EP2875492 - BROKEN MAG TICKET AUTHENTICATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 11.08.2017 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.08.2017 | Withdrawal of application | published on 13.09.2017 [2017/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cubic Corporation 9333 Balboa Avenue San Diego, CA 92123 / US | [2015/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SMITH, Gavin R. 8 Guinevere Road Ifield Crawley West Sussex RH11 0PE / GB | [2015/22] | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/22] | Crofts, Graham John Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | Application number, filing date | 13745496.3 | 17.07.2013 | WO2013US50857 | Priority number, date | US201261672699P | 17.07.2012 Original published format: US 201261672699 P | US201313943645 | 16.07.2013 Original published format: US201313943645 | [2015/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014015018 | Date: | 23.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2875492 | Date: | 27.05.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.01.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.01.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G07B11/00, G07B5/00 | [2015/22] | CPC: |
G07B5/00 (EP,US);
G06V30/224 (US);
G07B11/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/22] | Title | German: | AUTHENTIFIZIERER FÜR GEBROCHENE MAGNETKARTEN | [2015/22] | English: | BROKEN MAG TICKET AUTHENTICATOR | [2015/22] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'AUTHENTIFICATION DE TICKET MAGNÉTIQUE ROMPU | [2015/22] | Entry into regional phase | 22.01.2015 | National basic fee paid | 22.01.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.01.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.01.2015 | Examination requested [2015/22] | 28.08.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.08.2017 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2017/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2004136572 (LACY DONALD D [US]) [Y] 1-20 * abstract * * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0025] * * paragraph [0047] - paragraph [0049] *; | [Y]US2005021365 (NAKFOOR BRETT A [US]) [Y] 1-20 * abstract * * paragraph [0011] ** paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0036] *; | [I]CN102054182 (SHANDONG NEW BEIYANG INFO TECH) [I] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [P]EP2498194 (SHANDONG NEW BEIYANG INF TECH [CN]) [P] * abstract * * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0053] * |