Frank Faltergatter 5 82393 Iffeldorf / DE | ||
02 /
CYSEWSKI, Robert Broniewskiego 2A PL-89-620 Chojnice / PL | |||
03 /
DE COLA, Luisa 5a Boulevard du President Edwards F-67000 Strasbourg / FR | |||
04 /
DZIADEK, Sebastian Elilandstr. 2 83671 Benediktbeuern / DE | |||
05 /
FERNANDEZ HERNANDEZ, Jesus Miguel Frauenstr. 28 48143 Münster / DE | |||
06 /
JOSEL, Hans-Peter Ulmenstr. 28 82362 Weilheim / DE | |||
07 /
SEIDEL, Christoph Ammerstr. 39 82362 Weilheim / DE | Representative(s) | Teschemacher, Andrea Patentanwälte Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler PartG mbB Prinzregentenstraße 68 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/24] | Teschemacher, Andrea Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler LLP Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstraße 68 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13744978.1 | 02.08.2013 | [2016/40] | WO2013EP02321 | Priority number, date | EP20120179048 | 02.08.2012 Original published format: EP 12179048 | [2015/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2014019707 | Date: | 06.02.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/06] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2880123 | Date: | 10.06.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.02.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2880123 | Date: | 05.10.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.04.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C09K11/06, C07F15/00, G01N33/58 | [2016/18] | CPC: |
C07F15/0033 (EP,CN,US);
C09K11/06 (EP,CN,US);
G01N33/582 (CN,US);
C09K2211/1007 (EP,US);
C09K2211/1011 (EP,US);
C09K2211/1029 (EP,CN,US);
C09K2211/14 (EP,US);
C09K2211/1408 (EP,US);
C09K2211/1416 (EP,US);
C09K2211/1425 (EP,US);
C09K2211/1441 (EP,US);
C09K2211/1466 (EP,US);
C09K2211/185 (EP,CN,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2015/24] | C09K11/06, C07F15/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/24] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NEUE ECL-KOMPLEXE AUF IRIDIUMBASIS | [2015/24] | English: | NEW IRIDIUM-BASED COMPLEXES FOR ECL | [2015/24] | French: | NOUVEAUX COMPLEXES À BASE D'IRIDIUM POUR ECL | [2015/24] | Entry into regional phase | 10.02.2015 | National basic fee paid | 10.02.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.02.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.02.2015 | Examination requested [2015/24] | 26.08.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.04.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.08.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 19.08.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.08.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.04.2016 | Opposition(s) | 06.07.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 02.08.2013 | AL | 05.10.2016 | AT | 05.10.2016 | BE | 05.10.2016 | CY | 05.10.2016 | CZ | 05.10.2016 | DK | 05.10.2016 | EE | 05.10.2016 | FI | 05.10.2016 | HR | 05.10.2016 | LT | 05.10.2016 | LV | 05.10.2016 | MC | 05.10.2016 | MK | 05.10.2016 | NL | 05.10.2016 | PL | 05.10.2016 | RO | 05.10.2016 | RS | 05.10.2016 | SE | 05.10.2016 | SI | 05.10.2016 | SK | 05.10.2016 | SM | 05.10.2016 | TR | 05.10.2016 | BG | 05.01.2017 | NO | 05.01.2017 | GR | 06.01.2017 | IS | 05.02.2017 | PT | 06.02.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 02.08.2013 | |
AT | 05.10.2016 | ||
BE | 05.10.2016 | ||
CY | 05.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2016 | ||
DK | 05.10.2016 | ||
EE | 05.10.2016 | ||
FI | 05.10.2016 | ||
HR | 05.10.2016 | ||
LT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LV | 05.10.2016 | ||
MC | 05.10.2016 | ||
MK | 05.10.2016 | ||
NL | 05.10.2016 | ||
PL | 05.10.2016 | ||
RO | 05.10.2016 | ||
RS | 05.10.2016 | ||
SE | 05.10.2016 | ||
SI | 05.10.2016 | ||
SK | 05.10.2016 | ||
SM | 05.10.2016 | ||
TR | 05.10.2016 | ||
BG | 05.01.2017 | ||
NO | 05.01.2017 | ||
GR | 06.01.2017 | ||
IS | 05.02.2017 | ||
PT | 06.02.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 02.08.2013 | |
AT | 05.10.2016 | ||
BE | 05.10.2016 | ||
CY | 05.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2016 | ||
DK | 05.10.2016 | ||
EE | 05.10.2016 | ||
FI | 05.10.2016 | ||
HR | 05.10.2016 | ||
LT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LV | 05.10.2016 | ||
MC | 05.10.2016 | ||
MK | 05.10.2016 | ||
NL | 05.10.2016 | ||
PL | 05.10.2016 | ||
RO | 05.10.2016 | ||
RS | 05.10.2016 | ||
SE | 05.10.2016 | ||
SI | 05.10.2016 | ||
SK | 05.10.2016 | ||
SM | 05.10.2016 | ||
BG | 05.01.2017 | ||
NO | 05.01.2017 | ||
GR | 06.01.2017 | ||
IS | 05.02.2017 | ||
PT | 06.02.2017 | ||
Former [2019/47] | HU | 02.08.2013 | |
AT | 05.10.2016 | ||
BE | 05.10.2016 | ||
CY | 05.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2016 | ||
DK | 05.10.2016 | ||
EE | 05.10.2016 | ||
FI | 05.10.2016 | ||
HR | 05.10.2016 | ||
LT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LV | 05.10.2016 | ||
MC | 05.10.2016 | ||
NL | 05.10.2016 | ||
PL | 05.10.2016 | ||
RO | 05.10.2016 | ||
RS | 05.10.2016 | ||
SE | 05.10.2016 | ||
SI | 05.10.2016 | ||
SK | 05.10.2016 | ||
SM | 05.10.2016 | ||
BG | 05.01.2017 | ||
NO | 05.01.2017 | ||
GR | 06.01.2017 | ||
IS | 05.02.2017 | ||
PT | 06.02.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 02.08.2013 | |
AT | 05.10.2016 | ||
BE | 05.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2016 | ||
DK | 05.10.2016 | ||
EE | 05.10.2016 | ||
FI | 05.10.2016 | ||
HR | 05.10.2016 | ||
LT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LV | 05.10.2016 | ||
MC | 05.10.2016 | ||
NL | 05.10.2016 | ||
PL | 05.10.2016 | ||
RO | 05.10.2016 | ||
RS | 05.10.2016 | ||
SE | 05.10.2016 | ||
SI | 05.10.2016 | ||
SK | 05.10.2016 | ||
SM | 05.10.2016 | ||
BG | 05.01.2017 | ||
NO | 05.01.2017 | ||
GR | 06.01.2017 | ||
IS | 05.02.2017 | ||
PT | 06.02.2017 | ||
Former [2018/18] | AT | 05.10.2016 | |
BE | 05.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2016 | ||
DK | 05.10.2016 | ||
EE | 05.10.2016 | ||
FI | 05.10.2016 | ||
HR | 05.10.2016 | ||
LT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LV | 05.10.2016 | ||
MC | 05.10.2016 | ||
NL | 05.10.2016 | ||
PL | 05.10.2016 | ||
RO | 05.10.2016 | ||
RS | 05.10.2016 | ||
SE | 05.10.2016 | ||
SI | 05.10.2016 | ||
SK | 05.10.2016 | ||
SM | 05.10.2016 | ||
BG | 05.01.2017 | ||
NO | 05.01.2017 | ||
GR | 06.01.2017 | ||
IS | 05.02.2017 | ||
PT | 06.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | AT | 05.10.2016 | |
BE | 05.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2016 | ||
DK | 05.10.2016 | ||
EE | 05.10.2016 | ||
FI | 05.10.2016 | ||
HR | 05.10.2016 | ||
LT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LV | 05.10.2016 | ||
NL | 05.10.2016 | ||
PL | 05.10.2016 | ||
RO | 05.10.2016 | ||
RS | 05.10.2016 | ||
SE | 05.10.2016 | ||
SI | 05.10.2016 | ||
SK | 05.10.2016 | ||
SM | 05.10.2016 | ||
BG | 05.01.2017 | ||
NO | 05.01.2017 | ||
GR | 06.01.2017 | ||
IS | 05.02.2017 | ||
PT | 06.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/38] | AT | 05.10.2016 | |
BE | 05.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2016 | ||
DK | 05.10.2016 | ||
EE | 05.10.2016 | ||
FI | 05.10.2016 | ||
HR | 05.10.2016 | ||
LT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LV | 05.10.2016 | ||
NL | 05.10.2016 | ||
PL | 05.10.2016 | ||
RO | 05.10.2016 | ||
RS | 05.10.2016 | ||
SE | 05.10.2016 | ||
SK | 05.10.2016 | ||
SM | 05.10.2016 | ||
BG | 05.01.2017 | ||
NO | 05.01.2017 | ||
GR | 06.01.2017 | ||
IS | 05.02.2017 | ||
PT | 06.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 05.10.2016 | |
BE | 05.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2016 | ||
DK | 05.10.2016 | ||
EE | 05.10.2016 | ||
FI | 05.10.2016 | ||
HR | 05.10.2016 | ||
LT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LV | 05.10.2016 | ||
NL | 05.10.2016 | ||
PL | 05.10.2016 | ||
RO | 05.10.2016 | ||
RS | 05.10.2016 | ||
SE | 05.10.2016 | ||
SK | 05.10.2016 | ||
SM | 05.10.2016 | ||
NO | 05.01.2017 | ||
GR | 06.01.2017 | ||
IS | 05.02.2017 | ||
PT | 06.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/36] | AT | 05.10.2016 | |
BE | 05.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2016 | ||
DK | 05.10.2016 | ||
EE | 05.10.2016 | ||
FI | 05.10.2016 | ||
HR | 05.10.2016 | ||
LT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LV | 05.10.2016 | ||
NL | 05.10.2016 | ||
PL | 05.10.2016 | ||
RO | 05.10.2016 | ||
RS | 05.10.2016 | ||
SE | 05.10.2016 | ||
SK | 05.10.2016 | ||
NO | 05.01.2017 | ||
GR | 06.01.2017 | ||
IS | 05.02.2017 | ||
PT | 06.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/34] | AT | 05.10.2016 | |
BE | 05.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2016 | ||
DK | 05.10.2016 | ||
FI | 05.10.2016 | ||
HR | 05.10.2016 | ||
LT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LV | 05.10.2016 | ||
NL | 05.10.2016 | ||
PL | 05.10.2016 | ||
RS | 05.10.2016 | ||
SE | 05.10.2016 | ||
NO | 05.01.2017 | ||
GR | 06.01.2017 | ||
IS | 05.02.2017 | ||
PT | 06.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/33] | AT | 05.10.2016 | |
BE | 05.10.2016 | ||
DK | 05.10.2016 | ||
FI | 05.10.2016 | ||
HR | 05.10.2016 | ||
LT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LV | 05.10.2016 | ||
NL | 05.10.2016 | ||
PL | 05.10.2016 | ||
RS | 05.10.2016 | ||
SE | 05.10.2016 | ||
NO | 05.01.2017 | ||
GR | 06.01.2017 | ||
IS | 05.02.2017 | ||
PT | 06.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/26] | AT | 05.10.2016 | |
BE | 05.10.2016 | ||
FI | 05.10.2016 | ||
HR | 05.10.2016 | ||
LT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LV | 05.10.2016 | ||
NL | 05.10.2016 | ||
PL | 05.10.2016 | ||
RS | 05.10.2016 | ||
SE | 05.10.2016 | ||
NO | 05.01.2017 | ||
GR | 06.01.2017 | ||
IS | 05.02.2017 | ||
PT | 06.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/12] | LV | 05.10.2016 | Cited in | International search | [A]JP2007169474 (SHOWA DENKO KK) [A] 1-16 * compound D1 * * the whole document *; | [A]EP1418217 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO [JP]) [A] 1-16 * compound C6 *; | [A]US2006263630 (HO CHAN-YUAN [TW], et al) [A] 1-16 * claim 1 * * the whole document * | [A] - LEE YOUNG HEE ET AL, "THEORETICAL STUDY OF IR(III) COMPLEXES OF FLUORINATED PHENYLBENZOQUINOLINE AS RED PHOSPHORESCENT MATERIAL", JAPANESE JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS PART.2, THE JAPAN SOCIETY OF APPLIED PHYSICS, JAPAN SOCIETY OF APPLIED PHYSICS, TOKYO; JP, (20060101), vol. 45, no. 1 B, doi:10.1143/JJAP.45.563, ISSN 0021-4922, pages 563 - 567, XP009079763 [A] 1-16 * figure 1 * * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1143/JJAP.45.563 | [A] - YOUN S W ET AL, "Trifluoroacetic acid-mediated facile construction of 6-substituted phenanthridines", TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, PERGAMON, GB, vol. 50, no. 32, doi:10.1016/J.TETLET.2009.05.071, ISSN 0040-4039, (20090812), pages 4598 - 4601, (20090525), XP026211653 [A] 1-16 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.tetlet.2009.05.071 | Examination | WO2014019710 | by applicant | EP0404097 | WO9301161 | US5219847 | - LAMANSKY, S., INORG. CHEM., (2001), vol. 40, pages 1704 - 1711 | - PLUECKTHUN, The Pharmacology of Monoclonal Antibodies, SPRINGER-VERLAG, (1994), vol. 113, pages 269 - 315 | - HUDSON, P.J. ET AL., NAT. MED., (2003), vol. 9, pages 129 - 134 | - HOLLIGER, P. ET AL., PNAS USA, (1993), vol. 90, pages 6444 - 6448 | - YOUN, S.W., TETRAHEDRON LETT., (2009), vol. 50, pages 4598 - 4601 | - LION, C., BULL. SOC. CHIM. BELG., (1989), vol. 98, pages 557 - 566 | - NICOLAI, E., CHEM. PHARM. BULL., (1994), vol. 42, pages 1617 - 1630 | - CYMERMAN, J., J. CHEM. SOC., (1949), pages 703 - 707 | - JACS, (2007), vol. 129, page 13364 | - NONOYAMA, M., J. ORGANOMET. CHEM., (1975), vol. 86, pages 263 - 267 | - H. HILPERT, HELVETICA CHIMICA ACTA, (1987), pages 1307 - 1311 | EP20120179056 |