EP2986453 - BURNTHROUGH RESISTANT LAMINATE FILM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.03.2020 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.03.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.11.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Brook One Corporation 6 Fairway Heights Crescent Markham, Ontario L3T 1K1 / CA | [2016/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHENG, Zheng 4826 Grand Bend Drive Catonsville, Maryland 21228 / US | 02 /
LI, Qin Jian 6 Fairway Heights Crescent Markham, Ontario L3T 1K1 / CA | [2016/08] | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/18] | Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | ||
Former [2016/08] | Wills, Andrew Jonathan Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | Application number, filing date | 13745747.9 | 22.07.2013 | [2016/08] | WO2013US51476 | Priority number, date | US201361813279P | 18.04.2013 Original published format: US 201361813279 P | [2016/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014171957 | Date: | 23.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2986453 | Date: | 24.02.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.10.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2986453 | Date: | 01.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.10.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B32B27/12, B32B15/14, B32B17/04, B32B7/12, // B32B27/28, B32B15/20, B32B5/02 | [2018/45] | CPC: |
B32B5/024 (EP,US);
B32B15/14 (EP);
B32B15/20 (EP);
B32B17/04 (EP,US);
B32B17/06 (EP);
B32B27/12 (EP,US);
B32B27/286 (EP,US);
B32B27/288 (EP,US);
B32B7/12 (EP,US);
C03C13/005 (US);
C03C3/061 (US);
B32B2250/03 (EP,US);
B32B2250/40 (EP,US);
B32B2260/021 (EP,US);
B32B2260/046 (EP,US);
B32B2262/101 (EP,US);
B32B2307/102 (EP,US);
B32B2307/304 (EP,US);
B32B2307/3065 (EP,US);
B32B2307/54 (EP,US);
B32B2307/5825 (EP,US);
B32B2307/584 (EP,US);
B32B2307/714 (EP,US);
B32B2307/718 (EP,US);
B32B2405/00 (EP,US);
B32B2605/18 (EP,US);
Y10S428/92 (EP,US);
Y10S428/921 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24975 (EP,US);
Y10T442/3065 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2016/08] | B32B27/12, B32B15/14, B32B17/04, B32B7/12, B32B27/28, B32B15/20, B32B5/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/08] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DURCHBRENNFESTE MEHRLAGIGE FOLIE | [2018/45] | English: | BURNTHROUGH RESISTANT LAMINATE FILM | [2016/08] | French: | FILM MULTICOUCHE RÉSISTANT À LA PERFORATION PAR LE FEU | [2018/45] |
Former [2016/08] | DURCHBRENNRESISTENTE LAMINATFOLIE | ||
Former [2016/08] | FILM STRATIFIÉ RÉSISTANT À UNE BRÛLURE PERFORANTE | Entry into regional phase | 17.11.2015 | National basic fee paid | 17.11.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.11.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.11.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.11.2015 | Examination requested [2016/08] | 13.01.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.05.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.07.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.01.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.05.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.09.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.11.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.03.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 18.03.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.03.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.01.2017 | Opposition(s) | 04.02.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.07.2013 | AL | 01.05.2019 | AT | 01.05.2019 | CY | 01.05.2019 | CZ | 01.05.2019 | DK | 01.05.2019 | EE | 01.05.2019 | ES | 01.05.2019 | FI | 01.05.2019 | HR | 01.05.2019 | LT | 01.05.2019 | LV | 01.05.2019 | MC | 01.05.2019 | MK | 01.05.2019 | MT | 01.05.2019 | NL | 01.05.2019 | PL | 01.05.2019 | RO | 01.05.2019 | RS | 01.05.2019 | SE | 01.05.2019 | SI | 01.05.2019 | SK | 01.05.2019 | SM | 01.05.2019 | TR | 01.05.2019 | IE | 22.07.2019 | LU | 22.07.2019 | BE | 31.07.2019 | CH | 31.07.2019 | LI | 31.07.2019 | BG | 01.08.2019 | NO | 01.08.2019 | GR | 02.08.2019 | IS | 01.09.2019 | PT | 01.09.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 22.07.2013 | |
AL | 01.05.2019 | ||
AT | 01.05.2019 | ||
CY | 01.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 01.05.2019 | ||
DK | 01.05.2019 | ||
EE | 01.05.2019 | ||
ES | 01.05.2019 | ||
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
MC | 01.05.2019 | ||
MT | 01.05.2019 | ||
NL | 01.05.2019 | ||
PL | 01.05.2019 | ||
RO | 01.05.2019 | ||
RS | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
SI | 01.05.2019 | ||
SK | 01.05.2019 | ||
SM | 01.05.2019 | ||
TR | 01.05.2019 | ||
IE | 22.07.2019 | ||
LU | 22.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
IS | 01.09.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 22.07.2013 | |
AL | 01.05.2019 | ||
AT | 01.05.2019 | ||
CY | 01.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 01.05.2019 | ||
DK | 01.05.2019 | ||
EE | 01.05.2019 | ||
ES | 01.05.2019 | ||
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
MC | 01.05.2019 | ||
NL | 01.05.2019 | ||
PL | 01.05.2019 | ||
RO | 01.05.2019 | ||
RS | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
SI | 01.05.2019 | ||
SK | 01.05.2019 | ||
SM | 01.05.2019 | ||
TR | 01.05.2019 | ||
IE | 22.07.2019 | ||
LU | 22.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
IS | 01.09.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 01.05.2019 | |
AT | 01.05.2019 | ||
CY | 01.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 01.05.2019 | ||
DK | 01.05.2019 | ||
EE | 01.05.2019 | ||
ES | 01.05.2019 | ||
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
MC | 01.05.2019 | ||
NL | 01.05.2019 | ||
PL | 01.05.2019 | ||
RO | 01.05.2019 | ||
RS | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
SI | 01.05.2019 | ||
SK | 01.05.2019 | ||
SM | 01.05.2019 | ||
TR | 01.05.2019 | ||
IE | 22.07.2019 | ||
LU | 22.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
IS | 01.09.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 01.05.2019 | |
AT | 01.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 01.05.2019 | ||
DK | 01.05.2019 | ||
EE | 01.05.2019 | ||
ES | 01.05.2019 | ||
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
MC | 01.05.2019 | ||
NL | 01.05.2019 | ||
PL | 01.05.2019 | ||
RO | 01.05.2019 | ||
RS | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
SI | 01.05.2019 | ||
SK | 01.05.2019 | ||
SM | 01.05.2019 | ||
TR | 01.05.2019 | ||
IE | 22.07.2019 | ||
LU | 22.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
IS | 01.09.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 01.05.2019 | |
AT | 01.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 01.05.2019 | ||
DK | 01.05.2019 | ||
EE | 01.05.2019 | ||
ES | 01.05.2019 | ||
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
MC | 01.05.2019 | ||
NL | 01.05.2019 | ||
PL | 01.05.2019 | ||
RO | 01.05.2019 | ||
RS | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
SI | 01.05.2019 | ||
SK | 01.05.2019 | ||
SM | 01.05.2019 | ||
TR | 01.05.2019 | ||
LU | 22.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
IS | 01.09.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 01.05.2019 | |
AT | 01.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 01.05.2019 | ||
DK | 01.05.2019 | ||
EE | 01.05.2019 | ||
ES | 01.05.2019 | ||
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
MC | 01.05.2019 | ||
NL | 01.05.2019 | ||
RO | 01.05.2019 | ||
RS | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
SK | 01.05.2019 | ||
SM | 01.05.2019 | ||
TR | 01.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
IS | 01.09.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/14] | AL | 01.05.2019 | |
AT | 01.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 01.05.2019 | ||
DK | 01.05.2019 | ||
EE | 01.05.2019 | ||
ES | 01.05.2019 | ||
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
MC | 01.05.2019 | ||
NL | 01.05.2019 | ||
RO | 01.05.2019 | ||
RS | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
SK | 01.05.2019 | ||
SM | 01.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
IS | 01.09.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 01.05.2019 | |
AT | 01.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 01.05.2019 | ||
DK | 01.05.2019 | ||
EE | 01.05.2019 | ||
ES | 01.05.2019 | ||
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
NL | 01.05.2019 | ||
RO | 01.05.2019 | ||
RS | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
SK | 01.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
IS | 01.09.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AL | 01.05.2019 | |
AT | 01.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 01.05.2019 | ||
DK | 01.05.2019 | ||
ES | 01.05.2019 | ||
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
NL | 01.05.2019 | ||
RO | 01.05.2019 | ||
RS | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
IS | 01.09.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 01.05.2019 | |
CZ | 01.05.2019 | ||
DK | 01.05.2019 | ||
ES | 01.05.2019 | ||
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
NL | 01.05.2019 | ||
RS | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
IS | 01.09.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AL | 01.05.2019 | |
ES | 01.05.2019 | ||
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
NL | 01.05.2019 | ||
RS | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
IS | 01.09.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 01.05.2019 | |
ES | 01.05.2019 | ||
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
NL | 01.05.2019 | ||
RS | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 01.05.2019 | |
ES | 01.05.2019 | ||
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
NL | 01.05.2019 | ||
RS | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 01.05.2019 | |
ES | 01.05.2019 | ||
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
NL | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | ES | 01.05.2019 | |
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | ES | 01.05.2019 | |
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | Cited in | International search | [I]JPS63250188 ; | [XI]JP2010084085 ; | [XI]US4501787 (MARCHETTI JOSEPH R [US], et al) [X] 1,7 * abstract * * column 7, line 67 - column 9, line 19 * [I] 2-6,8-11,14-19; | [XI]US4769270 (NAGAMATSU HIROSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,2 * abstract * * column 2, line 36 - column 5, line 54 * [I] 3-11,13-21,24,25; | [XI]US5126192 (CHELLIS LEROY N [US], et al) [X] 1,7,8,11 * abstract * * column 5, line 4 - column 7, line 59 * [I] 2-6,9,10,14-19; | [XI]US5435877 (ISHII KENJI [JP], et al) [X] 1,8,11 * abstract * * column 3, line 4 - column 8, line 49 * [I] 5-7,9; | [XI]US2001053447 (TAKANO NOZOMU [JP], et al) [X] 1,7,8,11 * abstract * * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0029] * * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0045] * * paragraph [0047] - paragraph [0049] * [I] 2-6,9,10,14-19; | [XI]US2005080183 (CHUNG HYUK-SUNG [KR], et al) [X] 1,7,8 * abstract * * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0037] * * paragraph [0066] - paragraph [0067] * [I] 5,6,9-11; | [XI]US2006234027 (HUUSKEN ROBERT W [NL]) [X] 1,8 * abstract * * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0020] * [I] 5-7,9-11; | [XI]US2007077413 (AMOU SATORU [JP], et al) [X] 1,7,8 * abstract * * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0047] * [I] 2-6,9-11,14,15,17-19; | [XI]US2007193683 (HUUSKEN ROBERT [NL]) [X] 1,8 * abstract * * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0027] * [I] 5-7,9-11; | [XI]US2009266591 (AMOU SATORU [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,7,8 * abstract * * paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0046] - paragraph [0048] * [I] 3-6,9-11,14-19; | [I] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1988, no. 48, Database accession no. 1988-340510, XP002715380 & JPS63250188 A 19881018 (MITSUBISHI PLASTICS IND LTD) [I] 1-11,14-19 * abstract * | [XI] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2010, no. 27, Database accession no. 2010-E08236, XP002715381 & JP2010084085 A 20100415 (HITACHI CHEM CO LTD) [X] 1,2,7,8 * abstract * * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0031] * [I] 3-6,9-11,14-19 |