EP2877598 - MUTATIONS ASSOCIATED WITH RESISTANCE TO INHIBITORS OF BRUTON'S TYROSINE KINASE (BTK) [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.10.2019 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.01.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.11.2019 [2019/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pharmacyclics LLC 995 East Arques Avenue Sunnyvale, CA 94085 / US | [2017/20] |
Former [2015/23] | For all designated states Pharmacyclics, Inc. 995 East Arques Avenue Sunnyvale, CA 94085 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHANG, Betty, Y. 10375 Lindsay Avenue Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | 02 /
BUGGY, Joseph, J. 1229 Marilyn Avenue Mountain View, CA 94040 / US | 03 /
STEGGERDA, Susanne, M. 1286 8th Avenue San Francisco, CA 94122 / US | [2015/23] | Representative(s) | Miller, David James, et al Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/23] | Irvine, Jonquil Claire HGF Limited 140 London Wall London EC2Y 5DN / GB | Application number, filing date | 13745948.3 | 23.07.2013 | WO2013US51741 | Priority number, date | US201261675303P | 24.07.2012 Original published format: US 201261675303 P | US201261682688P | 13.08.2012 Original published format: US 201261682688 P | US201361780652P | 13.03.2013 Original published format: US 201361780652 P | [2015/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014018567 | Date: | 30.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2877598 | Date: | 03.06.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.01.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.01.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/6886 | [2018/51] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6886 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/505 (EP,US);
A61K31/506 (EP,US);
A61K31/519 (EP,US);
A61K31/52 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/02 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07K14/00 (US);
C12N9/12 (US);
C12N9/16 (US);
C12Q1/686 (KR);
G01N33/5041 (US);
C12Q2600/106 (EP,KR,US);
C12Q2600/156 (US);
C12Q2600/16 (US);
C12Y207/10002 (US);
|
Former IPC [2015/23] | C12Q1/68 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/23] | Extension states | BA | 22.01.2015 | ME | 22.01.2015 | Title | German: | MUTATIONEN IM ZUSAMMENHANG MIT DER RESISTENZ GEGENÜBER HEMMERN DER BRUTON-TYROSINKINASE (BTK) | [2015/23] | English: | MUTATIONS ASSOCIATED WITH RESISTANCE TO INHIBITORS OF BRUTON'S TYROSINE KINASE (BTK) | [2015/23] | French: | MUTATIONS ASSOCIÉES À LA RÉSISTANCE À DES INHIBITEURS DE LA TYROSINE KINASE DE BRUTON (BTK) | [2015/23] | Entry into regional phase | 22.01.2015 | National basic fee paid | 22.01.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.01.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.01.2015 | Examination requested [2015/23] | 22.09.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.11.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.09.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.02.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.08.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.11.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.09.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.01.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.05.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/45] | 18.06.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2019/45] | Divisional application(s) | EP19174436.6 / EP3550031 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.11.2015 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 07.09.2018 | Request for further processing filed | 07.09.2018 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 19.09.2018 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 08.09.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 08.09.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 21.09.2016 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2019 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2008054827 (PHARMACYCLICS INC [US], et al) [X] 53,67,70,75-77,81,83-85 * paragraph [0118] *; | [A]WO2008121742 (PHARMACYCLICS INC [US], et al) [A] 1-104 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2011133609 (TRANSLATIONAL GENOMICS RES INST [US], et al) [A] 1-104 * the whole document *; | [I] - HANTSCHEL OLIVER ET AL, "Systematic profiling and novel targets of the Bcr-Abl kinase inhibitors imatinib, nilotinib and dasatinib", BLOOD, & 49TH ANNUAL MEETING OF THE AMERICAN-SOCIETY-OF-HEMATOLOGY; ATLANTA, GA, USA; DECEMBER 08 -11, 2007, (200711), vol. 110, no. 11, Part 2, ISSN 0006-4971, page 207B, XP002714015 [I] 1-104 * the whole document * | [I] - OLIVER HANTSCHEL ET AL, "The Btk Tyrosine Kinase is a Major Target of the Bcr- Abl Inhibitor Dasatinib", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES - PNAS, NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES, US, vol. 104, no. 33, doi:10.1073/PNAS.0702654104, ISSN 0027-8424, (20070814), pages 13283 - 13288, (20070807), XP008141134 [I] 1-104 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.0702654104 | [A] - VILLUENDAS R ET AL, "Identification of genes involved in imatinib resistance in CML: a gene-expression profiling approach", LEUKEMIA, MACMILLAN PRESS LTD, US, vol. 20, no. 6, doi:10.1038/SJ.LEU.2404197, ISSN 0887-6924, (20060601), pages 1047 - 1054, (20060406), XP008096484 [A] 1-104 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/sj.leu.2404197 | [A] - BALASUBRAMANIAN SRIRAM ET AL, "Identification of MicroRNA Markers of Sensitivity to the Novel Bruton's Tyrosine Kinase (BTK) Inhibitor PCI-32765 in Non-Hodgkin's Lymphoma", BLOOD, & 50TH ANNUAL MEETING OF THE AMERICAN- SOCIETY-OF-HEMATOLOGY; SAN FRANCISCO, CA, USA; DECEMBER 06 -09, 2008, (200811), vol. 112, no. 11, ISSN 0006-4971, pages 1155 - 1156, XP002714016 [A] 1-104 * the whole document * |