EP2877599 - METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR DETERMINING RESISTANCE TO ANDROGEN RECEPTOR THERAPY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.08.2020 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.09.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.04.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.09.2020 [2020/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aragon Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 10990 Wilshire Blvd. Suite 300 Los Angeles, CA 90024 / US | [2020/01] |
Former [2015/23] | For all designated states Aragon Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 12780 El Camino Real, Suite 301 San Diego, CA 92130 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JOSEPH, James David 10242 Lone Bluff Drive San Diego, CA 92127 / US | 02 /
HAGER, Jeffrey H. 13381 Benchley Road San Diego, CA 92130 / US | 03 /
SENSINTAFFAR, John, Lee 12777 Casa Avenida Poway, CA 92064 / US | 04 /
LU, Nhin 3635 Ash Street Unit 4 San Diego, CA 92126 / US | 05 /
QIAN, Jing 9456 Compass Point Drive South 8 San Diego, CA 92126 / US | 06 /
SMITH, Nicholas, D. 1204 Beryl Street San Diego, CA 92109 / US | [2019/43] |
Former [2015/23] | 01 /
JOSEPH, James, David 10242 Lone Bluff Drive San Diego, CA 92127 / US | ||
02 /
HAGER, Jeffrey H. 13381 Benchley Road San Diego, CA 92130 / US | |||
03 /
SENSINTAFFAR, John, Lee 12777 Casa Avenida Poway, CA 92064 / US | |||
04 /
LU, Nhin 3635 Ash Street Unit 4 San Diego, CA 92126 / US | |||
05 /
QIAN, Jing 9456 Compass Point Drive South 8 San Diego, CA 92126 / US | |||
06 /
SMITH, Nicholas, D. 1204 Beryl Street San Diego, CA 92109 / US | Representative(s) | McGuire, Gillian Margaret Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2019/43] |
Former [2015/23] | Phillips, Gillian Margaret Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | Application number, filing date | 13745973.1 | 26.07.2013 | [2019/43] | WO2013US52395 | Priority number, date | US201261676842P | 27.07.2012 Original published format: US 201261676842 P | US201361783763P | 14.03.2013 Original published format: US 201361783763 P | US201361829123P | 30.05.2013 Original published format: US 201361829123 P | [2015/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014018926 | Date: | 30.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2877599 | Date: | 03.06.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.01.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2877599 | Date: | 23.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.01.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/6886 | [2019/19] | CPC: |
A61K31/4166 (EP,IL,US);
A61K31/4184 (IL,US);
C12Q1/6886 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C12Q1/6888 (CN,IL);
C07K19/00 (EA);
A61K31/00 (CN,IL);
A61K31/4164 (KR);
A61K31/4439 (EP,IL,US);
A61K38/09 (EP,IL,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,IL,US);
A61P1/16 (EP,IL);
A61P13/08 (EP,IL);
A61P13/10 (EP,IL);
A61P15/00 (EP,IL);
A61P29/00 (EP,IL);
A61P35/00 (EP,IL);
A61P43/00 (EP,IL);
C07K14/72 (EA);
C07K14/721 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
C07K16/28 (KR);
C07K16/2869 (CN,IL,US);
C12N15/63 (EA);
C12N5/10 (EA);
C12Q1/6869 (KR);
C12Q1/6897 (IL,US);
G01N33/543 (EA);
G01N33/57492 (IL,US);
C12Q2600/106 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C12Q2600/136 (IL,US);
C12Q2600/156 (IL,US);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/00, A61K2300/00 (CN);
A61K31/4166, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/4439, A61K2300/00 (US,EP)
|
Former IPC [2015/23] | C12Q1/68, A61K31/00, C07K14/72, C07K16/28 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/23] | Extension states | BA | 24.02.2015 | ME | 24.02.2015 | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUR BESTIMMUNG DER RESISTENZ GEGEN EINE ANDROGENREZEPTORTHERAPIE | [2015/23] | English: | METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR DETERMINING RESISTANCE TO ANDROGEN RECEPTOR THERAPY | [2015/23] | French: | MÉTHODES ET COMPOSITIONS POUR DÉTERMINER LA RÉSISTANCE À UNE THÉRAPIE DU RÉCEPTEUR DES ANDROGÈNES | [2015/23] | Entry into regional phase | 24.02.2015 | National basic fee paid | 24.02.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.02.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.02.2015 | Examination requested [2015/23] | 14.10.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.01.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.07.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.07.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.11.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.09.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.04.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.09.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 10.09.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.09.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP19204705.8 / EP3653733 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.01.2016 | Opposition(s) | 24.07.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO0166599 (SCHERING AG [DE], et al) [A] 1-76,91-114 * the whole document *; | [I]EP2065474 (SIEMENS HEALTHCARE DIAGNOSTICS [DE]) [I] 1-76,91-114 * the whole document *; | [X]US2010068802 (QIU YUN [US], et al) [X] 102* the whole document *; | [X] - TAKAYOSHI D ET AL, "Establishment and characterization of monoclonal antibody against androgen receptor", JOURNAL OF STEROID BIOCHEMISTRY, PERGAMON PRESS PLC, GB, vol. 33, no. 5, doi:10.1016/0022-4731(89)90231-8, ISSN 0022-4731, (19891101), pages 845 - 851, (19891101), XP025204824 [X] 102,103 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0022-4731(89)90231-8 | [A] - C. E. BOHL ET AL, "Crystal Structure of the T877A Human Androgen Receptor Ligand-binding Domain Complexed to Cyproterone Acetate Provides Insight for Ligand-induced Conformational Changes and Structure-based Drug Design", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (20070316), vol. 282, no. 18, doi:10.1074/jbc.M611711200, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 13648 - 13655, XP055080870 [A] 1-76,91-114 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.M611711200 | [I] - XING HUO ET AL, "Quantitative structure-activity relationship analysis of a novel series of chemicals antagonizing WT and MT AR", CHEMOMETRICS AND INTELLIGENT LABORATORY SYSTEMS, (20110701), vol. 107, no. 2, doi:10.1016/j.chemolab.2011.04.013, ISSN 0169-7439, pages 283 - 289, XP055081203 [I] 1-76,91-114 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.chemolab.2011.04.013 | [XP] - M. KORPAL ET AL, "An F876L Mutation in Androgen Receptor Confers Genetic and Phenotypic Resistance to MDV3100 (Enzalutamide)", CANCER DISCOVERY, (20130710), vol. 3, no. 9, doi:10.1158/2159-8290.CD-13-0142, ISSN 2159-8274, pages 1030 - 1043, XP055080863 [XP] 1-76,91-114 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1158/2159-8290.CD-13-0142 | [XP] - J. D. JOSEPH ET AL, "A Clinically Relevant Androgen Receptor Mutation Confers Resistance to Second-Generation Antiandrogens Enzalutamide and ARN-509", CANCER DISCOVERY, (20130618), vol. 3, no. 9, doi:10.1158/2159-8290.CD-13-0226, ISSN 2159-8274, pages 1020 - 1029, XP055080859 [XP] 1-76,91-114 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1158/2159-8290.CD-13-0226 | [A] - HAAPALA K ET AL, "Androgen receptor alterations in prostate cancer relapsed during a combined androgen blockade by orchiectomy and bicalutamide", LABORATORY INVESTIGATION, NATURE PUBLISHING GROUP, THE UNITED STATES AND CANADIAN ACADEMY OF PALHOLOGY, INC, (20011201), vol. 81, no. 12, ISSN 0023-6837, pages 1647 - 1651, XP002382327 [A] 1-76,91-114 * the whole document * | [XP] - BALBAS MINNA D ET AL, "Overcoming mutation-based resistance to antiandrogens with rational drug design.", ELIFE 2013, (2013), vol. 2, ISSN 2050-084X, page e00499, XP009173001 [XP] 1-76,91-114 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.7554/eLife.00499 |