EP2880077 - METHOD FOR THE PREPARATION OF POLYALKYLENE TEREPHTHALATE RESIN COMPOSITIONS EMPLOYING TITANIUM-CONTAINING CATALYST COMPLEX [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.07.2022 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.07.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.01.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SABIC Global Technologies B.V. Plasticslaan 1 4612 PX Bergen op Zoom / NL | [2021/34] |
Former [2016/31] | For all designated states SABIC Global Technologies B.V. Plasticslaan 1 4612 PX Bergen op Zoom / NL | ||
Former [2015/24] | For all designated states SABIC Innovative Plastics IP B.V. Plasticslaan 1 4612 PX Bergen op Zoom / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KANNAN, Ganesh 1 Lexan Lane Mt. Vernon, Indiana 47620-9367 / US | 02 /
DING, Tianhua 1 Lexan Lane Mt. Vernon, Indiana 47620-9367 / US | 03 /
TUKARAM, Gunale Flat F1 783 C Block AECS Layout Kundalahalli Bangalore 562107 / IN | [2015/24] | Representative(s) | Sabic Intellectual Property Group Sabic Intellectual Property Department P.O. Box 3008 6160 GA Geleen / NL | [2021/34] |
Former [2015/24] | Stiebe, Lars Magnus, et al Balder Paseo de la Castellana 93 28046 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 13747558.8 | 25.07.2013 | [2021/34] | WO2013US52057 | Priority number, date | US201261677224P | 30.07.2012 Original published format: US 201261677224 P | [2015/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014022196 | Date: | 06.02.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2880077 | Date: | 10.06.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.02.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2880077 | Date: | 25.08.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.02.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C08G63/85, C08L67/02, C08G63/183 | [2015/24] | CPC: |
C08G63/183 (EP,KR,US);
C08G63/85 (EP,KR,US);
C08L67/02 (US);
C08K3/40 (KR,US);
C08K5/103 (KR,US);
C08L67/06 (KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/24] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON POLYALKYLENTEREPHTHALATHARZZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN MIT EINEM TITANHALTIGEN KATALYSATORKOMPLEX | [2015/24] | English: | METHOD FOR THE PREPARATION OF POLYALKYLENE TEREPHTHALATE RESIN COMPOSITIONS EMPLOYING TITANIUM-CONTAINING CATALYST COMPLEX | [2015/24] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION DE COMPOSITIONS DE RÉSINE DE POLY(ALKYLÈNE TÉRÉPHTALATE) EMPLOYANT UN COMPLEXE DE CATALYSEUR CONTENANT DU TITANE | [2015/24] | Entry into regional phase | 27.10.2014 | National basic fee paid | 27.10.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.10.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.10.2014 | Examination requested [2015/24] | 27.07.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.07.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.11.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.01.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.06.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 16.07.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 16.07.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.07.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.07.2020 | Opposition(s) | 27.05.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/31] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 16.07.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 16.07.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 27.07.2021 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.07.2013 | AL | 25.08.2021 | AT | 25.08.2021 | CY | 25.08.2021 | CZ | 25.08.2021 | DK | 25.08.2021 | EE | 25.08.2021 | ES | 25.08.2021 | FI | 25.08.2021 | HR | 25.08.2021 | IT | 25.08.2021 | LT | 25.08.2021 | LV | 25.08.2021 | MC | 25.08.2021 | MK | 25.08.2021 | NL | 25.08.2021 | PL | 25.08.2021 | RO | 25.08.2021 | RS | 25.08.2021 | SE | 25.08.2021 | SI | 25.08.2021 | SK | 25.08.2021 | SM | 25.08.2021 | BG | 25.11.2021 | NO | 25.11.2021 | GR | 26.11.2021 | IS | 25.12.2021 | PT | 27.12.2021 | [2024/22] |
Former [2024/20] | HU | 25.07.2013 | |
AL | 25.08.2021 | ||
AT | 25.08.2021 | ||
CY | 25.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 25.08.2021 | ||
DK | 25.08.2021 | ||
EE | 25.08.2021 | ||
ES | 25.08.2021 | ||
FI | 25.08.2021 | ||
HR | 25.08.2021 | ||
IT | 25.08.2021 | ||
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
LV | 25.08.2021 | ||
MC | 25.08.2021 | ||
NL | 25.08.2021 | ||
PL | 25.08.2021 | ||
RO | 25.08.2021 | ||
RS | 25.08.2021 | ||
SE | 25.08.2021 | ||
SI | 25.08.2021 | ||
SK | 25.08.2021 | ||
SM | 25.08.2021 | ||
BG | 25.11.2021 | ||
NO | 25.11.2021 | ||
GR | 26.11.2021 | ||
IS | 25.12.2021 | ||
PT | 27.12.2021 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 25.07.2013 | |
AL | 25.08.2021 | ||
AT | 25.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 25.08.2021 | ||
DK | 25.08.2021 | ||
EE | 25.08.2021 | ||
ES | 25.08.2021 | ||
FI | 25.08.2021 | ||
HR | 25.08.2021 | ||
IT | 25.08.2021 | ||
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
LV | 25.08.2021 | ||
MC | 25.08.2021 | ||
NL | 25.08.2021 | ||
PL | 25.08.2021 | ||
RO | 25.08.2021 | ||
RS | 25.08.2021 | ||
SE | 25.08.2021 | ||
SI | 25.08.2021 | ||
SK | 25.08.2021 | ||
SM | 25.08.2021 | ||
BG | 25.11.2021 | ||
NO | 25.11.2021 | ||
GR | 26.11.2021 | ||
IS | 25.12.2021 | ||
PT | 27.12.2021 | ||
Former [2023/11] | AL | 25.08.2021 | |
AT | 25.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 25.08.2021 | ||
DK | 25.08.2021 | ||
EE | 25.08.2021 | ||
ES | 25.08.2021 | ||
FI | 25.08.2021 | ||
HR | 25.08.2021 | ||
IT | 25.08.2021 | ||
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
LV | 25.08.2021 | ||
MC | 25.08.2021 | ||
NL | 25.08.2021 | ||
PL | 25.08.2021 | ||
RO | 25.08.2021 | ||
RS | 25.08.2021 | ||
SE | 25.08.2021 | ||
SI | 25.08.2021 | ||
SK | 25.08.2021 | ||
SM | 25.08.2021 | ||
BG | 25.11.2021 | ||
NO | 25.11.2021 | ||
GR | 26.11.2021 | ||
IS | 25.12.2021 | ||
PT | 27.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 25.08.2021 | |
AT | 25.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 25.08.2021 | ||
DK | 25.08.2021 | ||
EE | 25.08.2021 | ||
ES | 25.08.2021 | ||
FI | 25.08.2021 | ||
HR | 25.08.2021 | ||
IT | 25.08.2021 | ||
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
LV | 25.08.2021 | ||
NL | 25.08.2021 | ||
PL | 25.08.2021 | ||
RO | 25.08.2021 | ||
RS | 25.08.2021 | ||
SE | 25.08.2021 | ||
SI | 25.08.2021 | ||
SK | 25.08.2021 | ||
SM | 25.08.2021 | ||
BG | 25.11.2021 | ||
NO | 25.11.2021 | ||
GR | 26.11.2021 | ||
IS | 25.12.2021 | ||
PT | 27.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 25.08.2021 | |
AT | 25.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 25.08.2021 | ||
DK | 25.08.2021 | ||
EE | 25.08.2021 | ||
ES | 25.08.2021 | ||
FI | 25.08.2021 | ||
HR | 25.08.2021 | ||
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
LV | 25.08.2021 | ||
NL | 25.08.2021 | ||
PL | 25.08.2021 | ||
RO | 25.08.2021 | ||
RS | 25.08.2021 | ||
SE | 25.08.2021 | ||
SK | 25.08.2021 | ||
SM | 25.08.2021 | ||
BG | 25.11.2021 | ||
NO | 25.11.2021 | ||
GR | 26.11.2021 | ||
IS | 25.12.2021 | ||
PT | 27.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AT | 25.08.2021 | |
CZ | 25.08.2021 | ||
DK | 25.08.2021 | ||
EE | 25.08.2021 | ||
ES | 25.08.2021 | ||
FI | 25.08.2021 | ||
HR | 25.08.2021 | ||
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
LV | 25.08.2021 | ||
NL | 25.08.2021 | ||
PL | 25.08.2021 | ||
RO | 25.08.2021 | ||
RS | 25.08.2021 | ||
SE | 25.08.2021 | ||
SK | 25.08.2021 | ||
SM | 25.08.2021 | ||
BG | 25.11.2021 | ||
NO | 25.11.2021 | ||
GR | 26.11.2021 | ||
IS | 25.12.2021 | ||
PT | 27.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 25.08.2021 | |
CZ | 25.08.2021 | ||
DK | 25.08.2021 | ||
EE | 25.08.2021 | ||
ES | 25.08.2021 | ||
FI | 25.08.2021 | ||
HR | 25.08.2021 | ||
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
LV | 25.08.2021 | ||
NL | 25.08.2021 | ||
PL | 25.08.2021 | ||
RO | 25.08.2021 | ||
RS | 25.08.2021 | ||
SE | 25.08.2021 | ||
SK | 25.08.2021 | ||
BG | 25.11.2021 | ||
NO | 25.11.2021 | ||
GR | 26.11.2021 | ||
IS | 25.12.2021 | ||
PT | 27.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 25.08.2021 | |
DK | 25.08.2021 | ||
ES | 25.08.2021 | ||
FI | 25.08.2021 | ||
HR | 25.08.2021 | ||
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
LV | 25.08.2021 | ||
NL | 25.08.2021 | ||
PL | 25.08.2021 | ||
RS | 25.08.2021 | ||
SE | 25.08.2021 | ||
BG | 25.11.2021 | ||
NO | 25.11.2021 | ||
GR | 26.11.2021 | ||
IS | 25.12.2021 | ||
PT | 27.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/16] | AT | 25.08.2021 | |
ES | 25.08.2021 | ||
FI | 25.08.2021 | ||
HR | 25.08.2021 | ||
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
LV | 25.08.2021 | ||
NL | 25.08.2021 | ||
PL | 25.08.2021 | ||
RS | 25.08.2021 | ||
SE | 25.08.2021 | ||
BG | 25.11.2021 | ||
NO | 25.11.2021 | ||
GR | 26.11.2021 | ||
IS | 25.12.2021 | ||
PT | 27.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AT | 25.08.2021 | |
ES | 25.08.2021 | ||
FI | 25.08.2021 | ||
HR | 25.08.2021 | ||
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
LV | 25.08.2021 | ||
PL | 25.08.2021 | ||
RS | 25.08.2021 | ||
SE | 25.08.2021 | ||
BG | 25.11.2021 | ||
NO | 25.11.2021 | ||
GR | 26.11.2021 | ||
IS | 25.12.2021 | ||
PT | 27.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 25.08.2021 | |
ES | 25.08.2021 | ||
FI | 25.08.2021 | ||
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
RS | 25.08.2021 | ||
SE | 25.08.2021 | ||
BG | 25.11.2021 | ||
NO | 25.11.2021 | ||
PT | 27.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AT | 25.08.2021 | |
ES | 25.08.2021 | ||
FI | 25.08.2021 | ||
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
SE | 25.08.2021 | ||
BG | 25.11.2021 | ||
NO | 25.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 25.08.2021 | |
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
NO | 25.11.2021 | Cited in | International search | [XAI]EP0634435 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [X] 1,3,5,16,18-20 * page 6, line 6 - page 7, line 58; examples 3-8; claims 4, 6, 9-11, 15, 16, 27; table 1 * [A] 9,10 [I] 2,4,6-8,11-15,17,21,22; | [XAI]WO9928033 (TIOXIDE SPECIALTIES LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1-3,5-8,11,16,18-20 * page 7, line 22 - page 8, line 2; examples 3, 5, 15, 17 Sample B; claim 20; table 4 * [A] 9,10,21,22 [I] 4,12-15,17; | [IA]US6066714 (PUTZIG DONALD EDWARD [US], et al) [I] 1-3,5-8,10-20 * column 1, line 62 - column 6, line 15; examples Procedure B, Procedure C, Control A, 2, 4; claims 1, 7; tables 1, 2 * [A] 4,9,21,22; | [A]EP1013692 (MITSUI CHEMICALS INC [JP]) [A] 1-22* paragraph [0076] - paragraph [0105]; claims 1-3, 17, 18, 32 *; | [XAI]US6303738 (PUTZIG DONALD EDWARD [US], et al) [X] 1,3,5-8,16,18,19 * column 5, line 24 - column 5, line 36; example 3 * [A] 9,10,22 [I] 2,4,11-15,17,20,21; | [XPI]US2013018143 (ALIDEDEOGLU HUSNU ALP [US], et al) [XP] 1-19,22 * examples 1-10; tables 1-12 * [I] 20,21 |