EP2790263 - NOVEL AIR COOLED STRUCTURED BATTERY PACK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.03.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 21.04.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG CHEM, LTD. 128, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | [2014/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHOI, Ji Young c/o LG Chem Research Park, 188, Munji-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-380 / KR | 02 /
LEE, Bum Hyun c/o LG Chem Research Park, 188, Munji-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-380 / KR | 03 /
CHUNG, Chae Ho c/o LG Chem Research Park, 188, Munji-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-380 / KR | 04 /
CHOI, Yong Seok c/o LG Chem Research Park, 188, Munji-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-380 / KR | [2017/21] |
Former [2014/42] | 01 /
CHOI, Ji Young LG Chem Research Park , 188 ,Munji-ro Yuseong - gu Daejon 305-380 / KR | ||
02 /
LEE, Bum Hyun LG Chem Research Park 188 , Munji-ro , Yuseong - gu Daejeon 305-380 / KR | |||
03 /
CHUNG, Chae Ho 188, Munji-ro , Yuseong -gu Daejeon 305-380 / KR | |||
04 /
CHOI, Yong Seok LG Chem Research Park 188 , Munji-ro , Yuseong - gu Daejeon 305-380 / KR | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 104 Rue de Richelieu CS92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2017/21] | Cabinet Plasseraud 66 rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [2014/42] | Cabinet Plasseraud 52, rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 13747035.7 | 06.02.2013 | [2017/21] | WO2013KR00932 | Priority number, date | KR20120012255 | 07.02.2012 Original published format: KR 20120012255 | [2014/42] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013119028 | Date: | 15.08.2013 | Language: | KO | [2013/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2790263 | Date: | 15.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2790263 | Date: | 24.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 15.08.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.11.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H01M10/613, H01M2/02, H01M10/052, B60L11/18, B60L3/00, H01M10/625, H01M10/6555, H01M10/6557, // H01M10/617 | [2014/52] | CPC: |
H01M10/613 (EP,CN,US);
H01M10/60 (KR);
B60L3/0046 (CN,US);
B60L50/50 (KR);
B60L50/64 (EP,CN,US);
B60L58/18 (EP);
B60L58/26 (EP,CN,US);
H01M10/052 (KR);
H01M10/625 (EP,CN,US);
H01M10/6555 (EP,CN,US);
H01M10/6557 (EP,CN,US);
B60L2240/545 (EP,CN,US);
H01M10/617 (EP,CN,US);
H01M2220/20 (CN);
Y02E60/10 (EP);
Y02T10/70 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2014/42] | H01M10/50, H01M2/02, H01M10/052, B60L11/18 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/42] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NEUARTIGE LUFTGEKÜHLTE STRUKTURIERTE BATTERIEPACKUNG | [2014/42] | English: | NOVEL AIR COOLED STRUCTURED BATTERY PACK | [2014/42] | French: | NOUVEAU BLOC-BATTERIE À STRUCTURE REFROIDIE PAR L'AIR | [2014/42] | Entry into regional phase | 08.07.2014 | Translation filed | 08.07.2014 | National basic fee paid | 08.07.2014 | Search fee paid | 08.07.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.07.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.07.2014 | Examination requested [2014/42] | 10.06.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.11.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.03.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.06.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.09.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.12.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.04.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 13.04.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.04.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.11.2015 | Opposition(s) | 27.02.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.02.2013 | AL | 24.05.2017 | AT | 24.05.2017 | CY | 24.05.2017 | CZ | 24.05.2017 | DK | 24.05.2017 | EE | 24.05.2017 | ES | 24.05.2017 | FI | 24.05.2017 | HR | 24.05.2017 | IT | 24.05.2017 | LT | 24.05.2017 | LV | 24.05.2017 | MC | 24.05.2017 | MK | 24.05.2017 | NL | 24.05.2017 | PL | 24.05.2017 | PT | 24.05.2017 | RO | 24.05.2017 | RS | 24.05.2017 | SE | 24.05.2017 | SI | 24.05.2017 | SK | 24.05.2017 | SM | 24.05.2017 | TR | 24.05.2017 | BG | 24.08.2017 | NO | 24.08.2017 | GR | 25.08.2017 | IS | 24.09.2017 | IE | 06.02.2018 | LU | 06.02.2018 | MT | 06.02.2018 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 06.02.2013 | |
AT | 24.05.2017 | ||
CY | 24.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 24.05.2017 | ||
DK | 24.05.2017 | ||
EE | 24.05.2017 | ||
ES | 24.05.2017 | ||
FI | 24.05.2017 | ||
HR | 24.05.2017 | ||
IT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LV | 24.05.2017 | ||
MC | 24.05.2017 | ||
MK | 24.05.2017 | ||
NL | 24.05.2017 | ||
PL | 24.05.2017 | ||
PT | 24.05.2017 | ||
RO | 24.05.2017 | ||
RS | 24.05.2017 | ||
SE | 24.05.2017 | ||
SI | 24.05.2017 | ||
SK | 24.05.2017 | ||
SM | 24.05.2017 | ||
TR | 24.05.2017 | ||
BG | 24.08.2017 | ||
NO | 24.08.2017 | ||
GR | 25.08.2017 | ||
IS | 24.09.2017 | ||
IE | 06.02.2018 | ||
LU | 06.02.2018 | ||
MT | 06.02.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | HU | 06.02.2013 | |
AT | 24.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 24.05.2017 | ||
DK | 24.05.2017 | ||
EE | 24.05.2017 | ||
ES | 24.05.2017 | ||
FI | 24.05.2017 | ||
HR | 24.05.2017 | ||
IT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LV | 24.05.2017 | ||
MC | 24.05.2017 | ||
NL | 24.05.2017 | ||
PL | 24.05.2017 | ||
PT | 24.05.2017 | ||
RO | 24.05.2017 | ||
RS | 24.05.2017 | ||
SE | 24.05.2017 | ||
SI | 24.05.2017 | ||
SK | 24.05.2017 | ||
SM | 24.05.2017 | ||
TR | 24.05.2017 | ||
BG | 24.08.2017 | ||
NO | 24.08.2017 | ||
GR | 25.08.2017 | ||
IS | 24.09.2017 | ||
IE | 06.02.2018 | ||
LU | 06.02.2018 | ||
MT | 06.02.2018 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AT | 24.05.2017 | |
CZ | 24.05.2017 | ||
DK | 24.05.2017 | ||
EE | 24.05.2017 | ||
ES | 24.05.2017 | ||
FI | 24.05.2017 | ||
HR | 24.05.2017 | ||
IT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LV | 24.05.2017 | ||
MC | 24.05.2017 | ||
NL | 24.05.2017 | ||
PL | 24.05.2017 | ||
RO | 24.05.2017 | ||
RS | 24.05.2017 | ||
SE | 24.05.2017 | ||
SI | 24.05.2017 | ||
SK | 24.05.2017 | ||
SM | 24.05.2017 | ||
TR | 24.05.2017 | ||
BG | 24.08.2017 | ||
NO | 24.08.2017 | ||
GR | 25.08.2017 | ||
IS | 24.09.2017 | ||
IE | 06.02.2018 | ||
LU | 06.02.2018 | ||
MT | 06.02.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AT | 24.05.2017 | |
CZ | 24.05.2017 | ||
DK | 24.05.2017 | ||
EE | 24.05.2017 | ||
ES | 24.05.2017 | ||
FI | 24.05.2017 | ||
HR | 24.05.2017 | ||
IT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LV | 24.05.2017 | ||
MC | 24.05.2017 | ||
NL | 24.05.2017 | ||
PL | 24.05.2017 | ||
RO | 24.05.2017 | ||
RS | 24.05.2017 | ||
SE | 24.05.2017 | ||
SI | 24.05.2017 | ||
SK | 24.05.2017 | ||
SM | 24.05.2017 | ||
BG | 24.08.2017 | ||
NO | 24.08.2017 | ||
GR | 25.08.2017 | ||
IS | 24.09.2017 | ||
IE | 06.02.2018 | ||
LU | 06.02.2018 | ||
MT | 06.02.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | AT | 24.05.2017 | |
CZ | 24.05.2017 | ||
DK | 24.05.2017 | ||
EE | 24.05.2017 | ||
ES | 24.05.2017 | ||
FI | 24.05.2017 | ||
HR | 24.05.2017 | ||
IT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LV | 24.05.2017 | ||
MC | 24.05.2017 | ||
NL | 24.05.2017 | ||
PL | 24.05.2017 | ||
RO | 24.05.2017 | ||
RS | 24.05.2017 | ||
SE | 24.05.2017 | ||
SI | 24.05.2017 | ||
SK | 24.05.2017 | ||
SM | 24.05.2017 | ||
BG | 24.08.2017 | ||
NO | 24.08.2017 | ||
GR | 25.08.2017 | ||
IS | 24.09.2017 | ||
IE | 06.02.2018 | ||
LU | 06.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 24.05.2017 | |
CZ | 24.05.2017 | ||
DK | 24.05.2017 | ||
EE | 24.05.2017 | ||
ES | 24.05.2017 | ||
FI | 24.05.2017 | ||
HR | 24.05.2017 | ||
IT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LV | 24.05.2017 | ||
MC | 24.05.2017 | ||
NL | 24.05.2017 | ||
PL | 24.05.2017 | ||
RO | 24.05.2017 | ||
RS | 24.05.2017 | ||
SE | 24.05.2017 | ||
SI | 24.05.2017 | ||
SK | 24.05.2017 | ||
SM | 24.05.2017 | ||
BG | 24.08.2017 | ||
NO | 24.08.2017 | ||
GR | 25.08.2017 | ||
IS | 24.09.2017 | ||
LU | 06.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/44] | AT | 24.05.2017 | |
CZ | 24.05.2017 | ||
DK | 24.05.2017 | ||
EE | 24.05.2017 | ||
ES | 24.05.2017 | ||
FI | 24.05.2017 | ||
HR | 24.05.2017 | ||
IT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LV | 24.05.2017 | ||
MC | 24.05.2017 | ||
NL | 24.05.2017 | ||
PL | 24.05.2017 | ||
RO | 24.05.2017 | ||
RS | 24.05.2017 | ||
SE | 24.05.2017 | ||
SI | 24.05.2017 | ||
SK | 24.05.2017 | ||
SM | 24.05.2017 | ||
BG | 24.08.2017 | ||
NO | 24.08.2017 | ||
GR | 25.08.2017 | ||
IS | 24.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/25] | AT | 24.05.2017 | |
CZ | 24.05.2017 | ||
DK | 24.05.2017 | ||
EE | 24.05.2017 | ||
ES | 24.05.2017 | ||
FI | 24.05.2017 | ||
HR | 24.05.2017 | ||
IT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LV | 24.05.2017 | ||
NL | 24.05.2017 | ||
PL | 24.05.2017 | ||
RO | 24.05.2017 | ||
RS | 24.05.2017 | ||
SE | 24.05.2017 | ||
SI | 24.05.2017 | ||
SK | 24.05.2017 | ||
SM | 24.05.2017 | ||
BG | 24.08.2017 | ||
NO | 24.08.2017 | ||
GR | 25.08.2017 | ||
IS | 24.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 24.05.2017 | |
CZ | 24.05.2017 | ||
DK | 24.05.2017 | ||
EE | 24.05.2017 | ||
ES | 24.05.2017 | ||
FI | 24.05.2017 | ||
HR | 24.05.2017 | ||
IT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LV | 24.05.2017 | ||
NL | 24.05.2017 | ||
PL | 24.05.2017 | ||
RO | 24.05.2017 | ||
RS | 24.05.2017 | ||
SE | 24.05.2017 | ||
SK | 24.05.2017 | ||
SM | 24.05.2017 | ||
BG | 24.08.2017 | ||
NO | 24.08.2017 | ||
GR | 25.08.2017 | ||
IS | 24.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 24.05.2017 | |
CZ | 24.05.2017 | ||
DK | 24.05.2017 | ||
EE | 24.05.2017 | ||
ES | 24.05.2017 | ||
FI | 24.05.2017 | ||
HR | 24.05.2017 | ||
LT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LV | 24.05.2017 | ||
NL | 24.05.2017 | ||
RO | 24.05.2017 | ||
RS | 24.05.2017 | ||
SE | 24.05.2017 | ||
SK | 24.05.2017 | ||
BG | 24.08.2017 | ||
NO | 24.08.2017 | ||
GR | 25.08.2017 | ||
IS | 24.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | AT | 24.05.2017 | |
DK | 24.05.2017 | ||
EE | 24.05.2017 | ||
ES | 24.05.2017 | ||
FI | 24.05.2017 | ||
HR | 24.05.2017 | ||
LT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LV | 24.05.2017 | ||
NL | 24.05.2017 | ||
RS | 24.05.2017 | ||
SE | 24.05.2017 | ||
BG | 24.08.2017 | ||
NO | 24.08.2017 | ||
GR | 25.08.2017 | ||
IS | 24.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | AT | 24.05.2017 | |
ES | 24.05.2017 | ||
FI | 24.05.2017 | ||
HR | 24.05.2017 | ||
LT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LV | 24.05.2017 | ||
NL | 24.05.2017 | ||
RS | 24.05.2017 | ||
SE | 24.05.2017 | ||
BG | 24.08.2017 | ||
NO | 24.08.2017 | ||
GR | 25.08.2017 | ||
IS | 24.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 24.05.2017 | |
ES | 24.05.2017 | ||
FI | 24.05.2017 | ||
HR | 24.05.2017 | ||
LT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LV | 24.05.2017 | ||
RS | 24.05.2017 | ||
SE | 24.05.2017 | ||
BG | 24.08.2017 | ||
NO | 24.08.2017 | ||
GR | 25.08.2017 | ||
IS | 24.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 24.05.2017 | |
ES | 24.05.2017 | ||
FI | 24.05.2017 | ||
HR | 24.05.2017 | ||
LT | 24.05.2017 | ||
NO | 24.08.2017 | ||
GR | 25.08.2017 | ||
IS | 24.09.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1026770 (TOSHIBA BATTERY [JP], et al) [A] 5-8* figures 1-10 *; | [A]JP2000243461 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [A] 5-8 * figures 1-4 *; | [XI]JP2001105894 (DAIHATSU MOTOR CO LTD) [X] 1-4,9-22 * paragraph [0001]; figures 1-4,7 * [I] 5-8; | [I]EP1753070 (SAMSUNG SDI CO LTD [KR]) [I] 1-22 * figure 7 *; | [XI]US2008026284 (FUJII KAZUHIRO [JP]) [X] 1,3-6,9-15,19-22 * paragraph [0004]; figures 6-12 * [I] 2,7,8,16-18; | [XI]EP1970981 (NGK INSULATORS LTD [JP]) [X] 1-4,9-11,13-22 * paragraph [0006]; figures 1-8 * [I] 5-8,12 | International search | [X]JP2006324037 (NEC LAMILION ENERGY LTD, et al); | [A]KR20070014661 (SAMSUNG SDI CO LTD [KR]); | [A]JP2008258027 (DENSO CORP); | [A]KR100937897B (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]); | [A]KR20110019490 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]) | Examination | JP2005247168 |